Clayborne v. Golden Krust Franchising, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith A. Clayborne
Defendant: Golden Krust Franchising, Inc. doing business as Golden Krust Caribbean Bakery & Grill
Case Number: 0:2022cv62018
Filed: October 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith A. Clayborne. Golden Krust Franchising, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2022, response/answer due 1/9/2023. (Bassaragh, Akivia)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT: Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re #1 Complaint, Exhibits F - I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GK Magazine Article, #2 Exhibit E-mail from Daren Hawthorne, #3 Exhibit 2015 Financial Disclosure Document, #4 Exhibit 2011 Financial Disclosure Document) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re #1 Complaint, Exhibit E - Part II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part II of the Oakland Park Franchise Agreement) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re #1 Complaint, Exhibit E - Part I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part I of the Oakland Park Franchise Agreement) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re #1 Complaint, Exhibit D - Part II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part II of the Tamarac Franchise Agreement) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re #1 Complaint, Exhibit D (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part I of the Tamarac Franchise Agreement) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Keith A. Clayborne re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Bassaragh, Akivia)
October 30, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (swr)
October 30, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
October 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Krust Franchising, Inc. d/b/a Golden Krust Caribbean Bakery & Grill. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16063257, filed by Clayborne Keith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lauderhill Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Coral Springs Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit Miramar Franchise Agreement)(Bassaragh, Akivia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayborne v. Golden Krust Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Clayborne
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Akivia Pete-A-Gay Al Bassaragh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Krust Franchising, Inc. doing business as Golden Krust Caribbean Bakery & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?