Codner v. State of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Cordell Codner and Jah Rastafari Malchizedek
Defendant: State of Florida, Ron DeSantis, Ashley Moody, Lee Packer, Governor of the State of Florida and Florida Attorney General
Case Number: 0:2022cv61878
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Randolph Cordell Codner re #13 Notice of Appeal, #12 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (jes)
November 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis and Affidavit by Randolph Cordell Codner. (jes)
November 8, 2022 Filing 19 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph Cordell Codner. Date received by USCA: 11/2/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-13724-J. (apz)
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph Cordell Codner. Date received by USCA: 11/02/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-13721-J. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE/REQUEST Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Randolph Cordell Codner re #13 Notice of Appeal, #12 Notice of Appeal. (Forms have been mailed to Randolph Codner to address on docket sheet). (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Randolph Cordell Codner re #13 Notice of Appeal. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Randolph Cordell Codner re #12 Notice of Appeal. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (construed from NOA DE #13 ) by Randolph Cordell Codner. Responses due by 11/14/2022 (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appeal RE: #7 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, by Randolph Cordell Codner. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appeal re: 11 Order Striking, by Randolph Cordell Codner. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #13 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (jes)
October 31, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (jes)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #8 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Randolph Cordell Codner, #10 Motion to Reassign Case filed by Randolph Cordell Codner Motions terminated: #10 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by Randolph Cordell Codner, #8 MOTION REQUEST for Court to Correct Form filed by Randolph Cordell Codner. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. (pls)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 (STRICKEN PER DE# 11 ) REQUEST for Judge Re-assignment by Randolph Cordell Codner. (cds) Modified Text on 10/25/2022 (cds).
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/21/2022 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS258780. (vt)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 (STRICKEN PER DE# 11 ) REQUEST for Court to Correct Form by Randolph Cordell Codner. (cds) Modified Text on 10/25/2022 (cds).
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 28 U.S.C. 2241 / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions DENIED AS MOOT: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Randolph Cordell Codner. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance re #5 Notice (Other), #4 Order, mailed to Randolph Cordell Codner. (swr)
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Exhibit per DE #4 (swr)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randolph Cordell Codner. (daa)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (daa)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Randolph Cordell Codner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codner v. State of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Cordell Codner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jah Rastafari Malchizedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron DeSantis
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Packer
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of the State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?