Chanel, Inc. v. 21914270 et al
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: 21914270, 21923202, 21910381, 21910127, 21702870, 21831943, 21831935, 21831945, 21930915, 21897234, 21930514 and 21925406
Case Number: 0:2024cv60261
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 16 Clerk's Entry of Default as to 21702870, 21831935, 21831943, 21831945, 21897234, 21910127, 21910381, 21914270, 21923202, 21925406, 21930514, 21930915 - Motions Terminated: #15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/28/2024. (drz)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to 21702870, 21831935, 21831943, 21831945, 21897234, 21910127, 21910381, 21914270, 21923202, 21925406, 21930514, 21930915 by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Chanel, Inc.. 21702870 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21831935 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21831943 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21831945 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21897234 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21910127 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21910381 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21914270 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21923202 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21925406 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21930514 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024; 21930915 served on 2/26/2024, response/answer due 3/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 26, 2024 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to all Defendant's Identified on Schedule "A" hereto. (drz)
February 26, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Chanel, Inc. re 11 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) combined) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (drz)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Chanel, Inc. re #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) combined) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Chanel, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Gaffigan Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Gaffigan Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion Authorizing Alternate Service of Process)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chanel, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/20/2024. (pb00)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/20/2024. (pb00)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Logs) (wce)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17299050, filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint Certificates of Registration for the Chanel Trademarks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. 21914270 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Ann Daley
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21914270
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21923202
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21910381
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21910127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21702870
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21831943
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21831935
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21831945
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21930915
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21897234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21930514
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21925406
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?