Cifuentes et al v. Regions Bank
Plaintiff: Mirma Cifuentes and Aura Terese Cifuentes
Defendant: Regions Bank
Case Number: 1:2011cv23455
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Federico A. Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 - Diversity: Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS-ACTION SETTLEMENT, CLASS COUNSEL'S APPLICATION FOR SERVICE AWARDS, AND CLASS COUNSEL'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2014. (err)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/10/2013. (err)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Answer due by 7/11/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/19/2012. (mmz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cifuentes et al v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirma Cifuentes
Represented By: Lorenz Michel Pruss
Represented By: David Alan Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aura Terese Cifuentes
Represented By: David Alan Rothstein
Represented By: Lorenz Michel Pruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?