Chanel, Inc. et al v. Krispin et al

Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc. and Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.
Defendant: Dror Krispin and Antonio Donani
Case Number: 1:2008cv23439
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Federico A. Moreno
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 50 and granting 29 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/19/2010. (mmd)
October 18, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional Sanctions for Contempt be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/18/2010. (aed)
April 1, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT against all defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/31/2009. (mmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. et al v. Krispin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dror Krispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Donani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?