Quail Cruises Ship Management LTD. v. Agencia De Viagens CVC Tur Limitada et al
Plaintiff: Quail Cruises Ship Management LTD.
Defendant: Agencia De Viagens CVC Tur Limitada, Valter Patriani, Seahawk North America, LLC, Rodolfo Spinelli and Lloyd's Register North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv23248
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Paul C. Huck
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:0078 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying 202 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/24/2012. (kfn)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 119 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/24/2011. (rky)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Lloyd's Register North America. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/21/2011. (rky)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying as moot 107 Motion to Dismiss; granting 116 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 119 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/6/2010. (eg)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber on 7/23/10. (cc)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Strike 93 Response in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber on 6/25/10. (cc)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/14/2010. (eg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quail Cruises Ship Management LTD. v. Agencia De Viagens CVC Tur Limitada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quail Cruises Ship Management LTD.
Represented By: George Mencio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agencia De Viagens CVC Tur Limitada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valter Patriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seahawk North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Register North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?