Estrella v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nicolas Estrella
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv20938
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Denying 194 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/19/2011. (jw)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/16/2011. (jw)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Compel, Denying Objections filed by Wells Fargo. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/10/2010. (jw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrella v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Estrella
Represented By: Benjamin Henry Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?