Kernel Records Oy v. Mosley et al
Plaintiff: |
Kernel Records Oy |
Defendant: |
Timothy Z. Mosley, UMG Recordings, Inc., Interscope-Geffen-A&M, Mosley Music Group, LLC, Universal Music Distribution and Nelly Furtado |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv21597 |
Filed: |
June 11, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Florida |
Office: |
Miami Office |
County: |
Miami-Dade |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald L. Graham |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 0101 Copyright Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
270
ORDER granting 264 Motion for Attorney Fees (as to entitlement). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/16/2013. (EGT)
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing
241
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND FINAL ORDER Affirming 227 March 31, 2011 Order on Pending Motions and Granting 137 Defendants Timothy Z. Mosley p/k/a Timbaland and Mosley Music, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 230 Plaintiff Kernal Record s Oy's Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Hold Entry of Final Order Briefly in Abeyance; and Denying 235 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. This case is now closed and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/7/2011. (aed) (aed)
|
July 5, 2010 |
Filing
195
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Nelstar's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to Join Indispensable Party; Dismissing all claims against Nelstar; Count 4 Dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/5/2010. (EGT)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER denying 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Disclosure; granting 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Questions Related to Expert Compensation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/28/2010. (EGT)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
108
OMNIBUS ORDER: (1) granting 74 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; (2) granting 74 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; (3) granting 78 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; (4) granting 78 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; (5) granting 79 D efendant's Motion to Dismiss; (6) granting 79 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; (7) granting 80 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; (8) granting 80 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; (9) granting 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave t o File Document Under Seal; (10) expediting response to 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by May 14, 2010; (11) denying as moot 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Reply; (12) approving joint stipulations; COUNT III OF THE AMENDED COMPLAI NT IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ANY CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEREBY STRICKEN. THE OPERATIVE PLEADING IN THE CASE CONTINUES TO BE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/10/2010. (EGT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?