Belizaire v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Young Belizaire
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc, McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Sandoz Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE and Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2023cv62226
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Referring Judge: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
2 Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT REGARDING JOINT PROPOSED SCHELDULE FOR DISCOVERY by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Parties' Proposed Full Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B- Authorizations, #3 Exhibit C-Defendants' Proposed Limited Discovery Scheduling Order)(Mastrucci, Katherine)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Additionally, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(A) and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe) Modified on 12/21/2023 (rbe).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER. By December 29, 2023, at 5:00 PM EST, the Parties shall file a proposed schedule for discovery (whether bifurcated or non-bifurcated), dispositive motions, and trial. The parties shall also submit the proposed schedule to rosenberg@flsd.uscourts.gov in Microsoft Word format. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Mastrucci, Katherine)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Attorney Jennifer Ann McLoone added to party Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ann McLoone added to party Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Remand Order) (McLoone, Jennifer)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Darin Lee Schanker, mailing date November 22, 2023. (cw)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. (jas)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01530. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas).
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(DePaz, Matt)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
February 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (jjs)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6656952) filed by Gloria Young Belizaire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Gloria Young Belizaire(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2018) (jjs). Modified on 2/28/2018 (jjs). Modified on 2/28/2018 (jjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belizaire v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Represented By: Katherine Grace Mastrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Represented By: Katherine Grace Mastrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Represented By: Katherine Grace Mastrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Young Belizaire
Represented By: J Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Darin Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?