Thompson v. The Florida Bar Featured Case
Plaintiff: John B. Thompson
Defendant: The Florida Bar
Case Number: 1:2007cv21256
Filed: May 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Adalberto Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Filing 450 NOTICE of Additional Legal Authority in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Relief from Order Dismissing this Action on the basis of Newly Discovered Misconduct by Judge Adalberto J. Jordan and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by John B. Thompson (mg)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER denying 448 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/13/10. (tp)
December 8, 2010 Filing 448 MOTION for Reconsideration of 445 Motion for Relief from Order Dismissing this Action on the basis of Newly Discovered Misconduct by Judge Adalberto J. Jordan and Memorandum of Law by John B. Thompson. (mg)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 AMENDED ORDER Denying re 445 Rule 60 Motion to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/7/2010. (ls)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER denying 445 Rule 60 Motion to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/3/2010. (ls)
December 1, 2010 Filing 445 MOTION for Relief from 347 Order Dismissing this Action on the Basis of Newly Discovered Misconduct by Judge Adalberto J. Jordan and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by John B. Thompson. (mg)
October 1, 2010 Filing 444 NOTICE to the Court by John B. Thompson (ls)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying 441 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/30/2010. (tp)
September 15, 2010 Filing 442 Plaintiff's Verified SUPPLEMENT to 441 MOTION for Reconsideration of 439 Order on Motion by John B. Thompson (ebs)
September 9, 2010 Filing 441 VERIFIED MOTION for Reconsideration re 439 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by John B. Thompson. (tb)
September 8, 2010 Filing 440 SUPPLEMENT to 438 MOTION for relief from order dismissing this action by John B. Thompson (tb)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER denying 438 Motion Rule 60 motion. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/7/2010. (tb)
September 1, 2010 Filing 438 MOTION for relief from order dismissing this action by John B. Thompson. (tb)
May 14, 2010 Filing 437 NOTICE to the Court in the Person of Judge Jordan by John B. Thompson (ral)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER denying 435 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 435 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 5/12/2010. (tb)
May 7, 2010 Filing 435 MOTION for Reconsideration of MOTION to Disqualify Judge Adalberto Jordan, re 433 Order on Motion for Recusal, by John B. Thompson. (ral)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER denying 431 Motion for relief from judgment. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 5/5/2010. (tb)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER denying 432 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 5/5/2010. (tb)
May 4, 2010 Filing 432 VERIFIED MOTION to Disqualify Judge Adalberto Jordan by John B. Thompson. (ral)
April 15, 2010 Filing 431 MOTION for relief from order dismissing this action by John B. Thompson. (tb)
March 17, 2010 Filing 430 NOTICE to the Court by John B. Thompson (jua)
March 15, 2010 Filing 429 NOTICE to clerk of court by John B. Thompson (dj)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER on Pending Motions denying 421 Motion for relief from this court's order of dismissal for fraud on the court and memorandum of law in support thereof; granting 426 Motion for a court ruling. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/15/2010. (dj)
March 1, 2010 Filing 427 SUPPLEMENT to 421 MOTION re 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson (jua)
February 25, 2010 Filing 426 MOTION for Court to Rule re 421 Verified 60 (d)(3) MOTION for relief from this court's order of dismissal for fraud on the court and memorandum of law in support thereof - re 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. (jua)
February 23, 2010 Filing 425 Verified SUPPLEMENT to 421 MOTION re 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson (jua)
February 11, 2010 Filing 424 NOTICE TO COURT by John B. Thompson (tb)
January 26, 2010 Filing 423 NOTICE to Court by John B. Thompson (lbc)
January 25, 2010 Filing 422 SUPPLEMENT to 421 MOTION re 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. (lbc)
January 19, 2010 Filing 421 Verified 60 (d)(3) MOTION for relief from this court's order of dismissal for fraud on the court and memorandum of law in support thereof - re 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. (lbc)
November 9, 2009 Filing 420 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 417 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, 418 Order. US Mail returned for: return to sender attempt not known unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. Norman Elliott Kent Second Return /Attempt. (rb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 419 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 402 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney,. US Mail returned for: NORMAN ELLIOTT KENT Return to Sender Unable to Forward ... The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (lbc)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER on pening motions, DE#'s 395,397,400,401,407,409,411,413,414,415, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/2/2009. (cqs)
September 28, 2009 Filing 417 Clerks Notice to Filer re 415 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#416]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
September 24, 2009 Filing 416 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by John B. Thompson filed by John B. Thompson. [See Image at DE #415](ls)
September 24, 2009 Filing 415 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Withdrawal of All Motions (Thompson, John)
September 24, 2009 Filing 414 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge in Light of His Clerk's Rudeness and the Court's Refusal to Grant a Hearing and Rule Prior to Plaintiff's Demise by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 24, 2009 Filing 413 VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT to Rule 60 Motions by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bar Governors as Guardians of Demcracy Sans Superherto Spandex Tights, # 2 Exhibit Google search result showing removal of www.mayannedowns.com blog from cyberspace, or so she thought)(Thompson, John) Modified text on 9/25/2009 (tas).
September 23, 2009 Filing 412 Clerks Notice to Filer re 411 Supplement,. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The Filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
September 21, 2009 Filing 411 SUPPLEMENT to 401 Rule 60(d)(3) MOTION for Relief from 374 Order of Dismissal for Fraud on the Court by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John) Modified on 9/23/2009 (ls). [Deleted relationship to DE #406, 408 and 409][Added relationshp to DE #401]
September 17, 2009 Filing 410 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 404 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney. US Mail returned for: NORMAN ELLIOTT KENT Return to Sender, Unable to Forward Time Expired .. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (lbc)
September 16, 2009 Filing 409 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re 408 Supplement, 406 Supplement, 407 Notice (Other) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 16, 2009 Filing 408 SUPPLEMENT to Rule 60 Motions by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Document Re Referee Selections)(Thompson, John)
September 8, 2009 Filing 407 NOTICE of Filing in Both of the Above Cases by John B. Thompson re 401 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order (Thompson, John) Modified on 9/10/2009 (ls). [Text modified by Clerk]
September 7, 2009 Filing 406 SUPPLEMENT to 403 Supplement, 401 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order (Bar Docs Showing Selective Prosecution) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 4, 2009 Filing 405 SUPPLEMENT to 399 Supplement Motion for Order to Show Cause by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pleading in pending federal case re unethical conduct by Greenberg in this case before Judge Jordan)(Thompson, John)
September 4, 2009 Filing 404 Clerks Notice to Filer re 400 Supplement. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The Filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
September 2, 2009 Filing 403 SUPPLEMENT to 401 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State filing showing fraud)(Thompson, John)
September 2, 2009 Filing 402 Clerks Notice to Filer re 401 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The Filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tas)
September 1, 2009 Filing 401 Plaintiff's Rule 60(d)(3) MOTION for Relief from 374 this Courts Order of Dismissal for Fraud on the Court by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Document Re Referee Appointments)(Thompson, John) Modified text and link on 9/2/2009 (tas).
August 29, 2009 Filing 400 SUPPLEMENT re 401 Rule 60(d)(3) MOTION for Relief from 374 this Court's Order of Dismissal for Fraud on the Court by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Transcripts Bar Prosecutor: Referees Must Be from Different Circuit from Respondent)(Thompson, John) Modified on 9/4/2009 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #401]
August 18, 2009 Filing 399 SUPPLEMENT to 397 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Greenberg Lawyers Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Disciplinary Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 18, 2009 Filing 398 SUPPLEMENT to 397 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Greenberg Lawyers Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Disciplinary Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 18, 2009 Filing 397 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Greenberg Lawyers Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Disciplinary Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 18, 2009 Filing 396 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re 60b Motion by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
August 17, 2009 Filing 395 Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case (Verified Motion for Relief from Judgment Per Rule 60b3 by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Permanent Disbarment Order)(Thompson, John)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER denying 389 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 390 Motion to Vacate; denying 391 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 393 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/14/2008. (ls)
September 17, 2008 Clerks SIXTH Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re 393 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 390 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal, 389 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case, 347 Order Dismissing Case, 391 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 390 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal, 389 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case, 347 Order Dismissing Case, 391 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 filed by John B. Thompson. Error - Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; Instructions to filer - In the future, please select all applicable reliefs. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
September 16, 2008 Filing 393 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 390 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal, 389 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case, 347 Order Dismissing Case, 391 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case and for Oral Argument Thereon by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Front Page Story Today in Palm Beach Post Re Bar "Discipline")(Thompson, John)
September 10, 2008 Filing 392 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Dava J. Tunis for dates of 09/18/2008 through 10/06/2008 (Fahlbusch, Charles)
September 2, 2008 Filing 391 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John) Modified on 9/2/2008 (ls). [Deleted relationship to DE 389 and 390]
August 11, 2008 Filing 390 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (Thompson, John)
July 7, 2008 Filing 389 Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Florida Supreme Court, # 2 Exhibit Stay Motion Refused Filing by Florida Supreme Court)(Thompson, John)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER denying 384 Motion to Vacate.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/28/08. (lk)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER denying 386 Motion to Vacate, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/28/08. (lh)
February 13, 2008 Filing 386 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 2/28/2008 (Thompson, John)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER denying 381 Motion to Vacate, denying 382 Motion to Vacate, denying 383 Motion to Vacate, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/12/08. (lh)
February 8, 2008 Filing 384 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 383 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case (Now that Referee is shown to have received money from the Bar's indicted designated reviewer) (Now we have Bar employees giving the referee money!) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 2/25/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Min filing)(Thompson, John)
February 8, 2008 Filing 383 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case (Now that Referee is shown to have received money from the Bar's indicted designated reviewer) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 2/25/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Filing with FL SC Re Kuehne and Tunis' Receipt of Moneys Therefrom)(Thompson, John)
February 7, 2008 Filing 382 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate (Fraud by Bar in using a thief as a designated reviewer) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 2/22/2008 (Thompson, John)
February 6, 2008 Filing 381 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case on the Basis of Fraud (Forgery and Failure to Comply with State Loyalty Oath Law) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 2/21/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Forged and Noncompliant Loyalty Oaths# 2 Exhibit Avvidavit and cv re Tunis forgery)(Thompson, John)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER denying 379 Motion to Vacate ;Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 1/18/08. (lh)
January 6, 2008 Filing 379 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case (This court now has proof of perjury. It cannot ignore it as if it does not exist) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 1/18/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bar complaint proving prejury by Bar's complainants)(Thompson, John)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER denying 375 Motion to Vacate, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/19/07. (lh)
December 17, 2007 Filing 377 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document does not have Case Style or Case Number and Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected re 376 Notice (Other). Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly. (de)
December 15, 2007 Filing 376 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 347 Order Dismissing Case (Thompson, John)
December 15, 2007 Filing 375 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Fraudulently Obtained Dismissal Order by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/31/2007 (Thompson, John)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA, this appeal is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution because appellant has failed to pay the $450 docketing and $5 filing fees ($455) to the district court clerk and file a Transcript Order Form within the time fixed by the rules, as to 349 Notice of Appeal filed by John B. Thompson, USCA #07-15441-J (abd)
December 11, 2007 Filing 373 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 372 Order on Motion to Vacate, (Thompson, John)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER denying 368 Motion to Vacate and for stay; denying 369 Motion to Vacate.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/10/07. (lk)
December 9, 2007 Filing 371 SUPPLEMENT to 370 Supplement,, 369 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar, 347 Order Dismissing Case, 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar (New Evidence of Patent Bad Faith by Bar) by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Governor Crist Re Min)(Thompson, John)
December 7, 2007 Filing 370 SUPPLEMENT to 369 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar, 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar (Can't ignore this one;) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
December 7, 2007 Filing 369 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/21/2007 (Thompson, John)
December 6, 2007 Filing 368 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case Based Upon Newly Discovered Fraud by The Bar by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/20/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Correspondence from Bar proving it was the complainant, not Judge Friedman)(Thompson, John)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER denying 365 Motion to Vacate,Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 12/5/07. (lh)
December 4, 2007 Filing 366 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; originally filed as 365 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate; however second requested relief is filed as an Emergency Motion to Stay. Instruction to Filer: See Administrative Procedures for filing an Emergency Motion and when filing multiple reliefs, select all applicable reliefs. (de)
December 3, 2007 Filing 365 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 347 Order Dismissing Case (Please make sure Judge Jordan personally sees this motion. He must then vacate his dismissal order. by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/17/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Order Explaining Amendment to Rule 3-4.6)(Thompson, John)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER denying 362 Motion to Vacate and to Stay, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/29/07. (lh)
November 28, 2007 Filing 363 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; originally filed as 362 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate; however second requested relief is filed as an Emergency Motion to Stay. Instruction to Filer: See Administrative Procedures for filing an Emergency Motion and when filing multiple reliefs, select all applicable reliefs. (de)
November 27, 2007 Filing 362 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order Based Upon Now Patent Fraud of The Florida Bar - The Court Might Want to Read This One by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/11/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER denying 354 Motion for Reconsideration.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/21/07. (lk)
November 26, 2007 Filing 360 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 353 Notice (Other) however document is titled Supplement to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay State Disciplinary Proceedings. Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly with the proper document heading including case number, style, and addressed to the appropriate court. (de)
November 26, 2007 Filing 359 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 352 Notice (Other) however document is titled Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay... and Declaratory Judgment Action. Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly with the proper document heading including case number, style, and addressed to the appropriate court. (de)
November 26, 2007 Filing 358 Order from the 11th Circuit pursuant to Appellant's emergency motion to stay state disciplinary proceedings, as supplemented, is DENIED. Should Appellant file a motion for reconsideration in this appeal and/or in Appeal No. 07-14967, the Clerk is instructed to submit such motion(s) to the Court as a non-emergency, time-sensitive matter. USCA #07-15441-J. Copy to Judge (abd)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying 350 Emergency Motion to Stay.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/21/07. (lk)
November 21, 2007 Filing 356 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document has Wrong Case Style and Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected re 348 Notice (Other). Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly. (de)
November 21, 2007 Filing 355 Order from the 11th Circuit pursuant to the October 25,2007, "Supplement to Petition for Writ," construed as a motion to supplement the petition, is DENIED. The November 13, 2007, "Verified Supplement to Petition for Writ," construed as a motion to supplement the petition, is DENIED. The "Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Writ of Mandamus" is DENIED. Petitioner's requests to stay the district court proceedings and the state bar disciplinary proceedings are DENIED AS MOOT. Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order why this file should not be sealed pursuant to 11th Circuit. On the Court's own motion, this file is hereby SEALED pending review of the responses to our order to show cause and futher order of the Court. USCA #07-14967-J. Copy to Judge (abd)
November 21, 2007 Filing 354 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re 347 Order Dismissing Case (the court did not address in any meaningful way the dec action) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 21, 2007 Filing 353 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 347 Order Dismissing Case (Judge Jordan threw the dec action baby out with the abstention bath water) (Thompson, John)
November 21, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet and Order under appeal to US Court of Appeals re 349 Notice of Appeal (abd)
November 21, 2007 Filing 352 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
November 21, 2007 Filing 351 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 350 Emergency MOTION to Stay State Disciplinary Proceedings (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 350 Emergency MOTION to Stay State Disciplinary Proceedings by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/5/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 349 NOTICE OF APPEAL of 347 Order Dismissing Case by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 348 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 347 Order Dismissing Case (The Latest Evidence of Bias and Misconduct by Judge Jordan) (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/20/07.(lk)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER on pending motions; denying 172 motion for appointment of mediator, denying 214 Motion to Strike, denying 216 Motion to Strike, granting 219 Motion for Leave to File, denying as moot 223 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot 224 Motion to Continue, denying 227 Motion to Strike, denying 246 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 248 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 251 Motion, denying 252 Motion, denying 256 Motion to Stay, denying 260 Motion for Clarification, denying 265 Motion, denying 266 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 268 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 269 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 272 Motion, denying 275 Motion, denying 276 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 277 Motion, denying 278 Motion, denying 280 Motion, granting 281 Motion, denying 283 Motion for Order to Show Cause, denying 285 Motion, denying 292 Motion, denying 294 Motion, denying 295 Motion, denying 299 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 301 Motion, denying 302 Motion, denying 305 Motion, denying 306 Motion, granting 307 Motion, denying 308 Motion, denying 309 Motion, denying 310 Motion, denying 311 Motion, granting in part 312 Motion, denying 315 Motion, denying 316 Motion, denying 317 Motion, denying 323 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 328 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 330 motion for appointment of mediator, denying 332 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 338 motion for appointment of mediator; Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/20/2007. (bs)
November 20, 2007 Filing 345 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit News Release and Letter by Four US Senators Re SLAPP Bar Complainant and the ESRB# 2 Exhibit Letter to Senator Lieberman)(Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 344 RESPONSE to Motion re 330 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator (How About George Knox?), 338 MOTION to Appoint Mediator filed by The Florida Bar. Replies due by 11/28/2007. (Sharpe, Karusha)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER denying 341 Motion for Hearing or ruling.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 11/20/07. (lk)
November 20, 2007 Filing 342 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 332 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 328 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Ain't No Abstention for This) (Supplement to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/5/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 341 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re 338 MOTION to Appoint Mediator by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 20, 2007 Filing 340 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay (Filed with the Eleventh Circuit) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/5/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 19, 2007 Filing 339 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Abate by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit case authority)(Thompson, John)
November 19, 2007 Filing 338 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Mediator by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/4/2007 (vjk)
November 19, 2007 Filing 337 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 336 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) to Court Re Mediation Deadline (Thompson, John)
November 19, 2007 Filing 336 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 25 Notice of Docket Correction,, Notice of Instruction to Filer,, 331 Notice (Other), 330 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator (How About George Knox?) (Mr. Knox Informs He Is Willing to Serve This Court as Mediator of the Dispute Herein) (Thompson, John)
November 19, 2007 Filing 335 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to FCC Re Airing of Indecent Material, Illegally, on Nov 19, 2007)(Thompson, John)
November 19, 2007 Filing 334 Notice of Supplemental Authority by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
November 18, 2007 Filing 333 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 328 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Ain't No Abstention for This) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to US Attorney Re Death Threat)(Thompson, John)
November 17, 2007 Filing 332 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 328 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Ain't No Abstention for This) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/3/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 17, 2007 Filing 331 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 330 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator (How About George Knox?) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to George Knox Re Mediation)(Thompson, John)
November 16, 2007 Filing 330 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator (How About George Knox?) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 12/3/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 16, 2007 Filing 329 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 327 Notice (Other) however document is titled Petitioner's Reply to the Florida Bar's Response. Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly with the proper document heading including case number, style, and addressed to the appropriate court. (de)
November 15, 2007 Filing 328 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Ain't No Abstention for This) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/30/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 15, 2007 Filing 327 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter to barry richard about his latest misrepresentations)(Thompson, John)
November 14, 2007 Filing 326 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 325 Notice of Instruction to Filer, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter from bar that a complaint is not a complaint)(Thompson, John)
November 14, 2007 Filing 325 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document has Wrong Case Style re 321 Notice (Other). 2nd Error: Main document is the same as the attachment. Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly including proper document heading which includes case number, style, and addressed to the appropriate court. (de)
November 14, 2007 Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re 323 MOTION for Reconsideration re 212 Order on Motion for Clarification,,, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,, filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 13, 2007 Filing 323 MOTION for Reconsideration re 212 Order on Motion for Clarification,,, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,, Order on Motion for Appointment of Mediator,,,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,, by Norman Elliott Kent. (Kent, Norman)
November 13, 2007 Filing 322 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter for School Killer)(Thompson, John)
November 13, 2007 Filing 321 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Bar stating bar complaint against a staff attorney is not a bar complaint)(Thompson, John)
November 13, 2007 Filing 320 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 319 Notice (Other); however document is titled Verified Supplement to Petition for Writ of Prohibition... Instruction to Filer: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the Document correctly. Always include proper document heading including case number, style, and addressed to the appropriate court. (de)
November 12, 2007 Filing 319 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing Supplement to Eleventh Circuit Petition (Thompson, John)
November 10, 2007 Filing 318 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 315 Plaintiff's MOTION To Take Judicial Notice of Video Game Industry Whistleblower's Revelations that Corroborate Plaintiff (Thompson, John)
November 9, 2007 Filing 317 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to US Attorney General)(Thompson, John)
November 9, 2007 Filing 316 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re Bar Counsel's Alleged Interest in "American Liberties" re 248 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Bar's Record Counsel Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 9, 2007 Filing 315 Plaintiff's MOTION To Take Judicial Notice of Video Game Industry Whistleblower's Revelations that Corroborate Plaintiff by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 8, 2007 Filing 314 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of SLAPP Complainant's Termination (Thompson, John)
November 8, 2007 Filing 313 Notice of Supplemental Authority by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supreme Court Ruling Re Due Proceed Owed in State Bar Proceedings)(Thompson, John)
November 8, 2007 Filing 312 Plaintiff's MOTION Take Judicial Notice (Latest Due Process Denials by Referee, Bar) by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Bar Referee Re Zelnick Subpoena# 2 Exhibit Zelnick Subpoena)(Thompson, John)
November 7, 2007 Filing 311 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judicial Notice Re News Item that Corroborates Bad Faith of Bar by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 6, 2007 Filing 310 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit News Release - Retailer Pulls SLAPP Bar Complainants' Game)(Thompson, John)
November 5, 2007 Filing 309 Plaintiff's MOTION To Take Judicial Notice of Chaykin's/Bar's Patent Bad Faith by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 5, 2007 Filing 308 Plaintiff's MOTION To Take Judicial Notice as to Obduracy of Bar Governors in Denying Apperance by Plaintiff before Them by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 5, 2007 Filing 307 Plaintiff's MOTION to Take Judicial Notice (J. Jordan May Want to Read This One) by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Written Request to Appear Before Bar Govs Per Mason v. Bar)(Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 306 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Artucle Re Local Disciplined Judge)(Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 305 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice of Current Harassment by Video Game Industry Site run by SLAPP Bar Complainant by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 304 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Motion to Vacate Order Based on Fraud (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion in Alabama Court to Vacate Order Based on Fraud)(Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 303 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Right to Privacy, Abstention by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 302 Proposed MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bar's Elevation of Judicial Independence Over Punishment for Rape)(Thompson, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 301 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Latest Fraud by SLAPP Bar Complainant (AP Story))(Thompson, John)
November 1, 2007 Filing 300 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
November 1, 2007 Filing 299 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add ADA Count by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/16/2007 (Thompson, John)
November 1, 2007 Filing 298 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Real Authority unlike Mason v. Bar) by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 31, 2007 Filing 297 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 31, 2007 Filing 296 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: In the future include proper document heading including case number, style, and the appropriate court re 291 Notice (Other). (de)
October 31, 2007 Filing 295 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re Bar's Bad Faith (Again) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 31, 2007 Filing 294 Plaintiff's MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Re Bad Faith by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 30, 2007 Filing 293 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 287 Plaintiff's MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief; however document is titled Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of Another Bar's Alleged Selective Prosecution and Protection of Attorneys. Instruction to Filer: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the Document correctly. This document was filed as a motion however no relief is requested. If filing as a Notice, select Notice (Other) found under Notices. (de)
October 30, 2007 Filing 292 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit News articles corroborating plaintiff's statements about SLAPP complainants)(Thompson, John)
October 30, 2007 Filing 291 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Letter to US Attorney Re Extortion by Blank Rome (Thompson, John)
October 30, 2007 Filing 290 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 284 Notice (Other); however document is titled Supplement to Petition for Writ of Prohibition... Instruction to Filer: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the Document correctly. In the future include proper document heading including case number, style, and the appropriate court. (de)
October 30, 2007 Filing 289 NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: Error: Two or More Document Events Filed as One; originally filed 282 Notice (Other); docketed requested relief as 288 MOTION for Hearing. Instruction to Filer: In the future please file Notices separately from Motions. (de)
October 30, 2007 Filing 287 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re Selective Bar Prosecution by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Law.com article re selective bar prosecution)(Thompson, John)
October 30, 2007 Filing 286 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Criminal Conduct by Blank Rome (Thompson, John)
October 30, 2007 Filing 285 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re SLAPP Bar Complainants' Criminal Activities by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Re SLAPP Complainants' Criminal Activities)(Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 288 MOTION for Hearing by John B. Thompson. (originally filed as 282 ) (de)
October 29, 2007 Filing 284 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing of Supplement to 11th Circuit Writ Petition Re Witness Tampering and This Court's Indifference to It (Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 283 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Re Indirect Criminal Contempt of Bar by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 282 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 199 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Witness Tampering, etc.) (Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 281 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re Startling Proof of the Bar's Equal Protection Denial (This Takes the Cake) by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norm Kent's Latest SLAPP Bar Assault on Thompson's Christianity)(Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 280 Plaintiff's MOTION Take Judicial Notice of FL SC Orders Denying "Adequate State Remedy" by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Orders Proving Lack of State Remedy)(Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 279 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Sovereign Immunity (Stripped by The Bar) by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 29, 2007 Filing 278 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Bar's Selective Prosecution)(Thompson, John)
October 28, 2007 Filing 277 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice of Criminal Activity of SLAPP Bar Complainant by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 27, 2007 Filing 276 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 27, 2007 Filing 275 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S. Senate Transcript)(Thompson, John)
October 26, 2007 Filing 274 Plaintiff's MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article Re Judicial Misconduct Rules# 2 Exhibit Letter to US Senator Grassley Re Judge Jordan's Misconduct)(Thompson, John)
October 26, 2007 Filing 273 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Wrong Relief Selected; originally filed as 271 Plaintiff's MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. Instruction to Filer: In the future please select Motion for Hearing. (de)
October 26, 2007 Filing 272 Plaintiff's MOTION Judicial Notice Re News Articles Re SLAPP Bar Complainant's Latest Illegal Activity by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit News Articles Re SLAPP Bar Complainant)(Thompson, John)
October 26, 2007 Filing 271 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 26, 2007 Filing 270 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 204 Order (Thompson, John)
October 25, 2007 Filing 269 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Adding Barry Richard and Greenberg Traurig by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/8/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 25, 2007 Filing 268 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Supplement) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 25, 2007 Filing 267 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Response to Bar's Supplemental Authority by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 25, 2007 Filing 266 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defense Counsel Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 25, 2007 Filing 265 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Re SLAPP Bar complainant)(Thompson, John)
October 24, 2007 Filing 264 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 263 Notice (Other); however document is titled Supplement to Petition for Writ of Prohibition... Instruction to Filer: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the Document correctly. In the future include proper document heading including case number, style, and the appropriate court. (de)
October 24, 2007 Filing 263 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Supplement to Petition (In Light of Judge Jordan's Latest Discriminatory Order) (Thompson, John)
October 23, 2007 Filing 262 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 259 Amended Order (Availability for Hearing to Prove Allegations Whose Truth the Court Says It Does Not Know (Thompson, John)
October 23, 2007 Filing 261 Notice of Supplemental Authority by The Florida Bar (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Thompson v Rogers WL 4056998# 2 Exhibit Hirsch v Justices of the Supreme Ct 67 F.3d 708# 3 Exhibit Fieger v Thomas 74 F.3d 740)(Sharpe, Karusha)
October 23, 2007 Filing 260 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification 259 Amended Order by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/6/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 259 AMENDED ORDER re 249 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge,,, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/22/07.(lh)
October 23, 2007 Filing 258 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Florida Supreme Court Opinion Right On Point) by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supreme Court Opinion in Florida Bar v. Brake)(Thompson, John)
October 23, 2007 Filing 257 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Court Re Its Failure to Rule on Email Service List (Thompson, John)
October 23, 2007 Filing 256 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/6/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 22, 2007 Filing 255 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Wrong Event Selected; originally filed as 245 Notice (Other); in the future please select Letter found under Other Events. Also include proper document heading including case number, style, and the appropriate court. (de)
October 22, 2007 Filing 254 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: re 244 Application for Writ. Error: Wrong Event Selected; Document Not Captioned; and Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected. Instruction to Filer: File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry and Refile the Document correctly. (de)
October 22, 2007 Filing 253 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Document Title Does Not Match Event Selected; originally filed as 243 Notice (Other); however document is titled a Petition for Writ of Prohibition... Instruction to Filer: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the Document correctly. In the future include proper document heading including case number, style, and the appropriate court. (de)
October 22, 2007 Filing 252 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judicial Notice by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Bar News Article Quoting Gay Rights Extremist Bar Governor Steve Chaykin)(Thompson, John)
October 22, 2007 Filing 251 Plaintiff's MOTION that the Court Take Judicial Notice of a Fact by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 22, 2007 Filing 250 NOTICE by John B. Thompson that Florida Bar Referee Blocks Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss "Alabama" Bar Complaint Ignored by Defendant Referee Tunis)(Thompson, John)
October 22, 2007 Filing 248 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Bar's Record Counsel Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Committee by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 22, 2007 Filing 247 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing of Oct. 22 News Article Re This Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Daily Business Review Article Re This Case)(Thompson, John)
October 21, 2007 Filing 246 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Norm Kent Should Not Be Referred to Ad Hoc Committee for Discipline by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norm Kent's Latest Public Attack on a Party in this Case)(Thompson, John)
October 21, 2007 Filing 245 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Demand to US Attorney (Thompson, John)
October 21, 2007 Filing 244 APPLICATION for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition/Emergency Stays Made Necessary by Lower Court's Refusal to Recuse by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petition to 11th Circuit for Writ)(Thompson, John)
October 20, 2007 Filing 243 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Petition to Be Filed Monday with Eleventh Circuit, Sans Referenced Court Orders (Thompson, John)
October 20, 2007 Filing 242 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 240 Notice (Other), 239 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/2/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER denying 217 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 218 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 229 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 232 Motion to Disqualify Judge Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/19/07. (mr1)
October 19, 2007 Filing 241 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 233 Plaintiff's MOTION Writ of Prohibition to 11th Circuit Re Refusal of Judge Jordan to Disqualify, 239 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 11/2/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 19, 2007 Filing 240 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing of Corrected Petition before 11th Circuit (Thompson, John)
October 19, 2007 Filing 239 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 233 Plaintiff's MOTION Writ of Prohibition to 11th Circuit Re Refusal of Judge Jordan to Disqualify (This is a revised version of what now will be filed with the 11th Circuit post haste (Thompson, John)
October 19, 2007 Filing 238 NOTICE of Instruction to Filer: Error: Wrong Event Selected; originally filed as 237 Notice (Other); in the future please select Letter found under Other Events. (de)
October 18, 2007 Filing 237 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 204 Order Letter to Chief Judge Moreno in Further Response to His Docketed Letter to Plaintiff (Thompson, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 236 NOTICE of Compliance with New Administrative Order and of Intent to File Verbal Descriptions of Obscenity by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 235 Notice of Supplemental Authority by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bates, v. Arizona State Bar)(Thompson, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 234 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 225 Notice (Other), 226 Notice (Other) Re Referee Tunis' Failure to Issue Necessary Subpoenas (Thompson, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 233 Plaintiff's MOTION Writ of Prohibition to 11th Circuit Re Refusal of Judge Jordan to Disqualify by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 232 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge (Addendum Re New Rule 6c) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 231 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Re Eleventh Circuit Relief (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 230 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing Before Magistrate by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 229 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge for Ex Post Facto Stunt by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 228 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 119 Order to Show Cause, 148 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Hearing (URGENT) (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 227 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/31/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 226 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 224 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue or Delay Ruling on Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena for Pollack, Bar's Outside Investigator)(Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 225 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 224 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue or Delay Ruling on Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoenas and Notices for Depo in Bar Proceedings Sent to Referee Tunis)(Thompson, John)
October 17, 2007 Filing 224 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue or Delay Ruling on Motions to Dismiss by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/31/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Bar Referee Giving Her One Last Chance to Provide Due Process)(Thompson, John)
October 16, 2007 Filing 223 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss State Proceedings by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/30/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 16, 2007 Filing 222 NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; originally filed as 217 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge; docketed second requested relief as 221 MOTION for Hearing. Instruction To Filer: In the future please select all applicable Reliefs. (de)
October 16, 2007 Filing 220 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to DOJ and Senate Judiciary Committee Re Misprision of a Felony by Sitting District Court Judge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to DOJ, Senate Judiciary Committee Chairman and Ranking Member)(Thompson, John)
October 16, 2007 Filing 219 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Analysis of Bar's Failure to Reform Disciplinary System (Proof of Due Process Violations) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 16, 2007 Filing 218 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge (Addendum) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Filing 221 MOTION for Hearing by John B. Thompson. (originally filed as 217 ) (de)
October 15, 2007 Filing 217 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Filing 216 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 215 Response to Motion (Kent Has No Standing to Filing Anything Herein) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Filing 215 RESPONSE to Motion re 214 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Kent from Court's E-mail Listing Intervenor's Notice to Court filed by Norman Elliott Kent. Replies due by 10/22/2007. (Kent, Norman)
October 15, 2007 Filing 214 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Kent from Court's E-mail Listing by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Filing 213 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Bar as "State Agency" (Keller) by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 212 OMNIBUS ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS: Denying 145 Motion for Clarification, denying 156 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 157 Motion for Discovery, denying 163 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 167 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 170 Motion for Leave to File, granting 171 Motion for Leave to File, denying 173 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 174 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 179 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 181 Motion to Intervene, denying 190 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR, denying as moot 193 Motion for Clarification, denying 194 Motion for Order to Show Cause.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/12/07. (lk)
October 15, 2007 Filing 211 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Abstention by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sixth Circuit Case Re Middlesex and Abstention)(Thompson, John)
October 15, 2007 Filing 210 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing with FL Supreme Ct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice to FL Supreme Court)(Thompson, John)
October 13, 2007 Filing 209 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Bar Complaint Filed Against Bar Prosecutor)(Thompson, John)
October 13, 2007 Filing 208 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Alerts Court to New SLAPP Complaint BY THE BAR, proving "bad faith" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit story re slapp complainant and what it is protecting by bar complaints# 2 Exhibit uk story re slapp complainant's predatory practices)(Thompson, John)
October 13, 2007 Filing 207 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing of Document Showing Bar's Selective Prosecution and Equal Protection Denial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Document Showing Selective Bar Prosecution)(Thompson, John)
October 12, 2007 Filing 206 Statement of: Response to Chief Judge Moreno's Docketed Letter by John B. Thompson re 204 Order. (Thompson, John)
October 12, 2007 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion re 201 Plaintiff's MOTION Remove interloper from electronic e-mail list re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention filed by Norman Elliott Kent. (Kent, Norman)
October 12, 2007 Filing 203 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Action against The Bar by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/26/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 12, 2007 Filing 202 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Service of Demand Letter on Bar President to Appear before Governors Re Constitutional Defenses Per Mason v. Bar (Thompson, John)
October 11, 2007 Filing 204 Letter to John B. Thompson, Esq.Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/11/07.(sc)
October 11, 2007 Filing 201 Plaintiff's MOTION Remove interloper from electronic e-mail list re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 11, 2007 Filing 200 Notice of Supplemental Authority re 197 Notice of Supplemental Authority, Re Judicial Immunity Per Court's Request by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 11, 2007 Filing 199 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 194 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Florida Bar Should Not Be Held in Indirect Criminal Contempt (Sworn Statement Re Witness Tampering, Etc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit gopman brief filed with florida supreme court# 2 Exhibit gopman not guilty plea)(Thompson, John)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER vacating 119 Order to Show Cause, 148 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Hearing; Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/10/2007.(bs)
October 11, 2007 Filing 197 Notice of Supplemental Authority re 132 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 113 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 142 Memorandum in Support, 89 Amended Complaint by Dava J. Tunis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit two printouts of supplemental authorities)(Fahlbusch, Charles)
October 10, 2007 Filing 196 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Re Bar Governors (Thompson, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 195 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Incorrect event selected; originally filed as 187 Notice (Other);in the future select Letter found under Other Events and add proper document heading including case number and style. (de)
October 10, 2007 Filing 194 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Florida Bar Should Not Be Held in Indirect Criminal Contempt by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 193 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification (Request for a Written Order Vacating Show Cause Order) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/24/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 192 NOTICE of Striking 186 Notice (Other) filed by John B. Thompson, by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 191 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Document attached is titled Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Norm Kent's Motion to Intervene but it is filed as 186 Notice (Other). Filer is instructed to: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the document correctly (as a Response in Opposition to Motion as it is titled). (de)
October 10, 2007 Filing 190 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/24/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 189 RESPONSE to Motion re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention (Final Response) filed by John B. Thompson. Replies due by 10/17/2007. (Thompson, John)
October 9, 2007 Filing 188 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Incorrect event selected re 178 Response to Order to Show Cause; in the future select Letter found under Other Events; also include proper document heading including case number and style on all pleadings. (de)
October 9, 2007 Filing 187 NOTICE by John B. Thompson As Further Proof that Judge Jordan Must Be Removed (Thompson, John)
October 9, 2007 Filing 186 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Judge Moreno Re Needed Removal of Judge Jordan (Thompson, John)
October 9, 2007 Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention of Kent filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 184 NOTICE by Norman Elliott Kent re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention, 183 Notice (Other), 182 Notice (Other) Second Adjusted and Correct Notice of Scrivener's Error (Kent, Norman)
October 8, 2007 Filing 183 NOTICE by Norman Elliott Kent re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention, 182 Notice (Other) Adjusted Notice of Scrivener's Error (Kent, Norman)
October 8, 2007 Filing 182 NOTICE by Norman Elliott Kent re 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention Notice of Scrivener's Error (Kent, Norman)
October 8, 2007 Filing 181 Third Party MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 for Permissive Intervention by Norman Elliott Kent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supreme Court of Florida Order of April 12, 2007)(Kent, Norman)
October 8, 2007 Filing 180 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Bar's Official Standards for Lawyer Discipline) by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Bar's Standards for Discipline)(Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 179 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge Jordan, Based Upon His Initiation of Ethics Inquiry by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 178 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 177 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Letter to Chief Judge Moreno Re Judge Jordan's Misconduct, Request for Jordan's Emergency Removal) (Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 176 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to the Court that Chaykin is on Ad Hoc Committee (Thompson, John)
October 8, 2007 Filing 175 Notice of Supplemental Authority re 166 Order on Motion for Clarification by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Brief filed with US Supreme Court citing cases defeating Bar's abstention arguments# 2 Supplement Authority showing bad faith of Bar with its lunacy stunts# 3 Exhibit Florida's Anti-SLAPP Statute which The Bar Is Violating)(Thompson, John)
October 7, 2007 Filing 174 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add Norm Kent as Defendant by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 6, 2007 Filing 173 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 172 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator Now As the Wrong Heading was on the immediately previously filed otherwise identical motion by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 6, 2007 Filing 172 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator Now by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 6, 2007 Filing 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Documents that Prove Due Process Denial by Bar by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 6, 2007 Filing 170 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Verbal Description of Bar SLAPP Complainant Kent Material by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 6, 2007 Filing 169 NOTICE by John B. Thompson for Consideration Prior to Oct 9 Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article proving Bar complainant Judge Friedman's mendacity and error)(Thompson, John)
October 5, 2007 Filing 168 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 166 Order on Motion for Clarification Re October 9 Hearing and What Thompson Will Do Thereat, Per the Court's Query (Thompson, John)
October 5, 2007 Filing 167 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge (Addendum Proving the Court was Wrong. It was a NECESSITY to file the actual web pages, not just a link) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part 155 Motion for Clarification, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/5/07. (lh)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying 149 Motion to Amend/Correct,Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/5/07. (lh)
October 4, 2007 Filing 164 NOTICE of Application for Writ by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
October 4, 2007 Filing 163 Amended MOTION to Disqualify Judge Jordan (The Judge Might Want to Read This One) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 4, 2007 Filing 162 Notice of Instruction to Filer: See Administrative Procedures for filing an Emergency Motion re 157 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery. (de)
October 4, 2007 Filing 161 Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; originally filed as 156 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge; docketed second requested relief as 160 MOTION for Hearing. Instruction To Filer: In the future please select all applicable Reliefs. (de)
October 4, 2007 Filing 160 MOTION for Hearing by John B. Thompson. (originally filed as 156 ) (de)
October 4, 2007 Filing 159 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Prior to Hearing on Show Cause Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norm Kent's increased obscenity trafficking, extortion)(Thompson, John)
October 4, 2007 Filing 158 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Dec Action Pertaining to State Bar Not a State Agency, Per Keller by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supreme Court Ruling in Keller that State Bars are Not State Governmental Agencies# 2 Supplement Justice Black's Dissent in Lathrop that has become law in Keller)(Thompson, John)
October 4, 2007 Filing 157 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery (Depo. of Bar's John T. Berry) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/19/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 4, 2007 Filing 156 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge Jordan (New) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 3, 2007 Filing 155 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification and Notice to Court of ABA's Report of the Failures of State Bar Disciplinary Systems by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/18/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ABA's Report Indicting State Bars' Discipline)(Thompson, John)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions 145 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification of October 1 Order, Etc., 118 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint (Third) and Memorandum of Law,, 113 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof: *** Motions Hearing set for 10/9/2007 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Adalberto Jordan.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/3/07.(lh)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying 143 Motion to recuse,Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/3/07. (lh)
October 3, 2007 Filing 152 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth Tendered) Naming Jordan as Individual Defendant, filed by John B. Thompson.(Thompson, John)
October 3, 2007 Filing 151 Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; originally filed as 145 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification; docketed second requested relief as 150 MOTION for Hearing. Instruction To Filer: In the future please select all applicable Reliefs. (de)
October 2, 2007 Filing 150 MOTION for Hearing re 119 Order to Show Cause, and 145 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification by John B. Thompson. (originally filed as 145 ) (de)
October 2, 2007 Filing 149 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add Adalberto As Individual Defendant, Per Federal Law by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/17/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REFERRING MR. THOMPSON TO AD HOC COMMITTEE ON ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS, PEER REVIEW, AND ATTORNEY GRIEVANCE FOR APPROPRIATE ACTION; denying 126 Motion to Vacate, denying 129 Motion for Hearing; Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/1/07. (lh)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 131 Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause filed by John B. Thompson, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/1/07.(lh)
October 2, 2007 Filing 146 Notice of Supplemental Authority re 120 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Dava Tunis by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Supplement USSC Case Authorizing Injunction of Judge's Discharging State Bar Duties)(Thompson, John)
October 2, 2007 Filing 145 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification of October 1 Order, Etc. by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/17/2007 (Thompson, John)
October 1, 2007 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re 118 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint (Third) and Memorandum of Law, filed by The Florida Bar. (Sharpe, Karusha)
October 1, 2007 Filing 143 Plaintiff's MOTION to Disqualify Judge Jordan for Patent Bias by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
October 1, 2007 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support re 113 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 89 Amended Complaint Reply Memorandum filed by Dava J. Tunis. (Fahlbusch, Charles)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT;Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 10/1/07.(lh)
October 1, 2007 Filing 140 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter Re Distribution of What This Court Found to Be "Obscenity")(Thompson, John)
October 1, 2007 Filing 139 Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: Added attachment description re 136 Response to Order to Show Cause. In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
October 1, 2007 Filing 138 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 30, 2007 Filing 137 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norm Kent's Portrayal of Plaintiff as Porn Model)(Thompson, John)
September 30, 2007 Filing 136 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Thompson, John)
September 28, 2007 Filing 135 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 28, 2007 Filing 134 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Ad Hoc Committee)(Thompson, John)
September 27, 2007 Filing 133 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bar Complaint Re Disparagement of Thompson as "Obscenity Trafficker" in Light of Bar Rule 3-8.4(d)# 2 Exhibit Letter from Alvin Entin Labeling Thompson Obscenity Trafficker Per Judge Jordan)(Thompson, John)
September 27, 2007 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re 113 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Re Judge Tunis' Motion to Dismiss filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Supreme Court Case Re Recusal)(Thompson, John)
September 27, 2007 Filing 131 REPLY to 130 Response to Order to Show Cause by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 27, 2007 Filing 130 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Clear Warning Given Court and Anyone of Following Obscenity on NEXT Page)(Thompson, John)
September 27, 2007 Filing 129 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re 119 Order to Show Cause by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Norm Kent's "News" Story about His Obscenity Trafficking)(Thompson, John)
September 26, 2007 Filing 128 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 26, 2007 Filing 127 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 26, 2007 Filing 126 Plaintiff's MOTION to Vacate 119 Order to Show Cause on the Basis of Court's Mistaken, Understandable Belief by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 10/11/2007 (Thompson, John)
September 26, 2007 Filing 125 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Error: Wrong Event Selected; originally filed as 122 Response (Other), 121 Response (Other), 124 Response (Other), and 123 Response (Other). Instruction to Filer: In the future please select the proper Event: Response to Order to Show Cause found under Other Documents. (de)
September 25, 2007 Filing 124 RESPONSE to 119 Order to Show Cause (Fourth) Re Lack of Risk to "Children" filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 25, 2007 Filing 123 RESPONSE to 119 Order to Show Cause (Third Response) filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Florida Bar to Proceed Against Attorney Kent for Obscenity Trafficking)(Thompson, John)
September 25, 2007 Filing 122 RESPONSE to 119 Order to Show Cause (Further Response) filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
September 25, 2007 Filing 121 RESPONSE to 119 Order to Show Cause filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pedophilia Reference to Just Us Boys Site)(Thompson, John)
September 25, 2007 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint (Third) and Memorandum of Law, filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Harper Decision)(Thompson, John)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2007.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/24/07.(lh)
September 24, 2007 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint (Third) and Memorandum of Law, by The Florida Bar. Responses due by 10/9/2007 (Sharpe, Karusha)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 84 Motion for Leave to File, denying as moot 86 Motion for Clarification, denying 91 Motion for Leave to File, denying 92 Motion for Leave to File, denying 96 Motion for Leave to File, denying 100 Motion for Leave to File, denying 102 Motion for Leave to File, denying 104 Motion for Leave to File, denying 107 Motion for Clarification, denying 111 Motion for Leave to File, denying 112 Motion for Leave to File, denying 114 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/19/07. (lh)
September 19, 2007 Filing 116 Notice of Docket Correction: re 115 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document Re Obscenity Distribution by SLAPP Bar Complainant filed by John B. Thompson, attachment has been restricted from public view by the Clerk (yc) Modified on 9/19/2007 (vp).
September 19, 2007 Filing 115 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document Re Obscenity Distribution by SLAPP Bar Complainant by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to State/Fed Law Enforcement Re Obscenity Distribution by Florida-Licensed Lawyer and The Bar's Indifference Thereto)(Thompson, John) Modified on 9/19/2007 (vp).
September 18, 2007 Filing 114 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File ACLU Gay Marriage Debate Announcement by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ACLU Gay Marriage Debate Announcement Re Thompson)(Thompson, John)
September 17, 2007 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Dava J. Tunis. Responses due by 10/1/2007 (Fahlbusch, Charles)
September 17, 2007 Filing 112 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Letter Re SLAPP Bar Complainant Targeting Thompson by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Letter Re Targeting of SLAPP Complainant Client Targeting Thompson)(Thompson, John)
September 16, 2007 Filing 111 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Bar Prosecutor's Letter and Attachments Showing Bad Faith by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bar Prosecutor's Letter and Attachments Proving Bad Faith)(Thompson, John)
September 14, 2007 Filing 110 Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Threat of Mental Assessment Unethical by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Supplement New Jersey Ethics Ruling)(Thompson, John)
September 12, 2007 Filing 109 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Court Re Withholding of Documents (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Bar's Bateman Letter)(Thompson, John)
September 12, 2007 Filing 108 NOTICE by John B. Thompson this Court Re Posture of State Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Notice in State Court Proceedings)(Thompson, John)
September 12, 2007 Filing 107 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification Re Proper Parties by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/26/2007 (Thompson, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 106 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Court of Defendant Tunis' Failure to Execute Subpoena (Thompson, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 105 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 11, 2007 Filing 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Tunis' Order Denying Recusal by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 103 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 102 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 11, 2007 Filing 102 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Florida Bar News Paid Ad by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 101 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 100 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 11, 2007 Filing 100 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Bar President Angones' Letter by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 99 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 11, 2007 Filing 98 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 95 Notice (Other). Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 11, 2007 Filing 97 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 93 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 10, 2007 Filing 96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Kuehne FOIA Request by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 10, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Re Request to Appear Before Bar Governors (State Remedy Enunciated in Mason v. Florida Bar) (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 10, 2007 Filing 94 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 92 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
September 10, 2007 Filing 93 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Tyson v. Florida Bar) by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 10, 2007 Filing 92 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Florida Bar Rules by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 9, 2007 Filing 91 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 8, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 88 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Appointment of Mediator, Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 7, 2007 Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third, in light of court's omnibus order of Sept. 6), filed by John B. Thompson.(Thompson, John)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OMNIBUS ORDER granting 48 Motion to accept memorandum in opposition, denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss, granting 58 Motion to Dismiss, denying 61 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR, denying 7 Motion for Settlement, denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying 23 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/6/07. (lh)
September 7, 2007 Filing 87 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Preliminary Injunction (Selective Prosecution/Equal Protection Issue) by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Thompson, John)
September 7, 2007 Filing 86 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/21/2007 (Thompson, John)
September 6, 2007 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re 79 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 77 Notice (Other) (Bar's False Rendering of Plaintiff's Disciplinary History) to Strike Filing of Disciplinary History filed by The Florida Bar. Replies due by 9/13/2007. (Sharpe, Karusha)
September 5, 2007 Filing 84 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Document by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
September 4, 2007 Filing 83 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 76 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) as to Defects in Tew/Alabama Bar Complaint (Thompson, John)
September 4, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 76 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) As to Defects in "Friedman Complaint" Filed by Defendant Tunis (Thompson, John)
September 4, 2007 Filing 81 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to the Court Re Trial Date Set in State Proceeding (Thompson, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 80 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 79 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 77 Notice (Other) (Bar's False Rendering of Plaintiff's Disciplinary History) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/17/2007 (Thompson, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 78 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 74 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 31, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE by The Florida Bar Filing Plaintiff's Disciplinary History with the Florida Bar (Sharpe, Karusha)
August 31, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE by Dava J. Tunis of Filing Complaints in Florida Bar Cases Pending Against Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cover sheet for Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exh. A - Complaint in SC07-80# 3 Exhibit Cover sheet for Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit Exh. B - Complaint in SC07-354)(Fahlbusch, Charles)
August 30, 2007 Filing 75 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 73 Notice (Other). Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 30, 2007 Filing 74 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Preliminary Injunction by John B. Thompson (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 29, 2007 Filing 73 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Demand to Appear Before Bar Governors Per Mason v. Bar (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 28, 2007 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Dismiss 40 Amended Complaint and in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 28, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE by John B. Thompson That Both Defendants Have Consented to Filing Amended Complaint (Thompson, John)
August 28, 2007 Filing 70 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Re Leave to Amend Complaint (Thompson, John)
August 27, 2007 Filing 69 Notice of Supplemental Authority by The Florida Bar (Sharpe, Karusha)
August 27, 2007 Filing 68 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 65 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Third Amended). Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 27, 2007 Filing 67 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 64 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 27, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re 65 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Third Amended) (Thompson, John)
August 26, 2007 Filing 65 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Third Amended) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/10/2007 (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(Thompson, John)
August 24, 2007 Filing 64 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Third Amended) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/10/2007 (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Thompson, John)
August 23, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of New Complaint to Be Filed (Thompson, John)
August 23, 2007 Filing 62 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 59 Response in Opposition to Motion. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 23, 2007 Filing 61 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 9/7/2007 (Thompson, John)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying as moot 24 Motion for Hearing, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/22/07. (lh)
August 22, 2007 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Dismiss 40 Amended Complaint filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Thompson, John)
August 21, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss 40 Amended Complaint by The Florida Bar. Responses due by 9/5/2007 (Sharpe, Karusha)
August 21, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Verified) Re Bar's Bad Faith and Prosecutorial Misconduct (Thompson, John)
August 21, 2007 Filing 56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Full Psych Evaluation, Attached by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 20, 2007 Filing 55 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 51 Notice (Other). Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion, granting 39 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 22 Motion to Amend/Correct, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/17/07. (lh)
August 20, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss 40 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Dava J. Tunis. Responses due by 9/4/2007 (Fahlbusch, Charles)
August 20, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE by John B. Thompson (Filing of Psych Evaluation) (Thompson, John)
August 18, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Filing Florida Supreme Court Docket Sheet (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 15, 2007 Filing 50 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 46 Reply to Response to Motion. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 14, 2007 Filing 49 Notice of Docket Correction: Multiple pleadings filed as one; originally filed as 44 Memorandum in Opposition; docketed requested relief as 48 MOTION (for Miscellaneous Relief) to Accept Memorandum in Opposition as Timely Filed. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future file Responses/Replies separately from Motions. (de)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Clarification Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/14/07. (gm1)
August 14, 2007 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint with Amended Complaint Tendered, 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Response by Tunis dated August 13) filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 13, 2007 Filing 48 MOTION to Accept Memorandum in Opposition and Memorandum in Support as Timely Filed by Dava J. Tunis. (originally filed as 44 ) (de)
August 13, 2007 Filing 45 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification of two court orders by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/27/2007 (Thompson, John)
August 13, 2007 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Accept filed by Dava J. Tunis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A,B, and C to Memorandum in Opposition)(Fahlbusch, Charles)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING; Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/23/2007 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Adalberto Jordan.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/13/07.(lk)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Response to the motion for summary judgment by 8/18/07.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/13/07. (lk)
August 10, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE by John B. Thompson re preliminary injunction and disciplinary trial date (Thompson, John)
August 9, 2007 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 9, 2007 Filing 39 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint with Amended Complaint Tendered by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/23/2007 (Thompson, John)
August 8, 2007 Filing 38 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions to Dismiss and/or File Proposed Amended Complaint by John B. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 6, 2007 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, 34 Plaintiff's MOTION re 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Request that Court Rule on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Dava J. Tunis. (Fahlbusch, Charles)
August 6, 2007 Filing 36 Notice of Docket Correction: Added attachment description re 35 Notice (Other). Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future add proper attachment description. (de)
August 5, 2007 Filing 35 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Court of Florida Supreme Court Docket (Attachments: # 1)(Thompson, John)
August 3, 2007 Filing 34 Plaintiff's MOTION re 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Request that Court Rule on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 17 Motion to Strike notice and for protective order, granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Stay discovery pending disposition of motion to dismiss, motion for protective order, motion to strike notice of deposition to Ben Kuehne.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/3/07. (lh)
August 3, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Urgency of Requested Relief (Thompson, John)
August 2, 2007 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification 29 Order, 30 Response (Other) (URGENT) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/16/2007 (Thompson, John)
August 1, 2007 Filing 30 RESPONSE to 29 Order filed by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER regarding emergency motion to strike ; Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 07/08/2007.(bs)
July 31, 2007 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Stike Notice of Depositon of Kuehne and Memo of Law, 17 MOTION to Strike, 23 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator and for Status Conference, 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, 24 MOTION for Hearing filed by John B. Thompson. Replies due by 8/7/2007. (Thompson, John)
July 31, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Stike Notice of Depositon of Kuehne and Memo of Law by The Florida Bar. Responses due by 8/14/2007 (Sharpe, Karusha)
July 28, 2007 Filing 26 NOTICE by John B. Thompson Re Agreement by Counsel to Amend Complaint (Thompson, John)
July 27, 2007 Filing 25 Notice of Docket Correction: Multiple reliefs filed as one; originally filed as 23 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator; docketed second requested relief as 24 MOTION for (Hearing) Status Conference. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future select all requested reliefs. (de)
July 26, 2007 Filing 24 MOTION for Status Conference or Case Management Conference by John B. Thompson. (originally filed as 23 ) (de)
July 26, 2007 Filing 23 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator and for Status Conference by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/9/2007 (Thompson, John)
July 26, 2007 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 8/9/2007 (Thompson, John)
July 25, 2007 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss 2 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by The Florida Bar. Responses due by 8/8/2007 (Sharpe, Karusha)
July 25, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE of Striking 15 MOTION to Dismiss 2 Amended Complaint filed by Dava J. Tunis, by Dava J. Tunis (Fahlbusch, Charles)
July 25, 2007 Filing 19 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Partial document filed as 15 MOTION to Dismiss. Filer is instructed to: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile the document correctly including proper heading (case number and style). (de)
July 24, 2007 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of Certification of Emergency (pa)
July 24, 2007 Filing 17 EMERGENCY MOTION and memorandum of law in support,to Strike notice of taking deposition and for protective order, by Dava J. Tunis. Responses due by 8/7/2007 (pa)
July 24, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss 2 Amended Complaint by Dava J. Tunis. Responses due by 8/7/2007 (Fahlbusch, Charles)
July 24, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss 2 Amended Complaint by Dava J. Tunis. Responses due by 8/7/2007 (Fahlbusch, Charles)
July 23, 2007 Filing 14 Expedited Verified MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John B. Thompson. (pa)
July 22, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ben Kuehne by John B. Thompson.(Thompson, John)
July 20, 2007 Filing 12 Notice of Instruction to Filer: Incorrect event selected; originally filed as 11 Notice (Other); in the future select Notice to Take Deposition found under Discovery Documents. (de)
July 19, 2007 Filing 11 NOTICE by John B. Thompson of Notice of Deposition of Party Defendant Tunis (Thompson, John)
July 11, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE by John B. Thompson to Court of Service on All Defendants by Process Server (Thompson, John)
July 3, 2007 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dava J. Tunis, The Florida Bar. (lk)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/26/07. (lh)
June 8, 2007 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Settlement (Motion for Court-Ordered Mediation to Attempt Settlement) by John B. Thompson. Responses due by 6/22/2007 (Thompson, John)
June 8, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's June 6 Order by John B. Thompson (Thompson, John)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Emergency Basis) filed by John B. Thompson, Proof of Service Deadline 6/15/2007.Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/6/07.(lh)
June 4, 2007 Filing 4 Notice of Instruction to Filer: See Administrative Procedures for filing emergency motions re 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency Basis. (de)
June 1, 2007 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Emergency Basis) by John B. Thompson. (Thompson, John)
May 30, 2007 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief, and Attorney's Fees (Civil Rights Action Adding Judge Tunis), filed by John B. Thompson.(Thompson, John)
May 15, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Florida Bar Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 959631, filed by John B. Thompson.(el)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. The Florida Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Thompson
Represented By: John Bruce Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Florida Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?