Disney Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Hotfile Corp. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. and Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Defendant: Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2011cv20427
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Adalberto Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 464 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
May 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 463 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
May 3, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 462 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
May 2, 2012 Filing 461 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Anthony Schoenberg and Exhibits Thereto, Filed in Support of Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Reply Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Munn, Janet)
May 2, 2012 Filing 460 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing Publicly Filed Redacted Version of Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike Reply Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
May 1, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 459 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
May 1, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 458 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 23, 2012 Filing 457 REPLY to Response to Motion re 423 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike >PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATIONS OF PROFESSOR JAMES BOYLE, DR. ANDREW CROMARTY AND ANTON TIVO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIO >>PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)<< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
April 23, 2012 Filing 456 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Andrew Leibnitz and Exhibits Thereto Filed in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and Hotfile's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Munn, Janet)
April 23, 2012 Filing 455 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer Yeh Filed in Support of Plainitiffs' Opposition to Defendant Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant Hotfile's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
April 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 454 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 453 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 452 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 451 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 16, 2012 Filing 450 RESPONSE in Opposition re 371 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Anton Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Defendant Hotfile Corp. >PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV'S SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 6 Exhibit E to declaration of J. Yeh, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of J. Yeh)(Stetson, Karen)
April 13, 2012 Filing 449 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Version of the Declaration of Andrew Leibnitz and Exhibits Thereto Filed In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Boyle, Cromarty and Titov Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Munn, Janet)
April 13, 2012 Filing 448 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Declaration of Dr. Daniel S. Levy In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portion of Testimony of Professor James Boyle (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER, ( Calendar Call set for 10/30/2012 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Trial set for 11/5/2012 before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2012 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/13/2012. (lh)
April 13, 2012 Filing 446 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Version of Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Boyle, Cromarty and Titov Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
April 13, 2012 Filing 445 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2012. Orderforthcoming. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Steven Fabrizio, Esq., Jaine Moskowitz, Esq., Janet Munn, Esq., N. Andrew Leibnitz, Esq., Roderick Thompson, Esq., Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
April 12, 2012 Filing 444 RESPONSE/REPLY to 443 Notice of Supplemental Authority Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' "Notice of Supplemental Authority" by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
April 11, 2012 Filing 443 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Disney Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stetson, Karen)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER Setting Status Conference:( Status Conference Re: Motions set for 4/13/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters set for 4/13/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.), Granting 432 MOTION >JOINT REQUEST FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE< filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP.. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/10/2012. (lh)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 441 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 440 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 439 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 438 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 437 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 436 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 435 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 434 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 433 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 4, 2012 Filing 432 MOTION >JOINT REQUEST FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE< by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
April 4, 2012 Filing 431 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 414 Notice (Other), >NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION (filed under seal, 3/7/12, public redacted version filed at DE 414) TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit >PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)<, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Yeh)(Stetson, Karen)
April 3, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 430 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 3, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 429 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 3, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 428 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 3, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 427 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 2, 2012 Filing 426 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 425 Reply to Response to Motion,, >>PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PUBLIC REDACTED VERSIONS OF REPLY DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT<< (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Dweclaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 2 Exhibit 151 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 3 Exhibit 152 to declaration of J. Yeh, # 4 Exhibit 153 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 5 Exhibit 154 to declaration of J. Yeh, # 6 Exhibit 155 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 7 Exhibit 156 to declaration of J. Yeh, # 8 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 9 Exhibit A to Declaration of I. Foster, # 10 Exhibit B to Declaration of I. Foster, # 11 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Dr. Richard Waterman in Support of Plaintiffs' MSJ (public redacted version))(Stetson, Karen)
April 2, 2012 Filing 425 REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) >>REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)<< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
April 2, 2012 Filing 424 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 423 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike >PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATIONS OF PROFESSOR JAMES BOYLE, DR. ANDREW CROMARTY AND ANTON TIVO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIO >NOTICE OF FILING PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH IN SUPPORTT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE< (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of J. Yeh)(Stetson, Karen)
April 2, 2012 Filing 423 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike >PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATIONS OF PROFESSOR JAMES BOYLE, DR. ANDREW CROMARTY AND ANTON TIVO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 4/19/2012 (Stetson, Karen)
April 2, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 422 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 2, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 421 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 2, 2012 Filing 420 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of the Declaration of Janel Thamkul Filed In Support of Memoranda In Support of Motions for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Munn, Janet)
April 2, 2012 Filing 419 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of Mr. Titov's Declaration Filed In Support of Defendant Hotfile's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Filed In Support of Defendant Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
April 2, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 418 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
April 2, 2012 Filing 417 NOTICE by Anton Titov of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of the Reply Memorandum Filed In Support of Mr. Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
April 2, 2012 Filing 416 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of the Reply Memorandum Filed In Support of Hotfile's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the DMCA's Safe Harbor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 29, 2012 Filing 415 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Notice of Filing by Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov of the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of Defendants' Reply and its Exhibits Filed in Support of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to "Use" Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 29, 2012 Filing 414 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Notice of Filing by Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and any References in Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or Statement of Facts to the Yeh Declaration and its Attachments (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 29, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 413 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 29, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 412 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 29, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 411 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 29, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 410 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 26, 2012 Filing 409 REPLY to Response to Motion re 301 MOTION for Summary Judgment >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< >WARNER'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF WARNER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 2 Exhibit R to Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh, # 3 Exhibit S to Declaration of Jennifer Yeh, # 4 Exhibit T to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 5 Exhibit U to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 6 Exhibit V to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 7 Exhibit W to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 8 Exhibit X to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 9 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version))(Stetson, Karen)
March 26, 2012 Filing 408 RESPONSE in Opposition re 314 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov For Oral Argument on Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation With Respect to Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use&quo >WARNER'S RESPONSE TO HOTFILE'S OBJECTIONS (FILED UNDER SEAL AS DE 313) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON WARNER'S MOTION TO USE TITOV EXHIBIT 27 IN ITS ENTIRETY AT TRIAL OR ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT< filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
March 23, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 407 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 23, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 406 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 23, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 405 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting 389 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/22/2012. (lk)
March 22, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 403 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 22, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 402 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 21, 2012 Filing 401 REPLY to Response to Motion re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant Hotfile Corp filed by Google Inc.. (Moscowitz, Jane)
March 21, 2012 Filing 400 RESPONSE in Opposition re 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION >PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON DIGITAL MILLENIUM COPYRIGHT ACT (AND ATTACHED DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH IN OPPOSITION TO HOTFILE CORP.'S MPSJ AND TITOV'S MSJ) (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 125-129 to Declaration of Jennifer Yeh, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 130-134 to Declaration of Jennifer Yeh, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 135-139 to Declaration of Jennifer Yeh, # 4 Exhibit 140 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 141 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 142 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 143 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 144 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 145 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 146 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 147 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 148 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 149 to J. Yeh Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 150 to J. Yeh Declaration)(Stetson, Karen)
March 21, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Dr. Andrew Cromarty in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2))(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 398 Statement of: PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO HOTFILE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON DIGITAL MILLENIUM COPYRIGHT ACT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 319 Statement, (Stetson, Karen)
March 21, 2012 Filing 397 Statement of: PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO ANTON TITOV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 317 Statement, (Stetson, Karen)
March 21, 2012 Filing 396 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Anton Titov Filed In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 395 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Publicly Filed Redacted Version filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen) Modified TEXT on 3/22/2012 (lk).
March 21, 2012 Filing 394 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov Filed in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 393 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Dr. Daniel S. Levy Filed in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 392 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Statement of Facts of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Defendants' Statement of Additional Material Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 391 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Professor James Boyle Filed In Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 21, 2012 Filing 390 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Defendants' Notice of Filing the Publicly Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Andrew Leibnitz and Exhibits Thereto, Filed in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37)(Munn, Janet)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 388 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 387 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 386 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 385 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 384 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 383 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 382 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 381 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 380 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 379 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 378 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 377 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 376 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 20, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 375 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 19, 2012 Filing 374 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov re 371 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Anton Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Defendant Hotfile Corp. Defendants' Notice of Filing Electronic Certificate of Service to Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Anton Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Defendant Hotfile Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 19, 2012 Filing 373 REPLY to Response to Motion re 314 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov For Oral Argument on Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation With Respect to Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use&quo Reply of Defendants In Support of Defendants' Request for Hearing on Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Regarding Titov Exhibit 27 filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
March 19, 2012 Filing 372 RESPONSE in Opposition re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant Hotfile Corp >PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
March 19, 2012 Filing 371 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion and Memorandum of Law to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Anton Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Defendant Hotfile Corp.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Responses due by 4/5/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 15, 2012 Filing 370 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Regarding Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use" Titov Exhibit 27 in its Entirety at Trial or on Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Munn, Janet)
March 14, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 369 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 14, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 368 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 Filing 389 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian M. Willen. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 35298. (ksa)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 367 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 366 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 365 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 364 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 363 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 362 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 361 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 360 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 359 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 358 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 357 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 356 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 12, 2012 Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant Hotfile Corp by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Moscowitz, Jane)
March 12, 2012 Filing 354 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice by Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile of Filing PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of Declaration of Roderick M. Thompson In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Warner Bros.' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37)(Munn, Janet)
March 12, 2012 Filing 353 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice by Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of the Declaration of Matthew Lynde, Ph.D. Filed in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros.' Motion for Summary Judgment on Hotfile's Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Munn, Janet)
March 12, 2012 Filing 352 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice by Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of the Declaration of Anton Titov and the Exhibits Thereto Filed In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros.' Motion for Summary Judgment on Hotfile's Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
March 12, 2012 Filing 351 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice by Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation of Filing the PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED Version of Hotfile's Counter-Statement of Facts in Opposition to the Statement of Uncontroverted Facts Submitted by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment on Hotfile's Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 12, 2012 Filing 350 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice by Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation of Filing the Publicly Redacted Version of Hotfile's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment on Hotfile's Counterclaim Filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
March 12, 2012 Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re 314 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov For Oral Argument on Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation With Respect to Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use&quo WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S OPPOSITION TO HOTFILE'S REQUEST FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION WITH RESPECT TO MOTION TO "USE" TITOV EXHIBIT 27 IN ITS ENTIRETY AT TRIAL OR ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
March 9, 2012 Filing 348 RESPONSE in Opposition re 315 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Hotfile's Opposition to Summary Judgment on its Counterclaim >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S OPPOSITION TO THE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF< filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
March 8, 2012 Filing 347 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Wasylik, Dineen)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 346 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 345 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 344 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 343 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 342 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 341 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 340 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 339 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 338 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 337 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov Notice of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov of Scrivener's Error In the Motion and Memorandum of Law of Defendants to Strike the Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh Filed In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and to Strike Any References In Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or Statement of Facts to the Yeh Declaration and Its Attachments (Munn, Janet)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 335 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 334 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 333 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 332 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 331 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting 328 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/7/2012. (lh)
March 6, 2012 Filing 329 Clerks Notice to Filer re 319 Statement, 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION, 317 Statement, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Publicly Filed Redacted Version. Document not filed in Text Searchable Format; ERROR - The document was not filed in Text Searchable Format. All future filings must be submitted in Text Searchable format as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3G(5) -Page 10-. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lh)
March 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 327 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 6, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 326 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 5, 2012 Filing 325 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) >PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PUBLIC REDACTED VERSIONS OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT< (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott A Zebrak in support of Plaintiff's MSJ (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Exhibit A (Zebrak), # 3 Exhibit B (Zebrak), # 4 Exhibit C (Zebrak), # 5 Exhibit D (Zebrak), # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Richard Waterman n Support of Plaintiffs' MSJ (Public Redacted Version), # 7 Exhibit A (Waterman), # 8 Exhibit B (Waterman), # 9 Exhibit C (Waterman), # 10 Exhibit D (Waterman), # 11 Exhibit E (Waterman), # 12 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Sehested in Support of Plaintiffs' MSJ (Public Redacted Version), # 13 Exhibit A (Sehested), # 14 Exhibit B (Sehested), # 15 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Thomas Kang in Support of Plaintiffs' MSJ (Public Redacted Version), # 16 Exhibit A (Kang), # 17 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of plaintiffs' MSJ (Public Redacted Version), # 18 Exhibit A (Foster), # 19 Exhibit B (Foster), # 20 Exhibit C (Foster), # 21 Exhibit D (Foster), # 22 Exhibit E (Foster), # 23 Exhibit F (Foster), # 24 Exhibit G (Foster), # 25 Exhibit H (Foster), # 26 Exhibit I (Foster), # 27 Exhibit J (Foster), # 28 Exhibit K (Foster))(Stetson, Karen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 324 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) >PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF JENNIFER V. YEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT< (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer V. Yeh in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Hotfile Corp. and Anton Titov (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Exhibit Exs. 1-29, # 3 Exhibit Exs. 30-35, # 4 Exhibit Exs. 36-37, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 6 Exhibit Exs. 39-42, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 43, part 1, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 43, part 2, # 9 Exhibit Ex 43, part 3, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 43, part 4, # 11 Exhibit Exs. 44-59, # 12 Exhibit Exs. 60-68, # 13 Exhibit Exs. 69-77, # 14 Exhibit Exs. 78-85, # 15 Exhibit Exs. 86-96, # 16 Exhibit Exs. 97-102, # 17 Exhibit Exs. 103-119)(Stetson, Karen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 323 Statement of: PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) (Stetson, Karen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TITOV (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 3/22/2012 (Stetson, Karen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 321 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. re 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit)(Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 320 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. re 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Errata, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 319 Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion of Defendant Hotfile Corporation for Partial Summary Judgment Based on the Digital Millenium Copyright Act Safe Harbor PUBLICLY FILED VERSION by Hotfile Corp. re 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION (Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 318 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED VERSION by Hotfile Corp.. Responses due by 3/22/2012 (Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 317 Statement of: of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Anton Titov's Motion for Summary Judgment PUBLICLY FILED REDACTED VERSION by Anton Titov re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Publicly Filed Redacted Version (Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Publicly Filed Redacted Version by Anton Titov. Responses due by 3/22/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Hotfile's Opposition to Summary Judgment on its Counterclaim by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Wasylik, Dineen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 314 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov For Oral Argument on Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation With Respect to Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use" Titov Exhibit 27 In Its Entirety At Trial or On Summary Judgment by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
March 5, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 313 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
March 2, 2012 Filing 328 Amicus Curiae MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mitchell L. Stoltz. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 34624. (ksa)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 PAPERLESS ORDER ON 307 Motion to Strike. Upon review of the record, and noting that the corrected version of the document has been filed at DE 108 , it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.'s Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams (ajs)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 309 Warner Bros.s Motion to Convert Report and Recommendation into an Order. This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 2/29/2012. (mao)
February 29, 2012 Filing 310 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp. Notice of Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation, of Scrivener's Error In Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Roderick M. Thompson Filed In Support of Hotfile's Memorandum of Law In Opposition to the Motion of Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. For Summary Judgment On Hotfile's Counterclaim (Munn, Janet)
February 29, 2012 Filing 309 MOTION WARNER'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO CONVERT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INTO AN ORDER by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Warner's Motion to Convert Report and Recommendation Into An Order and Ordering Hotfile Corp. to Produce the Full Titov Ex.27)(Stetson, Karen)
February 28, 2012 Filing 308 NOTICE by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.S NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF DAVID KAPLAN IN SUPPORT OF WARNERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Kaplan in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Redacted Version))(Stetson, Karen)
February 28, 2012 Filing 307 MOTION to Strike >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF DAVID KAPLAN IN SUPPORT OF WARNER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 3/16/2012 (Stetson, Karen)
February 28, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 306 [report and recommendations] restricted/sealed until further notice. (gm1)
February 28, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 305 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 28, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 304 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 28, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 303 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 27, 2012 Filing 302 Statement of: >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.S STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 301 MOTION for Summary Judgment >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< (Stetson, Karen)
February 27, 2012 Filing 301 MOTION for Summary Judgment >WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)< by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 3/15/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott A. Zebrak in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of S. Zebrak, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of S. Zebrak, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Ian Foster in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of I. Foster, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of david Kaplan in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Kerry Hopkins in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of K. Hopkins, # 9 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Yeh in Support of Warner's Motion for Summary Judgment (public redacted version), # 10 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 11 Exhibit B to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 12 Exhibit C to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 13 Exhibit D to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 14 Exhibit E to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 15 Exhibit F to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 16 Exhibit G to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 17 Exhibit H to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 18 Exhibit I to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 19 Exhibit J to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 20 Exhibit K to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 21 Exhibit L to Declaration of J. yeh, # 22 Exhibit M to Declaraton of J. Yeh, # 23 Exhibit N to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 24 Exhibit O to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 25 Exhibit P to declaration of J. Yeh, # 26 Exhibit Q to Declaration of J. Yeh, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
February 27, 2012 Filing 300 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation For Oral Argument on the Motion of Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. For Summary Judgment on Hotfile's Counterclaim by Hotfile Corp.. (Munn, Janet)
February 23, 2012 Filing 299 RESPONSE in Opposition re 293 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Hotfile's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] >WARNER'S RESPONSE TO HOTFILE'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATRE JUDGE'S ORDER REGARDING WARNER'S MOTION TO COMPEL TITOV DEPOSITION EXHIBIT 27 [PUBLIC REDACRED VERSION]< filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Duane C. Pozza in Support of Warner's Response to Hotfile's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Warner's motion to compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION])(Stetson, Karen)
February 23, 2012 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to Motion re 297 MOTION Warner's Motion to Permit use at Trial or Summary Judgment of Titov Ex. 27 in its Entirety [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] >Warner's Reply in Support of Motion to Permit Use at Trial or Summary Judgment of Titov Ex. 27 in its Entirety [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
February 23, 2012 Filing 297 MOTION Warner's Motion to Permit use at Trial or Summary Judgment of Titov Ex. 27 in its Entirety [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
February 23, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 296 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 23, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 295 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 22, 2012 Filing 294 RESPONSE/REPLY to 293 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Hotfile's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] Hotfile's Reply In Support of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by Hotfile Corp.. (Munn, Janet)
February 22, 2012 Filing 293 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Hotfile's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by Hotfile Corp.. (Munn, Janet)
February 22, 2012 Filing 292 RESPONSE to Motion re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] Opposition of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Plaintiff Warner's Motion to "Use" Titov Ex. 27 In Its Entirety At Trial Or On Summary Judgment [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Replies due by 3/5/2012. (Munn, Janet)
February 22, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 291 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 290 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 289 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 288 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 287 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 286 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 285 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 284 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 283 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 282 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 281 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 280 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 279 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 278 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 277 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 276 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 275 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 274 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 21, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 273 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 20, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. >PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA REARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (filed under seal) AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORP. AND ANTON TIVTOV AND STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT THEREOF (filed under seal)< (Stetson, Karen)
February 17, 2012 Filing 271 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov For Oral Argument On Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
February 17, 2012 Filing 270 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc. Notice of Filing Declarations in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (filed under seal) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Kaplan with Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Marsha Reed with Exhibit, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Carly Seabrook with Exhibit, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Vicki Solmon with Exhibit, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Betsy Zedek with Exhibit, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Erling Wold with Exhibits)(Stetson, Karen)
February 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 269 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 17, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 268 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 16, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 267 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 15, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 266 [minutes] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 15, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 265 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 15, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 264 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 14, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 263 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 14, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 262 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 261 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 260 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 259 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 258 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 257 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 256 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 255 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 13, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 254 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 253 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 252 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 10, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 251 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 241 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law To Permit Use At Trial of Summary Judgment of Titov Ex. 27 In Its Entirety Filed Under Seal Relates to Sealed Order and Contains Confidential Information Under Protective Order by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth : (Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 2/15/2012 at 2:00 PM, 301 N. Miami Avenue, 11th Floor in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 2/9/2012. (lw1)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 247 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/8/2012. (lh)
February 8, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 248 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 7, 2012 Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages >PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS< by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
February 7, 2012 Filing 246 *Paperless Order denying Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Discovery Hearing 242 . This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 2/7/2012. (mao)
February 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 245 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 244 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 7, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 243 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 6, 2012 Filing 242 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc. Request for Expedited Discovery Hearing (Stetson, Karen)
February 1, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 241 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 1, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 240 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
February 1, 2012 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11-30-11 before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-41 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 954-769-5488 / Carl_Schanzleh@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 14:59:09.) Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2012. (cs)
January 30, 2012 Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re 217 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 and Motion f Reply Memorandum of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov In Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P)(Munn, Janet)
January 30, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 237 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 27, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 236 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 27, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 235 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 27, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 234 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 25, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 233 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
January 23, 2012 Filing 232 RESPONSE in Opposition re 217 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 and Motion f >PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL REPORT OF DR. RICHARD WATERMAN< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Stetson, Karen)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 229 Joint Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/20/2012. (lh)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 228 Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Unseal the Recording of the Hearing Held Before United States Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on January 13, 2012 and to Permit Transcription of a Written Transcript by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 1/19/2012. (lw1)
January 18, 2012 Filing 229 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time >JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT #133) AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DKT # 157)< re 157 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 133 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
January 18, 2012 Filing 228 Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Unseal the Recording of the Hearing Held Before United States Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on January 13, 2012 and to Permit Transcription of a Written Transcript by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
January 18, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 227 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (lw1)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying as moot 162 Motion for a Case Management Order Deferring Damages Discovery; granting 198 Motion for Extension of Time to re-submit jointly proposed deadlines on or before January 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/13/2012. (lh)
January 17, 2012 Filing 225 REPORT of Mediation by Edward A. Infante. Disposition: Case did not settle.(jua)
January 16, 2012 Filing 224 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 1-13-2012 before Judge Kathleen M. Williams, 1-35 pages, Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, 305-523-5659 / Robin_Dispenzieri@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting Robin Dispenzieri before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2012. (rd)
January 13, 2012 Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2012 re 180 (granted-in-part and deferred-in-part) MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. 183 (deemed moot)SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Compel The Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 by Counterdefendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., 187 (withdrawn per stipulation) SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law To Compel The Deposition of Andrei Ianakov and Request for Expedited Briefing by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP., Columbia Pictures Industrie, 199 (deemed moot) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, 200 (granted) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PARTICULAR SOURCE CODE filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, 202 (granted nunc pro tunc) SEALED MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP., Columbia Pictures Industries,Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., 203 (deemed moot) SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Compel Production of Documents from Lemuria Communications, Inc. by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP., Columbia Pictures Industries,Inc., Wa, 204 (granted nunc pro tunc) SEALED MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP., Columbia Pictures Industries,Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., 205 (deemed moot) SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law to Compel Production of Particular Source Code by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP., Columbia Pictures Industries,Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainm, 207 (granted) MOTION for Hearing re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] Request of Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corp.'s for Hearing or Oral Argument on Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.'s filed by Hotfile Corp. and 215 (granted) SEALED MOTION to Seal. **APPEARANCES: Steven B. Fabrizio, Esq., Duane Pozza, Esq. & Karen L. Stetson, Esq. present on behalf of Plaintiffs. Roderick M. Thompson, Esq. & Janet Munn, Esq. Present on behalf of the Defendants. Motions addressed. Oral arguments heard. Order to follow, consistent with ruling and instructions stated in open court. (Digital 14:26:37-15:37:26)*Clerk's Note*: (Digital (15:37:26- 16:00:00)not recorded) (Time: 2:00PM-4:00PM) (lw1)
January 13, 2012 Filing 222 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Status Conference held on 1/13/2012. APPEARANCES:Steven Fabrizio, Esq., Roderick Thompson, Esq., and Janet Munn, Esq., Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, 305-523-5659 / Robin_Dispenzieri@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
January 10, 2012 Filing 221 REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PARTICULAR SOURCE CODE >PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULAR SOURCE CODE< filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stetson, Karen)
January 10, 2012 Filing 220 REPLY to Response to Motion re 199 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Lemuria Communications, Inc. filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
January 9, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov re 217 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 and Motion f Notice of Scrivener's Error (Munn, Janet)
January 9, 2012 Filing 218 MOTION for Hearing re 217 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 and Motion f Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Hearing on January 13, 2012 at the Upcoming Status Conference of Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Expert Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
January 9, 2012 Filing 217 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov to Strike Plaintiffs' Putative "Rebuttal" Report of Dr. Richard Waterman Before the Close of Expert Discovery on January 17, 2012 and Motion for Expedited Briefing and Hearing at the Upcoming Status Conference on January 13, 2012 by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Responses due by 1/26/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Munn, Janet)
January 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 216 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (tpe)
January 9, 2012 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 215 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (tpe)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF ANDREI IANAKOV; terminating 184 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 1/5/2012. (lh)
January 5, 2012 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 200 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PARTICULAR SOURCE CODE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
January 5, 2012 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 199 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Lemuria Communications, Inc.. (Munn, Janet)
January 5, 2012 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to Motion re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF TITOV DEPOISITION EXHIBIT 27 (public version) filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven B. Fabrizio in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the production of Titov deposition Exhibit 27 (public version))(Stetson, Karen)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 1/13/2012 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/5/2012. (lh)
January 4, 2012 Filing 209 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 184 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of [REDACTED] NOTICE OF FILING "STIPULATION AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF ANDREI IANAKOV" AND PROPOSED ORDER ADOPTING SAME (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Joint Stipulation and Notice of Withdrawal Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Andrei Ianakov, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
January 4, 2012 Filing 208 NOTICE by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov re 190 Memorandum, of the Withdrawal of Exhibit "D" Filed In Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Andrei Ianakov [D.E. #190] and Notice of the Substitution and Filing of the Correct Exhibit "D" to Defendants' Memorandum of Law (Munn, Janet)
December 27, 2011 Filing 207 MOTION for Hearing re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] Request of Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corp.'s for Hearing or Oral Argument on Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.'s Motion to Compel Titov Deposition Exhibit 27 by Hotfile Corp.. (Munn, Janet)
December 27, 2011 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] by Hotfile Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Munn, Janet)
December 27, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 205 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 27, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 204 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 27, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 203 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 27, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 202 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Substitute newly Redacted Versions of Motion to Compel Deposition of Andrei Ianakov. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 12/27/2011. (mao)
December 23, 2011 Filing 200 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PARTICULAR SOURCE CODE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Duane C. Pozza in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
December 23, 2011 Filing 199 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Duane C. pozza in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
December 23, 2011 Filing 198 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER (DE 133) AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DE 157) re 157 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 133 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
December 22, 2011 Attorney Jennifer V. Yeh representing Disney Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff) Activated per Order 197 . (lh)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 194 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 12/22/2011. (lh)
December 22, 2011 Filing 196 WITHDRAWAL of Motion to File Documents Under Seal (DE 186) (Stetson, Karen)
December 22, 2011 Filing 195 Plaintiff's MOTION To Substitute Newly Redacted Versions of Motion to Compel the Deposition of Andrei Ianakov in Place of Publicly Filed Versions re 184 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of [REDACTED] by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit Attachment D, # 5 Exhibit Attachment E, # 6 Exhibit Attachment F, # 7 Exhibit Attachment G, # 8 Exhibit Attachment H, # 9 Exhibit Attachment I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
December 20, 2011 Filing 194 MOTION for Limited to Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Jennifer V. Yeh. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 30435. (ksa)
December 20, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 193 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 20, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 192 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying 188 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing of Attorney Jennifer V. Yeh Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jennifer Yeh.. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/19/2011. (lh)
December 19, 2011 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 184 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of [REDACTED] Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Andrei Ianakov by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit 2)(Munn, Janet)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Setting Status Conference on all pending referred motions. Status Conference set for 1/13/2012 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 12/19/2011. (mao)
December 14, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 187 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 14, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 186 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 13, 2011 Filing 188 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Jennifer V. Yeh. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 29905. (cw)
December 13, 2011 Filing 185 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 184 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of [REDACTED] >NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATIO N OF LUKE PLATZER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luke Platzer in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition (DE 184), # 2 Exhibit A (PUBLIC VERSION), # 3 Exhibit B (PUBLIC VERSION), # 4 Exhibit C (PUBLIC VERSION), # 5 Exhibit D (PUBLIC VERSION), # 6 Exhibit E (PUBLIC VERSION0, # 7 Exhibit F (PUBLIC VERSION))(Stetson, Karen)
December 13, 2011 Filing 184 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Deposition of [REDACTED] by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted))(Stetson, Karen)
December 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 183 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 182 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
December 12, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] >NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF LUKE PLATZER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luke Platzer in Support of Warner's Motion to Compel (DE 180), # 2 Exhibit A (PUBLIC VERSION), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (PUBLIC VERSION))(Stetson, Karen)
December 12, 2011 Filing 180 MOTION to Compel the Production of Titov Deposition Ex. 27 [REDACTED] by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying 164 Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation ; granting 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 12/1/2011. (lw1)
November 30, 2011 Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2011 re 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law filed by Hotfile Corp., and 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. **Telephonic Appearances: Steven Fabrizio, Esq. and Luke Platzer, Esq. present on behalf of all of the Plaintiffs (Disney Enterprises, Inc., et al). Roderick Thompson, Esq., Andrew Leibnitz, Esq. and Janet Munn, Esq. present on behalf of Defendants (Hotfile Corp., et al). Motions addressed. Oral arguments heard. Court grants 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION, consistent with ruling stated in open court. Court denies without prejudice 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation by Hotfile Corp., consistent with ruling stated in open court. Order to follow. (Digital 14:59:09.) (Time: 3:00PM-3:50PM) (lw1)
November 28, 2011 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re 162 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEFERRING DAMAGES DISCOVERY re 133 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
November 28, 2011 Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
November 28, 2011 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law Reply of Defendant/Counterclaimant Hotfile Corporation to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment's Response In Opposition to Hotfile's Motion to Compel Warner to Produce Takedown Investigations filed by Hotfile Corp.. (Munn, Janet)
November 28, 2011 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM of Law re 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION Corrected Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Depose Anton Titov Individually and as Hotfile's Rule 30(b)(6) Witness For Over Four Days; and Defendants' Cross-Motion for Protective Order Limiting the Depositions of Hotfile Witnesses Including Mr. Titov by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 170 Motion for Telephonic Appearance at November 30, 2011 Hearing. The parties shall contact Chambers at 305/523-5710 at 3:00p.m. This entry constitutes the paperless order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 11/28/2011. (mao)
November 25, 2011 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luke Platzer in Support of Warner's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Stetson, Karen)
November 25, 2011 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM of Law re 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Depose Anton Titov Individually and as Hotfile's Rule 30(b)(6) Witness For Over Four Days and Defendants' Cross-Motion for Protective Order Limiting the Depositions of Hotfile Witnesses Including Mr. Titov by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
November 23, 2011 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 169 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Unopposed Motion of Counter-Claimant Hotfile Corporation for the November 30, 2011 Hearing on Hotfile's Motion to Compel Discovery from Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. and Warner's Motion for One Additional Examination Day for Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hotfile Corporation to be Conducted Telephonically Rather Than In-Person by Hotfile Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law,and 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 11/21/2011. (mao)
November 21, 2011 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM of Law re 162 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEFERRING DAMAGES DISCOVERY re 133 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Defer Damages Discovery by Hotfile Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Munn, Janet)
November 21, 2011 Pursuant to DE#167 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION . Responses due by 11/25/2011 (dgj)
November 21, 2011 Filing 167 *Endorsed Order requiring an expedited response by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for One Additional Examination Day for the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hotfile Corporation 165 , and an expedited response by Plaintiffs to Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery 164 . The expedited responses shall be submitted to the Court by no later than Friday, November 25, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 11/21/2011. (mao)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law filed by Hotfile Corp., 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP Motions referred to William C. Turnoff. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/18/11. (tp)
November 16, 2011 Filing 165 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR ONE ADDITIONAL EXAMINATION DAY FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HOTFILE CORPORATION by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
November 16, 2011 Filing 164 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. of Warner's Takedown Investigation and Memorandum of Law by Hotfile Corp.. Responses due by 12/5/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Munn, Janet)
November 7, 2011 Filing 163 ANSWER to Counterclaim ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC. TO HOTFILE CORP.'S SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc..(Stetson, Karen)
November 7, 2011 Filing 162 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEFERRING DAMAGES DISCOVERY re 133 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 161 Second Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. by Hotfile Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Munn, Janet)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/27/2011. (lh)
October 26, 2011 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 155 Order on Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law for Two-Day Enlargement of Time to Amend Counterclaim filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
October 26, 2011 Filing 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 155 Order on Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law for Two-Day Enlargement of Time to Amend Counterclaim by Hotfile Corp.. Responses due by 11/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/21/2011. (lh)
October 20, 2011 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time EXTENSION OF DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF NO. 133) TO COMPLETE EXPERT REPORTS AND EXPERT DISCOVERY re 133 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 151 Motion to Voluntary Dismissal of Second and Third Counts of Hotfil's First Amended Counterclaim and for Amendment of First Count and for Extending Time to Answer;. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/4/2011. (dj)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Scheduling Mediation: Mediation Hearing set for 1/9/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/4/2011. (lk)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/4/2011. (dj)
September 29, 2011 Filing 152 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order of August 30, 2011 by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 133 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
September 22, 2011 Filing 151 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 144 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Voluntary Dismissal of Second and Third Counts and for Amendment of First Count by Hotfile Corp., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
September 22, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE of Compliance With the Court's Order of August 30, 2011 by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 133 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, (Munn, Janet)
September 22, 2011 Filing 149 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion and Memorandum of Law for Enlargement of Time to Provide Discovery and to File Motion to Amend Complaint or Join Parties by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
September 19, 2011 Filing 148 Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge. Cae reassigned to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (vp)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/14/2011. (lh)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/14/2011. (lh)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/14/2011. (lh)
September 12, 2011 Filing 144 First Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Hotfile Corp. by Hotfile Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Munn, Janet)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings, Judge Adalberto Jordan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/12/2011. (vp)
September 9, 2011 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Duane C. Pozza in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel from Lemuria, # 2 Exhibit A to Declartion of Duane C. Pozza, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Duane C. Pozza)(Stetson, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Support re 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
September 1, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Compliance Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with the Court's Order of September 1, 2011 (DE 136) by Disney Enterprises, Inc. re 136 Order Cancelling Deadline/Hearing (Stetson, Karen)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 9/1/2011. (lh)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaim. Responses due by 9/19/2011. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/31/2011. (lh)
September 1, 2011 Filing 136 Order Cancelling 9/20/2011 Hearing before Magistrate Judge O'Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 9/1/2011. (mkr)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law, 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC., 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES, 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2011 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/31/2011. (mkr) Modified from AM to PM on 9/1/2011 (ls).
August 30, 2011 Filing 134 Discovery Procedure For Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/30/2011. (lh)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE: ( Trial set for 6/4/2012 before Judge Adalberto Jordan., Calendar Call set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Adalberto Jordan., Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2011., Discovery due by 12/23/2011., Expert Discovery due by 12/23/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 10/7/2011., Motions due by 1/23/2012., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/15/2012.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/13/2012.), ORDER REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/30/2011. (lh)
August 29, 2011 Filing 132 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 121 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Agreed Motion of Plaintiffs for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Counterclaim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
August 26, 2011 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stetson, Karen)
August 26, 2011 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES and Memorandum of Law filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Munn, Janet)
August 26, 2011 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES and Memorandum of Law filed by Lemuria Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Munn, Janet)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/26/2011. (lh)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Authorize Use of Categorical Privilege Logs. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/26/2011. (lh)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to serve a motion to compel on or before September 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/23/2011. (lh)
August 23, 2011 Filing 125 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report -Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/5/2011. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/23/2011. (lh)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying as moot 31 Motion for Hearing; denying 70 Motion for Hearing; denying as moot 71 Motion for Hearing; granting 115 Motion to authorize use of categorical privilege logs in place of the public redated versions. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/23/2011. (lh)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law, 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC., 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES. Responses due by 8/26/2011, Replies due by 9/9/2011. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 8/23/2011. (lh)
August 22, 2011 Filing 122 Anton Titov's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses by Anton Titov.(Munn, Janet)
August 22, 2011 Filing 121 Defendant Hotfile Corporation's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. by Hotfile Corp..(Munn, Janet)
August 22, 2011 Filing 120 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Motion to Compel With Respect to "Plaintiffs' Consolidated Responses and Objections to Defendant Hotfile Corp.'s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Hotfile Corp.. Responses due by 9/9/2011 (Munn, Janet)
August 17, 2011 Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law, 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC., 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES Joint Motion and Memorandum of Law of Plaintiffs, Defendants, and Non-Party Lemuria Communications, Inc. for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to Pending Motions to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 108, 110, 111) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
August 12, 2011 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stetson, Karen)
August 8, 2011 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 7-8-11 before Judge Adalberto Jordan, 1-21 pages, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-523-5568/Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (fs)
August 5, 2011 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES and Memorandum of Law filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Munn, Janet)
August 5, 2011 Filing 115 Plaintiff's MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF MOTION TO AUTHORIZE USE OF CATEGORICAL PRIVILEGE LOGS (DE 91) AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION (DE 92) IN PLACE OF PUBLIC REDACTED VERSIONS-- re 92 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 91 Motion to Authorize use of Categorical Privilege Logs and Memorandum of Law in Support by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
August 5, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. --PLAINTIFFS' AND THE MPAA'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' AND THE MPAA'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DE 96)--(Note: CM/ECF system does not display DE 96, a sealed docket entry, in a manner which will allow this Notice to be linked to DE 96) (Stetson, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. --PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER SEAL-- (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C)(Stetson, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES --NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL-- (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (DE 110), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Stetson, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 111 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery from Plaintiffs and Memorandum of Law by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Munn, Janet)
August 3, 2011 Filing 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Stetson, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. --NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL-- (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (DE 108), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Stetson, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY LEMURIA COMMUNICATIONS, INC. by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Stetson, Karen)
July 27, 2011 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 Motion to Authorize use of Categorical Privilege Logs and Memorandum of Law in Support -- PLAINTIFFS' AND THE MPAA'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AUTHORIZE USE OF CATEGORICAL PRIVILEGE LOGS -- filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
July 22, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES --NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF LUKE C. PLATZER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (DE 104) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF LUKE C. PLATZER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Stetson, Karen)
July 22, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES -NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DE 104))(Stetson, Karen)
July 22, 2011 Filing 104 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTIPIRACY INVESTIGATIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to file motions to compel on or before August 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 7/21/2011. (lh)
July 20, 2011 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 91 Motion to Authorize use of Categorical Privilege Logs and Memorandum of Law in Support (Public Redacted Version) by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
July 15, 2011 Filing 101 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Stetson, Karen)
July 15, 2011 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Selected Motions to Compel and for Defendants to File Their Answers and Counterclaims and Memorandum of Law by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 8/1/2011 (Munn, Janet)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal 75 , 78 , 89 , but they shall file redacted versions in the public record as indicated at the last hearing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 7/13/2011. (nc)
July 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 98 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 97 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 96 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
July 8, 2011 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Adalberto Jordan: Status Conference held on 7/8/2011. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-523-5568 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov (mc1)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 51 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 7/8/2011. (lh)
July 7, 2011 Filing 93 Clerks Notice to Filer re 91 Redacted Document,,. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lh)
July 6, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 91 Redacted Document,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Declaration of Luke C. Platzer in Support of Plaintiffs' and the MPAA's Motion to Authorize Use of Categorical Privilege Logs (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luke C. Platzer in Support of Plaintiffs' and the MPAA's Motion to Authorize Use of Categorical Privilege Logs (Public Redacted Version), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Stetson, Karen)
July 6, 2011 Filing 91 REDACTION MOTION Plaintiffs' and the MPAA's Motion to Authorize Use of Categorical Privilege Logs and Memorandum of Law in Support (Public Redacted Version) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' and the MPAA's Motion to Authorize Use of Categorical Privilege Logs)(Stetson, Karen) Modified to convert document to a motion on 7/7/2011 (lh).
June 28, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 90 restricted/sealed until further notice. (vp)
June 28, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 89 restricted/sealed until further notice. (vp)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying without prejudice 69 Motion to modify the discovery deadlines. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/27/2011. (lh)
June 24, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 85 Reply to Response to Motion,, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING REPLY DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit REPLY DECLARATION OF DUANE C. POZZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I (public redacted version))(Stetson, Karen)
June 24, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 85 Reply to Response to Motion,, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING REPLY DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit REPLY DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL, # 2 Exhibit A)(Stetson, Karen)
June 24, 2011 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version)Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version) PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/8/2011 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Adalberto Jordan.. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/23/2011. (ls)
June 20, 2011 Filing 83 Clerks Notice to Filer re 80 Memorandum,,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#82]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
June 17, 2011 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. See image at DE 80 (lk)
June 17, 2011 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM of Law re 72 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version)Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version) Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit 2, # 18 Exhibit 3, # 19 Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
June 17, 2011 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support re 70 MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Munn, Janet)
June 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 79 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
June 13, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 78 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
June 10, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 76 Response in Opposition to Motion,, NOTICE FILING DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SPECIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA IN SUPPORT OF DE # 76 (PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SPECIAL SCHEDULING ORDER), # 2 Exhibit A (public version), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (public version), # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Stetson, Karen)
June 10, 2011 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SPECIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
June 1, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 75 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
May 31, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 72 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version)Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version) NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G (public redacted version))(Stetson, Karen)
May 31, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 72 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version)Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version) NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL)(Stetson, Karen)
May 31, 2011 Filing 72 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES (Public Redacted Version) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 6/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
May 27, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Hearing Request of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Hearing or Oral Argument on Their Motion for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
May 27, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum of Law of Defendants Hotfile Corporation and Anton Titov for Special Scheduling Order Regarding the Safe Harbor Protections of the Digital Millenium Copyright Act by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
May 27, 2011 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to bring discovery motions JOINT MOTION OF THE PARTIES FOR STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO BRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Stetson, Karen)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED ORDER granting 66 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 5/18/2011. (lk)
May 12, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. NOTICE OF FILING JOINT PROPOSED ESI PLAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JOINT PROPOSED ESI PLAN)(Stetson, Karen)
May 12, 2011 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Protective Order JOINT MOTION OF PLAINITFFS AND DEFENDANTS FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 5/2/2011. (lh)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel M. Mandil terminated, Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Daniel Mandil. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 4/26/2011. (lh)
April 25, 2011 Filing 64 Agreed MOTION of Valentin Gurvits to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 17867. (ksa)
April 21, 2011 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION for Hearing re 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
April 21, 2011 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF CERTIFICATION FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/19/2011. (lh)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Preserve Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/19/2011. (tmi)
April 18, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 54 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1, SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 NOTICE OF FILING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER)(Stetson, Karen)
April 18, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Striking NOTICE OF STRIKING DOCKET ENTRY 55 by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Stetson, Karen)
April 18, 2011 Filing 56 Clerks Notice to Filer re 55 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (lh)
April 15, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 54 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1, SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 NOTICE JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Stetson, Karen)
April 15, 2011 Filing 54 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Stetson, Karen)
April 14, 2011 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Hearing re 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
April 14, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Stetson, Karen)
March 31, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Hearing re 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet)
March 31, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS HOTFILE CORPORATION AND ANTON TITOV TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Responses due by 4/18/2011 (Munn, Janet)
March 23, 2011 Filing 49 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Daniel M. Mandil. by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Karen)
March 18, 2011 Filing 48 REPORT REGARDING JOINT REPORT ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Stetson, Karen)
March 13, 2011 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference Hearing Transcript on Plaintiff's Motion Prohibiting Spoliation & Preserve Evidence held on 3/7/11 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-34 pages, Court Reporter: Jerald M. Meyers, 954-431-4757 / crjm@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(hh)
March 8, 2011 Filing 46 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 45 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (dgj)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER following status conference on 14 PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE.Status report due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/7/2011. (tmi) Modified text/hearing date on 3/8/2011 (dgj).
March 7, 2011 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Status Conference held on 3/7/2011, Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2011 re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Digital 11:03:25.) (nf)
March 4, 2011 Reset Answer Due Deadline per Order 34 : Hotfile Corp. response due 3/31/2011; Anton Titov response due 3/31/2011. (lh)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time To respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/3/2011. (lh)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/3/2011. (dj)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Status Conference:( Status Conference set for 3/7/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 3/3/2011. (tmi)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/2/2011. (lk)
March 2, 2011 Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re 31 MOTION for Hearing re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (lk)
March 1, 2011 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit REPLY DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER)(Stetson, Karen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Striking 36 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP NOTICE OF STRIKING DE# 36 by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Stetson, Karen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF REPLY)(Stetson, Karen)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP; Motions referred to Chris M. McAliley. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/1/2011. (lh)
February 28, 2011 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION of Anthony P. Schoenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14694. (ksa)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/28/2011. (lh)
February 28, 2011 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Complaint and for Date by Which Parties Shall Conduct Rule 26 and Rule 16 Conference re 1 Complaint, by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Responses due by 3/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Munn, Janet)
February 28, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Hearing re 14 Plaintiffs' "Emergency" Motion for Order Prohibiting Spoliation and to Preserve Evidence by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Munn, Janet) Modified link on 3/2/2011 (lk).
February 28, 2011 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Munn, Janet)
February 24, 2011 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION of N. Andrew Leibnitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14549. (ksa)
February 24, 2011 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION of Janel Thamkul to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14550. (ksa)
February 24, 2011 Filing 27 Agreed MOTION of Roderick M. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14548. (ksa)
February 24, 2011 Filing 26 Agreed MOTION of Deepak Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14547. (ksa)
February 24, 2011 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hotfile Corp. (Munn, Janet)
February 23, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Daniel M. Mandil. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14468. (ksa)
February 23, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Karen R. Thorland. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14469. (ksa)
February 23, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet T. Munn on behalf of Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov (Munn, Janet)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, ( Responses due by 2/28/2011). Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/23/2011. (lh)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Adalberto Jordan for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/23/11. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/22/2011. (lh)
February 23, 2011 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE. Emergency Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - Emergency matters may not be filed electronically, they must be filed in the conventional paper format in the division where the judge is chambered. The Clerk contacted Chambers and corrected the docket text to indicate the document is an emergency matter. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules. (lh)
February 23, 2011 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re 11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 12 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#17]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lh)
February 22, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUANE POZZA IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y)(Stetson, Karen)
February 22, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF IAN FOSTER)(Stetson, Karen)
February 22, 2011 Filing 14 Plaintiff's EMERGENCY MOTION to Preserve Evidence PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW, # 2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER PROHIBITING SPOLIATION, # 3 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE)(Stetson, Karen) Modified on 2/23/2011 (lh).
February 22, 2011 Filing 13 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Stetson, Karen)
February 18, 2011 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Hotfile Corp. served on 2/8/2011, answer due 3/1/2011; Anton Titov served on 2/8/2011, answer due 3/1/2011. (lh)see DE 11 , 12
February 18, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 4 Summons Issued Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Proof of Service on Anton Titov (Stetson, Karen)
February 18, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. re 4 Summons Issued Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Proof of Service on Hotfile Corp. (Stetson, Karen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Steven B. Fabrizio. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 13991. (ksa)
February 11, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Appeareance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Luke C. Platzer. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 13990. (ksa)
February 11, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Duane C. Pozza. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 13989. (ksa)
February 8, 2011 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Stetson, Karen)
February 8, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE by Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. AO121 COPYRIGHT OFFICE NOTICE (Stetson, Karen)
February 8, 2011 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case - Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vjk)
February 8, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. (vjk)
February 8, 2011 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (vjk)
February 8, 2011 Filing 2 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton (vjk)
February 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against Hotfile Corp., Anton Titov. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3500659, filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit NOTICE OF SIMILAR ACTION)(Stetson, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disney Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Hotfile Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B. Fabrizio
Represented By: Luke C. Platzer
Represented By: Duane C. Pozza
Represented By: Karen Linda Stetson
Represented By: Karen R. Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Steven B. Fabrizio
Represented By: Luke C. Platzer
Represented By: Duane C. Pozza
Represented By: Karen Linda Stetson
Represented By: Karen R. Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal City Studios Productions LLLP
Represented By: Steven B. Fabrizio
Represented By: Luke C. Platzer
Represented By: Duane C. Pozza
Represented By: Karen Linda Stetson
Represented By: Karen R. Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B. Fabrizio
Represented By: Luke C. Platzer
Represented By: Duane C. Pozza
Represented By: Karen Linda Stetson
Represented By: Karen R. Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Steven B. Fabrizio
Represented By: Luke C. Platzer
Represented By: Duane C. Pozza
Represented By: Karen Linda Stetson
Represented By: Karen R. Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotfile Corp.
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Valentin Gurvits
Represented By: N. Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg
Represented By: Janel Thamkul
Represented By: Roderick M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Titov
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Valentin Gurvits
Represented By: N. Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg
Represented By: Janel Thamkul
Represented By: Roderick M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?