Wollschlaeger et al v. Farmer et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Bernd Wollschlaeger, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack and Shannon Fox-Levine
Defendant: Rick Scott, Kurt S. Browning, Frank Farmer, Elizabeth Dudek, Lucy Gee, George Thomas, Jason Rosenberg, Zachariah P. Zachariah, Elisabeth Tucker, Trina Espinola, Merle Stringer, James Orr, Gary Winchester, Nabil El Sanadi, Robert Nuss, Onelia Lage, Fred Bearison, Donald Mullins, Brigitte Rivera Goersch and Bradley Levine
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc., Broward County Medical Association, Broward County Pediatric Society, Palm Beach County Medical Society, Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc., Early Childhood Initiative Foundation and University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic
Case Number: 1:2011cv22026
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Presiding Judge: William C. Turnoff
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/14/2011. (tm)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 75 Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum and Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants failed to comply with Local Rule 7.1(A)(3), which requires counsel to confer in good faith before filing any motions other than those specifically exempt. The parties should take very seriously their obligations under Local Rule 7.1(A)(3) to confer in good faith in an attempt to resolve issues prior to seeking judicial intervention. Moreover, Plaintiffs' memorandum did not improperly exceed the scope of an acceptable supplemental brief. Plaintiffs provided additional information in support of arguments they made in their prior motions and at the hearing before me. The only "new argument" Plaintiffs raised was a rebuttal of a new argument Defendants set forth in their own supplemental memorandum. Striking the Plaintiffs memorandum is not warranted. I also find these issues have been fully briefed and additional argument is unnecessary. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/14/2011. (scy)
August 15, 2011 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 75 MOTION to Strike plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum MOTION for Leave to File by Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Giuliano, Douglas)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER granting 76 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report within five days of this Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/10/2011. (scy)
August 8, 2011 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Scheduling Report by Bernd Wollschlaeger. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Douglas)
July 27, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION to Strike re 71 plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum by Frank Farmer. Responses due by 8/15/2011 (Vail, Jason) Added MOTION for Leave to File response on 7/28/2011 (mg).
July 22, 2011 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fred Bearison, Kurt S. Browning, Elizabeth Dudek, Nabil El Sanadi, Trina Espinola, Frank Farmer, Lucy Gee, Onelia Lage, Bradley Levine, Donald Mullins, Robert Nuss, James Orr, Brigitte Rivera Goersch, Jason Rosenberg, Rick Scott, Merle Stringer, George Thomas, Elisabeth Tucker, Gary Winchester, Zachariah P. Zachariah. (Vail, Jason)
July 19, 2011 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Giuliano, Douglas)
July 19, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall C. Marshall on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc., Broward County Medical Association, Broward County Pediatric Society, Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc., Early Childhood Initiative Foundation, Palm Beach County Medical Society, University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic (Marshall, Randall)
July 19, 2011 Filing 71 SUPPLEMENT to 49 Response/Reply (Other) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Fred Bearison, Kurt S. Browning, Elizabeth Dudek, Nabil El Sanadi, Trina Espinola, Frank Farmer, Lucy Gee, Onelia Lage, Bradley Levine, Donald Mullins, Robert Nuss, James Orr, Brigitte Rivera Goersch, Jason Rosenberg, Rick Scott, Merle Stringer, George Thomas, Elisabeth Tucker, Gary Winchester, Zachariah P. Zachariah (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Vail, Jason)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/19/2011. (scy)
July 19, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon McRae Mead, Jr on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc., Broward County Medical Association, Broward County Pediatric Society, Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc., Early Childhood Initiative Foundation, Palm Beach County Medical Society, University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic (Mead, Gordon)
July 19, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald Edward Greenberg on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc., Broward County Medical Association, Broward County Pediatric Society, Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc., Early Childhood Initiative Foundation, Palm Beach County Medical Society, University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic (Greenberg, Gerald)
July 19, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc., Broward County Medical Association, Broward County Pediatric Society, Palm Beach County Medical Society, Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc., Early Childhood Initiative Foundation, University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Julin, Thomas)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles J. Cooper, David H. Thompson, Brian S. Koukoutchos, and Peter A. Patterson, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 7/14/11. (lml) Modified signature date on 7/18/2011 (wc).
July 14, 2011 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 07/13/2011 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke, 1-54 pages, Court Reporter: Judy Shelton, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Shelton@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2011. (jsn)
July 13, 2011 Filing 66 Paperless Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/13/2011. All counsel present. Court Reporter: Judy Shelton, 305-523-5294 / Judy_Shelton@flsd.uscourts.gov (im)
July 11, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING by Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (abe)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED ORDER Denying 36 National Rifle Association's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/11/2011. (scy)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Change Style of Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/11/2011. (scy)
July 11, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Writ or order requiring amendment to case style filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. Replies due by 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mullins, Edward)
July 11, 2011 Filing 59 Order Vacating 55 Order on Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/11/2011. (scy)
July 8, 2011 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Reply by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Manheim, Jr.)(Mullins, Edward)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae. The National Rifle Association's motion for leave to file an amicus brief is granted. The National Rifle Association's motion to participate in the July 13, 2011 hearing is denied. This Court will take into consideration the NRA's arguments, as set forth in their brief. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/8/2011. (scy)
July 8, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Writ or order requiring amendment to case style by Frank Farmer. Responses due by 7/25/2011 (Vail, Jason)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 36 National Rifle Association's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/8/2011. (tm)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting 53 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a Consolidated Reply in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed 15 pages in length. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/7/2011. (scy)
July 7, 2011 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Their Consolidated Reply to the Opposition filed with the National Rifle Association's Motion for Leave to Participate Amicus Curiae and Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
July 5, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Leave to File /Participate as Amicus Curiae and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
July 5, 2011 Filing 51 RESPONSE/REPLY to 48 Response in Opposition to Motion, 36 Proposed MOTION to Intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, MEMORANDUM in Support by National Rifle Association. (Cesarano, Gregory)
July 5, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File /Participate as Amicus Curiae and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by National Rifle Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cesarano, Gregory)
July 5, 2011 Filing 49 RESPONSE/REPLY to 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Frank Farmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Vail, Jason)
July 1, 2011 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 Proposed MOTION to Intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Mullins, Edward)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Manheim, Esq., Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Esq., Augustin Ripa, Esq., and Julia Lewis, Esq., Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 6/30/11. (lml)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan E. Lowy, Esq., Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Vice, Esq., Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 6/30/11. (lml)
June 28, 2011 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Support re 36 Proposed MOTION to Intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Frank Farmer. (Vail, Jason)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule. Responses on 36 Motion to Intervene shall be filed on or before July 1, 2011. Replies shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/28/2011. (scy)
June 27, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for the Admission of Charles J. Cooper, David H. Thompson, Brian S. Koukoutchos, and Peter A. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 300.00. Receipt # 21060. (ksa)
June 27, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Vail on behalf of Frank Farmer (Vail, Jason)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER setting hearing on 16 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2011, at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/27/2011. (scy)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting 32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Hearing. A hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for July 13, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/27/2011. (scy)
June 27, 2011 Filing 39 *Endorsed Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before July 5, 2011, at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file a Reply on or before July 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/27/2011. (scy)
June 27, 2011 Filing 38 Proposed MOTION to Expedite and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by National Rifle Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cesarano, Gregory)
June 27, 2011 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Rifle Association (Cesarano, Gregory)
June 27, 2011 Filing 36 Proposed MOTION to Intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by National Rifle Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cesarano, Gregory)
June 27, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Morgen Cesarano on behalf of National Rifle Association (Cesarano, Gregory)
June 24, 2011 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Fred Bearison, Nabil El Sanadi, Trina Espinola, Onelia Lage, Bradley Levine, Donald Mullins, Robert Nuss, James Orr, Brigitte Rivera Goersch, Jason Rosenberg, Merle Stringer, Elisabeth Tucker, Gary Winchester, Zachariah P. Zachariah. (abe)
June 24, 2011 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to George Thomas. (abe) (Main Document 33 replaced on 6/27/2011) (abe).
June 24, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for Hearing re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Katherine Welty. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. June Leland. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Stanley Sack. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Roland Gutierrez. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. N. Lawrence Edwards. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Lance Goodman. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Elizabeth King. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Shannon Fox-Levine. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Bernd Wollschlaeger. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Tommy Schechtman. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Judith Schaechter, M.D.. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Bruce Manheim, Jr., Esq.. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Robert Raspa. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Stuart Himmelstein. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Lisa Cosgrove. re 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law - Declaration - by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Shannon Fox-Levine, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Judith Schaechter, Tommy Schechtman, Bernd Wollschlaeger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
June 24, 2011 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Elizabeth Dudek, Frank Farmer, George Thomas, Jason Rosenberg, Zachariah P. Zachariah, Elisabeth Tucker, Trina Espinola, Merle Stringer, James Orr, Gary Winchester, Nabil El Sanadi, Robert Nuss, Onelia Lage, Fred Bearison, Donald Mullins, Brigitte Rivera Goersch, Bradley Levine, filed by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter, Roland Gutierrez, Stanley Sack, Shannon Fox-Levine.(Mullins, Edward)
June 17, 2011 Filing 14 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/16/2011. (tm)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff for Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/16/2011. (tm)
June 14, 2011 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. Rick Scott served on 6/9/2011, answer due 6/30/2011. (Mullins, Edward)
June 14, 2011 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. Kurt S. Browning served on 6/9/2001, answer due 6/30/2001. (Mullins, Edward)
June 14, 2011 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. Elizabeth Dudek served on 6/9/2011, answer due 6/30/2011. (Mullins, Edward)
June 10, 2011 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. Frank Farmer served on 6/7/2011, answer due 6/28/2011. (Mullins, Edward)
June 10, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. Lucy Gee served on 6/7/2011, answer due 6/28/2011. (Mullins, Edward)
June 7, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION for the Admission of Bruce Manheim, Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Augustine Ripa, and Julia Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 300.00. Receipt # 19805. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel R. Vice. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19804. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan E. Lowy. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19803. (ksa)
June 7, 2011 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter (Mullins, Edward)
June 6, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kurt S. Browning, Elizabeth Dudek, Frank Farmer, Lucy Gee, Rick Scott. (yha)
June 6, 2011 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha)
June 6, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kurt S. Browning, Elizabeth Dudek, Frank Farmer, Lucy Gee, Rick Scott. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3812307, filed by American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc., Tommy Schechtman, Judith Schaechter, American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter, Bernd Wollschlaeger, American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Mullins, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wollschlaeger et al v. Farmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernd Wollschlaeger
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Schaechter
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Schechtman
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Academy of Pediatrics, Florida Chapter
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Academy of Family Physicians, Florida Chapter
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American College of Physicians, Florida Chapter, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Dennis Gary Kainen
Represented By: Julia Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lowy
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Bruce Manheim
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Augustine Ripa
Represented By: Daniel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Gutierrez
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Sack
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Fox-Levine
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt S. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Farmer
Represented By: Jason Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dudek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachariah P. Zachariah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Espinola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil El Sanadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onelia Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Bearison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigitte Rivera Goersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Broward County Medical Association
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Broward County Pediatric Society
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Palm Beach County Medical Society
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Children's Healthcare Is a Legal Duty, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Early Childhood Initiative Foundation
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: University of Miami School of Law Children and Youth Clinic
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Richard Julin
Represented By: Randall C. Marshall
Represented By: Gordon McRae Mead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?