Martins et al v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Plaintiff: Marla Martins, Marcelo Costa, Tatiana Martins and G. E.
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2015cv21124
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Jose E. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Granting 313 Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Nontaxable Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (km03) Modified to "opinion" on 6/7/2019 (wc).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice. All other pending motions are denied without prejudice as being moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (km03)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Plaintiff Marla Martins' Motion to Alter and Amend Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/27/2018. (jf00) Modified document type on 2/27/2018 (dgj).
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying 96 Defendant's Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/12/2017. (jf00)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Undersigned grants in large part and denies in small part Defendant's summary judgment motion. Plaintiff Marla Martins may proceed to trial on Counts I and II, but all other claims for her and the other Plaintiffs are now precluded because summary judgment for Defendant is appropriate on those claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/3/2016. (jf00)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in small part and denying in large part Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/29/2016. (tr00)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martins et al v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Martins
Represented By: David Wayne Brill
Represented By: Joseph J. Rinaldi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Costa
Represented By: David Wayne Brill
Represented By: Joseph J. Rinaldi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Martins
Represented By: David Wayne Brill
Represented By: Joseph J. Rinaldi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. E.
Represented By: David Wayne Brill
Represented By: Joseph J. Rinaldi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Drahos
Represented By: Marc J. Schleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?