CORBACHO DAUDINOT v. PUIG VALDES et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT
Defendant: YASIEL PUIG VALDES and MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ
Case Number: 1:2013cv22589
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2015 88 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Motions terminated: 87 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, Voluntarily Without Prejudice persuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) filed by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot, 74 Second MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 filed by Maritza Valdes Gonzalez, Yasiel Puig Valdes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/22/2015. (ots) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
June 19, 2015 87 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, Voluntarily Without Prejudice persuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 7/9/2015 (Bravo, Kenia)
May 27, 2015 86 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37 (DE 74). The Court RESERVES ruling on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. The Court DENIED Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings (DE 85). Counsel of record present. Court Reporter: William Romanishin, 305-523-5558 / Bill_Romanishin@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
May 22, 2015 85 MOTION to Stay Proceedings due to Newly Discovered Evidence by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bravo, Kenia)
May 22, 2015 84 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER striking 83 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff has failed to comply with Local Rule 7.1(e) and has failed to make a reasonable effort to confer with Defendant prior to filing the motion pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(3). The Court notes that a hearing is scheduled in this matter for May 27, 2015 and the matters presented in the motion to stay do not necessitate an emergency motion. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/22/2015. (drh)
May 22, 2015 83 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Due to Newly Discovered Evidence That Defendant's Wrongdoing Has Prevented Plaintiff from Personally Litigating This Case in The United States by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (dj)
May 21, 2015 82 NOTICE by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot of Filing Newly Discovered Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Bravo, Kenia)
May 19, 2015 81 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Murai, Rene. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Bravo, Kenia)
May 18, 2015 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 Second MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 filed by Yasiel Puig Valdes, Maritza Valdes Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Andrews, Averil)
May 11, 2015 79 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 78 Motion to Continue. The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is hereby RESET for 5/27/2015 at 3:00 P.M. in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/11/2015. (drh)
May 11, 2015 78 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bravo, Kenia)
May 11, 2015 77 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 74 Second MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37: Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2015 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (drh)
May 8, 2015 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 Second MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 filed by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bravo, Kenia)
May 8, 2015 75 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 6-24-14 before Judge Kathleen M. Williams, 27 pages, Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (ps)
April 21, 2015 74 Second MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 by Yasiel Puig Valdes, Maritza Valdes Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Andrews, Averil)
April 14, 2015 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Discovery due by 4/29/2015. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/14/2015. (ots)
April 14, 2015 72 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for parties to exchange Expert Discovery by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 5/1/2015 (Bravo, Kenia)
January 30, 2015 71 PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2015 re [D.E. #63] Motion to Stay filed by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. The Court DENIED Plaintiff's motion to stay [D.E.#63]. Counsel of record present at hearing. Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
January 27, 2015 70 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 63 MOTION to Stay pending Plaintiff's Visa Proceedings. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2015 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (drh)
January 13, 2015 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re 63 MOTION to Stay pending Plaintiff's Visa Proceedings filed by Yasiel Puig Valdes, Maritza Valdes Gonzalez. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Andrews, Averil)
January 13, 2015 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 MOTION to Continue Mediation filed by Yasiel Puig Valdes, Maritza Valdes Gonzalez. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Andrews, Averil)
January 13, 2015 67 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff's appearance at the mediation scheduled on January 14, 2014 is excused with the understanding that Plaintiff's counsel has full authority to settle this matter. The mediation scheduled for January 14, 2014, shall go forward. The parties are expected to mediate in good-faith. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/13/2015. (drh)
January 9, 2015 66 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER: Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Continue Mediation 65 by 5:00 p.m. on January 12, 2015. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/9/2015. (drh)
January 9, 2015 65 EMERGENCY MOTION to Continue of Mediation by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (ots)
January 7, 2015 64 MOTION for Hearing re 63 MOTION to Stay pending Plaintiff's Visa Proceedings by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. (Bravo, Kenia)
January 7, 2015 63 MOTION to Stay pending Plaintiff's Visa Proceedings by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bravo, Kenia)
November 10, 2014 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 Regarding Fees and Costs Pursuant to Court's Instructions at Hearing on 11/5/14 by Yasiel Puig Valdes, Maritza Valdes Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Andrews, Averil)
November 5, 2014 61 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2014 re 52 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 filed by Maritza Valdes Gonzalez, Yasiel Puig Valdes. Order to follow. Counsel of record present at hearing. Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
November 5, 2014 60 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER denying 52 Motion for Sanctions. The Court reserves ruling on Defendants' motion for fees and costs. The deposition of Plaintiff must be scheduled and begin prior to January 14, 2015. Prior to his deposition, Plaintiff shall apprise Defendants that he has obtained a visa and shall notify Defendants when he arrives in the United States. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/5/2014. (drh)
October 31, 2014 59 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entry 56 by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot (Gonzalez, Avelino)
October 28, 2014 58 Clerks Notice to Filer re 56 Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (ots)
October 28, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Rene V. Murai, Mediation Hearing set for 1/14/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/28/2014. (ls)
October 28, 2014 56 STRICKEN PER DE 59 :NOTICE by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT of Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Bravo, Kenia) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ots).
October 27, 2014 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 Memorandum in Support filed by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
October 15, 2014 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Bravo, Kenia)
October 10, 2014 53 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37 [DE 52]. The Court hereby SETS a Hearing in this matter on November 5, 2014, at 1:00 p.m., before the undersigned in Room 11-3, United States District Court, 400 N. Miami Avenue, Miami, FL. (drh)
October 9, 2014 52 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 37 by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E)(Andrews, Averil)
October 2, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER re 50 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Miguel Angel Corbacho Daudinot; Parties shall select a Mediator and Jointly file a Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by 10/31/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/2/2014. (ls)
October 2, 2014 50 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Gonzalez, Avelino)
October 1, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/1/2014. (lh)
August 8, 2014 48 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
August 1, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/1/2014. (lbc)
July 31, 2014 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Averil Koenig Andrews on behalf of YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Attorney Averil Koenig Andrews added to party YASIEL PUIG VALDES(pty:dft), Attorney Averil Koenig Andrews added to party MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ(pty:dft). (Andrews, Averil)
July 31, 2014 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 24 Amended Complaint,, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
July 8, 2014 44 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer RE: Complaints. Defendants shall have until 8/1/2014 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/8/2014. (drh)
July 8, 2014 43 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 24 Amended Complaint,, Defendant's by YASIEL PUIG VALDES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Order Mot 4 Extension of Time)(Santini, Sean)
June 30, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE,AND ESTABLISHING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2015 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 11/10/2015 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2014., Discovery due by 6/19/2015., Expert Discovery due by 6/19/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2014., Mediation Deadline 7/17/2015., In Limine Motions due by 9/30/2015., Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2015., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/30/2015.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 7/17/2015., Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/30/2014. (lbc)
June 27, 2014 41 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joine Scheduling Report)(Bravo, Kenia)
June 25, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER. Denying 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 11/10/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Scheduling Report due by 6/27/2014., Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/24/2014. (lbc)
June 24, 2014 39 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2014 re 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint,, filed by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Order to follow. Counsel of record present at hearing. Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
June 3, 2014 38 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joine Scheduling Report)(Gonzalez, Avelino)
May 14, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER RE-SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT. Granting 35 Motion to Continue. Motion 28 Hearing set for 6/24/2014 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/13/2014. (lbc)
May 14, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/4/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/13/2014. (lbc)
May 13, 2014 35 Defendant's MOTION to Continue Oral Argument of 5-16-14 by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Responses due by 5/30/2014 (Santini, Sean)
May 12, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT re 28 Motion to Dismiss. Hearing set for 5/16/2014 03:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/11/2014. (lbc)
April 4, 2014 33 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff no longer assigned to case. (dm)
March 13, 2014 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint,, DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
March 7, 2014 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint,, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Bravo, Kenia)
February 18, 2014 30 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his Response by 3/10/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams (tm00)
February 18, 2014 29 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint,, by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Gonzalez, Avelino)
February 10, 2014 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint,, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Responses due by 2/27/2014 (Santini, Sean)
January 23, 2014 27 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to answer 24 Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer the Second Amended Complaint by February 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams (tm00)
January 22, 2014 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 Amended Complaint,, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
January 15, 2014 25 NOTICE by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT re 24 Amended Complaint,, OF FILING CORRECTED EXHIBIT D FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Avelino)
January 13, 2014 24 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Gonzalez, Avelino)
December 20, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2014. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/19/2013. (lbc)
December 2, 2013 22 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2013 re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, filed by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Order to follow. Counsel of record present at hearing Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov (ag)
November 7, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to [11} MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 12/2/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. PER DE 21 (lbc)
November 7, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Continue. Hearing reset for 12/2/2013 02:00 PM on DE 11 before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/6/2013. (lbc)
November 6, 2013 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Bravo, Kenia)
November 6, 2013 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Oral Argument that was set for November 25, 2013 by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Bravo, Kenia)
November 5, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT re 11 Motion to Dismiss. Hearing set for 11/25/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/5/2013. (lbc)
November 5, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 11/13/2013. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/5/2013. (lbc)
November 4, 2013 16 MOTION to Strike 15 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. Responses due by 11/21/2013 (Gonzalez, Avelino)
October 31, 2013 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, filed by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Santini, Sean)
October 23, 2013 14 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to 11 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have until October 31, 2013 to file their Reply. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/23/2013 (tm00)
October 23, 2013 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Santini, Sean)
October 14, 2013 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Gonzalez, Avelino)
September 30, 2013 11 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Amended Complaint, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Responses due by 10/18/2013 (Santini, Sean)
September 12, 2013 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Gonzalez, Avelino)
August 30, 2013 9 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint. Responses due by 9/12/2013. Replies due by 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams (tm00)
August 28, 2013 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Gonzalez, Avelino)
August 22, 2013 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, and Memorandum of Law by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Responses due by 9/9/2013 (Santini, Sean)
August 8, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants. Answer deadline August 22, 2013. (tm00)
August 8, 2013 6 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer RE: Complaints. All Defendants shall answer the Complaint by August 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams (tm00)
August 8, 2013 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint,, by YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. Attorney Sean R. Santini added to party YASIEL PUIG VALDES(pty:dft), Attorney Sean R. Santini added to party MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Santini, Sean)
July 22, 2013 4 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT (Gonzalez, Avelino)
July 18, 2013 3 Summons Issued as to YASIEL PUIG VALDES, MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ. (bb)
July 18, 2013 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (bb)
July 18, 2013 1 COMPLAINT UNDER THE TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-5898756, filed by MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U)(Gonzalez, Avelino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORBACHO DAUDINOT v. PUIG VALDES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ANGEL CORBACHO DAUDINOT
Represented By: Kenia Bravo
Represented By: Avelino Jose Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YASIEL PUIG VALDES
Represented By: Sean R. Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARITZA VALDES GONZALEZ
Represented By: Sean R. Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?