Kardonick v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: David Kardonick
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2010cv23235
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: William M. Hoeveler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2013 Filing 482 NOTICE of filing by Alexander Scott (ail)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 SETTLEMENT DISTRIBUTION ORDER Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/10/2013. (ra)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER of DISMISSAL by USCA for want of prosecution because the appellant Trevor Grant has failed to file an appellant's brief and record excerpts within the time fixed by the rules; re 473 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant. USCA# 13-10014-DD (mc)
March 26, 2013 Filing 479 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail (2 LETTERS RETURNED) re 463 Order, 470 Order. US Mail returned for: DENNIS EVERETTE . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (lbc)
March 18, 2013 Filing 478 NOTICE of filing Letter to the Court by Almeada Williams (ail)
January 30, 2013 Filing 476 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 52654 re 473 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant (hh)
January 29, 2013 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Trevor Grant re 473 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (hh)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER of USCA GRANTING an extension of time including 2/11/2013 to pay to the District Court clerk the $450 docket and $5 filing fees (total of $455) with notice to this office or request leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the district court; re 473 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant. USCA# 13-10014-D (mc)
January 3, 2013 Filing 474 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 473 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant. Date received by USCA: 1/2/13. USCA Case Number: 13-10014-D. (hh)
December 27, 2012 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 473 Notice of Appeal, (hh)
December 27, 2012 Filing 473 Notice of Appeal by Trevor Grant as to 470 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Filing fee $ 455.00 Receipt#: NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (hh)
December 27, 2012 Filing 472 OBJECTIONS to 470 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss by Trevor Grant. (hh)
December 12, 2012 Filing 471 NOTICE of filing Document to the Court by Clyde Cook (ail)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting 452 Motion to Strike ; denying 452 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 12/3/2012. (ch1)
November 30, 2012 Filing 469 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 468 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds filed by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ku, Brian)
November 30, 2012 Filing 468 MOTION for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
November 27, 2012 Filing 467 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Chase's Motion for a Show Cause Order by Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
November 5, 2012 Filing 466 MOTION to Dismiss Claimant from Case 276 Letter to the Court by Janet Sullivan by Janet Sullivan. Responses due by 11/23/2012 (ail)
October 29, 2012 Filing 465 NOTICE of filing Letter to the Court re Jurisdiction by Cindy Nunn (ail)
October 26, 2012 Filing 464 REPLY to Response to Motion re 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Wick, # 2 Exhibit Responses & Objections to Request for Production, # 3 Exhibit Responses & Objections to Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit Correspondence to counsel, # 5 Exhibit Correspondence to counsel, # 6 Exhibit E-mail between counsel, # 7 Exhibit Transcript of hearing)(Campbell, Dennis)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting 462 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 462 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law, 460 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Replies due by 10/26/2012. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 10/25/2012. (mno)
October 24, 2012 Filing 462 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law, 460 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
October 24, 2012 Filing 461 NOTICE by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White of Change of Firm Affiliation (Dominguez, Manuel)
October 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Replies due by 10/25/2012. (ch1)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 459 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 459 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 10/17/2012. (ch1)
October 16, 2012 Filing 459 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply Memorandum re 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law ( Responses due by 11/2/2012), MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
October 12, 2012 Filing 458 RESPONSE in Opposition re 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Response by Non-Party) filed by Baron & Budd, P.C.. (Maderal, Francisco)
October 9, 2012 Filing 457 RESPONSE in Opposition re 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by David Kardonick. (Ku, Brian)
September 26, 2012 Filing 456 Defendant's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint - Mason County West Virginia, # 2 Exhibit Complaint - First Circuit State of Hawaii, # 3 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Letter to Counsel, # 5 Exhibit Letter to Robert Wick, # 6 Exhibit Temporary Restraing Order, # 7 Exhibit Declaration of Robert D. Wick)(Campbell, Dennis)
September 10, 2012 Filing 455 RESPONSE in Opposition re 452 Cross MOTION to Strike 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trevor Grant. (ail)
August 17, 2012 Filing 454 NOTICE of filing Letter to the Court by Jonathan T Marr (ail)
August 6, 2012 Filing 453 MEMORANDUM in Support re 452 Cross MOTION to Strike 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Mr. Grant's Request for Summary Judgment by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Dennis)
August 6, 2012 Filing 452 Cross MOTION to Strike 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 8/23/2012), MOTION to Dismiss 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Campbell, Dennis)
July 20, 2012 Filing 451 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Trevor Grant. Responses due by 8/6/2012 (jua)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER of DISMISSAL by USCA pursuant to Apppellant's motions to dismiss their respective appeals voluntarily with prejudice due to settlement, with costs and fees to be borne as agreed by the parties; re 389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tom Blanchard, 398 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carla Victoria Diaz, 395 Notice of Appeal, filed by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte, 392 Notice of Appeal,, filed by September Katje, Tom Blanchard, 404 Notice of Appeal, filed by Katie Sibley, 393 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Miller, 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by William H. McWhorter, 399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Margaret E. Wheeler, 401 Notice of Appeal, filed by Clark Hampe. USCA# 11-14538-AA (mc)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER of DISMISSAL by USCA for want of prosecution because the appellant Trevor Grant has failed to file an appellant's brief and record excerpts within the time fixed by the rules. This appeal for Appellant Trevor Grant was treated as dimissed on 4/24/2012; re 387 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant. USCA# 11-14538-AA (mc)
April 2, 2012 Filing 448 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 444 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. US Mail returned for: return to sender insufficient address unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided.US mail returned for Pamela Whiteside First return/attempt (rb)
March 29, 2012 Filing 447 NOTICE by Jacqueline M. Sorensen (cbr)
March 26, 2012 Filing 446 NOTICE by Carl Ribbeck (cbr)
March 12, 2012 Filing 445 CLAIM by Rita A Antonio. (cbr)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting 439 Motion for payment from the Settlement Fund. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/9/2012. (ch1)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying 406 Motion for Bond. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 2/6/2012. (ch1)
February 4, 2012 Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 11-01-11 by Carla Diaz has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re 398 Notice of Appeal, 410 Transcript Information Form. (gpz)
February 4, 2012 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Intervene held on 04-25-11 before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler, 1-43 pages, re: 398 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2012. (gpz)
January 18, 2012 Filing 440 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 398 Notice of Appeal, 410 Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript 02-17-12. (gpz)
January 17, 2012 Filing 439 Plaintiff's MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief: Release of Settlement Funds by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
December 29, 2011 Filing 438 RESPONSE to 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Trevor Grant. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (jua)
December 13, 2011 Filing 437 USCA Appeal Fees received on 12/13/2011 in the amount of $455.00 receipt number FLS100029887 re 389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tom Blanchard, 392 Notice of Appeal, filed by September Katje, Tom Blanchard (mc)
December 8, 2011 Filing 436 Letter to the Court by Carl Ribbeck (jua)
December 8, 2011 Filing 435 RESPONSE to Motion re 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Katie Sibley. Replies due by 12/19/2011. (System updated) (jua)
November 29, 2011 Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Katie Sibley re 404 Notice of Appeal. Other, Hearing 9/9/2011 transcript(s) ordered. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (mc)
November 22, 2011 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT of Fairness hearing held on 09/09/2011 before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler, 1-56 pages, re: 401 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Larry Herr, 305-523-5290 / Larry_Herr@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2012. (lh)
November 21, 2011 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Margaret E. Wheeler re 399 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (mc)
November 18, 2011 Filing 431 REPLY to Response to Motion re 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by David Kardonick. (Ku, Brian)
November 14, 2011 Filing 430 USCA Appeal Fees received on 11/14/2011 in the amount of $455.00 receipt number FLS100028542 re 393 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Miller (mc)
November 14, 2011 Filing 429 RESPONSE in Opposition re 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte. (Weinstein, Matt)
November 14, 2011 Filing 428 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 398 Notice of Appeal, 410 Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Arrangements not made for payment. (gpz)
November 10, 2011 Filing 427 RESPONSE/REPLY to 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond by William H. McWhorter. (Bacharach, N.)
November 10, 2011 Filing 426 RESPONSE in Opposition re 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Tom Blanchard. (Sweeney, Patrick)
November 10, 2011 Filing 425 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond to District Court (Sweeney, Patrick)
November 10, 2011 Filing 424 RESPONSE to 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Margaret E. Wheeler. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (System updated)(jua)
November 10, 2011 Filing 423 RESPONSE in Opposition re 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by September Katje. (Brown, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2011 Filing 422 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number FLS100028395 re 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by William H. McWhorter (mc)
November 9, 2011 Filing 421 RESPONSE in Opposition Re. 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond filed by Carla Victoria Diaz. (ar2)
November 8, 2011 Filing 420 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 404 Notice of Appeal, filed by Katie Sibley. Date received by USCA: 10/24/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 419 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 401 Notice of Appeal, filed by Clark Hampe. Date received by USCA: 10/21/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 418 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Margaret E. Wheeler. Date received by USCA: 10/21/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 417 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 398 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carla Victoria Diaz. Date received by USCA: 10/21/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 416 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 395 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte. Date received by USCA: 10/21/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 415 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 396 Notice of Appeal, filed by William H. McWhorter. Date received by USCA: 10/21/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 414 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 393 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Miller. Date received by USCA: 10/17/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 8, 2011 Filing 413 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tom Blanchard, 392 Notice of Appeal, filed by September Katje, Tom Blanchard. Date received by USCA: 10/17/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (mc)
November 7, 2011 Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by William H. McWhorter re 396 Notice of Appeal,. Hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by N. Albert Bacharach, Jr.. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Bacharach, N.)
October 31, 2011 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Clark Hampe re 401 Notice of Appeal. Other 9/9/2011 transcript(s) ordered. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (mc)
October 31, 2011 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Carla Victoria Diaz re 398 Notice of Appeal. Other 4/25/2011 and 9/9/2011 transcript(s) ordered. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (mc)
October 28, 2011 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte re 395 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Weinstein, Matt)
October 28, 2011 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Steven Miller re 393 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (cqs)
October 26, 2011 Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Tom Blanchard, September Katje re 392 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (cqs)
October 26, 2011 Filing 406 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Objectors to Post Appeal Bond by David Kardonick. Responses due by 11/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
October 26, 2011 Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Tom Blanchard, September Katje re 392 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Sweeney, Patrick)
October 19, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 404 Notice of Appeal (mc)
October 19, 2011 Filing 403 NOTICE by Beverly SMH O'Neil (abe).
October 17, 2011 Filing 404 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Katie Sibley re 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case. Filing fee $455.00, receipt number FLS100027124. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (mc)
October 17, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 401 Notice of Appeal, (hh)
October 17, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 399 Notice of Appeal, (hh)
October 17, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 398 Notice of Appeal, (hh)
October 17, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 396 Notice of Appeal, (cqs)
October 14, 2011 Filing 402 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 27010 re 401 Notice of Appeal, filed by Clark Hampe (hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 401 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Clark Hampe as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case, Filing Fee $ 455.00, receipt number 27010. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 400 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 27008 re 399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Margaret E. Wheeler (hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 399 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Margaret E. Wheeler as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case, Filing Fee $ 455.00, receipt number 27008. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 398 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Carla Victoria Diaz as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case, Filing Fee $ 455.00, receipt number 27009. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Attachments: # 1 noa receipt)(hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 397 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 27022 re 395 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte (hh)
October 14, 2011 Filing 396 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case by William H. McWhorter Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Bacharach, N.)Text Modified on 10/17/2011 (cqs). Fee- Not Paid
October 14, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 395 Notice of Appeal,, (cqs)
October 14, 2011 Filing 395 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeal statement, # 2 final judgment appealed from)(Weinstein, Matt Fee- Not Paid, Text Modified on 10/14/2011 (cqs).
October 14, 2011 Filing 394 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Trevor Grant re 387 Notice of Appeal,. Motion to Appear transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by K. Trevor Grant, Pro Se. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (cqs)
October 13, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 393 Notice of Appeal, (cqs)
October 13, 2011 Filing 393 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case by Steven Miller Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. Fee- Not Paid (cqs)
October 12, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 392 Notice of Appeal, (cqs)
October 12, 2011 Filing 392 NOTICE OF APPEAL(for image see DE# 389 Notice of Appeal) as to 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case by Tom Blanchard, September Katje Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. Fee- Not Paid (redocketed to correct linkage to parties) (cqs)Text Modified on 10/12/2011 (cqs).
October 12, 2011 Filing 391 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 387 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant. Date received by USCA: 10/3/2011. USCA Case Number: 11-14538-H. (cqs)
October 12, 2011 Filing 390 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number FLS100026795 re 387 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevor Grant (cqs)
October 12, 2011 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Tom Blanchard and September Katje, Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Sweeney, Patrick) Text Modified on 10/12/2011 (cqs).
October 4, 2011 Filing 388 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case. US Mail returned for: SABOREE GARDHARI . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (lbc)
September 29, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 387 Notice of Appeal (mc)
September 29, 2011 Filing 387 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Trevor Grant re 384 Judgment, Order Dismissing Case. Filing fee $(NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (mc)
September 23, 2011 Filing 386 Notice by Janet W. Sullivan asking to be withdrawn from case. (jcy)
September 19, 2011 Filing 385 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 365 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 358 Bar Letter. US Mail returned for: return to sender no such number. unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided.US Mail returned for Saboree GarghariSecond return/attempt (rb)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 9/16/2011. (ail)
September 16, 2011 Filing 383 Letter to the Court by Mary Click (yha)
September 16, 2011 Filing 382 Letter to the Court by Jonathan T Marr (yha)
September 16, 2011 Filing 381 Letter to the Court by Carl Ribbeck (yha)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER Granting Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 9/14/2011. (ail)
September 9, 2011 Filing 379 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler: Fairness Hearing held on 9/9/2011. PARTICIPANTS: Plaintiffs' Counsel - Allen Carney; Bruce Rogow; Randall Pullian; Conlee Whiteley; Richard Golomb; Ruben Honik; Ryan Casey; Brian Ku. Defendants' Counsel - Robert Wick. Counsel for Objectors Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte and Laura Fortman - Paul M. Kade; Matt Weinstein. Counsel for Objector William McWhorter - Theodore M. Goldberg for N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. The Court APPROVES the request to extend the deadline for submitting a claim on the Settlement Fund through and including September 9, 2011. Court Reporter: Larry Herr, 305-523-5290 / Larry_Herr@flsd.uscourts.gov (ail)
September 8, 2011 Filing 378 MEMORANDUM in Support re 351 Response/Reply (Other) Objections by William H. McWhorter. (Bacharach, N.)
September 8, 2011 Filing 377 NOTICE by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. of Filing Corrected Proposed Final Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
September 6, 2011 Filing 376 MOTION to Withdraw Document 339 Response/Reply (Other) by Cindy Barginear. Responses due by 9/23/2011 (yha)
September 6, 2011 Filing 375 CLAIM FORM by Reby Patterson (yha)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 372 Motion to Quash. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 9/2/2011. (yc)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 371 Motion to Quash. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 9/2/2011. (yc)
September 1, 2011 Filing 372 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash by William H. McWhorter. (Attachments: # 1 SUBPONEA)(Bacharach, N.)
August 30, 2011 Filing 371 MOTION to Quash Depositions by Cindy Barginear, Katie Sibley. (yha)
August 30, 2011 Filing 370 MOTION to Withdraw 339 OBJECTION to Settlement by Daniel Sibley. Responses due by 9/16/2011 (yha)
August 29, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 369 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 29, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 368 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 26, 2011 Filing 367 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 4-A, # 6 Exhibit 4-B, # 7 Exhibit 4-C, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
August 26, 2011 Filing 366 MEMORANDUM in Support of Final Approval by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Campbell, Dennis)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 362 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 363 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 8/26/2011. (ail)
August 25, 2011 Filing 364 Letter to the Court by Janet W. Sullivan (yha)
August 25, 2011 Filing 363 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
August 25, 2011 Filing 362 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Lead Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Settlement by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ku, Brian)
August 23, 2011 Filing 361 OBJECTION by Jon Marr re 20 Settlement Agreement (yha)
August 23, 2011 Filing 360 OBJECTION by Tom Blanchard re 20 Settlement Agreement (yha)
August 23, 2011 Filing 359 Letter to the Court by Zoila Escobar (yha)
August 23, 2011 Filing 358 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Thomas L. Cox, Jr., mailing date Augustw 23, 2011. (ksa)
August 19, 2011 Filing 357 NOTICE by September Katje re 16 Stipulation, 20 Settlement Agreement Objections to Settlement and Award of Attorney Fees (Brown, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2011 Filing 356 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M. Brown on behalf of September Katje (Brown, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2011 Filing 355 NOTICE by Laura Fortman, Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte re 16 Stipulation, 354 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Weinstein, Matt)
August 19, 2011 Filing 354 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 194 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard Golomb, Ruben Honik, James Allen Carney and Curtis L. Bowman. Filing Fee $ 300.00. Receipt # 17680/17681., 298 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, 18 Plaintiff's MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation,Plaintiff's MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation, Objection to Settlement and Award of Attorney fees filed by Douglas Paluczak, Chris Schulte, Laura Fortman. (Weinstein, Matt)
August 19, 2011 Filing 353 Letter to the Court by Manijeh Sabi (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 352 NOTICE by Tom Blanchard re 16 Stipulation, 20 Settlement Agreement Objection to Proposed Settlement (Brown, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2011 Filing 351 RESPONSE/REPLY to 23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,, Objection to Preliminarily-Approved Settlement by William H. McWhorter. (Bacharach, N.)
August 19, 2011 Filing 350 Letter to the Court by Michael T. Schroeder (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 349 Claim Form by Victor F Capurso (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 348 Letter to the Court by Christopher Jestak Beittenmiller (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 347 Letter to the Court by Raymond E. Johnson (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 346 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M. Brown on behalf of Tom Blanchard (Brown, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2011 Filing 345 Letter to the Court by Margaret E. Wheeler (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 344 Letter to the Court by Dennis Everette (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 343 Letter to the Court by Carla Victoria Diaz (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 342 Letter to the Court by Susan M Borden (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 341 Letter to the Court by Clark Hampe (yha)
August 19, 2011 Filing 340 MOTION to Intervene and Notice of Appearance by William H. McWhorter. (Bacharach, N.)
August 18, 2011 Filing 339 OBJECTION to 20 Settlement Agreement by Katie Sibley, Daniel Sibley, Cindy Barginear. (yha)
August 18, 2011 Filing 338 Letter to the Court by Saboree Gardhari (yha)
August 18, 2011 Filing 337 Letter to the Court by Kelly Erving (yha)
August 18, 2011 Filing 336 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Tse-Hua Ku (Ku, Brian)
August 17, 2011 Filing 335 Letter to the Court by Steven Miller (yha)
August 17, 2011 Filing 334 NOTICE to the Court by David C. Disher (System updated) (jua)
August 16, 2011 Filing 333 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Andrew Soukup. by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Shari M Pace (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
August 16, 2011 Filing 332 Letter to the Court by Trevor Grant (yha)
August 12, 2011 Filing 331 NOTICE to the Court by Diana K. Buck (System updated) (jua)
August 11, 2011 Filing 330 Letter to the Court by Nancy L Sauter (yha)
August 11, 2011 Filing 329 Letter to the Court by Melanie Foster (yha)
August 11, 2011 Filing 328 Letter to the Court by Robert Dickerson (yha)
August 11, 2011 Filing 327 Claim Form by Patsy M Loga, Kenneth D. Wright (yha)
August 10, 2011 Filing 326 Letter to the Court by Gordon G. Hill (yha)
August 10, 2011 Filing 325 Letter to the Court by Colleen Smith-Kyles (yha)
August 10, 2011 Filing 324 Letter to the Court by Stephanie L Diers (yha)
August 10, 2011 Filing 323 Letter to the Court by Cynthia M. Bracken (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 322 Letter to the Court by Angel M. Torres (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 321 Letter to the Court by Pamela Whiteside (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 320 Letter to the Court by Shari M Pace (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 319 Letter to the Court by Leonard Vidmar (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 318 Letter to the Court by Humberto Colon-Rivera (yha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 317 Letter to the Court by Salinda Mistretta (yha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 316 Letter to the Court by Buena Wright (yha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 315 Letter/Objection to Settlement by Michael J. Flynn, Jr (yha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 314 Letter to the Court by Brenda Wright (yha)
August 4, 2011 Filing 313 Letter to the Court/Request for Exclusion by Catherine Eleazer(yha)
August 4, 2011 Filing 312 Letter to the Court by Walter Harwood (yha)
August 4, 2011 Filing 311 Letter to the Court by Patricia R. Jacobs (yha)
August 2, 2011 Filing 310 Letter to the Court by Cindy Nunn (jua)
August 1, 2011 Filing 309 Letter to the Court by Aggie Vutaj (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 308 Letter to the Court by Irma Badge (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 307 Letter to the Court by Alice Davis (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 306 NOTICE/Claim Form by Donald T. Murphy (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE/Claim Form by William Koths (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 304 Letter to the Court by David Ford (yha)
August 1, 2011 Filing 303 Letter to the Court by Javier Cervantes (yha)
July 29, 2011 Filing 302 Letter to the Court by Victor Belanger (yha)
July 28, 2011 Filing 301 Letter to the Court by Stanley R Manske (yha)
July 28, 2011 Filing 300 Letter to the Court by Robert G Champagne (yha)
July 28, 2011 Filing 299 Letter to the Court by Evelyn Clanson (yha)
July 28, 2011 Filing 298 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by David Kardonick. Responses due by 8/15/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
July 25, 2011 Filing 297 Letter to the Court by Dolores J. Tronti (yha)
July 25, 2011 Filing 296 Letter to the Court by Maria Abullhay (yha)
July 25, 2011 Filing 295 Letter to the Court by Catherine B. Brackett (yha)
July 25, 2011 Filing 294 Letter to the Court by Catharine R. West (yha)
July 21, 2011 Filing 293 Letter to the Court by Rosemarie Venkatram (yha)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 285 Motion FOR DISTRIBUTION FORM SETTLEMENT FUND FOR THE ADDITIONAL COSTS OF NOTICE. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 7/21/2011. (ch1)
July 20, 2011 Filing 291 Letter to the Court by Karen Irwin (yha)
July 15, 2011 Filing 290 Letter from Elena S. Voykhansky (drz)
July 7, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. re 285 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF of Non-Opposition (Campbell, Dennis)
July 6, 2011 Filing 288 Letter to the Court by Mary Gawrys (yha)
July 5, 2011 Filing 287 Letter to the Court by Glenda L. Taylor (yha)
July 5, 2011 Filing 286 Letter to the Court by Morgan Cadeem (yha)
July 1, 2011 Filing 285 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ku, Brian)
June 28, 2011 Filing 284 Letter to the Court by Maria Sandoval (yha)
June 27, 2011 Filing 283 Letter to the Court by Ann Moomau (yha)
June 27, 2011 Filing 282 Letter to the Court by Dorothy Brantley (yha)
June 27, 2011 Filing 281 Letter to the Court by Peter Morrow (yha)
June 20, 2011 Filing 280 Letter to the Court by Brenda Wenzel (yha)
June 20, 2011 Filing 279 Letter to the Court by Clyde Cook (yha)
June 20, 2011 Filing 278 Letter to the Court by Cindy Nunn (yha)
June 17, 2011 Filing 277 Letter to the Court by Betty Green (yha)
June 16, 2011 Filing 276 Letter to the Court by Janet Sullivan (yha)
June 15, 2011 Filing 275 Letter to the Court by Cindy Nunn (yha)
June 14, 2011 Filing 274 Letter to the Court by Billi Carwile-Campanella (yha)
June 14, 2011 Filing 273 Letter to the Court by Arlene Hodges (yha)
June 14, 2011 Filing 272 Letter to the Court by Betty Eskine, Preston Eskine (yha)
June 9, 2011 Filing 271 Letter to the Court by J. Morris (yha)
June 7, 2011 Filing 270 Letter to the Court by Bobby Baggarley (yha)
May 31, 2011 Filing 269 Letter to the Court by Patrick Sheehan (yha)
May 31, 2011 Filing 268 Letter to the Court by Cheryl B. (yha)
May 31, 2011 Filing 267 Letter to the Court by Naomi Dickson (yha)
May 31, 2011 Filing 266 Letter to the Court by Cindy Nunn (yha)
May 27, 2011 Filing 265 Letter to the Court by Rufus Perry (yha)
May 27, 2011 Filing 264 Letter to the Court by Kimberly Gunderlach (yha)
May 26, 2011 Filing 263 Letter to the Court by Marv Watson (yha)
May 26, 2011 Filing 262 RESPONSE/REPLY/Objections to Settlement by Carl A Cole. (yha)
May 26, 2011 Filing 261 Letter to the Court by Louise Pryor (yha)
May 26, 2011 Filing 260 Letter to the Court by Irma Morales (yha)
May 26, 2011 Filing 259 Letter to the Court by Lillie Taylor (yha)
May 25, 2011 Filing 258 Letter to the Court by Virginia L. Baldwin (yha)
May 25, 2011 Filing 257 Letter to the Court by Mary Bruins (yha)
May 25, 2011 Filing 256 Letter to the Court by Stuart Herman (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 255 Letter to the Court by David Gilbert (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 254 Letter to the Court by Diana Lohr (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 253 Letter to the Court by Chlorinea Jamison (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 252 Letter to the Court by Richard Jamison (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 251 Letter to the Court by Pavel Guller (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 249 Letter to the Court by Jacqueline M. Sorensen (yha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 248 Letter to the Court by Steven Feinzig(yha)
May 20, 2011 Filing 250 Letter to the Court by Brenda Denney (yha)
May 19, 2011 Filing 247 Letter to the Court by Sidney L. Creamer (yha)
May 18, 2011 Filing 246 Letter to the Court by Nancy Auld (yha)
May 18, 2011 Filing 245 Letter to the Court by Coralie Smith (yha)
May 16, 2011 Filing 244 RESPONSE/REPLY/Objection to 20 Settlement Agreement by Marilyn Beardsley. (yha)
May 16, 2011 Filing 243 Letter to the Court by Mary Gilmore (yha)
May 13, 2011 Filing 242 Letter to the Court by Walker Estate (yha)
May 13, 2011 Filing 241 Letter to the Court by Jewel Springfield (yha)
May 12, 2011 Filing 240 Letter to the Court by Jacqueline Rockett (yha)
May 12, 2011 Filing 239 Letter to the Court by Deloris Scaife-Higgins (yha)
May 12, 2011 Filing 238 Letter to the Court by Regina Williams (yha)
May 11, 2011 Filing 237 Letter from Barbara Creamer (ots)
May 11, 2011 Filing 236 Letter from Gilda Lujan (ots)
May 10, 2011 Filing 235 Letter to the Court by Charles Ford (yha)
May 10, 2011 Filing 234 Letter to the Court by Donald Schaefer (yha)
May 10, 2011 Filing 233 Letter to the Court by Roberta Kwosek (yha)
May 10, 2011 Filing 232 RESPONSE/REPLY/Objections to Settlement by Jennie Semple. (yha)
May 6, 2011 Filing 231 Letter from Barbara Spencer (ots)
May 6, 2011 Filing 230 Letter from AW Garcia (ots)
May 4, 2011 Filing 229 Letter from Marcel Davis (ots)
May 3, 2011 Filing 228 Letter from Jackie Popovich (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 227 Letter from Vera Mabon-Kane (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 226 Letter from Jesse G. Ramos (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 225 Letter from Elosie Hoskins (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 224 Letter from Betty Curtis (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 223 Letter from Antelmo Gomez (ots)
May 2, 2011 Filing 222 Letter from Brandy Dague (ots)
April 29, 2011 Filing 221 Letter from E.J.M (ots)
April 29, 2011 Filing 220 Letter from J. Solka (ots)
April 29, 2011 Filing 219 Letter from Brandy Summers (ots)
April 28, 2011 Filing 218 Letter/Notification of Exclusion from Dennis Nona (ls)
April 28, 2011 Filing 217 CLAIM by John Rice. (ls)
April 27, 2011 Filing 216 Letter from Frances Dearman (ots)
April 27, 2011 Filing 215 Letter from Nancy Paternico (ots)
April 27, 2011 Filing 214 Letter from Stephanie Jean Schutte (ots)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/26/2011. (ch1)
April 25, 2011 Filing 212 Letter from James Easterling (ots)
April 25, 2011 Filing 211 Letter from Thomas M Wilber (ots)
April 25, 2011 Filing 210 Letter from Jennifer Easterling (ots)
April 25, 2011 Filing 209 Letter from Betty J. Giaze (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 208 Letter from Sherry Smith (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 207 Letter from Ann Bray (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 206 Letter from Marlon Rupe (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 205 Letter from Gerald E. Selk (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 204 Letter from Bertha Rogue (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 203 Letter from Vera Bishop (lk)
April 25, 2011 Filing 202 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2011 re 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by Harold Smith, Ennis White, Warren Prince, David Lundy, Trudy Smith, George Cleaver. Oral arguments heard, Ruling deferred, Order to follow. Parties Present: Curtis L. Bowman, Esq.; James Allen Carney, Esq.; Ruben Honik, Esq. - counsel for the Plaintiff; Kevin S. Landau, Esq., Manuel Juan Dominguez, Esq., Steven A. Owings, Esq., Brent Walker, Esq., Brett Cebulash, Esq. - counsel for the Intervenor Plaintiff's; Robert Wick, Esq. - counsel for the Defendant. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov (tas)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 194 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/25/11. (tas)
April 22, 2011 Filing 200 Letter from Joyce Campbell (ots)
April 22, 2011 Filing 199 Letter from V. L. Scope (ots)
April 22, 2011 Filing 198 Letter from Bill Fry (ots)
April 22, 2011 Filing 197 Letter from Ann Johnson (ots)
April 22, 2011 Filing 196 Letter from Edwin B. Spievack (ots)
April 22, 2011 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Intervene, 31 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of filed by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Ronald A. Bertino)(Ku, Brian)
April 21, 2011 Filing 194 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard Golomb, Ruben Honik, James Allen Carney and Curtis L. Bowman. Filing Fee $ 300.00. Receipt # 17680/17681. (ksa)
April 21, 2011 Filing 192 Letter from Joan Holst (ots)
April 21, 2011 Filing 189 Letter from Hach Saong (ots)
April 21, 2011 Filing 187 Letter from T.W (ots)
April 21, 2011 Filing 185 Letter from Cheri Hayes (ots)
April 21, 2011 Filing 181 Letter from Paul H. (ots)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 156 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/21/2011. (ch1)
April 20, 2011 Filing 193 Letter from Jocelyn Balan (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 191 Letter from Lou Guyton (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 190 Letter from Lou Guyton (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 188 Letter from Est of Volker (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 186 Letter from Phyllis Mochan (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 184 Letter from Raymond Greenwood (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 183 Letter from Robin Reidel (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 182 Letter from Patt Manwawing (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 180 Letter from Dianne Hufford (ots)
April 20, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S. Rogow on behalf of David Kardonick (Rogow, Bruce)
April 19, 2011 Filing 178 Letter from B. Dunn (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 177 Letter from Marie Sacco (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 176 Letter from John Edwards (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 175 Letter from Brenda L. Williams (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 174 Letter from Wilfredo Candelario (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 173 Letter from Mamie Hicks (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 172 Letter from Megan Sitzberger (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 171 Letter from Ivan Nelson (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 170 Letter from Richard Drake (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 169 Letter from A.Jones (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 168 Letter from Sophie S. Levitt (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 167 Letter from Joan Cook (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 166 Letter from Anne Pellett (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 164 Letter from Michael Emerson (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 163 Letter from Janae Akeem (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 162 Letter from Rosemary Lovisa (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 161 Letter from Dale Sandry (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 160 Letter from Evelyn McLain (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 159 Letter from Connie Heim (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 158 Letter from Nancy Loyd (ots)
April 19, 2011 Filing 157 Letter from Gayle C. Ford (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Steven A. Owings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17485. (ksa)
April 18, 2011 Filing 155 Letter from Hazel L. Jones (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 154 Letter from Joe Ferguson (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 153 Letter from Sharifa Mohammed (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 152 Letter from T.Keefe (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 151 Letter from Albert Swafford (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 150 Letter from Sebastian Peralta (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 138 Letter from David Johnson (Deceased) (ots)
April 18, 2011 Filing 137 Letter from Alexander Puckett (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 149 Letter from Bernadine McGowan (dj)
April 15, 2011 Filing 148 Letter from Virginia M. Ritter (dj)
April 15, 2011 Filing 147 Letter from Lorraine McFarland (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 146 Letter from Steve Polk (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 145 Letter from Belinda S. Solomon (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 144 Letter from Mariene Spivey (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 143 Letter from Mary Kessler (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 142 Letter from Angela A. Sienko (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 141 Letter from Ray & Cathy Carroll (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 140 Letter from M. Sonerholm (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 139 Letter from Cathleen Hotaling (ots)
April 15, 2011 Filing 128 Letter from Fred Helmcamp (ots) (Main Document 128 replaced on 4/15/2011) (ots).
April 14, 2011 Filing 136 Letter from Sue Kilgore (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 135 Letter from Carlos Sales (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 134 Letter from Ron Moran (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 133 Letter from Elearlor N (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 132 Letter from Thelma Kelley (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 131 Letter from Janet W. (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 130 Letter from Charlotte Morrell (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 129 Letter from Nicholas R. Malicoat (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 127 Letter from Merium Kilgore (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 126 Letter from Dana Thompson (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 125 Letter from Catherine C. Carroll (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 124 Letter from Jean Salanello (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 123 Letter from Melanie Bodily (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 122 Letter from Janez E. Kessler (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 121 Letter from Harold Felter (ots)
April 14, 2011 Filing 120 Letter from Vaneita Null (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 119 Letter from Shirley R Maxwell (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 118 Letter from Yon S. Groebner (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 117 Letter from Bertha Ernst (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 116 Letter from Betsy Hunt (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 115 Letter from Howard Lipscomb (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 114 Letter from Carolyn Clarkson (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 113 Letter from Gary Clarkson (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 112 Letter from Marianna Taylor (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 111 Letter (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 110 Letter from Patricia Cole (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 109 Letter from Susan O (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 108 Letter from Beverly Andrews (ots)
April 13, 2011 Filing 107 Letter from Kathleen Kippley (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 106 Letter from Mari Butler (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 105 Letter from Earl Weaver (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 104 Letter from Perry Green (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 103 Letter from Donald Sands (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 102 Letter from V Mariani (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 101 Letter from Helen B. Wolk (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 100 Letter from Dennis Jordan (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 99 Letter from Georgia Nemeth (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 98 Letter from Whitney Cox (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 97 Letter from Norma Howard (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 96 Letter from Virgil Wibbens (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 95 Letter from Linda L. Lewis (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 94 Letter from Jane Foerster (ots)
April 12, 2011 Filing 93 Letter from Hershel James (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 92 Letter from Florence Campas (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 91 Letter from John B. K (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 90 Letter from Victor Capurso (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 89 Letter from Willie Davis Jr (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 88 Letter from Jack Davis (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 87 Letter from Viginia M. Shively (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 86 Letter from Jean Redmon (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 85 Letter from Randy and Caroline Talley (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 84 Letter from Louis Perrone (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 83 Letter from Clemon L. Montgomery (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 82 Letter from Helene Conaway (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 81 Letter from Benjamin Moon (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 80 Letter from Victoria Shively (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Intervene, 31 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of [Corrected] filed by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Dominguez, Manuel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 74 Letter from Bonnie Schessdman (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Intervene, 31 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of filed by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Dominguez, Manuel)
April 11, 2011 Filing 69 Letter (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 68 Letter from Lynn C. Grant (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 67 Letter from J. Simmons (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 66 Letter from Rollin Woodruff (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 65 Letter from Dorothy Phyfisher (ots)
April 11, 2011 Filing 63 Clerks Notice to Filer re 60 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
April 8, 2011 Filing 78 Letter from Brenda Dozia (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 77 Letter from Melvyn Fradkin (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 76 Letter from Pamela Barkley (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 75 Letter from Roslin Gay Champin (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 73 Letter from Karen Stinson (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 72 Letter from Harris T. Herron (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 70 Letter from Beatrice Freeman (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 64 Letter from Andrew T. Kase (ots)
April 8, 2011 Filing 62 Docketed entry in error.(lk) Modified text on 4/11/2011 (lk).
April 8, 2011 Filing 60 Motion to withdraw as attorney-William B. Lewis by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White (Dominguez, Manuel) Modified event and text on 4/11/2011 (lk).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/8/2011. (ch1)
April 7, 2011 Filing 58 Letter from Exclusion from Tammy Dodson (dj)
April 7, 2011 Filing 57 Letter from Exclusion from James Sprouse (dj)
April 7, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , An Omnibus Reply and A Three-Day Extension To File The Omnibus Reply Brief by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Manuel)
April 6, 2011 Filing 55 Letter re: Exclusion from Kardonick Settlement from Karen E. Wolff (ls)
April 4, 2011 Filing 54 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 30 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2011 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler. (ch1)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/4/2011. (ch1)
April 1, 2011 Filing 61 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Orders 2010-145 and 2011-18 to Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra. (dm)
April 1, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION for Hearing re 32 Memorandum, 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Replies due by 4/11/2011. (Campbell, Dennis)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File within (3) days of the deadline opposition to objectors' Motion to Intervene. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/1/2011. (ag)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 4/1/2011. (ag)
March 31, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew Soukup. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16603. (ksa)
March 31, 2011 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Campbell, Dennis)
March 30, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Manuel Juan Dominguez (Dominguez, Manuel)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 41 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/30/2011. (tas)
March 29, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Hearing re 32 Memorandum, 30 MOTION to Intervene by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Dominguez, Manuel)
March 28, 2011 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Intervene, 31 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of filed by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Ku, Brian)
March 28, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Juan Dominguez on behalf of George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White (Dominguez, Manuel)
March 28, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Striking 29 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Harold Smith, Ennis White, Warren Prince, David Lundy, Trudy Smith, George Cleaver by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White (Dominguez, Manuel)
March 28, 2011 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Response to Motion to Intervene by David Kardonick. (Mussman, Louis) Modified on 3/28/2011 (ls).
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/25/2011. (ch1)
March 25, 2011 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Motion to Intervene with Supporting Memorandum by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
March 24, 2011 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re 35 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. Replies due by 4/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, William)
March 23, 2011 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION to Intervene by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
March 22, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Kevin Landau. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9628. (ksa)
March 22, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Brett Cebulash. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9627. (ksa)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 3/22/11. (tas)
March 21, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Marc L. Godino. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9620. (ksa)
March 9, 2011 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Intervene by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. See image at DE 31 (lk)
March 9, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Lewis, William)
March 9, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Intervene by George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White. (Lewis, William)
March 9, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Lewis on behalf of George Cleaver, David Lundy, Warren Prince, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Ennis White (Lewis, William)
March 9, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Lewis on behalf of Ennis White, George Cleaver, Harold Smith, Trudy Smith, Warren Prince, David Lundy (Lewis, William)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Cecil Gilbert terminated. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 2/17/2011. (yc)
February 16, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy William Alters on behalf of David Kardonick (Alters, Jeremy)
February 14, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Robert C. Gilbert. by David Kardonick. Responses due by 3/3/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Robert)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORRECTED ORDER re 23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Hearing, as to 23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Hearing. Fairness Hearing set for 9/9/2011 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 2/11/2011. (ch1)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Conditionally Cerftifying a Settlement Class, Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Approving Notice Plan 17 Motion Settlement; 18 Motion Settlement; 19 Motion for Hearing.Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 2/2/2011. (ots)
February 1, 2011 Filing 22 *Endorsed Order. THIS CAUSE is scheduled for a status conference on March 14, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. This conference will be held at Federal Courthouse Square, Courtroom 9, Ninth Floor, 30l North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. The purpose of the conference is to review the Joint Scheduling Report filed by the parties and to enter their attached Proposed Order, as agreed upon and prepared by the parties.The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by March 4, 2011. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the parties shall select a certified mediator under Local Rule 16.2.B and shall schedule a time, date and place for mediation. In the event the parties cannot agree on a certified mediator, they shall advise the Clerk and the Clerk shall designate a certified mediator under a blind rotation system. ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/4/2011, Status Conference set for 3/14/2011 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler.) Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 2/1/11. (ch1)
December 22, 2010 Filing 21 Clerks Notice to Filer re 16 Stipulation. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk, See DE 20 . It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (lk)
December 21, 2010 Filing 20 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Class action) by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., David Kardonick. See image at DE 16 (lk)
December 21, 2010 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation, 18 Plaintiff's MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation,Plaintiff's MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation, by David Kardonick. (Gilbert, Robert)
December 21, 2010 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation,, 16 Stipulation, by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gilbert, Robert)
December 21, 2010 Filing 17 Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 16 Stipulation, by David Kardonick. (Gilbert, Robert)
December 21, 2010 Filing 16 STIPULATION Stipulation and Agreement of Class Action Settlement by David Kardonick (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gilbert, Robert)
December 21, 2010 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed by David Kardonick.(Gilbert, Robert)
December 6, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by David Kardonick (Ku, Brian)
November 10, 2010 Filing 13 Courtesy Copy of Notice of Related Actions filed before the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation re MDL-2195. (gp)
November 10, 2010 Filing 12 STIPULATION re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Supporting Memorandum of Law MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Supporting Memorandum of Law STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., David Kardonick (Mussman, Louis)
November 1, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Supporting Memorandum of Law by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Responses due by 11/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Declaration of Marc Fink)(Campbell, Dennis)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 10/4/10. (ch1)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chase Bank USA, N.A. response due 11/12/2010; JP Morgan Chase & Co. response due 11/12/2010. Signed by Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler on 9/29/10. (ch1)
September 29, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert Wick and Keith Noreika. Filing Fee $ 150.00. Receipt # 7362. (ksa)
September 28, 2010 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Campbell, Dennis)
September 28, 2010 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Dennis)
September 24, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dennis Michael Campbell on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Campbell, Dennis)
September 8, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (ots)
September 8, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (ots)
September 8, 2010 Filing 2 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Senior Judge William M. Hoeveler (ots)
September 8, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3146271, filed by David Kardonick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s))(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kardonick v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kardonick
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?