Hernandez v. Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd et al Featured Case

Plaintiff suing Internet Gaming Entertainment (IGE) for selling World of Warcraft® virtual property generated by cheap labor in third world countries (i.e., gold farming). Plaintiff alleges that gold farming diminishes the enjoyment and satisfaction of consumers and violates the World of Warcraft® TOS.

Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Defendant: IGE U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv21403
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Referring Judge: Lurana S. Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 62 Joint Motion for Brief Enlargement of Time to File Joint Status Report. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/16/08. (lc2)
July 11, 2008 62
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd, IGE U.S. LLC. (Heywood, Samuel)
July 7, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER directing counsel to confer and file Joint Status Report and expediting Response and Reply regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories, and for Extension of Discovery Limits [DE 58]. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/7/08. (lc2)
May 30, 2008 51
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by IGE U.S. LLC. (Heywood, Samuel)
May 19, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER entering parties' stipulated protective order [DE 49]. Please see Order for details.Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/19/08.(lc2)
April 18, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order, denying as moot 45 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/18/08. (lc1)
April 17, 2008 45
Joint MOTION for Hearing on Status with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Antonio Hernandez, IGE U.S. LLC. (Heywood, Samuel)
April 2, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER on 42 Stipulation filed by IGE U.S. LLC, substituting Attorney James Michael Miller for IGE U.S. LLC added, Attorney Christopher Ryan Maloney and Scott David Richburg terminated. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/2/08.(lc1)
January 3, 2008 41
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by IGE U.S. LLC.(Richburg, Scott)
December 27, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 39 Motion to DROP PARTY. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/26/07. (lk)
December 21, 2007 39
MOTION Drop A Party Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd. by Antonio Hernandez. (Newsome, C.)
December 10, 2007 36
MOTION to Withdraw Document 20 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Arbitration, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Any Non-Arbitrable Claims for Improper Venue, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint by IGE U.S. LLC. Responses due by 12/24/2007 (Richburg, Scott)
November 30, 2007 32
NOTICE by Antonio Hernandez of Agreed Upon Mediator (Newsome, C.) Modified on 12/3/2007 (ls). "Wrong Event Used, Re-docketed as Entry ( 34 ); Notice of Mediator Selection".
November 21, 2007 28
RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Arbitration, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Any Non-Arbitrable Claims for Improper Venue filed by Antonio Hernandez. (Newsome, C.)
November 16, 2007 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/4/2008 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn. Fact Discovery due by 5/9/2008. Motions in limine due by 7/18/2008. Pretrial Motions due by 6/6/2008. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/25/2008.Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/15/07.(lk)
November 15, 2007 26
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry S. Seltzer : Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2007. Parties present, scheduling order to follow. (Tape #BSS-07-234-560.) (at)
November 7, 2007 23
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 20 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Arbitration, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Any Non-Arbitrable Claims for Improper Venue by Antonio Hernandez. (Newsome, C.)
October 18, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference [DE 17]. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/18/07. (lc2)
October 10, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for October 31, 2007. Please see Order for details.Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/10/07.(lc2)
October 3, 2007 15
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Antonio Hernandez as to IGE U.S. LLC. (Newsome, C.)
September 26, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IGE U.S. LLC response due 10/25/2007. ORDER Continuing Trial Date.Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/26/07. (lc1)
September 20, 2007 11
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Hernandez. IGE U.S. LLC served on 9/4/2007, answer due 9/25/2007. (Newsome, C.)
September 14, 2007 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Hernandez. IGE U.S. LLC served on 9/5/2007, answer due 9/25/2007. (Newsome, C.)
August 31, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/31/07. (lc1)
August 29, 2007 8
Plaintiff's MOTION Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd. by Antonio Hernandez. (Newsome, C.)
August 23, 2007 6
Summons Issued as to Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd, IGE U.S. LLC. (pa)
July 24, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Donald Haviland, Esq. is hereby permitted to enter a limited appearance for purposes of representing the plaintiff Antonio Hernandez in this cause; C. Richard Newsome, Esq. is designated as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/24/07. (jz)
July 11, 2007 3
MOTION for Limited Appearance of Donald E. Haviland, Jr., Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #540450. (cw)
June 12, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Scheduling Matters and Pretrial Discovery Matters. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2008 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn. Calendar Call set for 3/6/2008 at 01:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn.Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/12/2007.(vt)
June 1, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 960687, filed by Antonio Hernandez.(el)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Internet Gaming Entertainment, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?