Mamani et al v. Lozada Sanchez Bustamante
Plaintiff: Eloy Rojas Mamani, Etelvina Ramos Mamani, Sonia Espejo Villalobos, Jaun Patricio Quispe Mamani, Teofilo Baltazar Cerro, Juana Valencia De Carvajal, Hermogenes Bernabe Callizaya, Gonzalo Mamani Aguilar and Felicidad Rosa Huanca Quispe
Defendant: Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante
Case Number: 1:2008cv21063
Filed: April 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Adalberto Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER re 475 Supplement filed by Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante: The defendants' renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law is GRANTED. The Court will issue a final judgment separately. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 5/30/2018. (ane)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 339 Defendants' Amended Motion to Exclude Testimony of Allen Borrelli. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 2/28/2018. (ek00)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting 335 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Reference to Akin Gump's Representation of the Government of Bolivia. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 2/26/2018. (ek00)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 336 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Daniel M. Goldstein. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 2/22/2018. (ek00)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 337 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Material Concerning the 2009 Trial of Responsibilities in Bolivia. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 2/14/2018. (ek00)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER denying 259 Motion to Compel. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 8/11/2017. (pb00)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 167 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, and DENYING AS MOOT 168 Defendants' Joint Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/20/2014. (ms00)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mamani et al v. Lozada Sanchez Bustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Rojas Mamani
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etelvina Ramos Mamani
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Espejo Villalobos
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaun Patricio Quispe Mamani
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofilo Baltazar Cerro
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Valencia De Carvajal
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermogenes Bernabe Callizaya
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Mamani Aguilar
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicidad Rosa Huanca Quispe
Represented By: Tobias Eli Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante
Represented By: Mark Paul Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?