Parker et al v. American Traffic Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Condon, Victor Devila, Joseph Ramos, Andre Booker, Xiomara Santos, Donna Check, Bart Gancher, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Cesar Couri, Steven Holtz, William Dean, Marwa Moussa, Lori Gosewich, Erik Bartenhagen, Natasha Gibson, James Walker, Marc Leonardo, Sharon Pruett, Bryan Silber, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Donald Crepeau, Eduardo Zeitune, Maria Suarez, Thomas Kornell, Evan Moretti, Patrick Russell, Jeremy Woodrum, Michael Shane, Taryn Pisaneschi, Michael Woodby, Marc Averette, Richard Powers, Christopher L. Parker, Charles Becker, Justina Lopez, Henry Kesner, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Jorge Isa, Ivan Simson, Peter Diamond, Jesus Poli, Scott Barrish, Ron Taylor, Ronda Hamilton, Adlai Green, Sandra Delonis, Selena Mead, Vincenzina Jackson, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, Nelson Rosa, Philip Levine, William Moore, Harold Goldberg, Evelyn Park, Raul Millian, Metria Jones, Donna Schneider, Ramchand Persaud, Brian Tewes, Angela Rodriguez, James Mirabelli and Leigh Nolan
Defendant: City of Clewiston, City of North Miami, City of Homestead, City of Miami, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Groveland, City of Temple Terrace, City of Hollywood, City of Gainesville, City of Palm Springs, City of North Bay Village, City of Miami Beach, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Fort Lauderdale, Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions, City of Coral Springs, City of Palm Coast, ATS Consolidated, Inc., City of Milton, City of Opa-Locka, Town of Medley, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., Village of El Portal, City of Winter Park, American Traffic Solutions, LLC, City of Doral, City of West Palm Beach, City of Boynton Beach, City of Oldsmar, City of Kenneth City, Orange County, City of Daytona Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Cocoa Beach, Polk County, City of Aventura, City of Holly Hill, City of Orlando, City of Palm Bay, City of Miami Gardens, City of St. Petersburg, City of Apopka, City of Pembroke Pines, Town of Surfside, City of Gulfport, City of Margate, Town of Cutler Bay, City of West Park, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Boca Raton, City of Tampa, Hillsborough County, City of Sarasota, City of Clermont, Miami-Dade County, Florida Department Of Revenue, Town of Davie, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Palatka, City of Sunrise, Clay County, City of Bradenton, Palm Beach County, City of Brandon, Manatee County, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Tamarac, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Port Richey, City of West Miami, American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, Town of Campbellton, Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue, Town of Orange Park, City of Lakeland, City of Sweetwater, City of Ocoee, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Tallahassee, Town of Juno Beach, City of Miami Springs, City of Coral Gables, Gatso USA, Inc., Broward County, Village of Palm Springs, City of South Pasadena, City of Hialeah, City of New Port Richey, Osceola County and City of Florida City
Intervenor Plaintiff: Adam Ehrlich, John Devany, Carole J Silverman and Annie Migdal
Intervenor: Jeffery Passman
Case Number: 1:2014cv24010
Filed: October 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Barry L Garber
Referring Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
May 29, 2018 Filing 404 STATUS REPORT (Twelfth) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #402 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for "Plaintiffs." Ashlee A. Pouncy is terminated as counsel for Defendant Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/2/2018. (koa)
March 28, 2018 Filing 402 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashlee A. Pouncy. by Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. Responses due by 4/11/2018 (Pouncy, Ashlee)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting #400 Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Certain Plaintiffs and as Putative Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/30/2018. (kcg)
January 29, 2018 Filing 400 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Patrick Montoya. by Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donald Crepeau, John Devany, Adam Ehrlich, Annie Migdal, James Mirabelli, Carole J Silverman. Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party Donald Crepeau(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party James Mirabelli(pty:pla). Responses due by 2/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montoya, Patrick)
December 29, 2017 Filing 399 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Herbert Zebersky on behalf of Jeffery Passman. Attorney Edward Herbert Zebersky added to party Jeffery Passman(pty:intv). (Zebersky, Edward)
December 29, 2017 Filing 398 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark S. Fistos. Attorney Mark S. Fistos added to party Christopher L. Parker(pty:pla). (Fistos, Mark)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #396 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/8/2017. (kcg)
July 26, 2017 Filing 396 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew I. Dayes by Andrew I. Dayes. by City of Brooksville, City of Clewiston, City of Florida City, City of Gulfport, City of Maitland, City of New Port Richey, City of Port Richey, City of Temple Terrace. Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Florida City(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Temple Terrace(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/9/2017 (Roper, Donovan)
June 13, 2017 Filing 395 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Stella on behalf of City of West Palm Beach. Attorney Anthony M. Stella added to party City of West Palm Beach(pty:dft). (Stella, Anthony)
May 16, 2017 Filing 394 STATUS REPORT (Eleventh) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 393 STATUS REPORT (TENTH) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
April 14, 2017 Filing 392 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kim Ngoc Phan on behalf of Palm Beach County. Attorney Kim Ngoc Phan added to party Palm Beach County(pty:dft). (Phan, Kim)
March 6, 2017 Filing 391 STATUS REPORT (Ninth) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
January 4, 2017 Filing 390 STATUS REPORT (Eighth) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
November 14, 2016 Filing 389 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) We grant Plaintiffs motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction and deny their motion for a frivolity determination and sanctions under Rule 38 re #349 Notice of Appeal, filed by City of Groveland, City of Palatka, City of Florida City, City of Brooksville, City of Coral Springs, City of Temple Terrace, Osceola County, City of West Palm Beach, City of Apopka, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City of New Port Richey, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Tamarac, City of Miami Springs, Palm Beach County, Town of Juno Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Aventura, Town of Orange Park, City of Hialeah, Town of Davie, City of Hollywood, City of Sweetwater, Hillsborough County, City of Oldsmar, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gulfport, City of Coral Gables, City of North Bay Village, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Boynton Beach, City of Miami, Manatee County, Village of El Portal, City of South Pasadena, City of Opa-Locka, City of Sunrise, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Palm Coast, City of Clermont, Town of Surfside, City of Orlando, City of Ocoee, Town of Medley, City of Miami Gardens, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Lakeland, Town of Cutler Bay, City of Holly Hill, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Homestead, City of St. Petersburg, City of Miami Beach, City of Margate, City of Sarasota, Village of Palm Springs, City of North Miami, Town of Campbellton, City of Daytona Beach, City of Port Richey, City of Clewiston, City of Doral, City of West Park, Orange County, City of Kenneth City, City of West Miami, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Milton, City of Hialeah Gardens, #344 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, filed by City of Groveland, City of Palatka, City of Florida City, City of Brooksville, City of Coral Springs, City of Temple Terrace, Osceola County, City of Apopka, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City of New Port Richey, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Tamarac, City of Miami Springs, Palm Beach County, Town of Juno Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Aventura, Town of Orange Park, Town of Davie, City of Hollywood, City of Sweetwater, Hillsborough County, City of Oldsmar, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gulfport, City of Coral Gables, City of North Bay Village, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Boynton Beach, Manatee County, City of Miami, Village of El Portal, City of South Pasadena, City of Opa-Locka, City of Sunrise, City of Palm Coast, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Clermont, Town of Surfside, City of Orlando, City of Ocoee, Town of Medley, City of Miami Gardens, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Lakeland, City of Holly Hill, Town of Cutler Bay, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Homestead, City of St. Petersburg, City of Margate, City of Sarasota, Village of Palm Springs, City of Port Richey, Town of Campbellton, City of Clewiston, City of Doral, City of West Park, City of Kenneth City, Orange County, City of West Miami, City of Milton, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Hialeah Gardens ; Date Issued: 11/14/2016 ; USCA Case Number: 15-13721-BB (amb)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AS MOOT #386 . Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/10/2016. (cgy)
November 3, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC re #386 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings -- Joint Notice of Filing Authorities Supporting Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (McCoy, Kevin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 386 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(McCoy, Kevin)
September 28, 2016 Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis terminated. SEE DE #385 ORDER (ail)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL #384 : Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis is terminated. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/26/2016. (cgy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 384 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jonathan DeSantis. by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 10/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas)
September 19, 2016 Filing 383 NOTICE by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC of Appearance. Attorney Nicholas Alexander Brown added to party ATS Consolidated, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Alexander Brown added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Alexander Brown added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Alexander Brown added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Brown, Nicholas)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL #380 , #381 : Attorney Edward R. McCarthy and Edward Soto terminated. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/15/2016. (cgy)
September 9, 2016 Filing 381 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward R. McCarthy. by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
September 9, 2016 Filing 380 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward Soto. by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
September 2, 2016 Filing 379 STATUS REPORT (Seventh) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. We grant Plaintiffs motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction and deny their motion for a frivolity determination and sanctions under Rule 38 re #349 Notice of Appeal, filed by City of Groveland, City of Palatka, City of Florida City, City of Brooksville, City of Coral Springs, City of Temple Terrace, Osceola County, City of West Palm Beach, City of Apopka, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City of New Port Richey, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Tamarac, City of Miami Springs, Palm Beach County, Town of Juno Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Aventura, Town of Orange Park, City of Hialeah, Town of Davie, City of Hollywood, City of Sweetwater, Hillsborough County, City of Oldsmar, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gulfport, City of Coral Gables, City of North Bay Village, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Boynton Beach, City of Miami, Manatee County, Village of El Portal, City of South Pasadena, City of Opa-Locka, City of Sunrise, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Palm Coast, City of Clermont, Town of Surfside, City of Orlando, City of Ocoee, Town of Medley, City of Miami Gardens, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Lakeland, Town of Cutler Bay, City of Holly Hill, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Homestead, City of St. Petersburg, City of Miami Beach, City of Margate, City of Sarasota, Village of Palm Springs, City of North Miami, Town of Campbellton, City of Daytona Beach, City of Port Richey, City of Clewiston, City of Doral, City of West Park, Orange County, City of Kenneth City, City of West Miami, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Milton, City of Hialeah Gardens, #344 Notice of Appeal, filed by City of Groveland, City of Palatka, City of Florida City, City of Brooksville, City of Coral Springs, City of Temple Terrace, Osceola County, City of Apopka, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City of New Port Richey, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Tamarac, City of Miami Springs, Palm Beach County, Town of Juno Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Aventura, Town of Orange Park, Town of Davie, City of Hollywood, City of Sweetwater, Hillsborough County, City of Oldsmar, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gulfport, City of Coral Gables, City of North Bay Village, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Boynton Beach, Manatee County, City of Miami, Village of El Portal, City of South Pasadena, City of Opa-Locka, City of Sunrise, City of Palm Coast, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Clermont, Town of Surfside, City of Orlando, City of Ocoee, Town of Medley, City of Miami Gardens, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Lakeland, City of Holly Hill, Town of Cutler Bay, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Homestead, City of St. Petersburg, City of Margate, City of Sarasota, Village of Palm Springs, City of Port Richey, Town of Campbellton, City of Clewiston, City of Doral, City of West Park, City of Kenneth City, Orange County, City of West Miami, City of Milton, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Hialeah Gardens. USCA #15-13721-BB. (apz)
August 25, 2016 Filing 377 STATUS REPORT (SIXTH) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rosenthal, Stephen)
June 27, 2016 Filing 376 STATUS REPORT (Fifth) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rasco, Ramon)
April 25, 2016 Filing 375 STATUS REPORT by Christopher L. Parker (Rosenthal, Stephen)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #373 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Patricia Leigh McMillan Minoux terminated. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/2/2016. (ar2)
February 25, 2016 Filing 373 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel by City of North Miami Beach. Attorney Michele Samaroo added to party City of North Miami Beach(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Samaroo, Michele)
February 23, 2016 Filing 372 STATUS REPORT by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rasco, Ramon)
December 22, 2015 Filing 371 STATUS REPORT (Second) by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rasco, Ramon)
November 12, 2015 Filing 370 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #349 Notice of Appeal, #344 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-13721-BB. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (amb)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #226 City of Winter Park's Motion to Quash Service of Process for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The Motion is denied as moot in light of the Court's Order Staying Case Pending Appeal (D.E. 354). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/9/2015. (brn)
October 29, 2015 Filing 368 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Mugavero on behalf of Palm Beach County (Mugavero, Philip)
October 26, 2015 Filing 367 STATUS REPORT #1 by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Rasco, Ramon)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER denying #355 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/10/2015. (whl)
September 8, 2015 Filing 365 REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
September 4, 2015 Filing 364 REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leopold, Theodore)
September 2, 2015 Filing 363 NOTICE by City of Hialeah re #358 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, OF JOINDER IN LOCAL GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURTS SUA SPONTE ORDER GRANTING STAY (Desai, Devang)
September 2, 2015 Filing 362 NOTICE by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCoy, Kevin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 361 NOTICE by Palm Beach County re #358 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, (Petrick, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 360 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case (by Vendor Defendants) filed by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 9/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5/14/15 Hearing Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Local Government Defendants Corrected Response, #3 Exhibit C - First Request to Produce to ATS, #4 Exhibit D - First Set of Interrogatories to ATS, #5 Exhibit E - Order in Langham Case, #6 Exhibit F - Order in Meador Case, #7 Exhibit G - Xerox Tallahassee Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - Hollander Qui Tam Amended Complaint)(Soto, Edward)
August 28, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE by City of Daytona Beach re #358 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, OF JOINDER IN LOCAL GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S SUA SPONTE ORDER GRANTING STAY (Spellman, Michael)
August 28, 2015 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case (CORRECTED) filed by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Boynton Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Palm Springs, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Palm Beach, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Palm Beach County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal. Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Boynton Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Hialeah(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Maitland(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Miami Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Palm Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of West Palm Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Manatee County(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Palm Beach County(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Orange Park(pty:dft). Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Guedes, Edward)
August 28, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case (Vendors' Joint Notice of Intent to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration) (Soto, Edward)
August 28, 2015 Filing 356 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case filed by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Brooksville, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Groveland, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of New Port Richey, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of Palm Springs. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guedes, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 355 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #354 Order Staying Case by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Leopold, Theodore)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Order staying case pending appeal. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/26/2015. (whl)
August 26, 2015 Filing 353 Notice of Court Practice re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber on 8/26/2015. (kee)
August 25, 2015 Filing 352 Corrected MOTION for Certification That the Local Government Defendants' Appeal is Frivolous re #351 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION THAT LOCAL GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS' APPEAL IS FRIVOLOUS re #349 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
August 24, 2015 Filing 351 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION THAT LOCAL GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS' APPEAL IS FRIVOLOUS re #349 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
August 24, 2015 Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to Master Consolidated Amended Complaint by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Boynton Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Daytona Beach, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Palm Beach, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Palm Beach County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Boynton Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Daytona Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Hialeah(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Maitland(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of West Palm Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Palm Beach County(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Orange Park(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
August 24, 2015 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, Order Under Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #349 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (amb)
August 21, 2015 Filing 349 Amended Notice of Appeal Of Local Government Defendants' as to #341 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Boynton Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Daytona Beach, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Palm Beach, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Palm Beach County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Filing fee $ 505.00. No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Guedes, Edward)
August 21, 2015 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Boynton Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Palm Beach County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs re #344 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,. No Transcript Requested. (Guedes, Edward)
August 20, 2015 Filing 347 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #344 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, filed by City of Groveland, City of Palatka, City of Florida City, City of Brooksville, City of Coral Springs, City of Temple Terrace, Osceola County, City of Apopka, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City of New Port Richey, City of Tamarac, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Miami Springs, Palm Beach County, Town of Juno Beach, City of North Miami Beach, City of Aventura, Town of Orange Park, Town of Davie, City of Hollywood, City of Sweetwater, Hillsborough County, City of Oldsmar, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gulfport, City of Coral Gables, City of North Bay Village, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Boynton Beach, City of Miami, Manatee County, Village of El Portal, City of South Pasadena, City of Sunrise, City of Opa-Locka, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Palm Coast, City of Clermont, Town of Surfside, City of Orlando, City of Ocoee, Town of Medley, City of Miami Gardens, Town of Key Biscayne, City of Lakeland, Town of Cutler Bay, City of Holly Hill, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Maitland, City of Haines City, City of Homestead, City of St. Petersburg, City of Margate, City of Sarasota, Village of Palm Springs, Town of Campbellton, City of Port Richey, City of Clewiston, City of Doral, City of West Park, Orange County, City of Kenneth City, City of West Miami, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Milton, City of Hialeah Gardens. Date received by USCA: 8/19/2015. USCA Case Number: 15-13721-BB. (amb)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ENDORSED ORDER granting #345 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint until September 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/19/2015. (whl)
August 19, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order Under Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #344 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (amb)
August 18, 2015 Filing 345 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Master Consolidated Amended Complaint by Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Jerry)
August 18, 2015 Filing 344 Notice of Appeal of Local Government Defendants' as to #341 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Boynton Beach, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Palm Beach County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-8003130. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Guedes, Edward)
August 18, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Stearns, Jr on behalf of Manatee County. Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Manatee County(pty:dft). (Stearns, Christopher)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #254 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2015. (whl) Modified text per chambers' instruction on 8/11/2015 (ar2).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #191 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2015. (whl)
July 27, 2015 Filing 340 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Poblick on behalf of City of New Port Richey, City of Port Richey. Attorney Joseph A. Poblick added to party City of New Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph A. Poblick added to party City of Port Richey(pty:dft). (Poblick, Joseph)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #260 Marshall Stranburg and the Florida Department of Revenue's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/19/2015. (whl)
June 15, 2015 Filing 338 NOTICE by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune to the Court Regarding Status of Additional Plaintiffs (Rosenthal, Stephen)
June 2, 2015 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss held on 05-14-15 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-136 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2015. (gpz)
June 1, 2015 Filing 336 RESPONSE in Opposition re #334 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, #332 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 6/11/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
May 21, 2015 Filing 335 REPLY in Support of Motion re #272 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, filed by City of Hialeah. Replies due by 6/1/2015. (Desai, Devang) Modified text on 5/22/2015 (yar).
May 21, 2015 Filing 334 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, #332 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by City of West Palm Beach. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Collier-Herst, Dana)
May 18, 2015 Filing 333 REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Town of Orange Park. (Stearns, Christopher)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #330 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/18/2015. (jm00)
May 14, 2015 Filing 331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 5/14/2015. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov (sc)
May 14, 2015 Filing 330 MOTION for Leave to File Untimely Motion to Dismiss and Incorporate Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by City of West Palm Beach. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of S Vegas)(Collier-Herst, Dana)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER denying #325 Motion for Call in Number. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/14/2015. (whl)
May 14, 2015 Filing 328 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #242 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint,. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (dj)
May 13, 2015 Filing 327 RESPONSE/REPLY to #305 Response to Motion,,,, by Florida Department Of Revenue, Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue. (Bajger, John)
May 13, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE by Florida Department Of Revenue, Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue of Consent to be Sued in Federal Court (Bajger, John)
May 13, 2015 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave to Provide Conference Call-In Number for Use During May 14, 2015 Hearing by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
May 12, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE by City of Daytona Beach re #322 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Joinder in Local Government Defendants' Reply and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint [ECF 255] (Spellman, Michael)
May 12, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE by City of Maitland re #322 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Joinder in Local Government Defendants' Reply and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint [ECF 259] (Roper, Donovan)
May 12, 2015 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion re #254 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Brooksville(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Clermont(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Clewiston(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Green Cove Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Gulfport(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Haines City(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Hialeah Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Holly Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Lauderdale Lakes(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Milton(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of New Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of North Bay Village(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of North Miami Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Oldsmar(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Opa-Locka(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Palatka (pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Palm Coast(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of St. Petersburg(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Sweetwater(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of West Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Campbellton(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Juno Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Medley(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Surfside(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Village of El Portal(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Guedes, Edward)
May 12, 2015 Filing 321 RESPONSE to Motion re #272 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/22/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 12, 2015 Filing 320 #319 denying #318 . (whl)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying #316 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2015. (whl)
May 11, 2015 Filing 318 AMENDED MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom [Amends ECF 316] by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward) Modified text on 5/12/2015 (yar).
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ENDORSED ORDER granting #312 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/11/2015. (whl)
May 11, 2015 Filing 316 Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for May 14, 2015 Hearing by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
May 11, 2015 Filing 315 RESPONSE to Motion re #282 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 11, 2015 Filing 314 NOTICE by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune re #271 Notice of Adoption, #311 Notice of Adoption OF INCORPORATION OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 8, 2015 Filing 313 RESPONSE to Motion re #262 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 8, 2015 Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
May 8, 2015 Filing 311 Notice of Adoption by City of North Miami Beach. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of North Miami Beach(pty:dft). (Zeskind, Samuel)
May 7, 2015 Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion re #256 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 7, 2015 Filing 309 RESPONSE in Opposition re #259 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
May 7, 2015 Filing 308 RESPONSE to Motion re #255 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 7, 2015 Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #258 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
May 7, 2015 Filing 306 RESPONSE to Motion re #254 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 7, 2015 Filing 305 RESPONSE to Motion re #260 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ENDORSED ORDER granting #301 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/5/2015. (whl)
May 4, 2015 Filing 303 #302 denying #276 . (whl)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER denying #192 Motion to Stay. on 5/4/2015. (whl)
May 4, 2015 Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Stephen)
May 4, 2015 Filing 300 RESPONSE in Opposition re #242 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp). Replies due by 5/14/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
May 4, 2015 Filing 299 RESPONSE/REPLY to #192 Joint MOTION to Stay by ATS, Gatso and Xerox Defendants re Initial Disclosures and Pending Discovery by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC, City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Daytona Beach, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Gulfport, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Port Richey, City of South Pasadena, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Gatso USA, Inc., Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Orange Park, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs, Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Meeks, Thomas)
May 4, 2015 Filing 298 RESPONSE/REPLY to #279 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (Vendors' Joint Reply) by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - screenshots from www.violationinfo.com, #2 Exhibit B - screenshot www.public.cite-web.com, #3 Exhibit C - screenshot from www.viewviolation.com)(Soto, Edward)
May 1, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Leigh McMillan Minoux on behalf of City of North Miami Beach. Attorney Patricia Leigh McMillan Minoux added to party City of North Miami Beach(pty:dft). (McMillan Minoux, Patricia)
May 1, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of City of Tallahassee by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
April 30, 2015 Filing 295 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of North Miami Beach served on 4/29/2015, answer due 5/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 30, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of City of Tampa, City of Palm Bay and City of Winter Park by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ENDORSED ORDER granting #287 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/29/2015. (whl)
April 28, 2015 Filing 292 #291 denying #285 . (whl)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER denying #278 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/28/2015. (whl)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #288 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Responses due by 5/4/2015 Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/28/2015. (whl)
April 28, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE by Palm Beach County re #276 MOTION to Stay all Discovery Pending Adjudication of Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Sever and Transfer and Notice of Joinder in Joint Defendants' Motion to Stay (D.E. 192) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Petrick, Amy)
April 27, 2015 Filing 288 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #206 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, Improper VenueDefendant's MOTION to Change Venue by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Stephen)
April 27, 2015 Filing 287 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Vendors' Motion) by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward)
April 27, 2015 Filing 286 NOTICE by City of Bradenton re #276 MOTION to Stay all Discovery Pending Adjudication of Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Sever and Transfer and Notice of Joinder in Joint Defendants' Motion to Stay (D.E. 192) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Jensen, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2015 Filing 285 MOTION for clarification of Order Setting Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Groveland, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Orlando, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Manatee County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of Palm Springs. Responses due by 5/14/2015 (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 24, 2015 Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re #202 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, MOTION or, in the alternative, for Abstention filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 24, 2015 Filing 283 NOTICE by City of Bradenton re #276 MOTION to Stay all Discovery Pending Adjudication of Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Sever and Transfer and Notice of Joinder in Joint Defendants' Motion to Stay (D.E. 192) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Defendant's, City of Bradenton, Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Stay all Discovery Pending Adjudication of Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Sever and Transfer (D.E. 276). Attorney Thomas Robert Unice, Jr added to party City of Bradenton(pty:dft). (Unice, Thomas)
April 24, 2015 Filing 282 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Boynton Beach. Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cirullo, Michael)
April 23, 2015 Filing 281 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L. Switkes on behalf of City of North Bay Village. Attorney Robert L. Switkes added to party City of North Bay Village(pty:dft). (Switkes, Robert)
April 23, 2015 Filing 280 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 Joint MOTION to Stay by ATS, Gatso and Xerox Defendants re Initial Disclosures and Pending Discovery filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
April 23, 2015 Filing 279 RESPONSE in Opposition re #191 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (on behalf of Vendors ATS, Gatso and Xerox) filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
April 23, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION for clarification #239 Order Setting Hearing on Motion Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by City of Tallahassee. Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Spellman, Michael)
April 23, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE by City of Winter Park of Filing Proposed Order to Docket Entry 249 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Unice, Thomas)
April 23, 2015 Filing 276 MOTION to Stay all Discovery Pending Adjudication of Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Sever and Transfer and Notice of Joinder in Joint Defendants' Motion to Stay (D.E. 192) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Boynton Beach, City of Hialeah, City of Palm Bay, City of Tallahassee, City of Tampa, Palm Beach County. Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Petrick, Amy)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ENDORSED ORDER granting #233 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/22/2015. (whl)
April 22, 2015 Filing 274 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Palm Beach County. (Petrick, Amy)
April 22, 2015 Filing 273 Notice of Adoption by City of Groveland, City of St. Petersburg, City of Haines City, City of Sarasota, Manatee County, City of Miami Springs, City of West Park, Town of Medley, City of Miami Beach (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 22, 2015 Filing 272 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, by City of Hialeah. Attorney Joseph Maxwell Winsby added to party City of Hialeah(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Winsby, Joseph)
April 21, 2015 Filing 271 Notice of Adoption by Manatee County (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 21, 2015 Filing 270 Summons Issued as to City of North Miami Beach. (ar2)
April 21, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) North Miami Beach) (Leopold, Theodore)
April 21, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Cirullo, Jr on behalf of City of Tamarac. Attorney Michael David Cirullo, Jr added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft). (Cirullo, Michael)
April 21, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Cirullo, Jr on behalf of City of Pembroke Pines. Attorney Michael David Cirullo, Jr added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft). (Cirullo, Michael)
April 21, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracey Anne Wright on behalf of City of Tamarac. Attorney Tracey Anne Wright added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft). (Wright, Tracey)
April 21, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracey Anne Wright on behalf of City of Pembroke Pines. Attorney Tracey Anne Wright added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft). (Wright, Tracey)
April 21, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Stuart Goren on behalf of City of Tamarac. Attorney Samuel Stuart Goren added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft). (Goren, Samuel)
April 21, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Stuart Goren on behalf of City of Pembroke Pines. Attorney Samuel Stuart Goren added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft). (Goren, Samuel)
April 21, 2015 Filing 262 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Town of Orange Park. Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Orange Park(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/8/2015 (Stearns, Christopher)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ENDORSED ORDER granting #253 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file up to thirty pages in response. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/21/2015. (whl)
April 20, 2015 Filing 260 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florida Department Of Revenue, Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Bajger, John)
April 20, 2015 Filing 259 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Maitland. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Roper, Donovan)
April 20, 2015 Filing 258 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Pembroke Pines. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stearns, Christopher)
April 20, 2015 Filing 257 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Action Filed by Plaintiff, Jeffrey Passman, or, Alternatively, to Dismiss by City of Tallahassee. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Spellman, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Filing 256 MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Tamarac. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stearns, Christopher)
April 20, 2015 Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Daytona Beach. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Spellman, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Brooksville, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Orlando, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Medley, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Brooksville(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Clermont(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Clewiston(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Doral(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Green Cove Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Gulfport(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Hialeah Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Holly Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Lauderdale Lakes(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Miami Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Milton(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of New Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of North Bay Village(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Oldsmar(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Opa-Locka(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Orlando(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Palatka (pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Palm Coast(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Sweetwater(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Temple Terrace(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of West Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Campbellton(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Davie(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Juno Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Surfside(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Village of El Portal(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 20, 2015 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leopold, Theodore)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/17/2015. (whl)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting #217 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/20/2015. (whl)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #244 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/20/2015. (whl)
April 17, 2015 Filing 249 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by City of Winter Park (Unice, Thomas)
April 16, 2015 Filing 248 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 246 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (dgj)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ENDORSED ORDER granting #238 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/16/2015. (whl)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ENDORSED ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/16/2015. (whl) Modified on 4/16/2015 (dgj).
April 16, 2015 Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Rocco Antonelli on behalf of City of Hialeah. Attorney Mark Rocco Antonelli added to party City of Hialeah(pty:dft). (Antonelli, Mark)
April 16, 2015 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by City of Boynton Beach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirullo, Michael)
April 15, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #241 Notice of Attorney Appearance, and #242 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, by City of West Palm Beach (ar2)
April 15, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, by City of West Palm Beach. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (ar2)
April 15, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Collier-Herst on behalf of City of West Palm Beach. Attorney Dana Collier-Herst added to party City of West Palm Beach (pty:dft). (ar2)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ENDORSED ORDER granting #221 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2015. (whl)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Setting Hearing for 5/14/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2015. (whl)
April 15, 2015 Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time And for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by City of Sarasota. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Sarasota(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
April 15, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE by Manatee County of Filing Proposed Order to D.E. 236 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 15, 2015 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Manatee County. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 15, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Zeskind on behalf of Manatee County. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Manatee County(pty:dft). (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/14/2015. (whl)
April 14, 2015 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by City of Hialeah. Attorney Devang B. Desai added to party City of Hialeah(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Devang)
April 14, 2015 Filing 232 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal City of Palm Springs by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
April 14, 2015 Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Robert Unice, Jr on behalf of City of Winter Park. Attorney Thomas Robert Unice, Jr added to party City of Winter Park(pty:dft). (Unice, Thomas)
April 14, 2015 Filing 230 NOTICE by City of Winter Park re #226 MOTION to Quash Service of Process for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR (Brown, Usher)
April 14, 2015 Filing 229 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick Lannon on behalf of City of Palm Bay. Attorney Andrew Patrick Lannon added to party City of Palm Bay(pty:dft). (Lannon, Andrew)
April 14, 2015 Filing 228 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Pembroke Pines served on 4/8/2015, answer due 4/29/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 14, 2015 Filing 227 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Barclay Fountain on behalf of City of Daytona Beach, City of Tallahassee. Attorney Lisa Barclay Fountain added to party City of Daytona Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Barclay Fountain added to party City of Tallahassee(pty:dft). (Fountain, Lisa)
April 13, 2015 Filing 226 MOTION to Quash Service of Process for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Winter Park. Attorney Usher Lawrence Brown added to party City of Winter Park(pty:dft). (Brown, Usher)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ENDORSED ORDER granting #215 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2015. (whl)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ENDORSED ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015, and granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2015. (whl)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ENDORSED ORDER granting #210 Motion for Extension of Time Respond until April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2015. (whl)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ENDORSED ORDER granting #211 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2015. (whl)
April 13, 2015 Filing 221 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time And for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by City of Haines City, City of St. Petersburg. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Haines City(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/30/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
April 13, 2015 Filing 220 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Samuel Zeskind on behalf of City of St. Petersburg instead of prior counsel of record Joseph P. Patner. . Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of St. Petersburg(pty:dft). (Zeskind, Samuel)
April 13, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE by Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions re #185 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chris Bator. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 97317. of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sivick, Krista)
April 13, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Cirullo, Jr on behalf of City of Boynton Beach. Attorney Michael David Cirullo, Jr added to party City of Boynton Beach(pty:dft). (Cirullo, Michael)
April 13, 2015 Filing 217 MOTION for Substitution of Counsel by Aleksandr Boksner on behalf of City of Miami Beach instead of prior counsel of record Robert Rosenwald. . Attorney Aleksandr Boksner added to party City of Miami Beach(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boksner, Aleksandr) Modified to convert document to a motion on 4/13/2015 (ar2).
April 10, 2015 Filing 216 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Marc Averette(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Scott Barrish(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Erik Bartenhagen(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Charles Becker(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Andre Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Donna Check(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party James Condon(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Cesar Couri(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Donald Crepeau(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party William Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Sandra Delonis(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Victor Devila(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Peter Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Bart Gancher(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Natasha Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Harold Goldberg(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Lori Gosewich(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Adlai Green(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Ronda Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Steven Holtz(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Jorge Isa(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Vincenzina Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Metria Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Henry Kesner(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Thomas Kornell(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Angel Luis Lazo-Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Marc Leonardo(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Philip Levine(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Justina Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Selena Mead(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Raul Millian(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party James Mirabelli(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party William Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Evan Moretti(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Leigh Nolan(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Evelyn Park(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Jeffery Passman(pty:intv), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Ramchand Persaud(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Taryn Pisaneschi(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Jesus Poli(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Richard Powers(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Sharon Pruett(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Joseph Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Angela Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Nelson Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Kimberly Ann Rubin(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Patrick Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Xiomara Santos(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Donna Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Michael Shane(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Bryan Silber(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Ivan Simson(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Maria Suarez(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Ron Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Brian Tewes(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party James Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Michael Woodby(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Jeremy Woodrum(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Eduardo Zeitune(pty:pla). Replies due by 4/20/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
April 10, 2015 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Motion to Dismiss re #71 Amended Complaint, by City of Miami Beach. Attorney Robert F. Rosenwald, Jr added to party City of Miami Beach(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenwald, Robert)
April 10, 2015 Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time And For Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by Town of Medley. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Medley(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ENDORSED ORDER granting #203 Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/9/2015. (whl)
April 9, 2015 Filing 212 NOTICE by City of Daytona Beach, City of Tallahassee re #211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file their responses to Master Consolidated Amended Complaint re #71 Amended Complaint, of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Spellman, Michael)
April 9, 2015 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file their responses to Master Consolidated Amended Complaint re #71 Amended Complaint, by City of Daytona Beach, City of Tallahassee. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Spellman, Michael)
April 9, 2015 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #71 Amended Complaint, by City of St. Petersburg. Attorney Joseph Paul Patner added to party City of St. Petersburg(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patner, Joseph)
April 9, 2015 Filing 209 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward George Guedes on behalf of City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Groveland, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Orlando, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of Sunrise, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Key Biscayne, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Apopka(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Aventura(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Boca Raton(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Cocoa Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Coral Gables(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Doral(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Florida City(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Fort Lauderdale(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Groveland(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Hallandale Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Hollywood(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Homestead(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Kenneth City(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Lakeland(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Margate(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Miami Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of North Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Ocoee(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Orlando(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Sarasota(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of South Pasadena(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Sunrise(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of Temple Terrace(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party City of West Park(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Hillsborough County(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Orange County(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Osceola County(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Cutler Bay(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Davie(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Town of Key Biscayne(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Village of Bal Harbour(pty:dft), Attorney Edward George Guedes added to party Village of Palm Springs(pty:dft). (Guedes, Edward)
April 8, 2015 Filing 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Harris Mandel on behalf of City of Apopka, City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Doral, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Groveland, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Margate, City of Miami, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Orlando, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of Sunrise, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Park, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Osceola County, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, Town of Key Biscayne, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Apopka(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Aventura(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Boca Raton(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Cocoa Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Coral Gables(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Doral(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Florida City(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Fort Lauderdale(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Groveland(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Hallandale Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Hollywood(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Homestead(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Kenneth City(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Lakeland(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Margate(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Miami Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of North Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Ocoee(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Orlando(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Sarasota(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of South Pasadena(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Sunrise(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of Temple Terrace(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party City of West Park(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Hillsborough County(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Orange County(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Osceola County(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Town of Cutler Bay(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Town of Davie(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Town of Key Biscayne(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Village of Bal Harbour(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Mandel added to party Village of Palm Springs(pty:dft). (Mandel, Matthew)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ENDORSED ORDER granting #200 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion to File Thirty Page Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/8/2015. (whl)
April 8, 2015 Filing 206 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 4/27/2015), Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, Improper Venue ( Responses due by 4/27/2015), Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue by City of Palm Bay. Attorney Patricia Denise Smith added to party City of Palm Bay(pty:dft). (Smith, Patricia)
April 8, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Spellman on behalf of City of Tallahassee. Attorney Michael Patrick Spellman added to party City of Tallahassee(pty:dft). (Spellman, Michael)
April 8, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Martin Gewirtz on behalf of City of Tampa. Attorney Jerry Martin Gewirtz added to party City of Tampa(pty:dft). (Gewirtz, Jerry)
April 8, 2015 Filing 203 MOTION for Extension of Time and leave for permission to file excess pages by City of Tampa. Attorney Robin Horton Silverman added to party City of Tampa(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Silverman, Robin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 202 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 4/24/2015), MOTION or, in the alternative, for Abstention by City of Bradenton. (Jensen, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2015 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Dale Jensen on behalf of City of Bradenton. Attorney Jeffrey Dale Jensen added to party City of Bradenton(pty:dft). (Jensen, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2015 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time And for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by City of Groveland, City of Miami Springs, City of West Park. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Groveland(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of West Park(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/24/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
April 7, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Stearns, Jr on behalf of City of Aventura, City of Clermont, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of North Bay Village, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Aventura(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Clermont(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Cocoa Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Doral(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Green Cove Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Hialeah Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Holly Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Lauderdale Lakes(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Miami Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Milton(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of North Bay Village(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Oldsmar(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Opa-Locka(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Palatka (pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Palm Coast(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Sunrise(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Sweetwater(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of West Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party City of West Park(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Campbellton(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Cutler Bay(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Juno Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Key Biscayne(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Town of Surfside(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Village of Bal Harbour(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Village of El Portal(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Village of Palm Springs(pty:dft). (Stearns, Christopher)
April 7, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E. Bruce Johnson on behalf of City of Aventura, City of Clermont, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Springs, City of Doral, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Holly Hill, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Miami Gardens, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of North Bay Village, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Palatka, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Sunrise, City of Sweetwater, City of Tamarac, City of West Miami, City of West Park, Town of Campbellton, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Juno Beach, Town of Key Biscayne, Town of Surfside, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of El Portal, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Aventura(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Clermont(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Cocoa Beach(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Doral(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Green Cove Springs(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Hialeah Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Holly Hill(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Lauderdale Lakes(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Miami Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Miami Springs(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Milton(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of North Bay Village(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Oldsmar(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Opa-Locka(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Palatka (pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Palm Coast(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Pembroke Pines(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Sunrise(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Sweetwater(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Tamarac(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of West Miami(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of West Park(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Town of Campbellton(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Town of Cutler Bay(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Town of Juno Beach(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Town of Key Biscayne(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Town of Surfside(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Village of Bal Harbour(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Village of El Portal(pty:dft), Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party Village of Palm Springs(pty:dft). (Johnson, E.)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ENDORSED ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/6/2015. (whl)
April 6, 2015 Filing 196 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Oldsmar served on 3/26/2015, answer due 4/16/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 6, 2015 Filing 195 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Town of Surfside served on 4/2/2015, answer due 4/23/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 6, 2015 Filing 194 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Miami Springs served on 4/3/2015, answer due 4/24/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 6, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Spellman on behalf of City of Daytona Beach. Attorney Michael Patrick Spellman added to party City of Daytona Beach(pty:dft). (Spellman, Michael)
April 6, 2015 Filing 192 Joint MOTION to Stay by ATS, Gatso and Xerox Defendants re Initial Disclosures and Pending Discovery by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Passman Motion to Dismiss)(Soto, Edward)
April 6, 2015 Filing 191 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #71 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (on behalf of Vendors ATS, Gatso and Xerox) by American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arem 10/15/14 Decision, #2 Exhibit B - NOV UTC Flow Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Arem 4/23/14 Opinion)(Soto, Edward)
April 2, 2015 Filing 190 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Master Consolidated List re #71 Amended Complaint, ( Responses due by 4/20/2015), MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages 30 pages by City of Brooksville, City of Clewiston, City of Gulfport, City of Maitland, City of New Port Richey, City of Port Richey. Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Brooksville(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Clewiston(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Gulfport(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Maitland(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of New Port Richey(pty:dft), Attorney Donovan Adam Roper added to party City of Port Richey(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roper, Donovan)
April 1, 2015 Filing 189 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Port Richey served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 1, 2015 Filing 188 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of New Port Richey served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 1, 2015 Filing 187 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Town of Juno Beach served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED ORDER granting #184 Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/1/2015. (whl)
March 31, 2015 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for leave to file excess pages in Motion to Dismiss by City of Apopka, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Kenneth City, City of South Pasadena, Osceola County. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Apopka(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Fort Lauderdale(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Kenneth City(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of South Pasadena(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Osceola County(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 183 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Palm Coast served on 3/23/2015, answer due 5/8/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 31, 2015 Filing 182 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 31, 2015 Filing 181 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Osceola County served on 3/26/2015, answer due 4/16/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 31, 2015 Filing 180 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Boynton Beach served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 31, 2015 Filing 179 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Milton served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 31, 2015 Filing 178 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Homestead served on 3/27/2015, answer due 4/17/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 177 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Town of Cutler Bay served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 176 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Tampa served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 175 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Bradenton served on 3/24/2015, answer due 4/14/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 174 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Manatee County served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 173 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of South Pasadena served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 172 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Winter Park served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 171 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Town of Orange Park served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 170 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Gulfport served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 169 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Kenneth City served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 168 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Hialeah Gardens served on 3/27/2015, answer due 4/17/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 167 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Boynton Beach served on 3/26/2015, answer due 4/16/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 166 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of North Miami Beach served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 165 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of North Bay Village served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 164 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Miami Beach served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 163 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Village of El Portal served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 162 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Village of Bal Harbour served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 161 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Opa-Locka served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 160 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Groveland served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 159 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Clermont served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 30, 2015 Filing 158 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Tallahassee served on 3/25/2015, answer due 4/15/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 27, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chris Bator. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 97317. (ksa)
March 27, 2015 Filing 157 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Doral waiver sent on 3/27/2015, answer due 5/26/2015; Town of Key Biscayne waiver sent on 3/27/2015, answer due 5/26/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 27, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of City of Campbellton by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 27, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of City of Brandon by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 26, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R. McCarthy on behalf of American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Edward R. McCarthy added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Edward R. McCarthy added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward R. McCarthy added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (McCarthy, Edward)
March 26, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Soto on behalf of American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Edward Soto added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Soto added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Soto added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Soto, Edward)
March 25, 2015 Filing 152 Summons Issued as to Town of Juno Beach and Town of Surfside. (ar2)
March 25, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Clay County by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Broward County by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Miami Dade County by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Town of Juno Beach and Town of Surfside by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 147 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Fort Lauderdale served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 146 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of West Palm Beach served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 145 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Coral Springs served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 144 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Lauderdale Lakes served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 143 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Broward County served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 142 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Hollywood served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 141 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Polk County served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 140 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Palatka served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 139 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Sarasota served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 138 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of West Park served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 137 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Daytona Beach served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 136 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Apopka served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 135 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Clewiston served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 134 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Coral Gables served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 133 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Miami-Dade County served on 3/19/2015, answer due 4/9/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 132 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Haines City served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 131 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Palm Bay served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 130 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Green Cove Springs served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 129 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Clay County served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 128 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Hialeah served on 3/24/2015, answer due 4/14/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 127 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Town of Medley served on 3/24/2015, answer due 4/14/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 126 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of Sweetwater served on 3/24/2015, answer due 4/14/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 25, 2015 Filing 125 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. City of West Miami served on 3/24/2015, answer due 4/14/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015, and granting request for leave to file a motion to dismiss not to exceed thirty pages in length. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/24/2015. (whl)
March 23, 2015 Filing 123 MOTION for Extension of Time And for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by City of Aventura, City of Boca Raton, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Florida City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hollywood, City of Homestead, City of Lakeland, City of Margate, City of Miami Gardens, City of North Miami, City of Ocoee, City of Sunrise, Hillsborough County, Orange County, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Key Biscayne, Village of Bal Harbour, Village of Palm Springs. Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Aventura(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Boca Raton(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Cocoa Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Coral Gables(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Florida City(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Hallandale Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Hollywood(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Homestead(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Lakeland(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Margate(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Miami Gardens(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of North Miami(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Ocoee(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party City of Sunrise(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Hillsborough County(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Orange County(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Cutler Bay(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Town of Key Biscayne(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Village of Bal Harbour(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zeskind added to party Village of Palm Springs(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeskind, Samuel)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ENDORSED ORDER granting #114 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2015. (whl)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ENDORSED ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2015. (whl)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ENDORSED ORDER granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2015. (whl)
March 20, 2015 Filing 119 Summons Issued as to City of Boynton Beach and City of Homestead. (ar2)
March 20, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Boynton Beach and Homestead by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune (Leopold, Theodore)
March 20, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune Modified Waiver of Service Deadline (Leopold, Theodore)
March 20, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice - Polk County by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp). (Leopold, Theodore)
March 20, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice - Gainesville by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Marc Averette(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Scott Barrish(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Erik Bartenhagen(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Charles Becker(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Andre Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Donna Check(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party James Condon(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Cesar Couri(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Donald Crepeau(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party William Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Sandra Delonis(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Victor Devila(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Peter Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Bart Gancher(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Natasha Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Harold Goldberg(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Lori Gosewich(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Adlai Green(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Ronda Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Steven Holtz(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Jorge Isa(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Vincenzina Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Metria Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Henry Kesner(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Thomas Kornell(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Angel Luis Lazo-Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Marc Leonardo(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Philip Levine(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Justina Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Selena Mead(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Raul Millian(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party James Mirabelli(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party William Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Evan Moretti(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Leigh Nolan(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Evelyn Park(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Jeffery Passman(pty:intv), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Ramchand Persaud(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Taryn Pisaneschi(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Jesus Poli(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Richard Powers(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Sharon Pruett(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Joseph Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Angela Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Nelson Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Kimberly Ann Rubin(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Patrick Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Xiomara Santos(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Donna Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Michael Shane(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Bryan Silber(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Ivan Simson(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Maria Suarez(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Ron Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Brian Tewes(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party James Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Michael Woodby(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Jeremy Woodrum(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Jon Leopold added to party Eduardo Zeitune(pty:pla). (Leopold, Theodore)
March 19, 2015 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #71 Amended Complaint, by Gatso USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bredahl, Christina)
March 19, 2015 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #71 Amended Complaint, by Gatso USA, Inc.. (Bredahl, Christina)
March 19, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Bredahl on behalf of Gatso USA, Inc.. Attorney Christina Bredahl added to party Gatso USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bredahl, Christina)
March 19, 2015 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #71 Amended Complaint, by Florida Department Of Revenue, Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue. Attorney John Bajger added to party Florida Department Of Revenue(pty:dft), Attorney John Bajger added to party Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bajger, John)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/19/2015. (whl)
March 18, 2015 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #103 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Stephen)
March 17, 2015 Filing 108 Summons Issued as to Broward County, City of Boynton Beach, City of Apopka, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, City of Daytona Beach, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hialeah, City of Hialeah Gardens, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Miami Beach, City of Miami Springs, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami Beach, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, City of Palatka, City of Palm Bay, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sweetwater, City of Tallahassee, City of Tampa, City of West Miami, City of West Palm Beach, City of West Park, City of Winter Park, Clay County, Manatee County, Miami-Dade County, Osceola County, Polk County, Town of Medley, Town of Orange Park, Village of El Portal. (ar2)
March 17, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) City of Apopka, #2 Summon(s) City of Bal Harbour, #3 Summon(s) City of Boynton Beach, #4 Summon(s) City of Bradenton, #5 Summon(s) Broward County, #6 Summon(s) Clay County, #7 Summon(s) City of Clermont, #8 Summon(s) City of Clewiston, #9 Summon(s) City of Coral Gables, #10 Summon(s) City of Coral Springs, #11 Summon(s) City of Daytona Beach, #12 Summon(s) City of Green Cove Springs, #13 Summon(s) City of Groveland, #14 Summon(s) City of Gulfport, #15 Summon(s) Haines City, #16 Summon(s) City of Hialeah Gardens, #17 Summon(s) City of Hialeah, #18 Summon(s) City of Juno Beach, #19 Summon(s) Kenneth City, #20 Summon(s) City of Lauderdale Lakes, #21 Summon(s) Manatee County, #22 Summon(s) Town of Medley, #23 Summon(s) City of Miami Beach, #24 Summon(s) Miami Dade County, #25 Summon(s) City of Miami Springs, #26 Summon(s) City of Milton, #27 Summon(s) City of New Port Richey, #28 Summon(s) City of North Bay Village, #29 Summon(s) City of North Miami Beach, #30 Summon(s) City of Oldsmar, #31 Summon(s) City of Opa Locka, #32 Summon(s) Town of Orange Park, #33 Summon(s) Osceola County, #34 Summon(s) City of Palatka, #35 Summon(s) City of Palm Bay, #36 Summon(s) City of Palm Coast, #37 Summon(s) City of Pembroke Pines, #38 Summon(s) Polk County, #39 Summon(s) City of Port Richey, #40 Summon(s) City of Sarasota, #41 Summon(s) City of South Pasadena, #42 Summon(s) City of St. Petersburg, #43 Summon(s) City of Surfside, #44 Summon(s) City of Sweetwater, #45 Summon(s) City of Tallahassee, #46 Summon(s) City of Tampa, #47 Summon(s) Village of El Portal, #48 Summon(s) City of West Miami, #49 Summon(s) City of West Palm Beach, #50 Summon(s) City of West Park, #51 Summon(s) City of Winterpark) (Leopold, Theodore)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/16/2015. (whl)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Leopold and Rosenthal. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/13/2015. (whl)
March 11, 2015 Filing 104 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Palm Beach County. Palm Beach County waiver sent on 3/11/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. (Petrick, Amy)
March 10, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss #71 Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Palm Beach County. Responses due by 3/27/2015 (Petrick, Amy)
March 10, 2015 Filing 102 Summons Issued as to City of Hollywood. (ar2)
March 10, 2015 Filing 101 Summons Issued as to Town of Cutler Bay. (ar2)
March 10, 2015 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Palm Coast waiver sent on 3/9/2015, answer due 5/8/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 10, 2015 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Holly Hill waiver sent on 3/9/2015, answer due 5/8/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 10, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendants City of Cutler Bay and City of Hollywood by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) City of Cutler Bay, #2 Summon(s) City of Hollywood) (Leopold, Theodore)
March 10, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. Attorney Jerry Dean Hamilton added to party Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions(pty:dft). (Hamilton, Jerry)
March 10, 2015 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions identifying Corporate Parent Xerox Corporation, Corporate Parent Xerox Business Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Affiliated Computer Services, Inc. for Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions (Sivick, Krista)
March 9, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Krista Anne Sivick on behalf of Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions. Attorney Krista Anne Sivick added to party Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions(pty:dft). (Sivick, Krista)
March 6, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ervin Amado Gonzalez on behalf of John Devany, Adam Ehrlich, Annie Migdal, Carole J Silverman. Attorney Ervin Amado Gonzalez added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Ervin Amado Gonzalez added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp), Attorney Ervin Amado Gonzalez added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Ervin Amado Gonzalez added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp). (Gonzalez, Ervin)
March 6, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Shanan Montoya on behalf of John Devany, Adam Ehrlich, Annie Migdal, Carole J Silverman. Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp), Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp). (Montoya, Patrick)
March 6, 2015 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, Thomas)
March 6, 2015 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Aventura waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Boca Raton waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Cocoa Beach waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Florida City waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Hallandale Beach waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Lakeland waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Margate waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Miami waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Miami Gardens waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of North Miami waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Ocoee waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Orlando waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Sunrise waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Tamarac waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; City of Temple Terrace waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; Hillsborough County waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; Orange County waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; Town of Davie waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015; Village of Palm Springs waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 6, 2015 Filing 90 Summons Issued as to City of Fort Lauderdale. (ar2)
March 6, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to City of Fort Lauderdale by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) City of Fort Lauderdale) (Leopold, Theodore)
March 5, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason -- [Notice of Filing Proposed Order] (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rosenthal, Stephen)
March 4, 2015 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Brooksville waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 4, 2015 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. City of Maitland waiver sent on 2/27/2015, answer due 4/28/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 3, 2015 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher L. Parker. Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions waiver sent on 2/26/2015, answer due 4/27/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 2, 2015 Filing 84 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 2, 2015 Filing 83 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Florida Department Of Revenue served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 2, 2015 Filing 82 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #71 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker. Gatso USA, Inc. served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond until April 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/2/2015. (whl)
February 26, 2015 Filing 80 Summons Issued as to Florida Department Of Revenue and Marshall Stranburg. (ar2)
February 26, 2015 Filing 79 Summons Issued as to Gatso USA, Inc. (ar2)
February 26, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Florida Department of Revenue and Marshall Stranburg by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Leopold, Theodore)
February 26, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Gatso USA, Inc by Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Leopold, Theodore)
February 25, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Taylor Petrick on behalf of Palm Beach County. Attorney Amy Taylor Petrick added to party Palm Beach County(pty:dft). (Petrick, Amy)
February 25, 2015 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Master Consolidated Amended Complaint re #71 Amended Complaint, by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, Thomas)
February 23, 2015 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Erik Bartenhagen, Charles Becker, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, John Devany, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Adam Ehrlich, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Philip Levine, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Annie Migdal, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Marwa Moussa, Leigh Nolan, Evelyn Park, Christopher L. Parker, Jeffery Passman, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Donna Schneider, Michael Shane, Bryan Silber, Carole J Silverman, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Ron Taylor, Brian Tewes, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum, Eduardo Zeitune re #71 Amended Complaint, (Rosenthal, Stephen)
February 23, 2015 Filing 73 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Marc Averette, Scott Barrish, Charles Becker, Erik Bartenhagen, Andre Booker, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Donna Check, James Condon, Cesar Couri, Donald Crepeau, William Dean, Sandra Delonis, Victor Devila, Peter Diamond, Bart Gancher, Natasha Gibson, Harold Goldberg, Lori Gosewich, Adlai Green, Ronda Hamilton, Steven Holtz, Jorge Isa, Vincenzina Jackson, Metria Jones, Henry Kesner, Thomas Kornell, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Marc Leonardo, Justina Lopez, Selena Mead, Raul Millian, James Mirabelli, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Leigh Nolan, Philip Levine, Evelyn Park, Ramchand Persaud, Taryn Pisaneschi, Jesus Poli, Richard Powers, Sharon Pruett, Joseph Ramos, Angela Rodriguez, Nelson Rosa, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Patrick Russell, Xiomara Santos, Michael Shane, Donna Schneider, Bryan Silber, Ivan Simson, Maria Suarez, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, Brian Tewes, Ron Taylor, James Walker, Michael Woodby, Jeremy Woodrum and Eduardo Zeitune, Eduardo Zeitune, Angel Luis Lazo-Perez, Erik Bartenhagen, Selena Mead, Cesar Couri, Kimberly Ann Rubin, Thomas Kornell, Andre Booker, Henry Kesner, Donna Schneider, Raul Millian, Vincenzina Jackson, Marc Averette, Bryan Silber, Sharon Pruett, Jorge Isa, Scott Barrish, Justina Lopez, Jesus Poli, Maria Suarez, Nelson Rosa, Ivan Simson, Michael Woodby, Ron Taylor, Adlai Green, Sandra Delonis, William Dean, Philip Levine, Donald Crepeau, Victor Devila, Steven Holtz, Patrick Russell, James Walker, Donna Check, Harold Goldberg, Angela Rodriguez, Jeremy Woodrum, Peter Diamond, James Mirabelli, Metria Jones, Ramchand Persaud, Richard Powers, Lori Gosewich, Joseph Ramos, Evelyn Park, Marc Leonardo, Taryn Pisaneschi, Xiomara Santos, Natasha Gibson, Leigh Nolan, Ronda Hamilton, Bart Gancher, Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos, Charles Becker, Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert, Brian Tewes, Michael Shane, James Condon, William Moore, Evan Moretti, Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions, Gatso USA, Inc., Marshall Stranburg, Individually and as Executive Director of the Florida Department of Revenue, Florida Department Of Revenue, City of Apopka, City of Aventura, Village of Bal Harbour, City of Boca Raton, City Of Boynton Beach, City of Bradenton, City of Brandon, City of Brooksville, Broward County, Town of Campbellton, Clay County, City of Clermont, City of Clewiston, City of Cocoa Beach, City of Coral Gables, City of Coral Springs, Town of Cutler Bay, Town of Davie, City of Daytona Beach, City of Doral, Village of El Portal, City of Florida City, City of Fort Lauderdale, City of Gainesville, City of Green Cove Springs, City of Groveland, City of Gulfport, City of Haines City, City of Hallandale Beach, City of Hialeah, City of Hialeah Gardens, Hillsborough County, City of Hollywood, City of Holly Hill, City of Homestead, City of Juno Beach, City of Kenneth City, City of Lakeland, City of Lauderdale Lakes, City of Maitland, Manatee County, City of Margate, Town of Medley, City of Miami, City of Miami Beach, Miami-Dade County, City of Miami Gardens, City of Milton, City of New Port Richey, City of North Bay Village, City of North Miami, City of North Miami Beach, City of Ocoee, City of Oldsmar, City of Opa-Locka, Orange County, Town of Orange Park, City of Orlando, Osceola County, City of Palatka, Palm Beach County, City of Palm Bay, City of Palm Coast, City of Pembroke Pines, City of Palm Springs, Village of Palm Springs, Polk County, City of Port Richey, City of Sarasota, City of South Pasadena, City of St. Petersburg, City of Sunrise, Town of Surfside, City of Sweetwater, City of Tallahassee, City of Tamarac, City of Tampa, City of Temple Terrace, City of West Miami, City of West Palm Beach, City of West Park, City of Winter Park, City of Miami Springs and Town of Key Biscayne.. Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Jeffery Passman(pty:intv), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Marc Averette(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Scott Barrish(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Charles Becker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Erik Bartenhagen(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Andre Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Donna Check(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party James Condon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Cesar Couri(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Donald Crepeau(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party William Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Sandra Delonis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Victor Devila(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Peter Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Bart Gancher(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Natasha Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Harold Goldberg(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Lori Gosewich(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Adlai Green(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Ronda Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Steven Holtz(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Jorge Isa(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Vincenzina Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Metria Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Henry Kesner(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Thomas Kornell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Angel Luis Lazo-Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Marc Leonardo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Justina Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Selena Mead(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Raul Millian(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party James Mirabelli(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party William Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Evan Moretti(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Leigh Nolan(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Philip Levine(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Evelyn Park(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Ramchand Persaud(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Taryn Pisaneschi(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Jesus Poli(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Richard Powers(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Sharon Pruett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Joseph Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Angela Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Nelson Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Kimberly Ann Rubin(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Patrick Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Xiomara Santos(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Michael Shane(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Donna Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Bryan Silber(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Ivan Simson(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Maria Suarez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Brian Tewes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Ron Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party James Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Michael Woodby(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Jeremy Woodrum(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Eduardo Zeitune(pty:pla). (Rosenthal, Stephen)
February 23, 2015 Filing 72 Clerks Notice to Filer Re: DE #71 Master Consolidated Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2)
February 20, 2015 Filing 71 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (Master vs. all Defendants) against ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC, filed by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker.(Rosenthal, Stephen)
February 20, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE by Jeffery Passman re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason in Support of Proposed Leadership Structure (Jaffe, Steven)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew S. Axelrod terminated. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/17/2015. (whl)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order Vacating #67 and Denying #63 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/12/2015. (whl)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 (VACATED by DE#68 .) ORDER granting #63 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/11/2015. (whl) Modified on 2/12/2015: image restricted; text modified to reflect "vacated" (wc).
February 6, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Stay re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason ,filed on behalf of all plaintiffs in the merged cases, filed by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Replies due by 2/17/2015. (Rosenthal, Stephen)
February 5, 2015 Filing 65 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew S. Axelrod. by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Responses due by 2/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leopold, Theodore)
February 5, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE by Jeffery Passman re #63 MOTION to Stay re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Steven)
February 4, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION to Stay re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason by Jeffery Passman. Responses due by 2/23/2015 (Jaffe, Steven)
February 2, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC re #61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason of Non-Opposition (DeSantis, Jonathan)
January 26, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold and Stephen F. Rosenthal, and Ervin A. Gonzalez as Liason by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Responses due by 2/12/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rosenthal, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #43 Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue, with leave to refile after an amended complaint has been filed in this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/26/2015. (rtn)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint, with leave to amend the complaint by no later than 2/20/2015. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/26/2015. (rtn)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/26/2015. (rtn)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #24 Defendants' Motion to Invoke First-Filed Rule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2015. (rtn)
January 21, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC of Filing (McCoy, Kevin)
January 19, 2015 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 01-08-15 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-59 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (gpz)
January 19, 2015 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for ATS Defendants by Samuel J. Salario, Jr.. by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 2/5/2015 (Salario, Samuel)
January 13, 2015 Filing 53 RESPONSE/REPLY to Court Inquiry Regarding Recusal by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Meeks, Thomas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 52 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker (Rosenthal, Stephen)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #20 #21 #22 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings to maxelrod@cohenmilstein.com; shandmaker@cohenmilstein.com; afriedman@cohenmilstein.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/8/2015. (rtn)
January 8, 2015 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 1/8/2015. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov (sc)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Intervene to File Response to ATS Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Invoke First-Filed Rule; GRANTING #35 Motion for Limited Intervention and to File Opposition to ATS Defendants' Motion to Invoke First-Filed Rule. The Migdal Plaintiffs and the Passman Plaintiffs are hereby intervenor-plaintiffs in this action. The Migdal Plaintiffs' response to ATS Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Invoke First-Filed Rule is deemed filed. The Passman Plaintiffs shall file its response to the motion; STAYING case until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/8/2015. (rtn)
January 8, 2015 Filing 48 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rosenthal, Stephen)
January 7, 2015 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solutions Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Replies due by 1/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rosenthal, Stephen)
January 6, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party ATS Consolidated, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Allen, D)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants shall file the response by no later than 1/20/2015. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/29/2014. (rtn)
December 29, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE by Jeffery Passman re #43 MOTION to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solutions Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Filing Corrected Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Steven)
December 23, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solutions Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jeffery Passman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffe, Steven)
December 23, 2014 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salario, Samuel)
December 23, 2014 Filing 41 REPLY Brief in Support of Motion to Invoke First-Filed Rule by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Salario, Samuel) Modified title text on 12/24/2014 (asl).
December 22, 2014 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Intervene limited, to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solution's Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule filed by Christopher L. Parker. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
December 22, 2014 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Christopher L. Parker. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Rasco, Ramon)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Status Conference on 1/8/2015 at 9:00 A.M. in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/19/2014. (rtn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rafael Enrique Millares on behalf of Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Attorney Rafael Enrique Millares added to party Marwa Moussa(pty:pla), Attorney Rafael Enrique Millares added to party Christopher L. Parker(pty:pla). (Millares, Rafael)
December 18, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE by Jeffery Passman re #35 MOTION to Intervene limited, to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solution's Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Steven)
December 17, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene limited, to Transfer Venue, and Opposition to American Traffic Solution's Motion [DE 24] to Invoke First-Filed Rule by Jeffery Passman. Attorney Steven R. Jaffe added to party Jeffery Passman(pty:intv). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Declaration Steven R. Jaffe)(Jaffe, Steven)
December 17, 2014 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Annie Migdal, John Devany, Adam Ehrlich, Carole J Silverman. Attorney Marc Aaron Wites added to party Annie Migdal(pty:intvp), Attorney Marc Aaron Wites added to party John Devany(pty:intvp), Attorney Marc Aaron Wites added to party Adam Ehrlich(pty:intvp), Attorney Marc Aaron Wites added to party Carole J Silverman(pty:intvp). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Unopposed Motion to Invoke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wites, Marc)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 12/15/2014. (tpe)
December 15, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC re #24 Unopposed MOTION to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Filing of Motion to Transfer in Related Case and Amendment of Local Rule 7.1(A)(3) Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DeSantis, Jonathan)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 12/12/2014. (tpe)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/12/2014. (jc)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan A. Lenard recused. Case reassigned to Judge Federico A. Moreno for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/11/2014. (jc) (Main Document 29 replaced on 12/12/2014) (jc).
December 11, 2014 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #24 Unopposed MOTION to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Notice of Joinder filed by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. (Rasco, Ramon)
December 11, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Zachary DeSantis on behalf of ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis added to party ATS Consolidated, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Zachary DeSantis added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (DeSantis, Jonathan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga recused. Case reassigned to Judge Joan A. Lenard for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2014. (tpe)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/10/2014. (tpe)
December 5, 2014 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Invoke First-Filed Rule and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Passman Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Goldberg Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Diamond Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Migdal Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Devany Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Ehrlich Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Silverman Complaint)(Salario, Samuel)
November 26, 2014 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate American Traffic Solutions, LLC for American Traffic Solutions, Inc.; Other Affiliate ATS Processing Services, LLC for American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC (McCoy, Kevin)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies #17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr.
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants American Traffic Solutions, Inc., ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC and American Solutions Consolidated, LLC must respond to the complaint by January 5, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kdo)
November 20, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Andrew N. Friedman. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 3373. (cw)
November 20, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Sally Handmaker. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 3373. (cw)
November 20, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Matthew S. Axelrod. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 3373. (cw)
November 20, 2014 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Theodore J. Leopold & Stephen Rosenthal by Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Responses due by 12/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leopold, Theodore)
November 19, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa. American Traffic Solutions, Inc. served on 11/7/2014, answer due 11/28/2014. (Leopold, Theodore)
November 19, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa. American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC served on 11/7/2014, answer due 11/28/2014. (Leopold, Theodore)
November 19, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa. ATS Consolidated, Inc. served on 11/7/2014, answer due 11/28/2014. (Leopold, Theodore)
November 19, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa. American Traffic Solutions, LLC served on 11/7/2014, answer due 11/28/2014. (Leopold, Theodore)
November 14, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramon Alvaro Rasco on behalf of Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Marwa Moussa(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon Alvaro Rasco added to party Christopher L. Parker(pty:pla). (Rasco, Ramon)
November 14, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Frederick Rosenthal on behalf of Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Marwa Moussa(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Frederick Rosenthal added to party Christopher L. Parker(pty:pla). (Rosenthal, Stephen)
November 14, 2014 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re #1 Complaint, by ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Kevin P. McCoy added to party ATS Consolidated, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCoy, Kevin)
November 13, 2014 Filing 9 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by American Traffic Solutions, Inc. (McCoy, Kevin)
November 11, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr on behalf of ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr added to party ATS Consolidated, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Salario, Samuel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin P. McCoy on behalf of American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. Attorney Kevin P. McCoy added to party American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin P. McCoy added to party American Traffic Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin P. McCoy added to party American Traffic Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (McCoy, Kevin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 6 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa (Leopold, Theodore)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/29/2014. (ar2)
October 28, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thomas Trailor on behalf of Marwa Moussa, Christopher L. Parker. Attorney Andrew Thomas Trailor added to party Marwa Moussa(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Thomas Trailor added to party Christopher L. Parker(pty:pla). (Trailor, Andrew)
October 28, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ATS Consolidated, Inc., American Traffic Solutions Consolidated, LLC, American Traffic Solutions, Inc., American Traffic Solutions, LLC. (ail)
October 27, 2014 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (ail)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7188767, filed by Christopher L. Parker, Marwa Moussa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Leopold, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. American Traffic Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Condon
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Devila
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ramos
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Booker
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiomara Santos
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Check
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Gancher
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Rubin
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Couri
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Holtz
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dean
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marwa Moussa
Represented By: Matthew S. Axelrod
Represented By: Sally Handmaker
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Trailor
Represented By: Rafael Enrique Millares
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Gosewich
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Bartenhagen
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Gibson
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walker
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Leonardo
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Pruett
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Silber
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Lazo-Perez
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Crepeau
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Patrick Shanan Montoya
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Zeitune
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Suarez
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kornell
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Moretti
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Russell
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Woodrum
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taryn Pisaneschi
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Woodby
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Averette
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Powers
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Parker
Represented By: Matthew S. Axelrod
Represented By: Sally Handmaker
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Trailor
Represented By: Rafael Enrique Millares
Represented By: Mark S. Fistos
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Becker
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justina Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Kesner
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Alejandra Burgo Hoyos
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Patrick Shanan Montoya
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Isa
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Simson
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Diamond
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Poli
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Barrish
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Taylor
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Hamilton
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlai Green
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Delonis
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Mead
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincenzina Jackson
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Vicchiullo-Seufert
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Rosa
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Levine
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moore
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Goldberg
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Park
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Millian
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metria Jones
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Schneider
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramchand Persaud
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tewes
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Rodriguez
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mirabelli
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Patrick Shanan Montoya
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Nolan
Represented By: Ramon Alvaro Rasco
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Rosenthal
Represented By: Theodore Jon Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clewiston
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Donovan Adam Roper
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Miami
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Homestead
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miami
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Maitland
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Donovan Adam Roper
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Haines City
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Groveland
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Temple Terrace
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Donovan Adam Roper
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hollywood
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gainesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Springs
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Bay Village
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Robert L. Switkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miami Beach
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Aleksandr Boksner
Represented By: Robert F. Rosenwald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hallandale Beach
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brooksville
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Donovan Adam Roper
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fort Lauderdale
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox State & Local Solutions, Inc. f/k/a ACS State & Local Solutions
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Krista Anne Sivick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Coral Springs
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Coast
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS Consolidated, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Meeks
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Brown
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: D Matthew Allen
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milton
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Opa-Locka
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Medley
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Traffic Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R. McCarthy
Represented By: Thomas Meeks
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Brown
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: D Matthew Allen
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of El Portal
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winter Park
Represented By: Usher Lawrence Brown
Represented By: Thomas Robert Unice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Traffic Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Edward R. McCarthy
Represented By: Thomas Meeks
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Brown
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: D Matthew Allen
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Salario, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Doral
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Palm Beach
Represented By: Anthony M. Stella
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Dana Collier-Herst
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boynton Beach
Represented By: Tracey A. DeCarlo
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Michael David Cirullo, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Shana H. Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oldsmar
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kenneth City
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Daytona Beach
Represented By: Lisa Barclay Fountain
Represented By: Michael Patrick Spellman
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Miami Beach
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Michele Samaroo
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Patricia Leigh McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cocoa Beach
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aventura
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Holly Hill
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Orlando
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Bay
Represented By: Patricia Denise Smith
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Lannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miami Gardens
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Petersburg
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Joseph Paul Patner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Apopka
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pembroke Pines
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Tracey A. DeCarlo
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Michael David Cirullo, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Represented By: Samuel Stuart Goren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Surfside
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gulfport
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Donovan Adam Roper
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Margate
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Cutler Bay
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Park
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Key Biscayne
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boca Raton
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tampa
Represented By: Jerry Martin Gewirtz
Represented By: Robin Horton Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sarasota
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clermont
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department Of Revenue
Represented By: John Bajger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Davie
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Green Cove Springs
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palatka
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sunrise
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Matthew Harris Mandel
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bradenton
Represented By: Thomas Robert Unice, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Amy Taylor Petrick
Represented By: Kim Ngoc Phan
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manatee County
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hialeah Gardens
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Edward George Guedes
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Zeskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tamarac
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: