Regions Bank v. The 62' Ocean Sport Fish Hull I.D. No. XY001462J203 et al

Defendant: Class Action of South Florida, Inc., The 62' Ocean Sport Fish Hull I.D. No. XY001462J203, and John H. Ruiz
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Intervenor: NWYCM Charters, Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv20966
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Joan A. Lenard
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/21/2014. (mkr)
August 14, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment and requiring the parties to submit a joint proposed final judgment by 8/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/14/2014. (mkr)
January 6, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/6/2014. (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. The 62' Ocean Sport Fish Hull I.D. No. XY001462J203 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Class Action of South Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jill Barnet-Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 62' Ocean Sport Fish Hull I.D. No. XY001462J203,
Represented By: Karen Jill Barnet-Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Karen Jill Barnet-Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Patrick Edward Novak
Represented By: Nicolas Antonio Pelleya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NWYCM Charters, Inc
Represented By: Michael Ramer Karcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?