Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Case Number: 1:2010cv24063
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 213 Transmittal Letter Sent With Order of Transfer, Docket Sheet, (2)Boxes of Original Sealed Documents 139-162,165,166,180-189,191-207, To: Washington Western District Court (nc)
August 25, 2011 212 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in United States District Court for the Western District of Washington as case 2:11-cv-01408, filed 08/25/2011. (bb)
August 17, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:10-cv-24063 electronically transferred out to Washington Western. (ls)
August 17, 2011 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion to Transfer this Action to the Western District of Washington. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 8/17/2011. (ls)
August 16, 2011 210 Featured Case ORDER on Discovery - see order for full details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 8/16/2011. (dt)
August 15, 2011 209 Clerks Notice to Filer re 171 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other), 174 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other). Sealed Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - The Filer failed to file a sealed document in the conventional paper format. The document has been restricted and the docket text has been corrected. It is not necessary to refile the document but future sealed filings must be filed in the conventional paper format in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (nc)
August 12, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Trial and Certain Pretrial Dates re 190 MOTION for Specially Set Trial Date filed by Microsoft Corporation. Jury Trial set for two-week period beginning 3/12/2012 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno, Calendar Call for 3/6/2012 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno, Discovery due by 11/4/2011, In Limine Motions due by 12/13/2011, Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/30/11, Mediation completed by 12/16/11, Motions due by 12/13/2011, Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/28/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/12/11. (tp)
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 207 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 206 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 205 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 204 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 203 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 202 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 201 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 200 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 199 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 198 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 197 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 196 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 195 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 194 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 193 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 192 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 191 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 190 MOTION for Specially Set Trial Date by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 189 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 188 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 187 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 186 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 185 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 184 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 183 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 182 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 181 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 180 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
August 9, 2011 179 CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown pursuant to DE# 178 . (dgj)
August 9, 2011 178 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/8/2011. (ahy)
August 8, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 174 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 8, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 171 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
August 8, 2011 177 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 802, # 3 Exhibit 906, # 4 Exhibit 907, # 5 Exhibit 908, # 6 Exhibit 909, # 7 Exhibit 910, # 8 Exhibit 1005, # 9 Exhibit 1006, # 10 Exhibit 1117, # 11 Exhibit 1118, # 12 Exhibit 1119, # 13 Exhibit 1120, # 14 Exhibit 1121, # 15 Exhibit 1122, # 16 Exhibit 1411)(Miner, Curtis)
August 8, 2011 176 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Miner, Curtis)
August 8, 2011 175 RESPONSE to Motion re 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Replies due by 8/18/2011. (Mullins, Edward)
August 8, 2011 173 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Microsoft's Expert Robert Zeidman and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Miner, Curtis)
August 8, 2011 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re 121 MOTION for Use of Representative Claims filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miner, Curtis)
August 8, 2011 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Miner, Curtis)
August 8, 2011 169 STIPULATION and Joint Motion on Motions in Limine and Incorporated Proposed Order by Microsoft Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward)
August 8, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER granting 120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/6/2011. (ahy)
August 5, 2011 167 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 164 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Intent to Oppose Motorola's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time [doc.164] (Miner, Curtis)
August 5, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 166 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ch1)
August 5, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 165 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ch1)
August 4, 2011 164 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Out of Time and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Giuliano, Douglas) Modified text on 8/5/2011 (asl).
July 25, 2011 163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kelley Conaty. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 22468. (ksa)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 162 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 161 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 160 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 159 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 158 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 157 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 155 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 154 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 153 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 152 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 151 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 150 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 149 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 148 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 147 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 146 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 145 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 144 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 143 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 142 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 141 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 140 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 139 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 22, 2011 138 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 135 Trial Brief of Filing Supplemental Exhibits to Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Index of Supplemental Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 504, # 3 Exhibit 1002, # 4 Exhibit 1003, # 5 Exhibit 1101, # 6 Exhibit 1103, # 7 Exhibit 1104, # 8 Exhibit 1106, # 9 Exhibit 1107, # 10 Exhibit 1108, # 11 Exhibit 1109, # 12 Exhibit 1113)(Miner, Curtis)
July 22, 2011 137 NOTICE of Striking 133 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Microsoft Corporation by Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis)
July 22, 2011 136 Clerks Notice to Filer re 123 MOTION on Opening Claim Construction Brief, 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 134 , 135 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
July 21, 2011 135 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Microsoft Corporation. See 124 for image.(asl)
July 21, 2011 134 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Motorola Mobility, Inc. See 123 for image (asl)
July 21, 2011 133 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Filing Additional Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index to Additional Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1103, # 3 Exhibit 1104, # 4 Exhibit 1106, # 5 Exhibit 1107, # 6 Exhibit 1108, # 7 Exhibit 1109, # 8 Exhibit 1113)(Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 132 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Michael Wagner Concerning Non-Infringing Alternatives and Memorandum of Law in Support by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 21, 2011 131 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Martin Kaliski (Redacted) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 130 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Christian Tegillis (Redacted) and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 21, 2011 129 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 and Brief in Support Thereof by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit in Support, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit in Support, # 4 Exhibit C to Affidavit in Support, # 5 Exhibit D to Affidavit in Support, # 6 Exhibit E to Affidavit in Support, # 7 Exhibit F to Affidavit in Support, # 8 Exhibit G to Affidavit in Support, # 9 Exhibit H to Affidavit in Support, # 10 Exhibit I to Affidavit in Support, # 11 Exhibit J to Affidavit in Support, # 12 Exhibit K to Affidavit in Support, # 13 Exhibit L to Affidavit in Support, # 14 Exhibit M to Affidavit in Support)(Mullins, Edward)
July 21, 2011 128 Defendant's MOTION in Limine (Redacted) by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 127 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Appendix Index to Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 19, # 15 Exhibit 20)(Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Noninfringement for U.S. Patent Nos. 5,502,839, 5,784,001, and 6,272,333, and that Motorola Cannot Recover Damages Prior to Nov. 10, 2010 by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 21, 2011 125 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Index to Exhibits), # 2 Exhibit 101, # 3 Exhibit 102, # 4 Exhibit 201, # 5 Exhibit 301, # 6 Exhibit 302, # 7 Exhibit 304, # 8 Exhibit 305, # 9 Exhibit 501, # 10 Exhibit 502, # 11 Exhibit 504, # 12 Exhibit 601, # 13 Exhibit 801 (Part 1), # 14 Exhibit 801 (Part 2), # 15 Exhibit 901, # 16 Exhibit 902, # 17 Exhibit 903, # 18 Exhibit 904, # 19 Exhibit 905, # 20 Exhibit 1101, # 21 Exhibit 1102, # 22 Exhibit 1105, # 23 Exhibit 1110, # 24 Exhibit 1114, # 25 Exhibit 1115, # 26 Exhibit 1116, # 27 Exhibit 1201, # 28 Exhibit 1301, # 29 Exhibit 1302, # 30 Exhibit 1303, # 31 Exhibit 1304, # 32 Exhibit 1305, # 33 Exhibit 1401, # 34 Exhibit 1402, # 35 Exhibit 1403, # 36 Exhibit 1404, # 37 Exhibit 1405, # 38 Exhibit 1406, # 39 Exhibit 1407, # 40 Exhibit 1408, # 41 Exhibit 1409)(Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis) Modified to re-docket, see 135 on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 21, 2011 123 MOTION on Opening Claim Construction Brief by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit C, # 4 Exhibit Part 1 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 5 Exhibit Part 2 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 6 Exhibit Part 3 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 7 Exhibit Part 4a of 18 to Affidavit C, # 8 Exhibit Part 4b of 18 to Affidavit C, # 9 Exhibit Part 5 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 10 Exhibit Part 6 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 11 Exhibit Part 7 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 12 Exhibit Part 8 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 13 Exhibit Part 9 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 14 Exhibit Part 10 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 15 Exhibit Part 11 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 16 Exhibit Part 12 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 17 Exhibit Part 13 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 18 Exhibit Part 14 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 19 Exhibit Part 15 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 20 Exhibit Part 16 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 21 Exhibit Part 17 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 22 Exhibit Part 18 of 18 to Affidavit C)(Mullins, Edward) Modified to re-docket, see 134 on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 21, 2011 122 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Claim Construction Briefs) by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis)
July 21, 2011 121 MOTION for Use of Representative Claims and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl).
July 19, 2011 120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael P. Kahn. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 22133. (ksa)
July 19, 2011 119 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 115 116 117 and 118 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/19/11. (dge)
July 13, 2011 117 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Nelson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21738. (ksa)
July 12, 2011 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole M. Jantzi. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21739. (ksa)
July 11, 2011 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles K. Verhoeven. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 61622. (ksa)
July 8, 2011 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward J. DeFranco. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21517. (ksa)
July 7, 2011 113 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 7, 2011 112 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 7, 2011 111 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 7, 2011 110 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 7, 2011 109 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 7, 2011 108 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 6, 2011 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yongdan Li. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21436. (ksa)
July 6, 2011 107 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Suboena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis)
July 5, 2011 Attorney Kevin C. Wheeler terminated per 105 Notice of Withdrawal of counsel. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Kevin Wheeler. (asl)
July 5, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 100 101 102 103 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/5/11. (dge)
July 5, 2011 105 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Miner, Curtis)
July 1, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/30/11. (dge)
June 29, 2011 103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathleen L. Holthuas. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21165. (ksa)
June 29, 2011 102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Galligan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21164. (ksa)
June 29, 2011 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tamar B. Kelber. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21163. (ksa)
June 29, 2011 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher G. Wilson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21162. (ksa)
June 28, 2011 99 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David J. Wolfsohn. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21068. (ksa)
June 28, 2011 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony Balkissoon. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21095. (ksa)
June 28, 2011 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerald L. Angst. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21093. (ksa)
June 28, 2011 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frank J. Favia, Jr. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21094. (ksa)
June 28, 2011 95 Featured Case ORDER granting 94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/27/2011. (ahy)
June 22, 2011 94 MOTION for the Admission of Josef B. Schenker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20731. (ksa)
June 20, 2011 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 92 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/20/2011. (ahy)
June 16, 2011 92 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William M. Chang. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20371. (ksa)
June 16, 2011 91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael L. Lisak. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20372. (ksa)
June 15, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/14/2011. (ahy)
June 14, 2011 89 REPLY in Support of 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law Reply in Support of Microsoft's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 6/15/2011 (asl).
June 8, 2011 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Neil H. Wyland. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19953. (ksa)
June 8, 2011 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth Curtin. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19954. (ksa)
June 8, 2011 86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen C. Carlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19955. (ksa)
June 8, 2011 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sherry A. Knutson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19956. (ksa)
June 8, 2011 84 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shubham Mukherjee. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19957. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 83 MOTION for the Admission of R. Andrew Schwentker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19883. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 82 MOTION for the Admission of Erin Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19876. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 81 MOTION for the Admission of Priti Langer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19875. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 80 MOTION for the Admission of David Elihu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19874. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 79 MOTION for the Admission of Amanda Wieker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19873. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin B. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19865. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole D. Sims. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19864. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Olivia M. Kim. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19863. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Aseem S. Gupta. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19862. (ksa)
June 6, 2011 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Affidavit, # 29 Affidavit, # 30 Affidavit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
June 2, 2011 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dale B. Nixon. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19710. (ksa)
June 2, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2011. (ahy)
June 1, 2011 71 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 66 Order on Motion for Clarification. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (dgj)
May 31, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/31/2011. (ahy)
May 27, 2011 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nabeel U. Khan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19439. (ksa)
May 27, 2011 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erik J. Carlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19440. (ksa)
May 26, 2011 Attorney Jim S. Zeng terminated as per DE 67 Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jim Zeng. (lk)
May 25, 2011 67 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Miner, Curtis)
May 25, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/24/2011. (ahy) Modified action type on 6/1/2011 (dgj).
May 25, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/24/2011. (ahy)
May 23, 2011 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/23/2011. (ahy)
May 23, 2011 63 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/20/2011. (ahy)
May 19, 2011 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 6/6/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A David Kaefer's Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Group Exhibit C to Motion, # 23 Exhibit Group Exhibit D to Motion)(Miner, Curtis)
May 18, 2011 61 MOTION for the Admission of Brian Kao to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18976. (ksa)
May 18, 2011 60 MOTION for the Admission of Stuart W. Yothers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18975. (ksa)
May 18, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/18/2011. (ahy)
May 17, 2011 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erin E. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18886. (ksa)
May 17, 2011 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael C. Lee. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18887. (ksa)
May 17, 2011 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sandra S. Fujiyama. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18888. (ksa)
May 17, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/16/2011. (ahy)
May 17, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER denying 49 Motion to Include Pretrial Dates on Claim Construction and Expert Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/16/2011. (ahy)
May 16, 2011 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul D. Tripodi, II. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18836. (ksa)
May 12, 2011 52 Joint MOTION Request for Status Conference by Motorola Mobility, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) Modified relief on 5/13/2011 (asl).
May 12, 2011 51 Joint MOTION for clarification of Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs by Motorola Mobility, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Responses due by 5/31/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Joint Motion for Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
April 14, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2011. (ahy)
April 10, 2011 49 Joint MOTION to Include Pretrial Dates on Claim Construction and Expert Discovery 36 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas) Modified text on 4/11/2011 (asl).
April 6, 2011 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Philip W. Woo. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16871. (ksa)
April 6, 2011 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ellen S. Robbins. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16870. (ksa)
April 6, 2011 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Herman F. Webley. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16872. (ksa)
April 6, 2011 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
March 11, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/11/2011. (ahy)
March 1, 2011 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tung T. Nguyen. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14728. (ksa)
February 16, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/15/2011. (ahy)
February 7, 2011 41 MOTION for the Admission of Khue V. Hoang to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 13732. (ksa)
February 7, 2011 40 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Lucas, Hal) Modified text on 2/8/2011 (asl).
January 31, 2011 39 First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Microsoft Corporation by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Mullins, Edward)
January 21, 2011 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re 35 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 37 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
January 20, 2011 37 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Edward A. Infante added and Compliance with Pretrial Order Setting Conference. See 35 for image.(asl)
January 20, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Trial and Certain Pretrial Dates, ( Discovery due by 7/7/2011., Exhibit List due by 10/5/2011., Expert Witness List due by 10/5/2011., Mediation Deadline 8/3/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/11/2011., Calendar Call set for 10/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno. ). Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/20/2011. (rgs)
January 20, 2011 35 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Selection of Mediator and Compliance with Pretrial Order Setting Conference (Mullins, Edward) Modified to re-docket, see 37 on 1/21/2011 (asl).
January 20, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/20/2011. (ahy)
January 18, 2011 33 Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Microsoft Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Microsoft Corporation by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Mullins, Edward)
January 18, 2011 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jim S. Zeng. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12752. (ksa)
January 18, 2011 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Theodore W. Chandler. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12751. (ksa)
January 14, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/12/2011. (ahy)
January 5, 2011 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Douglas I. Lewis. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 5, 2011 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard A. Cederoth. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 5, 2011 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian R. Nester. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 5, 2011 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David T. Pritikin. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 5, 2011 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin C. Wheeler. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 5, 2011 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John W. McBride. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa)
January 4, 2011 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Calendar Call set for 7/12/2011 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2011., Discovery due by 4/7/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/5/2011.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/3/2011.). Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/4/2011. (rgs)
December 23, 2010 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis)
December 23, 2010 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Miner, Curtis)
December 21, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/20/2010. (ahy)
December 9, 2010 19 MOTION for the Admission of Megan F. Raymond to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10928. (ksa)
December 9, 2010 18 Featured Case Endorsed ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Microsoft Corporation response due 12/23/2010. (This is a paperless order.) Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/9/2010. (ahy)
December 6, 2010 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint, Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis)
December 6, 2010 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Bradley Miner on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis)
December 3, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/2/2010. (ahy)
November 29, 2010 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, from Chief Financial Officer State of Florida Acknowledgment filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
November 24, 2010 13 MOTION for the Admission of Kevin J. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0328. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 12 MOTION for the Admission of Jesse J. Jenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0334. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 11 MOTION for the Admission of Steven Pepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0333. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 10 MOTION for the Admission of Mark D. Rowland to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0332. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 9 MOTION for the Admission of Norman H. Beamer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0331. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 8 MOTION for the Admission of Gabrielle E. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0330. (ksa)
November 24, 2010 7 MOTION for the Admission of Leslie M. Spencer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0329. (ksa)
November 17, 2010 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward)
November 12, 2010 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward)
November 12, 2010 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (gme)
November 12, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (gme)
November 10, 2010 2 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno (gme)
November 10, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3301685, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Mullins, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?