Whirlpool Corporation et al v. The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
Plaintiff: Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. and Maytag Properties, LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", YenvK H2 Water Store, Ezshoo's booth, guangwei666 Store, accentraos.com, daiglecc.com, freewoodhut.com, handmadeteapot.com, homecarewholesale.com, playbabys.com, scodian.com, zalanbo.com, annalo-296060, chhol_4570, deckowo76, eballons, electfan, ha880771, haochuandianzi, hi-zonet0, janie-538162, jiachenjian_7, knlz75, lgde9021, liuthg, maenben, mattiel15, mi_737954, no1-tek, qimengping, shenzhenaigeke0, tiixab-12, tugvrt, wke902, yvyz58, Discount at home, Every Drop RWF, Nature Gift, TodChoen and GDQD Co., Ltd
Case Number: 0:2023cv62244
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re #23 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
January 24, 2024 Filing 26 Plaintiff's NOTICE upon Defendants via Electronic Mail by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re #23 Order on Ex Parte Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
January 24, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Whirlpool Properties, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC. Discount at home served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; Every Drop RWF served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; Ezshoo's booth served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; GDQD Co., Ltd served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; Nature Gift served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; TodChoen served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; YenvK H2 Water Store served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; accentraos.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; annalo-296060 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; chhol_4570 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; daiglecc.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; deckowo76 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; eballons served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; electfan served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; freewoodhut.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; guangwei666 Store served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; ha880771 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; handmadeteapot.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; haochuandianzi served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; hi-zonet0 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; homecarewholesale.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; janie-538162 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; jiachenjian_7 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; knlz75 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; lgde9021 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; liuthg served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; maenben served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; mattiel15 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; mi_737954 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; no1-tek served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; playbabys.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; qimengping served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; scodian.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; shenzhenaigeke0 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; tiixab-12 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; tugvrt served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; wke902 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; yvyz58 served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024; zalanbo.com served on 12/15/2023, response/answer due 1/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David P. Reiner, II on behalf of accentraos.com, daiglecc.com. Attorney David P. Reiner, II added to party accentraos.com(pty:dft), Attorney David P. Reiner, II added to party daiglecc.com(pty:dft). (Reiner, David)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #6 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
December 15, 2023 Filing 22 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2023 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Whirlpool Properties, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC. No Defendants appeared. Court will enter proposed order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, Court Reporter: Laura Melton, 305-523-5633 / Laura_Melton@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mkz)
December 14, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment,, #15 Ex Parte Document, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #3 Form AO 120/121, #12 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #9 Sealed Document, #8 Order on Motion to Seal, #10 Sealed Document, #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #16 Bond, #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 Plaintiff's NOTICE by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #12 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #14 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint Certificates of Registration for Whirlpools Trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint Certificate of Registration for the Maytag Trademark)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL: The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to unseal all docket entries in this case and return those portions of the Court file to the public records. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 Seizure BOND in the amount of $25,000 posted by Whirlpool Corporation and Whirlpool Properties, Inc. Approved by DEPUTY CLERK. (scn)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 Document Notice of Filing Part 2 of Composite Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns In Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 2, to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #7 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/15/2023 11:50 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Responses due by 12/8/2023 Replies due by 12/12/2023. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to YenvK H2 Water Store, and all other Defendants identified in Schedule A hereto. (scn) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 Document Notice of Filing Proposed Summonses re DE#8 Order on Motion to Seal, by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Document re DE#8 Order on Motion to Seal, by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule "A" to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to File Under Seal. Schedule A to Plaintiffs' Complaint and the Summonses shall be filed under seal and shall remain under seal until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Graff in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #3 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Unsealed per order at DE#18 on 12/11/2023 (scn).
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Whirlpool International Holdings S.a.r.l., Corporate Parent KitchenAid Delaware, Inc., Corporate Parent 1900 Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Whirlpool Holdings Corporation for Maytag Properties, LLC (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint.) (caw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17097451, filed by Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Whirlpool Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Certificate of Registration for the Maytag Trademark)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whirlpool Corporation et al v. The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Christine Ann Daley
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whirlpool Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Christine Ann Daley
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maytag Properties, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Christine Ann Daley
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YenvK H2 Water Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezshoo's booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guangwei666 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: accentraos.com
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: daiglecc.com
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: freewoodhut.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handmadeteapot.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: homecarewholesale.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: playbabys.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: scodian.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zalanbo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annalo-296060
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chhol_4570
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: deckowo76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eballons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: electfan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ha880771
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haochuandianzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hi-zonet0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: janie-538162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiachenjian_7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: knlz75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lgde9021
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liuthg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maenben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mattiel15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mi_737954
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: no1-tek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qimengping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzhenaigeke0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tiixab-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tugvrt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wke902
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yvyz58
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount at home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Every Drop RWF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature Gift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TodChoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDQD Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?