Passage Health International, LLC v. Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Passage Health International, LLC
Defendant: Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 0:2023cv62278
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 25 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. (Gerson, Shari)
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (cds)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand. Replies due by 1/25/2024. (Passaro, Geralyn) Modified Link on 1/19/2024 (cds).
January 18, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. Replies due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Marlena P. Pickering)(Gerson, Shari)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. #20 . Therein, Defendant requests a brief extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #16 because Plaintiff has provided Defendant with "additional information" regarding the claim at issue in this case. Id. at 1. Plaintiff does not oppose the relief requested. Id. at 2. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #20 is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand on or before January 18, 2024. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/5/2024. (mh02)
January 5, 2024 Reset Deadline as to #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 1/18/2024. PER DE#21 (cds)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerson, Shari)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff Passage Health International, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed on December 20, 2023. #18 . Therein, Plaintiff requests a brief extension of time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #15 because "Plaintiff requires additional time to prepare and file its response to the Motion to Dismiss due to holiday time constraints." Id. at 1. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #18 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 20, 2024. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/2/2024. (mh02)
January 2, 2024 Set Deadline as to #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 1/20/2024. PER DE#19 (cds)
December 29, 2023 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Passage Health International, LLC. (Passaro, Geralyn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Howard Tescher as Mediator. Mediation set for 03/25/2024 (Rothman, Robin) Modified Text on 12/29/2023 (cds).
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Passage Health International, LLC. Attorney Robin Beth Rothman added to party Passage Health International, LLC(pty:pla). (Rothman, Robin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/3/2024) by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. (Gerson, Shari)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent The Cigna Group, (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cigna International Health Services BVBA (Belgium), Other Affiliate Cigna Elmwood Holdings SPRL (Belgium), Other Affiliate Cigna Myrtle Holdings, Ltd. (Malta), Other Affiliate Cigna Palmetto Holdings, Ltd. (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Cigna Laurel Holdings, Ltd., (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Cigna Linden Holdings, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings Overseas, Inc (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cigna Global Reinsurance Company, Ltd. (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Cigna Global Holdings, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company, (Delaware) for Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. (Yesner, Eric)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. Cigna International Health Services BVBA, Cigna Elmwood Holdings SPRL, Cigna Myrtle Holdings, Ltd., Cigna Palmetto Holdings, Ltd., Cigna Laurel Holdings, Ltd., Cigna Linden Holdings, Inc., Cigna Holdings Overseas, Inc., Cigna Global Reinsurance Company, Ltd., Cigna Global Holdings, Inc. Cigna Holding Company (cds)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. (Yesner, Eric)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two-week trial period beginning October 21, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If any party is not an individual (e.g., a corporation), a representative of that party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. The mediation shall take place in person absent good cause shown by the parties. No party shall be excused from attendance without express authorization from the Court. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/15/2023. (mh02)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN FORT LAUDERDALE. This case is now set for trial commencing the two-week trial period of October 21, 2024, at 9 a.m. in the United States District Courthouse, 299 East Broward Boulevard, Fort Lauderdale, Florida. The assigned courtroom will be announced at the calendar call. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on October 17, 2024, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for October 8, 2024, at 11 a.m. The calendar call and the final pretrial conference will take place in Courtroom 13-1 (thirteenth floor), United States District Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Parties are hereby notified that this Court requires strict compliance with Local Rule 56.1 regarding the filing of any motion for summary judgment and corresponding statements of material facts. For evidence not previously filed on the docket, and to the extent practicable, evidentiary support for a Party's statement of material facts shall be filed as separate exhibits within the Court's electronic case filing system; the first citation to any evidence in support of a motion for summary judgment or statement of material facts shall provide the docket entry for that evidence using the form "ECF No." In all circumstances, citations to any composite exhibit shall provide both the page number assigned by the Court's electronic case filing system (i.e., the page number of the PDF) and the page number of the document. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/15/2023. (mh02) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. (Yesner, Eric)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Passage Health International, LLC (Passaro, Geralyn)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. #6 . Therein, Defendant requests a brief extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint because Defendant "requires additional time to consider a series of significant threshold legal issues." Id. at 1. Plaintiff does not oppose the request. Id. at 2. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #6 is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 21, 2023. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/6/2023. (mh02)
December 6, 2023 Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C. response/answer due 12/21/2023. PER DE#7 (cds)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. Attorney Eric Matthew Yesner added to party Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/19/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Yesner, Eric)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALICIA O. VALLE. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Valle's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/1/2023. (mh02)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/1/2023. (mh02)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel J. Lomba, mailing date December 1, 2023, (pt)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17110225, filed by Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint/Documents)(Gerson, Shari) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. Modified text and attachment description on 12/1/2023 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Passage Health International, LLC v. Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Passage Health International, LLC
Represented By: Geralyn Marie Passaro
Represented By: Robin Beth Rothman
Represented By: Daniel J. Lomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna International Health Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shari Lyn Gerson
Represented By: Eric Matthew Yesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?