Kallas, et al v. Carnival Corporation, et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv20115
Filed: January 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Federico A. Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Denying All Pending Motions as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/13/2010. (cm)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/27/2010. (cm)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 219 Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Nitin Paranjpe re lost earnings of Hailey Kallas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/30/2009. (EGT)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OMNIBUS ORDER granting 162 Motion in Limine; granting in part 163 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 164 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 165 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 166 Motion to Strike Experts; gran ting in part 167 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 168 Motion in Limine; denying 169 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 170 Motion in Limine; denying 171 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 172 Motion in Limine; denying 173 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 174 Motion in Limine; denying 175 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/13/2009. (EGT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kallas, et al v. Carnival Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?