OJ Commerce LLC v. NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Defendant: NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC doing business as National Tree Company, NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, INC doing business as National Tree Company, NATIONAL TREE INTERMEDIARY, LLC, NATIONAL TREE HOLDING, LLC, JOSEPH A PULEO, SALVATORE PULEO, JR and RICHARD PULEO
Case Number: 0:2024cv60331
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #13 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Party listed as being served ; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#14]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (drz)
April 26, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by OJ Commerce LLC. SALVATORE PULEO, JR served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (for image see de #13 ) (drz)
April 26, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by OJ Commerce LLC. NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, INC served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. JOSEPH A PULEO waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. SALVATORE PULEO, JR waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. RICHARD PULEO waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. NATIONAL TREE INTERMEDIARY, LLC waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. NATIONAL TREE HOLDING, LLC waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
April 10, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OJ Commerce LLC. NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC waiver sent on 3/5/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Hecht, Shlomo)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/28/2024. (pb00)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/28/2024. (pb00)
February 28, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, INC, NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC, NATIONAL TREE HOLDING, LLC, NATIONAL TREE INTERMEDIARY, LLC, JOSEPH A PULEO, RICHARD PULEO, and SALVATORE PULEO, JR. (wce)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17326109, filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s))(Hecht, Shlomo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OJ Commerce LLC v. NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Represented By: Shlomo Y Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, LLC doing business as National Tree Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CHRISTMAS PRODUCTS, INC doing business as National Tree Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL TREE INTERMEDIARY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL TREE HOLDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A PULEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE PULEO, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PULEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?