Apple Corps Limited et al v. Fuego Entertainment, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Corps Limited and Apple Records, Inc. alleges that defendants have attempted to release unauthorized bootleg recordings of musical performances of The Beatles from Hamburg Germany\'s Star-Club in 1962.

Plaintiff: Apple Corps Limited and Apple Records, Inc.
Defendant: Fuego Entertainment, Inc., Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC, Echo-Vista Inc., Hugo M. Cancio and Jeffery Collins
Case Number: 1:2008cv20748
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: William M. Hoeveler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE Upon Stipulation of the Parties.. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 10/20/08. (tp)
July 9, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting re 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law Responses due by 7/28/2008. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 7/9/08. (md)
July 8, 2008 25
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Apple Corps Limited. (Wolfe, Richard)
June 12, 2008 23
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Apple Corps Limited. (Wolfe, Richard)
June 5, 2008 22
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Fuego Entertainment, Inc., Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC, Hugo M. Cancio for dates of June 23, 2008 through July 11, 2008 (Perlman, Jonathan)
May 23, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 19 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 6/20/2008Signed by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 5/23/2008. (ls)
May 22, 2008 20
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Apple Corps Limited. (Wolfe, Richard)
May 14, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fuego Entertainment, Inc. response due 5/16/2008; Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC response due 5/16/2008; Hugo M. Cancio response due 5/16/2008. Signed by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 5/13/2008. (tb)
May 7, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fuego Entertainment, Inc. response due 5/9/2008; Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC response due 5/9/2008; Hugo M. Cancio response due 5/9/2008. Signed by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 5/7/08. (md)
May 2, 2008 15
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to complaint by Fuego Entertainment, Inc., Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC, Hugo M. Cancio. (Perlman, Jonathan)
April 4, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/4/08. (ch1)
March 31, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom Signed by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/31/08. (md)
March 28, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 4 Motion to set Emergency Hearing. Motion for Preliminary Emergency Injunction is set for April 2, 2008 at 11:00 AMSigned by Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/28/08. (md)
March 26, 2008 8
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Perlman on behalf of Fuego Entertainment, Inc., Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC, Hugo M. Cancio (Perlman, Jonathan)
March 24, 2008 5
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (lh)
March 21, 2008 6
MOTION for Limited Appearances, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul LiCalsi and Howard Weller, Filing Fee $150, Receipt #977355. (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Corps Limited et al v. Fuego Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Corps Limited
Represented By: Richard Charles Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Records, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Charles Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuego Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo-Fuego Music Group LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo-Vista Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo M. Cancio
Represented By: Jonathan Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?