Blaszkowski et al v. Mars Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs filed a class action complaint against Defendants Mars Inc., Proctor & Gamble Co., Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods Co., Nestle USA, Nutro Products Inc., Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets Inc., Winn Dixie Stores Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Inc., Pet Supermarket Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp. and Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Plaintiffs alleged that Defendants fraudulently and negligently misrepresented that their pet foods were safe and healthy.

Plaintiff: Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis, All Plaintiffs, Susan Peters, Deborah Hock, Mike Floyd, Beth Wilson, Claire Kotzampaltiris, Donna Hopkins-Jones, Nicole Piazza, Marian Lupo, Jane Herring, Jo-Ann Murphy, Stephanie Stone, Patricia Hanrahan, Debbie Rice, Ann Quinn, Sharon Mathiesen, Sandy Shore, Carolyn White, Lou Wiggins, Michelle Lucarelli, Raul Isern, Daniele Valoras, Lisa MacDonald, Cindy Tregoe, Jennifer Damron, Marlena Rucker, Julie Nelson, Gene Reed, Yvonne Thomas, Debbie McGregor, Linda Brown and Tone Gaglione
Defendant: Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co., Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Super Markets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc. and Natura Pet Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv21221
Filed: May 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M. Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice, Joint Stipulation 638 is APPROVED, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2009. (cqs)
March 30, 2009 Filing 638 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maltzman, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/1/2009 (ls).
March 19, 2009 Filing 637 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Status (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2009 Filing 636 PARTIAL JUDGMENT in favor of the Natura against the Dismissing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/6/2009. (ail)
March 6, 2009 Filing 635 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Filing Proposed Partial Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Partial Judgment)(York, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2009 Filing 634 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 3/5/2009. The parties will provide the Court with additional paperwork on March 19, 2009. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina, Phone: 305-523-5518. (lc2)
March 4, 2009 Filing 633 NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Telephnoic Status Conference reset for 3/5/2009 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Conference call information stays the same; only time of day changes.(ps1)
March 3, 2009 Filing 632 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Withdrawal of Motions to Dismiss (York, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER Setting telephonic Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/5/2009 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Please see order for instructions for conference call. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/27/2009. (ps1)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER granting 629 Motion for Extension of Time to File Fifth Amended Complaint and Mediation Results. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/25/2009. (ps1)
February 25, 2009 Filing 629 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Fifth Amended Complaint and Report of Mediation by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
February 12, 2009 Filing 628 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs, Natura Pet Products, Inc. Joint Notice Of Inability To Unanimously Agree To Trial And Final DispositiMagistrate Judge Stephen T. Brownon By (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting 555 Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintiffs are to file an amended complaint by 2/25/09. Request for leave to file a Rule 12(b)(3) motion to dimiss for improper venue, found in the 577 Response in Opposition filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc. is denied. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/12/2009. (ps1)
February 10, 2009 Filing 626 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Court's Orders Regarding Motions to Compel and Motion Regarding Sufficiency of Answers by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER granting 624 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to 612 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Susan Peters, 600 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cindy Tregoe and Jo-Ann Murphy; Responses due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/6/2009. (ps1)
February 5, 2009 Filing 624 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 600 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cindy Tregoe and Jo-Ann Murphy, 612 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Susan Peters, Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response by Susan Peters, Jo-Ann Murphy, Cindy Tregoe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Jonathan)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER re 621 Stipulation filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc. Parties shall attend mediation on 2/24/09. Parties shall file Mediation Report on or before 2/25/09. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/4/2009. (lcs)
February 4, 2009 Filing 622 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Natura Pet Products, Inc. for dates of February 12, 2009 through February 13, 2009 (York, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2009 Filing 621 STIPULATION and Request for Leave of Court to Use a California Mediator and Schedule a Mediation in California by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2009 Filing 620 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Emergency Discovery Hearing held on 2/3/2009. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina, Phone: 305-523-5518. (lc2)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER denying 615 Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline to Allow for Reconsideration of Motion for Reconsideration of Court Orders Regarding Defendant's Motions to Compel Further Discovery Requests; granting in part 616 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Production of Her Computer Hard Drive to Defendant Natura Pet Food Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/3/2009. (ps1)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting 617 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation; the parties have until 2/6/09. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/3/2009. (ps1)
February 2, 2009 Filing 617 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Jonathan)
February 2, 2009 Filing 616 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Production of Patricia Davis' Computer Hard Drive to Defendant Natura Pet Products Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, # 2 Declaration of Patricia Davis)(MacIvor, Catherine)
February 2, 2009 Filing 615 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Allow for Reconsideration of Motion for Reconsideration of Court Orders Regarding Defendants' Motions to Compel Further Discovery Responses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, # 2 Declaration of Patricia Davis)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 29, 2009 Filing 614 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 612 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Susan Peters of Request for Judicial Notice (York, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2009 Filing 613 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 612 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Susan Peters of Filing Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly)(York, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2009 Filing 612 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Susan Peters by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER denying 610 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 1/29/2009. (lc1)
January 28, 2009 Filing 610 MOTION for Reconsideration re 605 Order on Motion to Compel,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER denying 607 Motion to Strike ; denying 608 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/28/2009. (ch1)
January 27, 2009 Filing 608 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor; or in the Alternative, Those Portions Which Are Inadmissible as Evidence by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2009 (York, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2009 Filing 607 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Edgar R. Nield in Support of Class Certification Motion; or in the Alternative, Those Portions Which Are Inadmissible as Evidence by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2009 (York, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2009 Filing 606 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Filing Evidentiary Objection to the Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman (York, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting 584 Motion to Compel; granting 585 Motion to Compel; granting 586 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 1/26/2009. (ra1)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting 587 Motion Regarding the Sufficiency of Answers...Plaintiff, Daivs shall have (5) days from the date of this order to file amended answers to Request for Admissions 1, 3, 4, 5 and 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 1/26/2009. (dt)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER denying 523 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/26/2009. (lcs)
January 23, 2009 Filing 602 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Request for Judicial Notice (York, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2009 Filing 601 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 600 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cindy Tregoe and Jo-Ann Murphy of Filing Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly)(York, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2009 Filing 600 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cindy Tregoe and Jo-Ann Murphy by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2009 Filing 599 Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 583 Order, Terminate Parties US Mail returned for: Return to sender. Moved left no address. Unable to forward, for Lisa MacDonald. (Notice not delivered by other means for this event). (jmd)
January 16, 2009 Filing 598 REPLY to Response to Motion re 555 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 597 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Affidavit or Arna Cortazzo (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arna Cortazzo)(Schwartz, Jonathan)
January 16, 2009 Filing 596 REPLY to Response to Motion re 560 Corrected MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 595 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Edgar R. Nield (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C, Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C, Part 5, # 9 Exhibit C, Part 6, # 10 Exhibit C, Part 7, # 11 Exhibit C, Part 8, # 12 Exhibit C, Part 9, # 13 Exhibit C, Part 10, # 14 Exhibit C, Part 11, # 15 Exhibit C, Part 12, # 16 Exhibit C, Part 13, # 17 Exhibit D)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 594 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor, # 2 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 593 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Objections to Defendant's Declarations in Support of Natura Pet Products Inc.'s Opposition to Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Defendants' Declarations)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 592 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entries 588, 589 & 590 by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 591 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 590 NOTICE by All Defendants of Filing the Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor, # 2 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 589 NOTICE by All Defendants Declaration of Edgar R. Nield (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 1 of 13, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C, Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C, Part 5, # 9 Exhibit C, Part 6, # 10 Exhibit C, Part 7, # 11 Exhibit C, Part 8, # 12 Exhibit C, Part 9, # 13 Exhibit C, Part 10, # 14 Exhibit C, Part 11, # 15 Exhibit C, Part 12, # 16 Exhibit C, Part 13, # 17 Exhibit D)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2009 Filing 588 NOTICE by All Defendants of Filing Objections to Defendants' Declarations in Support of Natura Pet Products, Inc.'s Opposition to Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Defendants' Declarations)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 13, 2009 Filing 587 MOTION Regarding the Sufficiency of Answers and Objections to Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Patricia Davis by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert C. Mardian III)(York, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2009 Filing 586 MOTION to Compel Responses to Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Plaintiff Patricia Davis by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert C. Mardian III)(York, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2009 Filing 585 MOTION to Compel Responses by Jo-Ann Murphy and Cindy Tregoe to Natura's Third Set of Interrogatories; and Patricia Davis to Natura's Fourth Set of Interrogatories by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert C. Mardian III)(York, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2009 Filing 584 MOTION to Compel Responses by Jo-Ann Murphy and Cindy Tregoe to Natura's Second Set of Interrogatories; and Patricia Davis to Natura's Third Set of Interrogatories by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert C. Mardian III)(York, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice, Yvonne Thomas terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/7/2009. (lcs)
January 6, 2009 Filing 582 STIPULATION for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Defendant and Plaintiff Yvonne Thomas by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting 515 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 545 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2009. (lcs)
December 23, 2008 Filing 580 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 552 Notice (Other), 548 Notice (Other), 549 Notice (Other), 551 Notice (Other) Evidentiary Objections (Giel, Michael)
December 23, 2008 Filing 579 RESPONSE in Opposition re 560 Corrected MOTION to Certify Class filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Caverly Decl. (1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Caverly Decl. (2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - 1 of 4, # 4 Exhibit Ex 2 - 2 of 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex 2 - 3 of 4, # 6 Exhibit Ex 2 - 4 of 4, # 7 Exhibit Ex 3, # 8 Exhibit Ex 4)(Giel, Michael)
December 23, 2008 Filing 578 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 577 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Request for Judicial Notice (Giel, Michael)
December 23, 2008 Filing 577 RESPONSE in Opposition re 555 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit 1 (2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 2)(Giel, Michael)
December 22, 2008 Filing 576 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of January 8-12, 2009 for Catherine MacIvor only (MacIvor, Catherine)
December 8, 2008 Filing 575 REPLY to Response to Motion re 545 MOTION to Strike 543 Notice (Other) and Accompanying Memorandum of Law filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting 518 Motion for voluntary dismissal with prejudice without an award of costs and fees. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/5/08. (ch1)
December 4, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines per Order at DE 573 as to 560 Corrected MOTION to Certify Class. Replies due by 1/16/2009. (bb)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER granting 572 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/4/2008. (jw)
December 4, 2008 Filing 572 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by All Plaintiffs, Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Enlargement of Deadlines)(Giel, Michael)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER denying 570 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/3/08. (jc)
December 2, 2008 Filing 570 MOTION to Strike 553 Response/Reply (Other) Portions of Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Susan Peters by Susan Peters. Responses due by 12/19/2008 (Schwartz, Jonathan)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER Granting 566 Sealed Document.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/2/08. (jc)
December 1, 2008 Filing 568 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund OF REMOVAL OF AMY W. SCHULMAN AND (Simpson, Lonnie)
November 28, 2008 Filing 567 RESPONSE in Opposition re 545 MOTION to Strike 543 Notice (Other) and Accompanying Memorandum of Law and Cross-Motion to Allow Leave to File Objection filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
November 26, 2008 Filing 566 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 24, 2008 Filing 565 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 554 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Withdrawal (Giel, Michael)
November 21, 2008 Filing 564 Sealed Document. (tas)
November 18, 2008 Filing 563 NOTICE by Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. of Removal of Mark Goodman from This Court's Electronic Service List (Litten, Barbara)
November 18, 2008 Filing 562 NOTICE by Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. of Removal of Barbara Bolton Litten From This Court's Electronic Service List (Litten, Barbara)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER denying 556 Motion to Certify Class in light of docket entry 560. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
November 18, 2008 Filing 560 Corrected MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/8/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER denying 540 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order as to Subpoenaed Documents. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/18/2008. (ps1)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER denying 557 Motion for Hearing. The Court will advise the parties if and when a hearing will be scheduled after the pending motions are briefed and any motions for dismissal and for summary judgment are resolved. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
November 18, 2008 Filing 557 Agreed MOTION for Hearing re 556 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by All Plaintiffs, Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 556 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Patricia Davis. Responses due by 12/5/2008 (Schwartz, Jonathan)
November 17, 2008 Filing 555 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 554 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 539 Sealed Document of Filing Objection to or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion to File Financial Affidavits and Supporting Documents of Renee Blaszkowski and Jennifer Damron and Accompanying Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly)(York, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2008 Filing 553 RESPONSE/REPLY in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Susan Peters Pursuant to Rule 56 filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly)(York, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2008 Filing 552 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Patrick N. Keegan (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick N. Keegan, # 2 Exhibits to Declaration of Patrick N. Keegan)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 551 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 550 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Intent to File Confidential Document (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 549 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Deposition Transcript of Peter Atkins (Attachments: # 1 Deposition of Peter Atkins)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 17, 2008 Filing 548 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Deposition Transcript of Patricia Davis (Attachments: # 1 Deposition of Patricia Davis)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 14, 2008 Filing 547 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER Denying Agreed Motion to File Under Seal, re: 539 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/14/2008. (ps1)
November 13, 2008 Filing 545 MOTION to Strike 543 Notice (Other) and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2008 (Giel, Michael)
November 11, 2008 Filing 544 NOTICE by The Kroger Co. of Ohio re 483 Order, Notice of Removal of James K. Reuss From Electronic Service List (Fulmer, Charles)
November 7, 2008 Filing 543 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Evidentiary Objection to Natura Pet Products, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Against Non-Natura Plaintiffs Linda Brown, et al. (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 7, 2008 Filing 542 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order as to Subpoenaed Documents (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 541 REPLY to Response to Motion re 518 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice without an Award of Costs and Fees filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Jennifer Damron. (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 540 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash and Objections as to Subpoenaed Documents by Maltzman Foreman, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 539 Sealed Document. (igo)
November 6, 2008 Filing 538 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Exhibit A to the Declaration of Russell Keith (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 537 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Russell Keith (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Russell Keith)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 536 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Excerpts from the Deposition of Plaintiff Patricia Davis (Attachments: # 1 Excerpts from the Deposition of Plaintiff Patricia Davis)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 6, 2008 Filing 535 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor, # 2 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 5, 2008 Filing 534 RESPONSE/REPLY to 515 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
November 5, 2008 Filing 533 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. re 526 Notice (Other) of Filing Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Giel, Michael)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER re 529 Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order and Approved Confidentiality Agreement filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/4/2008. (ail)
November 4, 2008 Filing 531 RESPONSE in Opposition re 523 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Susan Peters Pursuant to Rule 56 filed by Susan Peters. (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 4, 2008 Filing 530 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Susan Peters (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Peters, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Composite Exhibit C)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 3, 2008 Filing 529 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Filing Stipulated Protective Order and Approved Confidentiality Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Giel, Michael)
October 29, 2008 Attorney Patrick J. Houlihan; Juli Ann Lund; Philip A. Sechler; Dane H. Butswinkas and Thomas G. Hentoff terminated per documents # 508,509,510,511,512,513,514. (mr1)
October 27, 2008 Filing 528 RESPONSE in Opposition re 515 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Debbie McGregor, Linda Brown, Tone Gaglione, Deborah Hock, Beth Wilson, Claire Kotzampaltiris, Donna Hopkins-Jones, Marian Lupo, Jane Herring, Stephanie Stone, Patricia Hanrahan, Ann Quinn, Sharon Mathiesen, Sandy Shore, Carolyn White, Lou Wiggins, Michelle Lucarelli, Raul Isern, Daniele Valoras, Marlena Rucker, Julie Nelson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 27, 2008 Filing 527 NOTICEof Filing the Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Defendants, Natura Pet Products, Inc., Motion for Summary Judgment by Debbie McGregor, Linda Brown, Tone Gaglione, Deborah Hock, Beth Wilson, Claire Kotzampaltiris, Donna Hopkins-Jones, Marian Lupo, Jane Herring, Stephanie Stone, Patricia Hanrahan, Ann Quinn, Sharon Mathiesen, Sandy Shore, Carolyn White, Lou Wiggins, Michelle Lucarelli, Raul Isern, Daniele Valoras, Marlena Rucker, Julie Nelson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine) Modified on 10/28/2008 (ail).
October 27, 2008 Filing 526 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Catherine MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting 524 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Reply to 518 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice without an Award of Costs and Fees; Replies due by 11/6/2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/23/2008. (ps1)
October 22, 2008 Filing 524 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 522 Response in Opposition to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Without an Award of Costs and Fees by Renee Blaszkowski, Jennifer Damron. (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 21, 2008 Filing 523 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Susan Peters Pursuant to Rule 56 by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly, # 4 Declaration of Ronn Walthers, # 5 Declaration of Jonathan D. Brunk, # 6 Declaration of Shawn Salas)(Giel, Michael)
October 20, 2008 Filing 522 RESPONSE in Opposition re 518 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice without an Award of Costs and Fees filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
October 16, 2008 Filing 521 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs of Catherine J. MacIvor for December 18, 2008 through January 6, 2009 (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 16, 2008 Filing 520 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs of Catherine J. MacIvor for November 24, 2008 through December 2, 2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 16, 2008 Filing 519 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs of Catherine J. MacIvor for November 5, 2008 through November 14, 2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 13, 2008 Filing 518 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice without an Award of Costs and Fees by Renee Blaszkowski, Jennifer Damron. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 13, 2008 Filing 517 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Jennifer Damron (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Damron)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 13, 2008 Filing 516 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Renee Blaszkowski (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Renee Blaszkowski)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 10, 2008 Filing 515 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 10/30/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of K. Caverly (1 of 5), # 4 Declaration of K. Caverly (2 of 5), # 5 Declaration of K. Caverly (3 of 5), # 6 Declaration of K. Caverly (4 of 5), # 7 Declaration of K. Caverly (5 of 5))(Giel, Michael)
October 10, 2008 Filing 514 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Thomas G. Hentoff (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 513 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Philip A. Sechler (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 512 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Patrick J. Houlihan (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 511 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Juli Ann Lund (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 510 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal of Court's Electronic Service List for Dane H. Butswinkas (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 509 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Christopher M. D' Angelo (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Filing 508 NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc. of Removal from Court's Electronic Service List for Amy R. Davis (Ortega, Omar)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Iams Company; Mars, Inc.; Mars Petcare US, Inc.; Menu Foods Income Fund; NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.; Nestle Purina Petcare Co.; Del Monte Foods, Co. and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.; these Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 9, 2008. (ps1)
October 9, 2008 Filing 506 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Non-Natura Claims by All Manufacturing Defendants, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER denying 457 Motion to Add and/or Substitute Cortazzo; granting 484 Motion for Leave to Supplement Motion to Add and/or Substitute. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 8, 2008. (ps1) Modified on 10/9/2008 to reflect correct signature date (bb).
October 2, 2008 Filing 504 NOTICE by Natura Pet Products, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Henderson, Caverly, Pum & Charney LLP) (York, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2008 Filing 503 NOTICE by Renee Blaszkowski, Jennifer Damron of Intent to File Voluntary Dismissal of Claims against Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc. (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff, Debbie Rice, pursuant to 460 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, and 492 Order to Show Cause; Debbie Rice terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 1, 2008. (ps1)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting 499 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Robert C. Mardian, III, Esq. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 30, 2008. (ps1)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER that Plaintiff Lisa MacDonald is STRICKEN as a named plaintiff in this cause, re: 487 Order to Show Cause, 455 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Lisa MacDonald. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 30, 2008. (ps1)
September 29, 2008 Filing 498 NOTICE by Del Monte Foods, Co., Iams Company, Natura Pet Products, Inc. Notice of Unsuccessful Attempts to Serve Plaintiff Lisa MacDonald (Greer, Alan)
September 26, 2008 Filing 497 REPLY to Response to Motion re 484 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 25, 2008 Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION for Admission of Robert C. Mardian III Pro Hac Vice to Represent Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc., Filing Fee $75.00, Receipt #987797. (cw)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER denying 495 Motion to Strike Natura's Three "Evidentiary Objections". Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 24, 2008. (ps1)
September 23, 2008 Filing 495 MOTION to Strike Natura's Three "Evidentiary Objections" by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/10/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 23, 2008 Filing 494 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Pending and Dismissed Claims (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting 491 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re 484 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative; Replies due by 9/26/2008.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 19, 2008. (ps1)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re: 460 order requiring Debbie Rice to notify Court if she intends to proceed pro-se; Show Cause Response due by 9/26/2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 19, 2008. (ps1)
September 18, 2008 Filing 491 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Motion to add and/or Subsitute Arna Cortazzo as Plaintiff/Class Representative by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 18, 2008 Filing 490 NOTICE by Meijer Inc. of Removal of Jason Daniel Joffe from this Court's Electronic Service List (Litten, Barbara)
September 18, 2008 Filing 489 NOTICE by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. of Removal of Robin Lea Hanger from this Court's Electronic Service List (Litten, Barbara)
September 18, 2008 Filing 488 NOTICE by Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. of Removal of John B.T. Murray, Jr. from this Court's Electronic Service List (Litten, Barbara)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2008.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/16/08. (ail)
September 16, 2008 Filing 486 RESPONSE in Opposition re 484 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly)(Giel, Michael)
September 15, 2008 Attorney Bjorg Eikeland terminated. per document # 485 and chambers instructions (mr1)
September 15, 2008 Filing 485 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Removal of Bjorg Eikeland from this Court's Electronic Service List (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 12, 2008 Filing 484 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Exhibit "A", # 3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", # 4 Exhibit Exhibit "C", # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit "C", # 6 Exhibit Exhibit "D", # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit "D", # 8 Exhibit Exhibit "E")(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 481 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by New Albertson's Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Albertson's LLC, Pet Supermarket, Inc., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Target Corp., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., All Plaintiffs, Petsmart Inc., Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 12, 2008. (ps1)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 480 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Nestle Purina Petcare Co., Iams Company, Menu Foods Holding, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Menu Foods, Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co., All Plaintiffs, Del Monte Foods, Co., Menu Foods Income Fund, Mars Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 12, 2008. (ps1)
September 12, 2008 Filing 481 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Albertson's LLC, The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 12, 2008 Filing 480 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Holding, Inc., Iams Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., All Plaintiffs, Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co. (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 11, 2008 Filing 479 RESPONSE/REPLY to 471 Notice (Other) Evidentiary Objection to Supplemental Declaration of Catherine MacIvor and Exhibit Attached Thereto filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
September 11, 2008 Filing 478 RESPONSE/REPLY to 468 Notice (Other) Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Arna Cortazzo and Exhibit Attached Thereto filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
September 11, 2008 Filing 477 RESPONSE/REPLY to 466 Notice (Other) Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor and Exhibit Attached Thereto filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Giel, Michael)
September 9, 2008 Filing 476 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal Without Prejudice (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 8, 2008 Filing 475 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 8, 2008 Filing 474 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Amended) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 8, 2008 Filing 473 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 8, 2008 Filing 472 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing the Declaration of Patricia Davis (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia Davis)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 5, 2008 Filing 471 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 468 Notice (Other) of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor, # 2 Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 469 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 468 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of filing Amended Declaration of Arna Cortazzo (attaching exhibit) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 467 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Arna Cortazzo (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arna Cortazzo)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 466 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor)(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 3, 2008 Filing 465 REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff (As to Non-Natura Defendants' Response) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(MacIvor, Catherine)
September 2, 2008 Filing 464 NOTICE by All Defendants of Postponement of Deposition of Lisa McDonald (Licko, Carol)
August 29, 2008 Filing 463 RESPONSE in Opposition re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly in Support of the Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Declaration of Kristen E. Caverly in Support of the Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and/or Substitute Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative)(Giel, Michael)
August 29, 2008 Filing 462 RESPONSE to Motion re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff filed by Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc.. Replies due by 9/11/2008. (Greer, Alan)
August 28, 2008 Filing 461 NOTICE by Del Monte Foods, Co. of Notice of Filing Proof of Service to Pro Se Plaintiff Lisa MacDonald (Gallardo, Anaysa)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 456 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine J. MacIvor; Jason E. Baker and Patrick N. Keegan terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 08/25/08. (ail)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff filed by All Plaintiffs; additional responses due by 8/29/2008, Replies due by 9/3/2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on August 26, 2008. (ps1)
August 25, 2008 Filing 458 RESPONSE in Opposition re 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff Arna Cortazzo as a Plaintiff/Class Representative filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2008 Attorney Jason E. Baker and Patrick N. Keegan terminated per Order at DE 455 . (bb)
August 22, 2008 Filing 457 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Add and/or Substitute Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/11/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 22, 2008 Filing 456 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Debbie Rice by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/11/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting 454 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine J. MacIvor terminated; Deadline to obtain new counsel: 20 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on August 21, 2008. (ps1)
August 21, 2008 Filing 454 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Lisa MacDonald by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/8/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting 452 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tony F. Farmani terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/14/08. (ail)
August 14, 2008 Filing 452 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/2/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2008 Filing 451 NOTICE of Compliance With Court Order Dated July 31, 2008 by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 4, 2008 Filing 450 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone conference Proceedings held on 7/31/2008 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 1-28 pages.. (cqs)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER STRIKING 441 Notice filed by Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 8/1/08. (ail)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting 447 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings (CMA)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER denying 437 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/31/08. (ail)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting 429 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/31/08. (lc1)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER DENYING 428 Motion to Compel as moot and approving Stipulation 442 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/31/08. (lc1)
July 31, 2008 Filing 443 Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2008 re 437 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. For the reasons stated in open court, the Motion is Denied. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (mo)
July 31, 2008 Filing 442 STIPULATION Scheduling Plaintiffs' Depositions and Conditions Thereto by Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Licko, Carol)
July 30, 2008 Filing 447 Defendants Petco, Petsmart, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Target's Unopposed MOTION for Limited Appearance of Mark C. Goodman, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #724547. (cw)
July 30, 2008 Filing 441 NOTICE by Nestle Purina Petcare Co. of Plaintiffs' Failure to Respond and Request to Grant Defendants' Motion to Compel [D.E. 429] (Licko, Carol)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ENDORSED ORDER granting 439 Motion to Continue. Hearing will be reset by separate order if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/30/08. (lc1)
July 29, 2008 Filing 439 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue 7/31/08 hearing before Judge Brown by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/15/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 29, 2008 Filing 438 NOTICE of Hearing on 437 Plaintiff's Renewed MOTION to Stay: Telephonic Hearing set for 7/31/2008 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Please see notice for instructions for conference call.(ps1)
July 29, 2008 Filing 437 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/15/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ex A Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 28, 2008 Filing 436 RESPONSE in Opposition re 426 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Plaintiffs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 428 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Plaintiffs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of P. Keegan Ex A)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ENDORSED ORDER denying 431 Motion for Oral Argument. The request is denied at this time. After reviewing the written materials, the Court will set a hearing if it deems one necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/23/08. (lc1)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ENDORSED ORDER granting 432 Motion Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/23/08. (lc1)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 428 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Plaintiffs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2008 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 07-22-08. (dt)
July 21, 2008 Filing 432 MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion to Compel Depositions of Plaintiffs by Mars Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 431 MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Answers Regarding Pet Food Communications by Mars Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 430 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Documents and Interrogatory Answers Regarding Pet Food Communications by Mars Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 429 MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers to Interrogatories Regarding Pet Food Communications by Mars Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2008 (Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 428 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Plaintiffs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 427 STATUS REPORT and Notice of the Defendants' Proposed Plan of Sequenced Discovery by Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of D. Jeffrey Ireland, # 2 Exhibit Exh A to Declaration of Jeffrey Ireland, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Ireland Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Ireland Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ireland, # 6 Exhibit Ex. E of Declaration of Ireland, # 7 Exhibit F of Declaration of Ireland, # 8 Exhibit Ex. G to Declaration of Ireland, # 9 Exhibit Exh. H to Declaration of Ireland)(Greer, Alan)
July 21, 2008 Filing 426 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Plaintiffs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order on Motion to Compel)(Ortega, Omar)
July 21, 2008 Filing 425 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order dated June 25, 2008 DE 414 by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER denying without prejudice 421 Motion to Stay; denying 422 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on July 21, 2008. (ps1)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting 419 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for attorney E. Desmond Hogan. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on July 21, 2008. (ps1)
July 18, 2008 Filing 422 MOTION for Hearing re 421 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 18, 2008 Filing 421 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/4/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 18, 2008 Filing 420 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs in Support of Motion for Stay (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor, # 2 Exhibit "A" to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit "B" to Declaration)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 16, 2008 Filing 419 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for E. Desmond Hogan, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #983833. (cw)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting 415 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings ; granting 416 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings ; granting 417 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings (CMA)
June 25, 2008 Filing 417 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Edgar R. Nield, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982799. (cw)
June 25, 2008 Filing 416 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Patrick N. Keegan, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982798. (cw)
June 25, 2008 Filing 415 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Jason E. Baker, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982796. (cw)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting 410 Motion for Reconsideration, amending 401 Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 24, 2008. (ps1)
June 20, 2008 Filing 413 REPLY to Response to Motion re 410 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Defendants' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 9, 2008 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 410 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Defendants' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests filed by All Manufacturing Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Relevant Portions of Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Iams, # 3 Exhibit Letter to Mars and Nutro, # 4 Exhibit Letter to Purina, # 5 Exhibit Letter to Natura, # 6 Exhibit Letter to Hill's, # 7 Exhibit Letter to Del Monte, # 8 Exhibit 5-14-080 Letter to Natura)(Greer, Alan)
June 4, 2008 Filing 411 NOTICE of Compliance and Objection by All Plaintiffs re 401 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 3, 2008 Filing 410 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Defendants' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 3, 2008 Filing 409 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Transcript of Hearing Held May 23, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Transcript)(MacIvor, Catherine)
June 3, 2008 Filing 408 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Transcript of Hearing Held April 4, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Transcript)(MacIvor, Catherine)
June 3, 2008 Filing 407 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Transcript of Hearing Held January 25, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Transcript)(MacIvor, Catherine)
May 30, 2008 Filing 406 NOTICE by All Defendants of Proposed Special Masters (Greer, Alan)
May 29, 2008 Attorney Maria Kayanan terminated per 403 . (tb)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting 404 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed order appointing mediator. The proposed order shall be filed no later than Wednesday, June 4, 2008. (CMA)
May 29, 2008 Filing 404 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Order Appointing Special Master by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Stephen T. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacIvor, Catherine)
May 29, 2008 Filing 403 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Maria Kayanan on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kayanan, Maria)
May 27, 2008 Filing 402 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Scott Baumberger on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Baumberger, Peter)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting 382 Motion to Sequence; denying 395 Motion to Strike. The parties are to submit proposed orders appointing a special master by May 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on May 23, 2008. (ps1)
May 23, 2008 Filing 400 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga : Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2008 re 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests filed by Iams Company,, 395 MOTION to Strike Defendant Manufacturers' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Document Requests and Request for Attorneys Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. The parties were heard on the pending motions. A written order is forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518
May 22, 2008 Filing 399 RESPONSE in Support re 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests filed by Iams Company. (Greer, Alan)
May 22, 2008 Filing 398 RESPONSE in Opposition re 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests, 388 MOTION to Adopt/Join 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER denying 392 Emergency Motion to Continue Hearing set for May 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/22/08. (md)
May 22, 2008 Filing 396 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J)(MacIvor, Catherine)
May 22, 2008 Filing 395 MOTION to Strike Defendant Manufacturers' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Document Requests and Request for Attorneys Fees by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/6/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(MacIvor, Catherine)
May 22, 2008 Filing 394 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Supplement to Motion to Continue Hearing DE 392 (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 22, 2008 Filing 393 RESPONSE in Opposition re 392 Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests filed by Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Garcia-Linares, Manuel)
May 22, 2008 Filing 392 Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/6/2008 (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 22, 2008 Filing 391 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Douglas Knox (Knox, Steven)
May 21, 2008 Filing 390 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing List of Pet Food Products Purchased by Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 List of Pet Food Products Purchased by Plaintiffs)(MacIvor, Catherine)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting 388 Motion to Adopt/Join (CMA)
May 20, 2008 Filing 388 MOTION to Adopt/Join 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests by Mars Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
May 20, 2008 Filing 387 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Debbie McGregor (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 19, 2008 Set Deadlines as to 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests; Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2008 09:05 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting 384 Motion for Oral Argument; Oral Argument is scheduled for May 23, 2008 at 9:05 a.m.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on May 19, 2008. (ps1)
May 19, 2008 Filing 385 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of July 2, 3, and 7, 2008; July 25 thru August 1, 2008; and October 8 - 10, 2008 (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2008 Filing 384 MOTION Request for Oral Argument on Its Motion to sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs' Document Requests by Iams Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Greer, Alan)
May 16, 2008 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM in Support re 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests filed by Iams Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit B-1# 4 Exhibit B-2# 5 Exhibit B-3# 6 Exhibit B-4# 7 # 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I)(Greer, Alan)
May 16, 2008 Filing 382 MOTION to Sequence Document Production and to Limit Plaintiffs Document Requests by Iams Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Greer, Alan)
May 16, 2008 Filing 381 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of 05/28/08 through 06/20/08 (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 12, 2008 Filing 380 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Albertson's LLC.(Kalil, Craig)
May 12, 2008 Filing 379 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by New Albertson's Inc..(Kalil, Craig)
May 12, 2008 Filing 378 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Complaint) by Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc..(Tamarazzo, Dominick)
May 12, 2008 Filing 377 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods, Inc..(Knox, Steven)
May 12, 2008 Filing 376 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Publix Supermarkets, Inc..(Turner, Hugh)
May 12, 2008 Filing 375 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Litten, Barbara)
May 12, 2008 Filing 374 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) by Target Corp..(Litten, Barbara)
May 12, 2008 Filing 373 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) by Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc..(Litten, Barbara)
May 12, 2008 Filing 372 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint) by Petsmart Inc..(Litten, Barbara)
May 12, 2008 Filing 371 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nestle Purina Petcare Co..(Licko, Carol)
May 12, 2008 Filing 370 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc..(Craig, Ana)
May 12, 2008 Filing 369 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Natura Pet Products, Inc..(Giel, Michael)
May 12, 2008 Filing 368 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth) by Iams Company.(Greer, Alan)
May 12, 2008 Filing 367 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Del Monte Foods, Co..(Colombo, Sherril)
May 12, 2008 Filing 366 ANSWER to Fourth Amended Complaint by Nutro Products, Inc. by Mars Petcare US, Inc., Mars Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part II to Answer# 2 Answer Part III)(Ortega, Omar) Modified Text on 5/12/2008 (ra).
May 12, 2008 Filing 365 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Pet Supermarket, Inc..(Kayanan, Maria)
May 9, 2008 Filing 364 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. (Patino, Ralph)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting 362 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings (CMA)
May 5, 2008 Filing 362 Unopposed MOTION for Admission of Tony F. Farmani Pro Hac Vice to Represent Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc., Filing Fee $75, Receipt #979615. (cw)
May 5, 2008 Attorney Gail E. Lees; William Edward Wegner; Mark Whitburn; Charles H. Abbott and Gary L. Justice terminated per Order at DE 358 . Sent terminated attorney(s) instructions for tracking future case activity. (bb)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting 359 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, granting 360 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings (CMA)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting 357 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Omar Ortega for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Dane H. Butswinkas for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Patrick J. Houlihan for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Thomas G. Hentoff for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Philip A. Sechler for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. Attorney Gail E. Lees; William Edward Wegner; Mark Whitburn; Charles H. Abbott and Gary L. Justice terminated.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on May 5, 2008. (ps1)
May 1, 2008 Filing 360 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Juli Ann Lund on Behalf of Mars, Inc., Mars Petcare U.S., Inc., and Nutro Products, Inc.; Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #979452. (cw)
May 1, 2008 Filing 359 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Amy R. Davis on Behalf of Mars, Inc., Mars Petcare U.S., Inc., and Nutro Products, Inc.; Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #979453. (cw)
May 1, 2008 Filing 357 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney of Record by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. Responses due by 5/15/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Order)(Ortega, Omar)
April 28, 2008 Attorney Cassidy Yen Dang terminated per 356 notice. Sent terminated attorney(s) instructions for tracking future case activity. (ps1)
April 25, 2008 Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell and Martin Leonard Steinberg terminated per Order at DE 353 . Sent terminated attorney(s) instructions for tracking future case activity. (bb)
April 25, 2008 Filing 356 NOTICE by Pet Supermarket, Inc. of Attorney No Longer Associated (Kayanan, Maria)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 355 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE BROWN: Trial set for 2 week trial period beginning 11/9/2009 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga; Calendar Call set for 10/27/2009 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2009. Fact Discovery due by 2/9/2009. Motions in limine due by 10/5/2009. All pre-trial motions due by 8/3/2009.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on April 25,2008.(ps1)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting 352 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Answers and Affirmative Defenses for Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint; responses by all Defendants (except The Kroger Co.) are due by 5/12/2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on April 25, 2008. (ps1)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting 350 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Omar Ortega for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell and Martin Leonard Steinberg terminated as to NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on April 25, 2008. (ps1)
April 24, 2008 Filing 352 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by all Defendants by Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Licko, Carol)
April 24, 2008 Filing 351 SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Licko, Carol)
April 24, 2008 Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. Responses due by 5/8/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
April 11, 2008 Filing 349 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 29# 2 Exhibits 30 through 35)(MacIvor, Catherine)
April 9, 2008 Filing 348 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of 4/24/08 - 5/5/08 (MacIvor, Catherine)
April 9, 2008 Filing 347 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of 4/16/08 - 4/19/08 (MacIvor, Catherine)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 336 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants, P&G, Colgate, and Nestle USA, are dismissed from the action without prejudice. Plaintiffs are directed to file a Fourth Amended Complaint by Friday, April 11, 2008; the parties are directed to submit a new scheduling report by April 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on April 21, 2008. (ps1)
April 8, 2008 Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 345 Motion Hearing,, 344 Order, 343 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge Email returned for: Cassidy Yen Dang Resolved by: Attorney Dang provided correct email address. NEF was resent. (mc)
April 8, 2008 Filing 345 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2008 re 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint. The parties were heard on the pending motion. A written order is forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER on Discovery [See order for full details].Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 04-07-08.(dt)
April 3, 2008 Filing 343 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order 2008-09 to Judge Stephen T. Brown. Judge William C. Turnoff no longer assigned to the case. (yc)
March 31, 2008 Filing 342 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by all parties for dates of 7/11/08-8/1/08 (Diaz, Rolando)
March 18, 2008 Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint filed by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Meijer Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Natura Pet Products, Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
March 7, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint. Replies due by 3/18/2008. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting in part 338 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint; Consolidated Replies due by 3/18/2008. Oral Argument is scheduled for 4/4/08 at 8:30 a.m.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on March 7, 2008. (ps1)
March 7, 2008 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re 338 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint, 337 Response in Opposition to Motion /Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Consolidated Reply in S filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
March 6, 2008 Filing 338 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint, 337 Response in Opposition to Motion /Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Consolidated Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Natura Pet Products, Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exh. A# 2 Exhibit Exh. B - E-mail)(Licko, Carol)
March 3, 2008 Filing 337 RESPONSE in Opposition re 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
February 14, 2008 Filing 336 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 333 Amended Complaint by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Natura Pet Products, Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. Responses due by 2/29/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Affidavit)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
January 31, 2008 Notice of Undeliverable E-Mail re 334 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Kristen E. Caverly, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #973888, 335 Order on Motion for Limited Appearance Email returned for: Christopher M. D'Angelo Resolved by: Called attorneys' office, the Receptionist informed that this attorney is not longer with the firm. The attorney cannot be located no forwarded address or an email address was found. Email address has been deleted. (mc)
January 31, 2008 Attorney Sara F. Holladay-Tobias terminated as per Order 329 Sent terminated attorney(s) instructions for tracking future case activity. (lk)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting 334 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings (CMA)
January 25, 2008 Filing 334 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Admission of Kristen E. Caverly Pro Hac Vice to Represent Defendant Natura Pet Products, Inc., Filing Fee $75, Receipt #973888. (cw)
January 25, 2008 Filing 333 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 29# 2 Exhibits 30 - 35)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 310 Motion for Leave the File Third Amended Complaint; the Third Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of this date; Defendants have 20 days to respond. Granting in part and denying in part 314 Motion for Protective Order, and denying as moot 279 Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on January 25, 2008. (ps1)
January 25, 2008 Filing 331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga : Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2008 re 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs, 314 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. The parties were heard on the pending motions. For the reasons stated in open court, 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs is GRANTED. 314 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Kroger Co. of Ohio is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (mo)
January 24, 2008 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to Motion re 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting 322 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on January 24, 2008. (ps1)
January 24, 2008 Filing 328 NOTICE of Striking 323 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc.,, 324 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Unopposed Pro Hac Vice filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc., by Natura Pet Products, Inc. (York, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2008 Filing 327 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion. Pursuant to 2B in the Administrative Procedures, a motion to make a limited appearance must be filed in the conventional manner along with the applicable filing fee. LOCAL COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO 1. FILE A NOTICE TO STRIKE DE# 323 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc., 324 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Unopposed Pro Hac Vice filed by Natura Pet Products, Inc., AND 2. CONVENTIONALLY FILE AN ORIGINAL MOTION TO MAKE A LIMITED APPEARANCE ALONG WITH THE APPLICABLE FILING FEE. (gp)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting 318 Motion for Joinder, denying as moot 323 Motion for Leave to Appear, granting 324 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear (CMA)
January 24, 2008 Filing 325 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 24, 2008 Filing 324 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Unopposed Pro Hac Vice by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/7/2008 (York, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2008 Filing 323 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/7/2008 (York, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2008 Filing 322 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. Responses due by 2/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2008 Filing 321 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Amanda Sample (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda Sample)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 24, 2008 Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition re 314 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 23, 2008 Filing 319 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Kroger Form 10-k in opposition to Kroger's Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kroger Form 10-k year ending 2/3/07)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 23, 2008 Filing 318 Defendant's MOTION for Joinder in 317 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Target Corp.. (Litten, Barbara)
January 22, 2008 Filing 317 RESPONSE in Opposition re 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Natura Pet Products, Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Licko, Carol)
January 22, 2008 Filing 316 NOTICE of Striking 313 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Kroger Co. of Ohio, by The Kroger Co. of Ohio (Fulmer, Charles)
January 22, 2008 Filing 315 NOTICE Regarding Hearing: Court will hear argument on Motion 314 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order, 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint: Court will hear argument on these motions in addition to the previously scheduled matter. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
January 18, 2008 Filing 314 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30(b)(6))(Fulmer, Charles)
January 18, 2008 Filing 313 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition)(Fulmer, Charles)
January 17, 2008 Filing 312 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE of Hearing on 310 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
January 16, 2008 Filing 310 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/31/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2008 Filing 309 NOTICE of Striking 308 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct their Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs, Exhibit "A" by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2008 Filing 308 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct their Complaint by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/31/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint)(MacIvor, Catherine)
January 16, 2008 Filing 307 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Safeway by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 14, 2008 Filing 306 NOTICE by New Albertson's Inc. Notice of Withdrawing New Albertsons Personal Jurisdiction Objection and Supporting Affidavit (Kalil, Craig)
January 14, 2008 Filing 305 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing reset for 1/25/2008 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
January 14, 2008 Filing 304 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ana M. Craig on behalf of Colgate Palmolive Company (Craig, Ana)
January 11, 2008 Filing 303 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant H. E. Butt Grocery Company by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 11, 2008 Filing 302 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Stop & Shop by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 11, 2008 Filing 301 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Meijer, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
January 8, 2008 Filing 300 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 12/19/07 before Judge Cecilia M. altonaga. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 1-79 pages.. (cqs)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting 298 Motion for Joinder. (CMA)
January 2, 2008 Filing 298 MOTION for Joinder in 279 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 260 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (York, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2007 Filing 297 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meijer Inc.. (Litten, Barbara)
December 20, 2007 Filing 296 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/15/2008 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER denying as moot 283 Motion for Protective Order, denying as moot 286 Motion for Protective Order, granting 287 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery, denying as moot 289 Motion for Protective Order, denying as moot 290 Notice of Joinder, denying as moot 291 Motion for Protective Order. The briefing schedule on the consolidated motion to dismiss is suspended until future order.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 20, 2007. (ps1)
December 20, 2007 Filing 294 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga : Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2007 re 290 MOTION for Joinder in 289 MOTION for Protective Order and Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice, 283 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc. 286 MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by New Albertson's Inc., 289 MOTION for Protective Order and Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice filed by Meijer Inc., 287 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by New Albertson's Inc., 291 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. The parties were heard on the pending motions. For the reasons stated in open court, 287 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by New Albertson's Inc. is granted. All other pending motions are denied as moot in light of the parties' intention to meet and confer to resolve the scope of discovery. Order forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (mo)
December 19, 2007 Filing 293 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Email to Counsel for New Albertson's Inc. in Opposition to Their Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Email to Counsel for New Albertson's Inc.)(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 19, 2007 Filing 292 RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
December 19, 2007 Filing 291 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. (Fulmer, Charles)
December 19, 2007 Filing 290 MOTION for Joinder in 289 MOTION for Protective Order and Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice, 283 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. (Jimenez, Marcos)
December 18, 2007 Filing 289 MOTION for Protective Order and Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice by Meijer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Litten, Barbara)
December 18, 2007 Filing 288 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 287 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery, 286 MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law: Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2007 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
December 18, 2007 Filing 287 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by New Albertson's Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Poyer, Joshua)
December 18, 2007 Filing 286 MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law by New Albertson's Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Poyer, Joshua)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 284 Request for Hearing; hearing on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order is scheduled for December 19, 2007 at 2:00 p.m.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 18, 2007. (ps1)
December 17, 2007 Filing 284 Defendant's MOTION for Hearing re 283 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. (Jimenez, Marcos)
December 17, 2007 Filing 283 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, Marcos)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 280 Motion for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 17, 2007. (ps1)
December 14, 2007 Filing 282 Summons Issued as to Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (tb)
December 14, 2007 Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 279 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 260 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Super Markets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Request for Oral Argument)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
December 14, 2007 Filing 279 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 260 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Super Markets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. Responses due by 12/31/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through I)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 262 Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and denying 268 Cross Motion to Strike Portions of Response.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 13, 2007. (ps1)
December 12, 2007 Filing 277 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga : Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2007 re 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. The parties were heard on the pending motion. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion is granted. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (mo)
December 12, 2007 Filing 276 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Strike Portions of the Jurisdictional Defendants' Response (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine J. MacIvor# 2 Exhibit "A")(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 12, 2007 Filing 275 REPLY to Response to Motion re 273 Defendant's MOTION In Opposition to Cross-Motion re 268 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 12, 2007 Filing 274 NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 273 Defendant's MOTION In Opposition to Cross-Motion re 268 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc., Error: Wrong Event Selected; should have been docketed as memorandum in opposition, not a motion; Instruction to Filer=In the future please select the proper Event. (ps1)
December 11, 2007 Filing 273 Defendant's MOTION In Opposition to Cross-Motion re 268 Reply to Response to Motion, by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, Marcos)
December 11, 2007 Filing 272 NOTICE of Striking 267 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Meijer Inc., by Meijer Inc. (Joffe, Jason)
December 11, 2007 Filing 271 RESPONSE in Opposition re 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery filed by Meijer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Affidavit of Robert VerHeulen in Support of Jurisdictional Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery)(Joffe, Jason)
December 11, 2007 Filing 270 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 267 Notice (Other) filed by Meijer Inc., ERROR: Document Title (Response) Does Not Match Event (Notice) Selected; Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly. (gp)
December 11, 2007 Filing 269 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Declaration of Amanda Sample in Support of Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda Sample# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 10, 2007 Filing 268 REPLY to Response to Motion re 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amanda Sample# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 10, 2007 Filing 267 NOTICE by Meijer Inc. of Filing Third Affidavit of Robert VerHeulen in Support of Jurisdictional Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Third Affidavit of Robert VerHeulen)(Joffe, Jason)
December 7, 2007 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery filed by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Alwine, Robert)
December 5, 2007 Filing 265 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing 7.1 Certificate as to Plaintiffs/Class Representatives Motion for leave to conduct personal jurisdiction discovery (Eikeland, Bjorg)
December 5, 2007 Filing 264 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Corrected Exhibits to Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibits to Motion for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery [DE 262-2])(MacIvor, Catherine)
December 4, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines per Order at DE 263 as to 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery. Responses due by 12/7/2007 Replies due by 12/10/2007. (bb)
December 4, 2007 Set Deadlines as to 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery: Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2007 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER SETTING HEARING re 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs, hearing scheduled for December 12, 2007 at 3:00 p.m. Please see order for expedited briefing schedule.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 4, 2007.(ps1)
December 3, 2007 Filing 262 MOTION for Discovery To Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/17/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through D)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 30, 2007 Filing 261 Summons Issued as to Natura Pet Products, Inc.. (ail)
November 29, 2007 Filing 260 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-30# 2 Exhibits 31-35)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 258 Motion. Plaintiffs are reminded to comply with the folllowing instructions in future submissions: Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, proposed orders shall be filed initially as an attachment to a motion, notice, or other filing; however, the final version of the proposed document must be e-mailed to Judge Altonaga at altonaga@flsd.uscourts.gov. The final version of the proposed document shall be submitted by e-mail in WordPerfect or Word format. The e-mail line and the name of the attachment should include the case number, followed by a short description of the attachment (e.g., 00-cv-00000 Order). Failure to follow the above outlined procedure may result in denial of the motion without prejudice. The CM/ECF Administrative Procedures may be viewed at http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov. (CMA)
November 19, 2007 Filing 258 Plaintiff's MOTION to Deem Correct Second Amended Complaint as filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-35 to the Second Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 31-35 to Second Amended Complaint)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying as moot 232 Motion to Dismiss; defendants' consolidated response to the second amended complaint is due by 1/11/08; granting in part 255 Motion for Extension of Time for Joinder of Parties and to Amend Pleadings, granting 256 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; the Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date of this order.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on November 19, 2007. (ps1)
November 16, 2007 Filing 256 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Renee Blaszkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(MacIvor, Catherine)
November 16, 2007 Filing 255 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and to Join Parties by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/3/2007 (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 16, 2007 Filing 254 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Nestle SA by Renee Blaszkowski (MacIvor, Catherine)
November 13, 2007 Filing 253 NOTICE by Safeway Inc. of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Laura A. Donald (Jimenez, Marcos)
November 12, 2007 Filing 252 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Certificate of Service for Nestle SA (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MacIvor, Catherine)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 30, 2007. (ps1)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 249 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
October 29, 2007 Filing 249 MOTION for Substitution of Counsel and Motion for Admission of Mark Whitburn Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #969141. (cw)
October 29, 2007 Filing 248 REPLY to Response to Motion re 244 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 243 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by New Albertson's Inc., Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Nestle S.A., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Jimenez, Marcos)
October 25, 2007 Filing 247 RESPONSE to Motion re 244 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 243 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/1/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1")(Eikeland, Bjorg)
October 25, 2007 Filing 246 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bjorg Eikeland on behalf of all plaintiffs (Eikeland, Bjorg)
October 23, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines per Order at DE 245 as to 244 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 243 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 10/25/2007 Replies due by 10/29/2007. (bb)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER taking under advisement 244 Motion for Reconsideration and requiring expedited briefing. In order to avoid any further delay in the briefing of the issues raised in the pending Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Motion for Reconsideration by Thursday, October 25, 2007. The reply memorandum, if any, must be filed by Monday, October 29, 2007. (CMA)
October 22, 2007 Filing 244 Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 243 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by New Albertson's Inc., Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Nestle S.A., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. (Jimenez, Marcos)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting in part 240 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response re 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint; Responses due by 11/30/2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 19, 2007. (ps1)
October 19, 2007 Filing 242 REPLY to Response to Motion re 240 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 19, 2007 Filing 241 RESPONSE to Motion re 240 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, filed by Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. Replies due by 10/26/2007. (Licko, Carol)
October 19, 2007 Filing 240 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, by All Plaintiffs. (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 17, 2007 Filing 239 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albertson's LLC. (Poyer, Joshua)
October 17, 2007 Filing 238 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Albertson's Inc.. (Poyer, Joshua)
October 15, 2007 Filing 237 NOTICE of Compliance With Order of the Court by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Nestle S.A., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co. re 234 Order (Licko, Carol)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 233 Motion for Oral Argument on Consolidated Motion to Dismiss; the parties are responsible for coordinating the date of the argument and to advise the court of the date.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 15, 2007. (ps1)
October 15, 2007 Filing 235 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, filed by Publix Supermarkets, Inc.,, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.,, Pet Supermarket, Inc.,, Colgate Palmolive Company,, Nestle S.A.,, Menu Foods, Inc.,, Menu Foods Income Fund,, Mars Inc.,, Proctor and Gamble Co.,, Del Monte Foods, Co.,, Nestle U.S.A. Inc.,, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.,, Petsmart Inc.,, Target Corp.,, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.,, New Albertson's Inc.,, Iams Company,, Albertson's LLC,, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company,, H.E. Butt Grocery Company,, Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc.,, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.,, Mars Petcare US, Inc.,, Nestle Purina Petcare Co.,, The Kroger Co. of Ohio,, Safeway Inc.,, Meijer Inc.,, Meijer Super Markets, Inc.,, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.,, Pet Supplies "Plus",, Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Error: Attachments 1 and 2 Should Have Been Part of Main Document. (ls)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER re 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint; the Defendants are instructed to submit a courtesy copy to Chambers by October 18, 2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 15, 2007.(ps1)
October 12, 2007 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 232 MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Nestle S.A., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Super Markets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Oral Argument)(Licko, Carol) Modified on 10/15/2007 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #232]
October 12, 2007 Filing 232 First MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, by Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., New Albertson's Inc., Iams Company, Albertson's LLC, Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Nestle S.A., Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co., The Kroger Co. of Ohio, Safeway Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Super Markets, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc., Mars Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. Responses due by 10/26/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Part 2 # 2 Main Document Part 3 # 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I)(Licko, Carol) Modified on 10/15/2007 (ls). [Missing description on exhibits/attachments-corrected by Clerk]
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 230 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
October 4, 2007 Filing 230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of James K. Reuss, Esq., Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #541175. (cw)
October 4, 2007 Filing 229 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by all plaintiffs for dates of 11-6-07 thru 11-9-07 and 11-19-07 thru 11-23-09 (MacIvor, Catherine)
October 4, 2007 Filing 228 Notice of Instruction to Filer Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion. Pursuant to 2B in the Administrative Procedures, a motion to make a limited appearance must be filed in the conventional manner along with the applicable filing fee. LOCAL COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO 1. FILE A NOTICE TO STRIKE DE# 227 MOTION for Limited Admission of James K. Reuss filed by The Kroger Co. of Ohio, AND 2. CONVENTIONALLY FILE AN ORIGINAL MOTION TO MAKE A LIMITED APPEARANCE ALONG WITH THE APPLICABLE FILING FEE. (ps1)
October 4, 2007 Filing 227 MOTION for Limited Admission of James K. Reuss by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulmer, Charles)
September 27, 2007 Filing 226 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 9/27/2007. The Court informed the parties that they must refile their motions to dismiss as a single motion to dismiss. Order forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (lc1)
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying without prejudice 197 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 202 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 203 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 206 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 209 Motion to Dismiss, 210 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 211 Motion to Dismiss, 212 Motion to Dismiss; the defendants are instructed to file a single amended motion to dismiss by October 12, 2007; Plaintiffs' response is due by October 29, 2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 27, 2007. (ps1)
September 26, 2007 Filing 224 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mars Petcare US, Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
September 24, 2007 Filing 223 Notice of Instruction to Filer: re 216 Statement filed by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, 217 Statement filed by Safeway Inc.; Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correct event to use, for FUTURE reference is "Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Parties" found under Other Documents. It is not necessary to refile this document. (gp)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 220 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 221 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
September 21, 2007 Filing 221 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Robert A. Valadez, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #541054. (cw)
September 21, 2007 Filing 220 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Javier T. Duran, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #541053. (cw)
September 21, 2007 Filing 219 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/27/2007 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Please see notice for instructions for telephone conference.(ps1)
September 21, 2007 Filing 218 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Mark C. Goodman, mailing date September 21, 2007. (cw)
September 21, 2007 Filing 217 Statement of: Corporate Disclosure by Safeway Inc.. (Alwine, Robert)
September 21, 2007 Filing 216 Statement of: Corporate Disclosure by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company. (Alwine, Robert)
September 21, 2007 Filing 215 Notice of Instruction to Filer ; Error: Multi-Pleading Filing entered as One Pleading; re 212 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, Motion to Quash and to Dismiss, and Memorandum of Law filed by Nestle S.A.; For FUTURE reference, this Motion should have been filed/docketed selecting 2 different reliefs : "Motion to Dismiss" and "Motion to Quash".- (You can select multiple reliefs by using the Ctrl key). This is for FUTURE reference only, it is not necessary to refile this document. (gp)
September 21, 2007 Filing 214 Notice of Instruction to Filer, Notice of Docket Correction re 202 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, filed by Meijer Inc.; ERROR: Attachments to Motion did not have a description; FUTURE documents containing attachments need to be described.- Corrected by Clerk. (gp)
September 20, 2007 Filing 213 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. (Licko, Carol)
September 20, 2007 Filing 212 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, Motion to Quash and to Dismiss, and Memorandum of Law by Nestle S.A.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Hans Peter Frick# 2 Exhibit B - 8/16/07 Letter# 3 Exhibit C - 9/10/07 Letter)(Licko, Carol)
September 20, 2007 Filing 211 MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Co.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Licko, Carol)
September 20, 2007 Filing 210 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Laura Donald# 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Steven Rowell)(Jimenez, Marcos)
September 20, 2007 Filing 209 MOTION to Dismiss 156 Amended Complaint, by Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Salup, Carlos)
September 20, 2007 Filing 208 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Turner, Hugh)
September 20, 2007 Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Andrew Liang. re 206 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, by H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Turner, Hugh)
September 20, 2007 Filing 206 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, by H.E. Butt Grocery Company. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support)(Turner, Hugh)
September 20, 2007 Filing 205 NOTICE by New Albertson's Inc. re 203 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 153 Amended Complaint, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law Notice of Filing Affidavits in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Julie T. Backe# 2 Affidavit Daniel S. Day)(Kalil, Craig)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 201 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
September 20, 2007 Filing 203 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 153 Amended Complaint, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law by New Albertson's Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Kalil, Craig)
September 20, 2007 Filing 202 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, by Meijer Inc.. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1)(Joffe, Jason)
September 20, 2007 Filing 199 NOTICE by The Kroger Co. of Ohio Corporate Disclosure Statement (Fulmer, Charles)
September 20, 2007 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Martha Cutright Sarra. re 197 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. (Fulmer, Charles)
September 20, 2007 Filing 197 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 156 Amended Complaint, by The Kroger Co. of Ohio. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Fulmer, Charles)
September 20, 2007 Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Richard Fulmer, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co. of Ohio (Fulmer, Charles)
September 19, 2007 Filing 201 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney W. Randolph Teslik, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #966791. (cw)
September 19, 2007 Filing 200 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Andrew J. Dober, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #966792. (cw)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re: 193 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel filed by Target Corp., Seipp, Flick, & Kissane, LLP is permitted to withdraw as counsel, and Squire Sanders & Dempsey, LLP is substituted as counsel of record for Target.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 19, 2007.(ps1)
September 18, 2007 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Meijer Super Markets Inc due to the Defendant's Representations that Company has been Merged with Meijer Inc. by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 18, 2007 Filing 193 STIPULATION For Substitution of Counsel by Target Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Substitution of Counsel)(Flick, Charles)
September 17, 2007 Filing 192 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by all plaintiffs for dates of 10-22-07 thru 11-05-07 (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 13, 2007 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per Order at DE #191: Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc. response due 9/20/2007. (bb)
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their combined response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before September 20, 2007. (CMA)
September 13, 2007 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 156 Amended Complaint, by Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Tamarazzo, Dominick)
September 13, 2007 Filing 189 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (MacIvor, Catherine)
September 12, 2007 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Bernardo Salup on behalf of Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc. (Salup, Carlos)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint; Stop and Shop Supermarket Company and Safeway Inc. answer is due by 9/20/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 12, 2007. (ps1)
September 12, 2007 Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 156 Amended Complaint, by Stop and Shop Supermarket Company, Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jimenez, Marcos)
September 7, 2007 Filing 185 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ralph George Patino on behalf of Pet Supplies "Plus", Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc. (Patino, Ralph)
August 31, 2007 Filing 184 Notice of Instruction to Filer re 183 Affidavit of Service filed by Renee Blaszkowski. ERROR: Document Not Captioned; For FUTURE reference Please See Local Rule 5.1.A.5 Re: Document Heading and Case Style. It is not necessary to refile this document. (gp)
August 30, 2007 Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Stop & Shop Supermarket Company on 08/16/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 182 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Doane Pet Care Enterprises on 08/15/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Mars Petcare USA, Inc on 08/16/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on H.E. Butt Grocery Company on 08/16/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Meijer, Inc. on 08/17/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 178 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Meijer Supermarkets, Inc on 08/17/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 30, 2007 Filing 177 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Hill's Pet Nutrition on 08/16/07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 24, 2007 Filing 176 Notice of Instruction to Filer, Notice of Docket Correction: re 174 Affidavit of Service filed by Renee Blaszkowski, 172 Affidavit of Service, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, 175 Affidavit of Service filed by Renee Blaszkowski, 173 Affidavit of Service filed by Renee Blaszkowski. ERROR: Modified Service date from 7/27/07 to 7/30/07, also, for FUTURE reference the correct event to use is "Summons Returns Executed" found under Service of Process. It is not necessary to refile the documents. (gp)
August 23, 2007 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Class Action Complaint served on The Iams Co on July 30, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine) **Modified service date from 7/27/07 to 7/30/07 on 8/24/2007 (gp)**.
August 23, 2007 Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint served on New Albertson's Inc. on July 30, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine) **Modified service date from 7/27/07 to 7/30/07 on 8/24/2007 (gp)**.
August 23, 2007 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint served on Albertson's LLC on July 30, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine) **Modified service date from 7/27/07 to 7/30/07 on 8/24/2007 (gp)**.
August 23, 2007 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint served on Nestle Purina Pet Care Co. on July 30, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine) **Modified service date from 7/27/07 to 7/30/07 on 8/24/2007 (gp)**.
August 23, 2007 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Corrected Amended Class Action served on Safeway, Inc on July 31, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 23, 2007 Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Class Action Complaint served on The Kroger Co. of Ohio on July 31, 2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/13/2007. (tb)
August 9, 2007 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Nestle U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Licko, Carol)
August 8, 2007 Filing 167 Summons Issued as to Nestle S.A., (bs)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 08/03/2007. (bs)
August 3, 2007 Filing 165 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Notice to Client and Motion for Substitution of Counsel by Petsmart Inc.. Responses due by 8/17/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Murray, John)
July 31, 2007 Filing 164 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by all plaintiffs for dates of 09-03-07 thru 09-07-07 of Catherine MacIvor (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 31, 2007 Filing 163 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by all plaintiffs for dates of 07-31-07 thru 08-07-07 of Catherine MacIvor (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 30, 2007 Filing 162 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Nestle U.S.A. Inc. (Licko, Carol)
July 30, 2007 Filing 161 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Nestle U.S.A. Inc. (Licko, Carol)
July 30, 2007 Filing 160 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Nestle U.S.A. Inc. (Licko, Carol)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 157 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 27, 2007 Filing 159 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (tb)
July 27, 2007 Filing 156 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected as to scriveners errors only), filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 thru 7# 2 Exhibit 8, part 1# 3 Exhibit 8, part 2# 4 Exhibit 9# 5 Exhibit 10, part 1# 6 Exhibit 10, part 2# 7 Exhibits 11 thru 28# 8 Exhibits 29 thru 40# 9 Exhibit 41# 10 Exhibits 42 thru 62)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 26, 2007 Filing 157 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Amy W. Schulman, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963830. (cw)
July 26, 2007 Filing 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menu Foods, Inc. Certificate of Interested Party included, Menu Foods Holding, Inc. added.. (Knox, Steven)
July 26, 2007 Filing 154 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menu Foods Income Fund Certificate of Interested Party included, Menu Foods, Inc., and AGF Management Limited, and Deans Knight Capital Management, Ltd. added.. (Knox, Steven)
July 25, 2007 Filing 153 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 7# 2 Exhibit 8, part 1# 3 Exhibit 8, part 2# 4 Exhibit 9# 5 Exhibit 10, part 1# 6 Exhibit 10, part 2# 7 Exhibits 11 thru 28# 8 Exhibits 29 thru 40# 9 Exhibit 41# 10 Exhibits 42 thru 62)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Lonnie Lloyd Simpson for Menu Foods, Inc. and Menu Foods Income Fund, Steven Douglas Knox for Menu Foods, Inc. and Menu Foods Income Fund. Attorney Robert Dewitt McIntosh terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on July 19, 2007. (ps1)
July 19, 2007 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice to Client by Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund. Responses due by 8/2/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Substituting Local Counsel)(Knox, Steven)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 149 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 17, 2007 Filing 149 MOTION for Admission of William E. Wegner Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963345. (cw)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CMA)
July 16, 2007 Filing 147 MOTION for John J. Kuster to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963261. (cw)
July 16, 2007 Filing 146 NOTICE by Colgate Palmolive Company of Change of Law Firm Name (Vieira, Olga)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 13, 2007 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Michael K. Kennedy, Esquire, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963187. (cw)
July 13, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines per Order at DE #143: Amended Complaint due by 7/25/2007. (bb)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs shall have until July 25, 2007 to file.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on July 13, 2007. (ps1)
July 12, 2007 Filing 141 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacIvor, Catherine)
July 11, 2007 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/6/07 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina 37 pages. (pc)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 9, 2007 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods Inc. on 6/11/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nutro Products on 6/18/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Del Monte Foods on 6/11/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods Income Fund on 6/13/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Procter and Gamble on 6/13/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mars Inc. on 6/11/2007, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
July 9, 2007 Filing 133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Michael R. Ross, Esquire, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962743 by local counsel attorney Susan Elizabeth Mortensen for Petsmart Inc.. (cw)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 129 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 6, 2007 Filing 131 Notice of Instruction to Filer Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion. Pursuant to 2B in the Administrative Procedures, a motion to make a limited appearance must be filed in the conventional manner along with the applicable filing fee. LOCAL COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO 1. FILE A NOTICE TO STRIKE DE# 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings Pro Hac Vice filed by Petsmart Inc., AND 2. CONVENTIONALLY FILE AN ORIGINAL MOTION TO MAKE A LIMITED APPEARANCE ALONG WITH THE APPLICABLE FILING FEE. (cw)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SCHEDULING ORDER:, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff for Discovery, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Jury Trial set for 5/25/2009 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 5/19/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 07/06/2007.(bs)
July 6, 2007 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga : Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2007. Scheduling Order forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina (lc2)
July 5, 2007 Filing 129 MOTION for Kara L. McCall to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962751. (cw)
July 5, 2007 Filing 127 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
July 5, 2007 Filing 126 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nestle U.S.A. Inc.. (Licko, Carol)
July 5, 2007 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgate Palmolive Company. (Vieira, Olga)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Motion for Leave to Appear, granting 122 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 123 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 5, 2007 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings Pro Hac Vice by Petsmart Inc.. Responses due by 7/19/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Michael R. Ross# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Ross Admission Pro Hac Vice Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Recieve Notice of Electronic Filings)(Mortensen, Susan)
July 3, 2007 Filing 123 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William C. Martin, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962629. (cw)
July 3, 2007 Filing 122 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander Shaknes, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962628. (cw)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CMA)
July 3, 2007 Filing 119 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Philip A. Sechler on Behalf of Mars, Incorporated, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962674. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Philip A. Sechler)(cw)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CMA)
July 2, 2007 Filing 117 MOTION for Admission of Charles H. Abbott Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962598. (cw)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE OF MIRANDA L. BERGE: Motion re 101 MOTION for Attorney: Miranda L. Berge to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962428 is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/29/07.(pa)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Ordered that motion (DE 100) is here by granted. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/29/07.(pa)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 113 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CMA)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 110 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CMA)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and denying 103 Motion to Continue Hearing. The scheduling hearing in this case was set by court order dated June 7, 2007. While certainly movants' counsel may have encountered a scheduling conflict after the order of June 7, it is unlikely that any other date selected will be free of conflict to some or all of the many counsel who have appeared in this case. In the event movants' counsel is available to appear by telephone, he certainly may do so, and is instructed to call the undersigned's courtroom deputy, Patricia Snead, to make the necessary arrangements. (CMA)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying as moot 99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 29, 2007. (ps1)
June 30, 2007 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Hearing filed by Renee Blaszkowski. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 29, 2007 Filing 113 MOTION for Admission of Gail E. Lees Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962544. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 111 MOTION for Admission of Gary L. Justice Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962545. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 110 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Patrick J. Houlihan on Behalf of Mars, Incorporated, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962500. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Christopher M. D'Angelo on Behalf of Mars, Incorporated, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962501. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Dane H. Butswinkas on Behalf of Mars, Incorporated, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962503. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION for Limited Appearance of Thomas G. Hentoff on Behalf of Mars, Incorporated, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962502. (cw)
June 29, 2007 Filing 103 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Hearing by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. Responses due by 7/16/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Target Corp. Answer due 7/20/2007. Further, all defendants shall be given through July 20, 2007 to file responses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendants need not file individual motions for extensions. Please see order for details. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 06/29/2007. (lc2)
June 29, 2007 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Anticipated Amended Complaint by Pet Supermarket, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Extension of Time)(Kayanan, Maria)
June 28, 2007 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Miranda L. Berge, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962428. (cw)
June 28, 2007 Filing 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig A. Hoover, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962429. (cw)
June 28, 2007 Filing 98 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Target Corp.. (Phang, Kathleen)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/27/07. (hd)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/27/07. (hd)
June 27, 2007 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corp.. (Flick, Charles)
June 27, 2007 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Dewitt McIntosh on behalf of Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund (McIntosh, Robert)
June 26, 2007 Filing 93 MOTION for James D. Arden to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962303. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James D. Arden)(cw)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: John F. Mullen Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/07. (hd)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Brian D. Wright Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/07. (hd)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Laura Sanom Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/07. (hd)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: D. Jeffrey IrelandSigned by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/07. (hd)
June 22, 2007 Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Mullen, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962059. (cw)
June 22, 2007 Filing 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Troyer, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962132. (cw)
June 21, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION for Admission of Brian D. Wright Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962037. (cw)
June 21, 2007 Filing 85 MOTION for Admission of Laura A. Sanom Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962030. (cw)
June 21, 2007 Filing 84 MOTION for Admission of D. Jeffrey Ireland Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #962028. (cw)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/07. (lk)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/07. (lk)
June 18, 2007 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Fama, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #961819. (cw)
June 18, 2007 Filing 80 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John J. McDonough, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #961820. (cw)
June 18, 2007 Filing 79 Notice of Instruction to Filer re 78 Notice of Unavailability filed by Patricia Davis, Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub. ERROR: Document does not include "s/" on signature line, FUTURE Documents filed electronically shall indicate a signature (e.g., "s/Jane Doe"). Please refer to CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (gp)
June 15, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis for dates of June 28, 2007 through July 10, 2007 for Catherine J. MacIvor (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 15, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Petsmart Inc..(Mortensen, Susan)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint; Target Corp.'s answer due 7/5/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 14, 2007. (ps1)
June 13, 2007 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Target Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Target's Agreed Motion for Extension)(Flick, Charles)
June 13, 2007 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nestle, U.S.A. Inc. on 06.08.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint: Menu Foods, Inc.'s answer due 7/5/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 13, 2007. (ps1)
June 12, 2007 Filing 72 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint by Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Robert)
June 11, 2007 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Nestle U.S.A. Inc. answer due 7/5/2007. (ps1)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time respond to 1 Complaint; Proctor and Gamble Co.'s response to complaint due by 7/5/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 8, 2007. (ps1)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint; Nestle shall file its answer by July 5, 2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 11, 2007. (ps1)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Response to the Complaint; Colgate Palmolive Company's answer, Certificate of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement is by due 7/6/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 11, 2007. (ps1)
June 8, 2007 Filing 68 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint and to file Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgate Palmolive Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Colgate's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Move Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to file Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Vieira, Olga)
June 8, 2007 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nestle U.S.A. Inc.. (Licko, Carol)
June 8, 2007 Filing 66 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Nestle U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Nestle USA, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Licko, Carol)
June 8, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Wayne Friedman on behalf of all plaintiffs (Friedman, Darren)
June 8, 2007 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Greer, Alan)
June 8, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Graham Greer on behalf of Proctor and Gamble Co. (Greer, Alan)
June 8, 2007 Filing 62 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint by Proctor and Gamble Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Alan)
June 7, 2007 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Domestic and Foreign Entities)(Murray, John)
June 7, 2007 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pet Supermarket, Inc.. (Kayanan, Maria)
June 7, 2007 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. (Hanger, Robin Lea)
June 7, 2007 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Del Monte Foods, Co.. (Colombo, Sherril)
June 7, 2007 Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2007 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part 43 44 45 Motions for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report, and granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Mars Inc.'s answer due 7/5/2007. A scheduling conference shall be held on July 6, 2007 at 8:30 a.m.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 7, 2007. (ps1)
June 7, 2007 Filing 56 RESPONSE Plaintiff's Verified Respionse in Opposition to "Joint" Motion for Forty (40) day Englargment of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods Income Fund on 05.23.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods, Inc. on 05.23.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Proctor and Gamble Co. on 05.22.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nutro Products, Inc. on 05.22.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nestle U.S.A. on 05.22.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Del Monte Foods, Co. on 05.25.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 7, 2007 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mars Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
June 7, 2007 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint by Mars Inc.. (Ortega, Omar)
June 7, 2007 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mars, Inc. on 05.25.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 6, 2007 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (pa)
June 6, 2007 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties by Del Monte Foods, Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colombo, Sherril)
June 6, 2007 Filing 44 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. (Hanger, Robin Lea)
June 6, 2007 Filing 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hanger, Robin Lea)
June 6, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Kayanan on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Kayanan, Maria)
June 6, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE of Striking 36 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Pet Supermarket, Inc., Notice of Striking Noncompliant Notice of Appearance by Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Kayanan, Maria)
June 6, 2007 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Publix Super Markets on 05.14.07, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants shall file their responses to the Complaint by July 5, 2007. (CMA)
June 6, 2007 Filing 38 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Agreed Motion for Extension of Time)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
June 6, 2007 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Riviere-Badell on behalf of NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
June 6, 2007 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Kayanan on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Kayanan, Maria)
June 6, 2007 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Del Monte Foods, Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colombo, Sherril)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 33 without predudice Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Defendant has failed to comply with Local Rule 7.1 A. 2 and 3. (CMA)
June 5, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by Pet Supermarket, Inc.. (Dang, Cassidy)
June 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants shall have until July 5, 2007 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (CMA)
June 5, 2007 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Supermarkets, Inc.. (Turner, Hugh)
June 4, 2007 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Colgate Palmolive Company, Del Monte Foods, Co., Nestle U.S.A. Inc., Nurto Procucts Inc., Menue Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Petsmart Inc., Proctor and Gamble Co.. (pa)
June 4, 2007 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension for Wal-Mart Response to Complaint)(Murray, John)
June 4, 2007 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and/or Respond to Complaint by Petsmart Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Mortensen, Susan)
June 4, 2007 Filing 27 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Publix Supermarkets, Inc.. (Turner, Hugh)
June 4, 2007 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Winn-Dixie Stores,Inc., as a Result of Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.'s Bankruptcy Proceeding by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis (MacIvor, Catherine)
June 4, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hugh J. Turner, Jr on behalf of Publix Supermarkets, Inc. (Turner, Hugh)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Pet Supermarket, Inc. answer due 7/5/2007. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 4, 2007. (ps1)
June 1, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pet Supermarket, Inc.. (Dang, Cassidy)
June 1, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassidy Yen Dang on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Dang, Cassidy)
June 1, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rolando Andres Diaz on behalf of Pet Supermarket, Inc. (Diaz, Rolando)
June 1, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE by Winn Dixie Stores, Inc. of Discharge of Debt and Prosecution of Action in Violation of 11 U.S.C. Section 524 (Jackson, Cynthia)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to complaint Response due by 7/5/2007Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/29/07. (hd)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sanford Lewis Bohrer terminated Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/26/07. (hd)
May 25, 2007 Filing 17 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. Responses due by 6/11/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, John)
May 24, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. (Bohrer, Sanford)
May 17, 2007 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Winn Dixie Stores, Inc. answer due 6/4/2007. (sk)
May 17, 2007 Filing 15 Notice of Docket Correction: re 8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Patricia Davis,, Renee Blaszkowski,, Amy Hollub, Error: Other; Correction: Date of service executed was actually 5/14/07, Answer Due Date is June 4th, 2007 (sk)
May 17, 2007 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Pet Supermarket, Inc. served on 5/15/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 5/15/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Petsmart Inc. served on 5/15/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Colgate Palmolive Company served on 5/15/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Target Corp. served on 5/15/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. served on 5/14/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine)
May 17, 2007 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia 06/4/2007. (MacIvor, Catherine) Modified on 5/17/2007 (sk).
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/7/2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/16/07.(hd)
May 16, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Foreman on behalf of all plaintiffs (Foreman, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman on behalf of all plaintiffs (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2007 Filing 3 Notice of Docket Correction: re 2 Summons Issued Error: Multi-Pleading Filing entered as One Pleading; (sk)
May 11, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Colgate Palmolive Company, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Winn Dixie Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Pet Supermarket, Inc., Petsmart Inc., Target Corp., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (sk)
May 11, 2007 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Colgate Palmolive Company. (sk)
May 9, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 959317, filed by Renee Blaszkowski, Amy Hollub, Patricia Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix part 2# 2 Appendix part 3# 3 Appendix part 4# 4 Appendix part 5)(dj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaszkowski et al v. Mars Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Blaszkowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hollub
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Peters
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Hock
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Floyd
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Wilson
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Kotzampaltiris
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hopkins-Jones
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Piazza
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Lupo
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Herring
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo-Ann Murphy
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Stone
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hanrahan
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Rice
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Quinn
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Mathiesen
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Shore
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn White
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Wiggins
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lucarelli
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Isern
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniele Valoras
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa MacDonald
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Tregoe
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Damron
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena Rucker
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Nelson
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Reed
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Thomas
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tone Gaglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Sechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor and Gamble Co.
Represented By: Brian D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate Palmolive Company
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Foods, Co.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie Lloyd Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Lonnie Lloyd Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corp.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Mark Whitburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Albertson's Inc.
Represented By: W. Randoph Teslik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iams Company
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Represented By: W. Randoph Teslik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stop and Shop Supermarket Company
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E. Butt Grocery Company
Represented By: Robert A. Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doane Pet Care Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Petcare US, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina Petcare Co.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co. of Ohio
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Supplies "Plus"
Represented By: Dominick Victor Tamarazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Supplies Plus/USA Inc.
Represented By: Dominick Victor Tamarazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natura Pet Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?