United States of America v. In The Matter of The Extradition of Jonathan Octavio Nunez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jonathan Octavio Nunez
Case Number: 1:2010mc24020
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Presiding Judge: John J. O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:3181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 EXTRADITION CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF COMMITMENT re 1 Complaint filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/28/2011. (mkr)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/26/2011. (mkr)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/23/2010. (mkr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. In The Matter of The Extradition of Jonathan Octavio Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Caroline Heck Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Octavio Nunez
Represented By: Sabrina Puglisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?