YZ Productions, Inc. v. The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: YZ Productions, Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, Buzzdaisy Children's Clothing (2) and giofjJHp45 (3)
Case Number: 0:2023cv62268
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 31 Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A - Motions Terminated: #30 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/23/2024. (cds)
January 23, 2024 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alisha Moriceau)(Moriceau, Alisha)
January 3, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YZ Productions, Inc. of Complaint, Plaintiff's trademark and copyright registrations, Issued Summons, orders Granting and Extending Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, and Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Moriceau, Alisha)
January 3, 2024 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge James I. Cohn: Motion for Preliminary Hearing held on 1/3/2024 re 12 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and an Order to Show Cause as to Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by YZ Productions, Inc. Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (spe)
January 3, 2024 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 27 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cds)
January 3, 2024 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 26 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cds)
January 2, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Buzzdaisy Children's Clothing (2) and giofjJHp45 (3). (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 29, 2023 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (cds)
December 29, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by YZ Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #19 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESCHEDULE HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOE 1 re #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by YZ Productions, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Striking #18 Second MOTION to Extend Sealed Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing Presently Set for December 20, 2023, to January 3, 2024 filed by YZ Productions, Inc. by YZ Productions, Inc. (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 Second MOTION to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing on its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alisha Moriceau, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing on its Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Moriceau, Alisha)
December 28, 2023 Filing 18 (STRICKEN PER DE#20 ) Second MOTION to Extend Sealed Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing Presently Set for December 20, 2023, to January 3, 2024 by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alisha Moriceau, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Sealed Temporary Restraining Order and Rescheduling Hearing)(Moriceau, Alisha) Modified Text on 12/28/2023 (cds).
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendant No. 1 (melcarbre) by YZ Productions, Inc. (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 15, 2023 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. PER DE#16 (cds)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/3/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Responses due by 12/28/2023 Replies due by 12/29/2023. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend Sealed Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing Presently Set for December 20, 2023, to January 3, 2024 by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alisha Moriceau, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Sealed Temporary Restraining Order and Reschedule Hearing)(Moriceau, Alisha)
December 6, 2023 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 14 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cds)
December 5, 2023 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 12 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2029754)
December 5, 2023 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 13 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2029754)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Motion File Under Seal. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 4, 2023 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 9 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cds)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moriceau, Alisha)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by YZ Productions, Inc. (Moriceau, Alisha)
December 1, 2023 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 7 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2029754)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: ( Jury Trial set for 8/26/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 8/22/2024 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters and to conduct a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 11/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (nwn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17105416, filed by YZ Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trademark, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copyright, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moriceau, Alisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YZ Productions, Inc. v. The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YZ Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Alisha Moriceau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buzzdaisy Children's Clothing (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: giofjJHp45 (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?