Alsobrook v. Alvarado et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Uriah Alsobrook
Defendant: Alvarado and E Medina
Case Number: 1:2010cv22183
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Presiding Judge: Patrick A. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Denying Motions in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/24/2014. (jw)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/3/2013. (jw)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Partial Dismissal of Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/28/2011. (jw)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AFFIRMING & ADOPTING Report and Recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/19/2010. (jw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsobrook v. Alvarado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Uriah Alsobrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?