Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Motorola subsidiary Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s patent infringement lawsuit against Apple, Inc. alleging violations of 6 patents. This is one of 3 patent infringement lawsuits that Motorola filed against Apple on October 6, 2010. A total of 18 Motorola patents were alleged to have been infringed by Apple in its hardware and software products in the 3 cases.

Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv23580
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Andrea M. Simonton
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Attorney R. Anthony Lopez; Chris Martiniak; Anupam Sharma; Winslow B. Taub; Elena M. DiMuzio and Christopher K. Eppich terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Elena DiMuzio, Christopher Eppich, R. Lopez, Chris Martiniak, Anupam Sharma, Winslow Taub. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(ls)(per DE #163)
December 17, 2012 Filing 368 Clerks Notice to Filer re (365 in 1:10-cv-23580-RNS, 151 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#153/367]. It is not necessary to refile this document. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(ls)
December 14, 2012 Filing 367 Statement of: Accused Products by Apple, Inc. re (363 in 1:10-cv-23580-RNS) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, (136 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(ls)(See Image at DE # 151 )
December 14, 2012 Filing 366 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC Amended Infringement Contentions and Statement of Accused Products (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Kruse, Regan)
December 14, 2012 Filing 365 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Apple, Inc. Statement Of Accused Products Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
December 13, 2012 Filing 364 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc. Requesting Termination of Electronic Notices Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER Granting in Part Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule. First Joint Interim Status Report due by 03/01/2013. First Mediation due by 05/31/2013. Expert Discovery due by 10/4/2013. Fact Discovery due by 7/5/2013. Second Mediation Deadline 11/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2013. Pretrial Motions (In Limine Motions/Daubert) due by 1/31/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2014. Second Joint Interim Status Report due by 11/8/2013. Calendar Call set for 4/15/2014 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Trial set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/24/2012. (See order for more details and deadlines)(jua)
October 22, 2012 Filing 362 REPLY to Response to Motion re (361 in 1:10-cv-23580-RNS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (84 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Scheduling Order,,, MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO AMEND THE PROCEDURAL SCHEDULE filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Current iPhone Models, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Current Motorola Phones for Sale, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 8/21/12 Email from Searcy to Davis, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 8/15/12 Email from Vlasis to Searcy, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 9/17/12 Email from Searcy to Vlasis, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 9/14/12 Email from Searcy to Vlasis, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 9/24/12 Email from Vlasis to Searcy, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 10/1/12 Email from Vlasis to Searcy, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 10/5/12 Email from Vlasis to Searcy, # 10 Exhibit 10 - 10/8/12 Email from Vlasis to Searcy, # 11 Exhibit 11 - 10/9/12 Email from Davis to Vlasis, # 12 Exhibit 12 - 10/11/12 Email from Vlasis to Davis, # 13 Exhibit 13 - 10/11/12 Email from Davis to Vlasis, # 14 Exhibit 14 - 10/16/12 Letter from Bonifield to Vlasis)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
October 11, 2012 Filing 361 MOTION to Amend/Correct (84 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Scheduling Order,,, MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO AMEND THE PROCEDURAL SCHEDULE by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Declining Transfer. Transferred Back to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings, Judge Patricia A. Seitz no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 7/31/2012. (jua)
July 31, 2012 Filing 359 Order Transferring Case Pursuant to Administrative Order 2011-53. This matter is hereby reassigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Patricia A. Seitz for all further proceedings, Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/31/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS (mb)
July 9, 2012 Filing 358 REPLY to Response to Motion re (97 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Change Venue filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
July 6, 2012 Attorney Christine Saunders Haskett; Robert T. Haslam; Samuel F. Ernst and Robert D. Fram terminated per DE 357 . Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Samuel Ernst, Robert Fram, Christine Haskett, Robert Haslam. (ar2) Modified text on 7/6/2012 (ar2).
July 5, 2012 Filing 357 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Covington & Burling as Counsel of Record (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Pace, Christopher)
June 26, 2012 Filing 356 RESPONSE/REPLY to (95 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 95 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
June 11, 2012 Filing 355 NOTICE by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc. re (98 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Affidavit in Support of Motion,, of Filing Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) Modified on 6/12/2012 (ls).
June 8, 2012 Filing 354 REPLY to Response to Motion re (83 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Sever filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond Pao, # 2 Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John)
May 15, 2012 Filing 353 RESPONSE/REPLY , ANSWER, and COUNTERCLAIMS to Apple Inc.'s 2nd Amended Answer and Counterclaims [DE 332 filed in 10-cv-23580-RNS] by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Kruse, Regan)
May 14, 2012 Filing 352 Order Administratively Closing 2010 Case Upon Consolidation. 1. The 2010 and 2012 cases having been consolidated, the Clerk is directed to CLOSE the 2010 case, Case No. 10-23580. All filings going forward in these cases shall bemade under the 2012 Case Number. 2. Apples Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule [ECF No. 323] in the 2010 case is DENIED AS MOOT, in light of the Courts recent Amended Scheduling Order entered in the 2012 case, which shall govern, going forward, both the 2010 and 2012 disputes for scheduling purposes. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/14/2012. (ar2)
May 14, 2012 Cases associated per DE 351 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER Consolidating Cases. (ar2)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER Consolidating Cases; Order granting 64 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Re: 347 Joint Status Report Regarding Amended Procedural Schedule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/14/2012. (Amended Scheduling Order Deadlines and Hearings set on case number 12-cv-20271-RNS only, per Chambers' instructions). (ar2)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 333 MOTION to Enforce Order Compelling Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 5/11/2012. (See Order for Details). (ar2)
May 11, 2012 Filing 349 Clerks Notice to Filer re 347 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#348]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
May 10, 2012 Filing 348 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Procedural Schedule by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. See DE 347 for image (tp)
May 10, 2012 Filing 347 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 346 Order on Motion to Vacate,, Joint Status Report Regarding Amended Procedural Schedule (Pace, Christopher)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 346 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 344 Joint Motion to Vacate Deadlines in Scheduling Order. The dates and deadlines set forth in Court's most recent Scheduling Order are hereby vacated. The parties shall report to the Court by May 10, 2012 to inform it of the status of their discussions and whether the parties have reached any agreement as to an appropriate amended procedural schedule and whether this case should be consolidated, in whole or in part, with the 2012 case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/7/2012. (jky)
May 4, 2012 Filing 345 REPLY to Response to Motion re 333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce Order Compelling Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony from Apple and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Herrera, Sujey)
May 4, 2012 Filing 344 Joint MOTION to Vacate Deadlines in Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Vacating Deadlines in Scheduling Order)(Pace, Christopher)
May 4, 2012 Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Pursuant to Apple's Sealed Motion DE 279 held on 04/19/2012 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-42 pages, Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2012. (jsn)
May 1, 2012 Filing 342 RESPONSE to Motion re 333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce Order Compelling Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony from Apple and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support Apple's Response to Motorola's Motion to Enforce Order Compelling Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony From Apple filed by Apple, Inc.. Replies due by 5/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Pace, Christopher)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 340 Motion for Extension of Time. Motorola Mobility, Inc. is given until May 16, 2012 to file its response to Apple's Motion to Amend The Procedural Schedule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/1/2012. (jky)
May 1, 2012 Filing 340 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 323 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motorola's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Apple's Motion to Amend Procedural Schedule)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 337 338 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Monica Mucchetti Eno and Stefani C. Smith are given permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Apple, Inc. in this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of all electronic filings to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in their respective Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/30/2012. (jky)
April 30, 2012 Filing 338 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stefani C. Smith. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 37866. (ksa)
April 30, 2012 Filing 337 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Monica Mucchetti Eno. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 37864. (ksa)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting 227 Sealed Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories; granting in part 285 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Documents; granting in part and denying in part 286 Sealed Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/24/2012. (ra)
April 25, 2012 Filing 335 Clerks Notice to Filer re 332 Answer to Complaint. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#334]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 24, 2012 Filing 334 Second Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(ls)(See Image at DE # 332 )
April 24, 2012 Filing 333 Plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce Order Compelling Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony from Apple and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
April 24, 2012 Filing 332 Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint for Patent Infringement by Apple, Inc..(Pace, Christopher)
April 24, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 331 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
April 24, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 330 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
April 24, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 329 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
April 23, 2012 Filing 328 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 327 Order. (nc)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER Granting 279 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer Jury Trial Demanded by Apple Inc. Apple shall file its Amended Answer in this case forthwith. The Court also vacates Judge Ungaro's Order Striking Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions [ECF No. 198]. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/19/2012. (See Order for full details) (nc)
April 19, 2012 Filing 326 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2012 re 279 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Apple Inc. APPEARANCES: Marshall M. Searcy, III, Charles K. Verhoeven, Sujey Herrera, Robert Pluta, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christine Saunders Haskett, Mark Davis, Wendy Anna Herby. Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov (jh)
April 18, 2012 Filing 325 RESPONSE/REPLY in Support of its Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 321 Motion to File Under Seal. The certain exhibits in question, relating to Apple's Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule, shall be kept on file under seal. The Clerk shall maintain the aforementioned exhibits under seal through the final resolution of the above captioned action, including during any periods of appeal taken by any party to this case, except as otherwise ordered by this Court or required by law. The Clerk shall destroy the aforementioned exhibits upon final resolution of the above captioned action, including all appeals. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/18/2012. (jky)
April 17, 2012 Filing 323 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 5/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark G. Davis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Supplement Notice of Filing Under Seal, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Procedural Schedule)(Pace, Christopher)
April 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 322 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 321 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 13, 2012 Filing 320 RESPONSE/REPLY to 292 Response/Reply (Other) Apple's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 19-22 by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Duchemin in Support of Surreply, # 2 Exhibit 1- Filed Under Seal)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Granting 311 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit 1 to John Duchemin Declaration In Support of Motorola's Surreply Under Seal by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/13/2012. (nc)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER Granting 307 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleadings pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/13/2012. (ar2)
April 11, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 317 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 316 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 315 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 314 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 313 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 312 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 311 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. This hearing is for argument on 279 Apple's Motion to Amend. (jky)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 309 Unopposed Request for Oral Argument on Apple's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. The parties are now aware of the Court's practice and philosophy of allowing reasonable accommodations in order to see that matters are resolved on the merits in the most efficient manner possible. If, despite having this knowledge, the parties are still unable to reach agreement of some kind as to Apple's Motion to Amend, then the parties shall appear for a hearing before the undersigned on April 19, 2012 in order to present argument on the Motion. If, on the other hand, the parties can reach a reasonable agreement that is fair to both sides, then the Court will approve the relief agreed upon. In the event any agreement is reached, the parties should promptly inform the Court so that the hearing may be cancelled. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/10/2012. (jky)
April 9, 2012 Filing 309 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 308 Response/Reply (Other), 276 Notice (Other),, -Request for Oral Argument by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Herrera, Sujey)
April 9, 2012 Filing 308 RESPONSE/REPLY to 276 Notice (Other),, in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cathleen Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit A- Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit B)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 9, 2012 Filing 307 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Surreply, # 2 Affidavit of John Duchemin in Support of Motorola's Surreply, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motorola's Motion for Leave to File Surreply)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 9, 2012 Filing 306 NOTICE of Striking 305 Response/Reply (Other), filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Herrera, Sujey)
April 9, 2012 Filing 305 RESPONSE/REPLY Surreply Regarding Apple's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 19-22 by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John Duchemin in Support of Plaintiff's Surreply)(Mullins, Edward)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 304 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 303 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 302 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 301 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 300 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 4, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 299 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 4, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 298 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 4, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 297 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 4, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 296 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 3, 2012 Filing 295 Clerks Notice to Filer re 292 Response/Reply (Other). Document not filed in Text Searchable Format; ERROR - The document was not filed in Text Searchable Format. All future filings must be submitted in Text Searchable format as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3G(5) -Page 10-. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
April 3, 2012 Filing 294 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 292 Response/Reply (Other) of filing Declaration by John Duchemin in Support of Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John Duchemin Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 3, 2012 Filing 293 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 291 Response/Reply (Other), of filing Declaration by John Duchemin in Support of Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John Duchemin Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 2, 2012 Filing 292 RESPONSE/REPLY (Redacted) to Apple's March 26, 2012 Motion to CompelFurther Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 19-22 by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Herrera, Sujey)
April 2, 2012 Filing 291 RESPONSE/REPLY (Redacted) to Apple's March 26, 2012 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Set-Top Box Components by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 21, # 3 Exhibit 23)(Herrera, Sujey)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Granting 284 Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motions to Compel and Exhibits Thereto by Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/28/2012. (See Order for full details) (nc)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting 260 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/28/2012. (ar2)
March 28, 2012 Filing 288 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Attorney Name change (Pace, Christopher)
March 28, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 286 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Granting 272 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/27/2012. (nc)
March 27, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 285 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 27, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 284 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting 277 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order/ Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/26/2012. (jua)
March 26, 2012 Filing 282 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Set-Top Box Components and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Set-Top Box Components, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H)(Pace, Christopher)
March 26, 2012 Filing 281 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Regarding Set-Top Box Patents (Nos. 19-22) and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Regarding Set-Top Box Patents (Nos. 19-22), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Pace, Christopher)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 278 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/26/2012. (jky)
March 26, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 279 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 26, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 278 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 23, 2012 Filing 277 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 261 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order)(Herrera, Sujey)
March 23, 2012 Filing 276 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Filing Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Pace, Christopher)
March 21, 2012 Filing 275 REPLY to Response to Motion re 260 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony From Apple [DE 270] filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER Granting 262 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Sealed by Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/21/2012. (nc)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 273 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 272 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 18, 2012 Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT of Technology/Legal Tutorials held on 03/08/2012 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-338 pages, Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2012. (jsn)
March 16, 2012 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition re 260 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony From Apple filed by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
March 16, 2012 Filing 269 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER re 252 Emergency Motion to Compel Motorola to Provide Timely Depositions Concerning The Accused Set-Top Boxes by Apple Inc. is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/15/2012. (nc)
March 15, 2012 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT of Argument on Motorola's Motion to Amend Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions held on 03/09/2012 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-41 pages, Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2012. (jsn)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Granting 264 Agreed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/14/2012. (ar2)
March 14, 2012 Filing 265 WITHDRAWAL of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Compel Motorola to Provide Timely Depositions Concerning the Accused Set-Top Boxes (Pace, Christopher)
March 14, 2012 Filing 264 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 6,282,646 and 7,380,116 by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment re 646 and 116 Patents)(Pace, Christopher)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Granting 251 Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Emergency Motion to Compel Motorola to Provide Timely Depositions Concerning The Accused Set-Top Boxes by Apple Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/13/2012. (See Order for full details) (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 262 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 256 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Deadline for Apple to Substantially narrow its asserted claims: 3/22/2012. Fact Discovery Deadline: 3/28/2012. Deadline to File opening expert reports: 3/30/2012. Deadline to file rebuttal expert reports: 4/27/2012. Expert discovery deadline: 5/15/2012. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/8/2012. (ar2) Modified text on 3/12/2012 (ar2). (See Order for Further Details).
March 9, 2012 Filing 260 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony From Apple by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit M. Korhonen, # 2 Affidavit C. Garrigan, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Escobar, Annette)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER on 211 Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, filed by Motorola. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/9/2012. (jky)
March 9, 2012 Filing 258 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2012 re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. APPEARANCES: Marshall M. Searcy, III, Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Perlson, Edward Maurice Mullins, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christine Saunders Haskett, Jill J. Ho, Matthew D. Powers, Robert T. Haslam, Wendy Anna Herby. Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov (jh)
March 8, 2012 Attorney Anthony Pastor terminated by DE 255 . Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Anthony Pastor. (tp)
March 8, 2012 Filing 257 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Technology/Legal Tutorials held on 3/8/2012 re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. APPEARANCES: Marshall M. Searcy, III, Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Perlson, Edward Maurice Mullins, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christine Saunders Haskett, Jill J. Ho, Matthew D. Powers, Robert T. Haslam, Wendy Anna Herby. Court Reporter: Judy Wolff, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Wolff@flsd.uscourts.gov (jh)
March 8, 2012 Filing 256 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Scheduling Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
March 8, 2012 Filing 255 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Anthony Pastor) (Mullins, Edward)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 250 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court finds that Graham Pechenik, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. as pro hac vice counsel. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to this attorney at the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/8/2012. (jky)
March 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 253 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 252 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 251 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 7, 2012 Filing 250 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Graham Pechenik. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 34916. (ksa)
March 7, 2012 Filing 249 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Filing of Exhibits to Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Motorola to Provide Timely Depositions Concerning The Accused Set-Top Boxes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y)(Pace, Christopher)
March 6, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Regarding the Schedule and Presentation of the March 8, 2012 Tutorial (Mullins, Edward)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 224 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 2/24/2012. (yha)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 225 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 2/24/2012. (yha)
February 24, 2012 Attorney Benoit Quarmby terminated by DE 243 . Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Benoit Quarmby. (tp)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 244 Motorola s Motion for Leave to Bring Equipment Into Courtroom for Use During the March 8, 2012 Tutorial Hearing. All parties are permitted to bring the necessary equipment for the March 8, 2012 tutorial session. This includes several laptop computers and their external drives, 6 flash drives, and additional audio/video presentation equipment, consisting of: cables, power strips, extension cords, presentation clickers and laser pointers, as well as certain demonstrative devices, including: a Neonode N1 and/or N2 mobile phone, an exemplary Motorola set top box, and a number of exemplary Motorola and Apple cell phones and tablet computers. The Court authorizes representatives of the parties to access Courtroom 12-3 on March 7, 2012 from 2:00 p.m. to 5:00 p.m. to set up and check this equipment for use during the hearing on March 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/24/2012. (jky)
February 24, 2012 Filing 244 Plaintiff's MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment Into Courtroom for Use During March 8, 2012 Tutorial Hearing by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
February 24, 2012 Filing 243 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Benoit Quarmby) (Mullins, Edward)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 240 241 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorneys Christopher K. Eppich and Elena M. DuMuzio are permitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Apple, Inc. The Clerk shall provide notices of electronic filing to these attorneys at the email addresses set forth in the respective Motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/22/2012. (jky)
February 22, 2012 Filing 241 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher K. Eppich. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 34059. (ksa)
February 22, 2012 Filing 240 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elena M. DiMuzio. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 34060. (ksa)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Granting 232 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Its Declarations In Support of Its Oppositions to Apple's Motion to Compel (DE 224 and 225) by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 2/14/2012. (See Order for full details) (nc)
February 10, 2012 Attorney Douglas J. Giuliano terminated. (ls)(per DE #238)
February 10, 2012 Filing 238 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel - Douglas J. Giuliano (Mullins, Edward)
February 10, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings Expert Discovery due by 5/11/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2012. Calendar Call set for 10/16/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2012 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr per 237 Order. (yha)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 233 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/8/2012. (yha)
February 9, 2012 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re 225 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 7 and 12 Regarding Products Embodying Motorola's Asserted Patents and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher) Modified on 2/10/2012 (ls).
February 9, 2012 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 224 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Regarding Set-Top Box Patents (Nos. 19-22) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jason Lang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 2/10/2012 (ls).
February 9, 2012 Hearing re Technology and Legal Tutorials for 3/8/2012 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. and Motion Hearing as to 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support set for 3/9/2012 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. (See DE# 234.) (wc)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PAPERLESS ORDER setting hearing for Technology and Legal Tutorials and argument on 211 Motorola's Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. The parties have agreed to hold the Technology and Legal Tutorials for the Court on March 8, 2012 beginning at 9 a.m. The Court has allotted the entire day for these Tutorials. The following day, March 9, 2012, the Court will hear argument on 211 Motorola's Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. This hearing will be held at 10 a.m. and the Court has allotted one hour for argument.Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/9/2012. (jky)
February 8, 2012 Filing 233 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 2/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
February 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 232 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 7, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Regarding the Benefits of a Technology Tutorial (Mullins, Edward)
February 6, 2012 Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re 225 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 7 and 12 Regarding Products Embodying Motorola's Asserted Patents and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David M. Elihu, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration (redacted), # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Escobar, Annette)
February 6, 2012 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re 224 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Regarding Set-Top Box Patents (Nos. 19-22) filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David M. Elihu, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration (Filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration (redacted), # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration (redacted), # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration (redacted), # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration)(Escobar, Annette)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER regarding 212 Request for Hearing on Motorola's Motion to Amend Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. See ORDER for instructions. Parties have until February 7, 2012 to comply. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/3/2012. (jky)
January 31, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 227 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 31, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 226 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 30, 2012 Filing 225 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 7 and 12 Regarding Products Embodying Motorola's Asserted Patents and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Elena Dimuzio, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
January 30, 2012 Filing 224 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Regarding Set-Top Box Patents (Nos. 19-22) by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jill Ho, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-SEALED, # 5 Exhibit D-SEALED, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U-SEALED, # 23 Exhibit V-SEALED, # 24 Exhibit W-SEALED, # 25 Exhibit X-SEALED, # 26 Exhibit Y-SEALED, # 27 Exhibit Z-SEALED, # 28 Exhibit AA-SEALED, # 29 Exhibit BB-SEALED, # 30 Exhibit CC-SEALED, # 31 Exhibit DD-SEALED, # 32 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
January 27, 2012 Filing 223 REPLY to Response to Motion re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R)(Giuliano, Douglas)
January 20, 2012 Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 221 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court finds that R. Anthony Lopez, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Apple, Inc. as pro hac vice counsel. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to this attorney at rlopez@cov.com. (jky)
January 19, 2012 Filing 221 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for R. Anthony Lopez. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 32253. (ksa)
January 17, 2012 Filing 220 STATUS REPORT Joint Interim Status Report by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Giuliano, Douglas)
January 17, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 218 Affidavit, Notice of Filing of Replacement Exhibit K to the Declaration of Jill Ho in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (D.E. 218-11) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Pace, Christopher)
January 17, 2012 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Jill Ho. re 217 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Jill Ho in Support of Apple's Opposition (D.E. 217) by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Pace, Christopher)
January 17, 2012 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
January 4, 2012 Filing 216 NOTICE of Compliance with Mediation by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Giuliano, Douglas)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 213 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court finds that Brian Ferguson, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Apple, Inc. as pro hac vice counsel. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to this attorney at brian.ferguson@weil.com. DONE and ORDERED in chambers at Miami, Florida, on January 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr.(jky)
January 3, 2012 Filing 214 Clerks Notice to Filer re 212 Motion for Hearing. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
December 30, 2011 Filing 213 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian Ferguson. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 30960. (cw)
December 30, 2011 Filing 212 Request for Hearingby Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support of Request for Oral Argument (Giuliano, Douglas) Modified converted to motion on 1/3/2012 (tp).
December 28, 2011 Filing 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cathleen Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Mullins, Edward)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 205 Motorola's Motion to Amend the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. The Motion does not comply with this District's Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). With limited exceptions not applicable here, all motions must contain a certificate of good-faith conference. Upon conferring with the opposition, Motorola may file an amended motion containing the required certification under the Local Rule. DONE and ORDERED in chambers at Miami, Florida on 12/20/2011. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jky)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting Addendum to Protective Order; re 202 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/19/2011. (asl)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 200 and 201 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/19/2011. (asl)
December 19, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per 206 Order. Expert Discovery due by 4/13/2012. Fact Discovery due by 3/16/2012. Mediation Deadline 2/3/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2012. In Limine Motions due by 6/1/2012. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/13/2012. Status Report due by 1/16/2012. Calendar Call set for 9/18/2012 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Jury Trial set for 9/24/2012 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. (asl)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER REFERRING Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra for Discovery Proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/19/2011. See 206 for image (asl)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; granting in part 203 Motion to Amend/Correct. Trial set for 9/24/12. Calendar call set for 9/18/12 at 9:00 a.m. in Miami. Joint Status report due 1/16/12. Mediation complete by 2/3/12. Fact discovery due 3/16/12. Expert discovery due 4/13/12. Dispositive motions due 4/20/12. In Limine motions due 6/1/12. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due 9/13/12. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/19/2011. (asl)
December 19, 2011 Filing 205 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief the Procedural Schedule to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support and Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan in Support Thereof by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan, # 15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Cathleen Garrigan)(Mullins, Edward)
December 19, 2011 Filing 204 Clerks Notice to Filer re 203 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
December 16, 2011 Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 113 Scheduling Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) Modified link on 12/19/2011 (tp).
December 12, 2011 Filing 202 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 69 Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Pace, Christopher)
December 9, 2011 Filing 201 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anupam Sharma. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 29809. (ksa)
December 6, 2011 Filing 200 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeremy Jason Lang. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 29577. (ksa)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of Reassignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/6/2011. (asl)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting Motion to Strike; re 178 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 191 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/6/2011. (asl)
December 5, 2011 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Support re 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Haskett Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Pace, Christopher)
December 2, 2011 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re 191 Motion for Oral Arguments filed by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
December 2, 2011 Filing 195 Clerks Notice to Filer re 191 Motion for Oral Arguments. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (tp)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER ruling on parties' disputed claim terms 93 .. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/1/2011. (mth)
December 1, 2011 Filing 193 STIPULATION Regarding Documentary Evidence by Apple, Inc. (Pace, Christopher)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Requiring Response as to 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions.( Replies due by 12/5/2011.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/1/2011. (asl)
December 1, 2011 Filing 191 MOTION Request for Oral Argument re 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Giuliano, Douglas) Modified relief on 12/2/2011 (tp).
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 188 , 189 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/30/2011. (asl)
November 29, 2011 Filing 189 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cathleen G. Garrigan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 29144. (ksa)
November 29, 2011 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Marshall M. Searcy, III. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 29145. (ksa)
November 29, 2011 Filing 187 Order Vacating Order Granting Motion to Strike; re 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc., vacating 186 Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/29/2011. (asl)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Granting Motion to Strike; re 178 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/28/2011. (asl)
November 28, 2011 Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Giuliano, Douglas)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 182 , 183 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/28/2011. (asl)
November 18, 2011 Filing 183 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Azra Hadzimehmedovic. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 28810. (ksa)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hace Vice; re 180 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/18/2011. (asl)
November 17, 2011 Filing 182 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Eiseman. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 28724. (ksa)
November 10, 2011 Filing 180 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benoit Quarmby. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 28423. (ksa)
November 7, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Response in Support of Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
November 7, 2011 Filing 178 MOTION to Strike Motorola's Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 11/25/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
November 4, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 170 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines of Filing Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Giuliano, Douglas)
November 4, 2011 Filing 176 RESPONSE/REPLY to 159 Response/Reply (Other), Apple's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
November 3, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 175 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/3/2011. (asl)
November 2, 2011 Filing 173 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Arjun Mehra. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 27948. (ksa)
November 2, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 172 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
November 2, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 171 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
November 2, 2011 Filing 169 Clerks Notice to Filer re 165 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#168]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Requiring Response re 162 Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc., 168 Response/Reply (Other) filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., ( Motions due by 11/7/2011). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2011. (asl)
October 31, 2011 Filing 168 REPLY to 162 Notice (Other),,, by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (ls)(See Image at DE # 165 )
October 31, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 167 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
October 31, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 166 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
October 31, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motorola's Reply to Apple's Response to Motorola's Infringement Contentions (Mullins, Edward)
October 31, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 164 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
October 31, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 163 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
October 28, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Response to the Court's October 24, 2011 Order and Notice of Filing of Motorola's May 13, 2011 Infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit B - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 4 Exhibit C - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit D - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 6 Exhibit E - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions, # 7 Exhibit F - Motorola's Preliminary Infringement Contentions)(Pace, Christopher)
October 28, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Apple's Infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Apple's Infringement Contentions)(Pace, Christopher)
October 28, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Supplemental Infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 1-B, # 4 Exhibit 1-C, # 5 Exhibit 1-D, # 6 Exhibit 1-E, # 7 Exhibit 1-F, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3)(Giuliano, Douglas)
October 26, 2011 Filing 159 RESPONSE/REPLY to 95 Affidavit, Supplemental Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine Haskett, # 2 Exhibit #1- Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit #2- Presentation, # 4 Exhibit #3- Contentions, # 5 Exhibit #4- EP0847654B1, # 6 Exhibit #5- Comparison, # 7 Exhibit #6- Translation, # 8 Exhibit #7- Rule 43)(Pace, Christopher)
October 26, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Supplemental Authority on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Giuliano, Douglas)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER requiring response no later than October 28, 2011.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/24/2011. (mth)
October 20, 2011 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/18/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 2B, 408-512 pages, Court Reporter: Tamra K. Piderit, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin prior to the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012. (br)
October 20, 2011 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 3B of 3B, 638-770 pages, Court Reporter: Tamra K. Piderit, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012. (br)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 146 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/18/2011. (asl)
October 19, 2011 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 3A, 513-637 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2012. (br)
October 19, 2011 Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ursula Ungaro: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov (kh)
October 18, 2011 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ursula Ungaro: Markman Hearing held on 10/18/2011. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov (kh)
October 18, 2011 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/18/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 2A, 276-407 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2012. (br)
October 18, 2011 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/17/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 1B, 68-276 pages, Court Reporter: Tamra K. Piderit, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2012. (br)
October 18, 2011 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 10/17/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Volume Number 1, 1-67 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2012. (br)
October 17, 2011 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ursula Ungaro: Markman Hearing held on 10/17/2011. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov (kh)
October 16, 2011 Filing 145 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Amended Joint Chart Concerning Impact of Claim Construction (Giuliano, Douglas)
October 13, 2011 Filing 146 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Raymond N. Nimrod. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 26926. (cw)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER on Motion to Reserve Three Days for Markman Hearing; granting in part 141 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/13/2011. (asl)
October 12, 2011 Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Length of Markman Hearing filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mullins, Edward)
October 11, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entries 138 and 139 by Apple, Inc. (Pace, Christopher) Modified on link 10/12/2011 (tp).
October 11, 2011 Filing 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Length of Markman Hearing by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re Length of Markman Hearing)(Pace, Christopher)
October 11, 2011 Filing 140 Clerks Notice to Filer re 139 Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (ls)
October 11, 2011 Filing 139 Stricken by DE 142 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Length of Markman Hearing [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Extend Length of Markman Hearing (Pace, Christopher) Modified on 10/12/2011 (tp).
October 11, 2011 Filing 138 Stricken by DE 142 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Length of Markman Hearing by Apple, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2011 (Pace, Christopher) Modified on 10/12/2011 (tp).
October 11, 2011 Filing 137 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 135 Transcript,,. Correction; Transcript Refiled due to error see de# 136. (hh)
October 11, 2011 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT of Tutorial to Markman Hearing held on 10/6/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, 1-226 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2012. (br)
October 11, 2011 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Turotial to Marking Hearing held on 10/6/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, 1-226 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 11/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2012. (br)
October 10, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing Presentations from October 6, 2011 Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Apple Tutorial Presentation Re Motorola Patents- Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Apple Tutorial Presentation Re Motorola Patents- Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Apple Tutorial Presentation Re Apple Patents- Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Apple Tutorial Presentation Re Apple Patents- Part 2)(Pace, Christopher)
October 7, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Copies of Presentations Relating to Tutorial Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER on Motion to Stay; denying 109 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/7/2011. (asl)
October 5, 2011 Filing 131 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Joint Chart Concerning the Impact of Claim Construction (Mullins, Edward)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER on Motion to Bring Equipment; granting 129 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/5/2011. (asl)
October 4, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for use during the October 6, 2011 and October 17, 2011 hearings by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 10/4/2011 (ls).
September 30, 2011 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 9/7/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, 1-14 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 10/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. (br)
September 29, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing Regarding Relevant Products (Attachments: # 1 Relevant Products Chart)(Pace, Christopher)
September 29, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Joint Chart Concerning the Impact of Claim Construction (Pace, Christopher)
September 29, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Filing of Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits 27 and 28 [Originally filed under seal on 8/18/2011 - Refile Per Order D.E. 120] (Attachments: # 1 1 - Responsive Claim Construction Brief, # 2 2 - Exhibit 27, # 3 3 - Exhibit 28)(Pace, Christopher)
September 29, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Unredacted Brief and Unredacted Exhibits 32 and 36 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 36)(Giuliano, Douglas)
September 29, 2011 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by returning (97-100) documents under seal to the filing parties pursuant to 120 Order, (nc)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying 114 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/28/2011. (ls)
September 28, 2011 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 MOTION to Stay filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Giuliano, Douglas)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER on Motions to File Under Seal. Motions DE 97 , 99 are denied. The Clerk is instructed to return DE#'s 97-100 under seal back to the filing parties. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/27/2011. (asl) Modified docket text per Chambers on 9/29/2011 (nc).
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Expediting Response as to 114 Corrected MOTION to Stay re 109 MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 9/28/2011). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/26/2011. (asl)
September 22, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Page 21 of its Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Supplement In Color Page 21 of Responsive Brief)(Pace, Christopher)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 115 , 116 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/19/2011. (asl)
September 15, 2011 Filing 114 Corrected MOTION to Stay re 109 MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 10/3/2011 (Pace, Christopher)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER on Joint Motion for Amended Scheduling Order; granting 111 Motion to Amend/Correct. Expert discovery due 3/23/12. Dispositive motions due 4/6/12. Pretrial motions due 5/2/12. In Limine motions due 6/13/12. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/14/2011. (asl)
September 13, 2011 Filing 112 Clerks Notice to Filer re 111 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (tp)
September 12, 2011 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew Korhonen. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 25192. (ksa)
September 12, 2011 Filing 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amanda S. Williamson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 25193. (ksa)
September 12, 2011 Filing 111 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re 88 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Douglas) Modified relief on 9/13/2011 (tp).
September 9, 2011 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Samuel F. Ernst. re 109 MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 3), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 4), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 5), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 6), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 7), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 8), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 9), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Pace, Christopher)
September 9, 2011 Filing 109 MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AMENDED ORDER Setting Hearing Dates; Markman Hearing re-set for 10/17/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Tutorial Hearing set for 10/6/2011 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2011 02:30 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/30/2011. (ral)
September 6, 2011 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 8/29/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, 1-22 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting William Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or William Romanishin. Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011. (br)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 104 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/31/2011. (asl)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Setting Hearing Dates ( Markman Hearing set for 10/17/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro., Tutorial Hearing set for 10/7/2011 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro., Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2011 02:30 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/30/2011. (asl)
August 29, 2011 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ursula Ungaro: Status Conference held on 8/29/2011. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov (kh)
August 26, 2011 Filing 104 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Perlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 24249. (ksa)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/25/2011. (asl)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Re-Setting Markman Hearing ( Markman Hearing set for 10/12/2011 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/19/2011. (asl)
August 22, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 100 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 22, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 99 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 19, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 98 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 19, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 97 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 18, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Responsive Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 41, # 11 Affidavit Declaration)(Giuliano, Douglas)
August 18, 2011 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Christine Saunders Haskett. Supplemental Declaration in Support of Apple Inc's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Brief Filed Under Seal) by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 29, # 8 Exhibit 30)(Pace, Christopher)
July 28, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Affidavit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
July 28, 2011 Filing 93 Defendant's MOTION Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Pace, Christopher)
July 13, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Change of Affiliation (Pace, Christopher)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER on Parties' Motion for Increasing Page Limit; granting 90 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/6/2011. (asl)
July 5, 2011 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Claim Construction Briefs and [Proposed] Order by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/13/2011. (asl)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER on Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Modified Scheduling Order; granting 77 Motion. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/27/2011. (asl)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/23/2011. (jc)
May 23, 2011 Filing 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony Pastor. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19160. (ksa)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/23/2011. (bb)
May 16, 2011 Filing 84 Clerks Notice to Filer re 82 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de# 83]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
May 13, 2011 Filing 83 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26(a)(1) by Apple, Inc. See DE 82 for image (tp)
May 13, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Apple, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Apple's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures)(Pace, Christopher)
May 2, 2011 Filing 80 STATUS REPORT by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward)
May 2, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 46 Order Referring Case to Mediation of Filing of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
May 2, 2011 Filing 78 RESPONSE/REPLY to 71 Response/Reply (Other) Defendant Apple Inc.'s Answer to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Joint Counterclaims by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David L. Shaul. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18070. (ksa)
April 25, 2011 Filing 77 Joint MOTION Regarding Contention and Construction Deadlines re 45 Scheduling Order,, by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Douglas)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 72 , 73 , 74 , 75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/22/2011. (asl)
April 21, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian C. Cannon. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17704. (ksa)
April 21, 2011 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas R. Watson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17703. (ksa)
April 21, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Duchemin. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17702. (ksa)
April 20, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard W. Erwine. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17626. (ksa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 71 RESPONSE/REPLY to 68 Stipulation,, re: Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Giuliano, Douglas)
April 1, 2011 Filing 70 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Orders 2010-145 and 2011-18 to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton no longer assigned to case. (dm)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/21/2011. (asl)
March 18, 2011 Filing 68 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Stipulation for Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc. to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Apple Inc.'s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Pace, Christopher)
March 17, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. of Filing Joint [Proposed] Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
March 14, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of filing of the Opinion and Order denying Motorola's motion to dismiss or sever and transfer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pace, Christopher)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 59 , 60 , 61 , 62 , 63 , 64 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/7/2011. (asl)
March 2, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Winslow B. Taub. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14897. (ksa)
March 2, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chris Martiniak. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14898. (ksa)
March 2, 2011 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert D. Fram. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14899. (ksa)
March 2, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christine Saunders Haskett. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14900. (ksa)
March 2, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert T. Haslam. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14901. (ksa)
March 2, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Samuel F. Ernst. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14896. (ksa)
February 25, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Antonio Piazza, Esq. selected.(Lucas, Hal)
February 23, 2011 Filing 57 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jc)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying 50 Motion for Extension of Time to Select Mediator. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is DENIED. The Motion and all attachments SHALL be UNSEALED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/22/2011. (nc)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying 49 Joint Motion to Seal the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Select A Mediator File Under Seal. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is DENIED. The Motion and all attachments SHALL be UNSEALED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/22/2011. (nc)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Motion for Patricia Young to Withdraw as Counsel for Apple, Inc.; re 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patricia Young terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Patricia Young. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/18/2011. (asl)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/22/2011. (asl)
February 18, 2011 Filing 52 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Patricia Young. by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 3/7/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
February 16, 2011 Filing 50 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Select A Mediator by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc) Modified by unsealing per 56 Order on 2/22/2011 (nc).
February 16, 2011 Filing 49 JOINT MOTION to Seal the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Select A Mediator by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., and Appel Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Tracking Form)(nc) Modified by unsealing per 55 Order on 2/22/2011 (nc).
February 15, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jennifer A. Bauer. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14191. (ksa)
February 14, 2011 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Apple's Reply ISO Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cherensky Decl. ISO Apple's Reply ISO Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Pace, Christopher)
February 3, 2011 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER of Referral to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/1/2011. (asl)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER for Pretrial Conference and Trial. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2012 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 8/8/2012 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2011. Discovery due by 1/17/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2011. In Limine Motions due by 4/13/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2012. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/1/2011. (asl)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Motorola's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue; granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 2/3/2011. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/1/2011. (asl)
January 31, 2011 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
January 21, 2011 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Planning & Scheduling Conference held on 1/14/2011 before Judge Ursula Ungaro, 1-32 pages, Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting Mr. Romanishin before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2011. (br)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/20/2011. (asl)
January 18, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark G. Davis. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 233586. (ksa)
January 13, 2011 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Jill J. Ho. re 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Declaration of Jill J. Ho in Support of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple, Inc. (Pace, Christopher)
January 12, 2011 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Steven S. Cherensky. re 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Declaration of Steven S. Cherensky in Support of Motion to Transfer by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Pace, Christopher)
January 12, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 1/31/2011 (Pace, Christopher)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Rescheduling Time of Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2011 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/11/2011. (asl)
January 6, 2011 Filing 35 ANSWER to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Joint Counterclaim by Apple, Inc. See De 33 for image(tp)
January 6, 2011 Filing 33 RESPONSE/REPLY Answer to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Joint Counterclaims by Apple, Inc.. (Pace, Christopher)
January 6, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hal Michael Lucas on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Lucas, Hal)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/30/2010. (dj)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/30/2010. (dj)
December 29, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian C. Chang. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 11827. (ksa)
December 29, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew D. Powers. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 11828. (ksa)
December 29, 2010 Filing 27 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
December 13, 2010 Filing 26 RESPONSE/REPLY to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, and Counterclaims to Apple, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; re 18 , 19 , 20 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 24 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/2/2010. (asl)
December 1, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jill J. Ho. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10448. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anne M. Cappella. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10448. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven S. Cherensky. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10450. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patricia Young. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10451. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jacqueline T. Harlow. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10452. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jenny C. Wu. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10453. (ksa)
December 1, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nathan A. Greenblatt. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10454. (ksa)
November 18, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 11/19/2010 (ls).
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/12/2010. (ebs)
November 9, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alexander Rudis. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9533. (ksa)
November 9, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Nelson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9530. (ksa)
November 9, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles K. Verhoeven. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9529. (ksa)
November 9, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward J. DeFranco. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9532. (ksa)
November 9, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Baker. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9531. (ksa)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting in Part 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint; Apple, Inc. response due 11/18/2010. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro (ebs)
October 27, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Pace, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( -Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/29/2010, Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2011 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/20/2010. (tb)
October 15, 2010 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re 5 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de# 6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp)
October 14, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Apple, Inc. served on 10/7/2010, answer due 10/28/2010. See DE 5 for image (tp)
October 14, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Filing Affidavit of Service (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Mullins, Edward)
October 7, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (tb)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Motorola, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Giuliano, Douglas)
October 6, 2010 Filing 2 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton (jc)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3213106, filed by Motorola Nobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Mullins, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?