Espinoza et al v. Galardi South Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jaszmann Espinoza, Seleta Stanton, Tiffany Thompson, Douganna Ballard, Janice Bailey and Shanice Bain
Defendant: Galardi South Enterprises, Inc., Galardi South Enterprises Consulting, Inc., Fly Low Inc., Teri Galardi, Michael Kapp and Dennis Willliams
Case Number: 1:2014cv21244
Filed: April 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Jose E. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER on 196 Defendants' Partial Summary Judgment Motion on Certain Claims Arising Under the FLSA and Florida law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/10/2018. (jf00)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 OMNIBUS ORDER on Pending Motions Regarding the Florida Minimum Wage Act's Constitutionality 245 , 249 , and 253 , and Reopening the Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/12/2017. (jf00)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 198 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal. This case is hereby STAYED; all pending motions are hereby administratively suspended and all scheduled hearings are cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/5/2016. (tr00)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 178 Renewed Motion for Rule 23 Class Certification of State Law Minimum Wage Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/11/2016. (tr00)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying 166 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying 168 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/31/2015. (tr00)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Other Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/18/2014. (tr00)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 104 Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply wit the Court's August 13, 2014 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/16/2014. (tr00)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza et al v. Galardi South Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaszmann Espinoza
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seleta Stanton
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Thompson
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douganna Ballard
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Bailey
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanice Bain
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Harlan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galardi South Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galardi South Enterprises Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fly Low Inc.
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Daniel Wayne Matlow
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Galardi
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kapp
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Willliams
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: Susan Kastan Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?