IN RE: Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Loren Petersen, Plaintiffs Lead Counsel, Bernadette Heard, Nicholas Kinney, Pamela Wilsey, Frank Mason, Christopher Kosherzenko, James Herron, Sue Radoff, Harold Caraviello, Walter Heinl, Yolanda Dillard, Holly Ruth, Eric Rosson, Sheila Torregano, Jennifer Manfrin, Charles & Vickie Burd, Amy Roy, Doreen Kehoe, Charon Berg, Mark Dieckman, Keith Marsden, Victoria Barbarin, Lucy Jackson, Travis Poper, Justin S. Birdsall, Andrew King, Daniel Thies, Richard McCormick, Charles & Dana Talamantes, Joe Emanus, Patricia Dumire, Kristin Petri, Sinan Kalaba, Errol Jacobsen, Regina M. Reilly, Hayley Wells, Julean Williams, Farrell Moskow, John Huff, Kevin Roberts, Arthur Hegewald, Juan Lugo, Valescia Starks, James Mancuso, Michael Etter, Quarnos Auto Salvage, Susan Ginsberg, Daniel S. Silva, Gary Guadagno, Victor Williams, Allison C Connelly, Catherine Davenport, Vanessa Harris, Elizabeth Pelayo, Angie Alomar, Rudolph Otto, Jr., Jean Zimmerman, Danny Tyrus Barnes, Bernard Cyrus, Jr., Subhija Imamovic, Matt Dean, William James, Agaron Tavitian, Whid Noori, Dana Talamantes, Eleanor & Anthony Settembrino, Mary Anne Pownall, George Agustin, Sr., Tekeisha Washington, Mary Hasley, Brandon Hines, Helen Klemer, Eugennie Sinclair, Charles and Christina Cochran, Darla Spies, Joan Overmyer, Krystal Shelby, Ella Ragan, Gurinder Dhillon, Rebecca Lew, Richard Wright, Ivana Smith, Enefiok Anwana, Ty Kline, Carla Thompson, Robert Barto, Milton Hanks, Jr., Mark Schmidt, Judy Vice, Brad Hays, Frank Smith, Robert Carobene, Dianne Albright, Arlan Albright, Lisa Peterson, William Reedy, Vickie Burd, Matthew Long, Brian Calderone, Carolyn Gamble, Kenisha Eron-Jones, Camila G. Corteleti, M&K Used Auto Parts, Inc., Megan Sayre-Scibona, Thomas & Carolyn Adkins, Arthur and Yolanda Glynn, Jr., Walter and Vicky Askew, Teresa Woodard, David Brown, Cody Jacobs, Leslie Flaherty, Joseph Przybszewski, Doreen Dembeck, Regina Tate, Rigsby's Auto Parts & Sales, Inc., Madilyn Fox, Robert & Angela Dickie, Janice LaPlante, Randall Hall, John Meiser, Alicia Benton, Gerald Ordonio, Boyd Cantu, Tonya Folse, Lynda Flores, Quarno's Auto Salvage, Angie Elder-Johnson and Tyler Meier
Defendant: Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation, General Motors LLC, Esq. Sekou Gary, Inflation Systems Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, FCA US LLC, Ashley McCain, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Daimler AG, James McCain, Sean Hull, Kervin Walsh, General Motors Holdings LLC, Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Susan L. Nickolopoulos and Victor L Howser
Consolidated Plaintiff: Ann Xiaoyan Chen, Kathryn Commiciotto, Lynndon Bais, Ellen Bonet, Juan Falcon-Cosme, Zulemarie Rivera, John Huebner, Kenneth G. Desie, Jossellin M. Resto, John Considine, Kelly R Denny, Dorry Taylor, Michael Osborn, Carolyn Miller, Automotive Dismantlers and Recyclers Association, Inc., Margaret Bace, Keith Gauchet, Ruth Thompson, Erin K. Meiser, Gilbert Art, LLC, Susan Teisl, Jina Bae, Laura Killgo, James Pollara, William R Wilson, Tina Herring, Annette Reid, Idotenyin Umoh, Aaron Montigue, Todd Stefenack, Jerry Adler, Roseana Weartherwax, Richard Lee, Steven P. Schneider, Milton Francis, Corine Shearer, Coleman Haklar, Erik Boone, Kevin Boyd, Gregory McCarthy, Matilde Kuffo, Robert E. Weisberg, Midway Auto Parts LLC, Patty Arriola, Joseph Przybyszewski, Corene L Quirk, John S Zielinski, Michael Sanchez, Hassan Ahmadi, Juan E. Diaz Diaz, Antonio Floro, Angela Ruffin, Luz Pacheco, Clyde K Chapman, Pilsun Pai, Miranda Perez, Kangyi Chen, Amy Patterson, Richard A. Alexander, Mimi Primeaux, Gail Markowitz, Gwendolyn Cody, Lidice C. Santos, Chanteil Walter, David W. Cambron, Jr., Nathan Bordewich, Denise Raposo, Edward L. Drake, Valerie M Nannery, Sherry Zappola, America Diaz Vega, Henry Pham, Law Ngee Chiong, Sandeep Dewan, Teresa Lemke, Paula Lynn Weaver, Rodney Harris, Daree Sutton, Thomas J. Faber, Jena Napp, John Lee, Marna S Chapman, Barbara Courtney, Christine Thornton, Pam Koehler, Tasha R. Siverio, Adeline Cadit, Crystal Pardue, Vincent J. Simarano, Veronica Stewart, Philip Bace, Shelley Shader, Howard Singer, Sian Schafle, Angelina C Sujata, Marjorie Michelle Avery, Joyce White, Peggy Joyce Kole, Joan Schwebel, Robert Redfearn, Jr., Santiago Gomez Bautista, Angel Figuerora, Nicole Peaslee, Claire W Thompson, Triple D Corporation, David Davis, Luann Bishop-Smith, Nola Touche, Laura S. Boggess, Kelly Ritter, Kathy Liberal, Gerson Joseph, Oswald C. Tessier, Sr., David W. Ellis, Sr., Frank Lupberger, Clark Stanley Dube, Lawrence Nesmith, Kelly Autry, Barry Balmuth, Heidi Lantier Mauro, Sabra M. Wilson, Amy C. Patterson, Lisa Marie Duke, Rodys Exposito, Nancy DeLeone, Cyndee Wishkovsky, Adam Wishkovsky, Thomas Dunleavy, Patricia Arnold, Haccord Curry, Amanda J. Revelia, Richard Klinger, Nicole Fisch, Alex M Oh, Robin Holt, Joseph Aliscio, James Johnson, Michael Karolak, Kurt Scheuerman, Maureen Rash, Marlene S. Karu, Howard Campbell, Candido Orlando Francisco Rodriguez, Joyce M Wichmann, Robin Spence, Snyder's LTD, Erin Taffera, Susan Nattrass, Charline Cypre, Claribel Del Carmen Nunez, Mary B Johnston, David G. Thomas, Suketu Dalal, Roy Mills, Patrick Bryans, Shaun Taylor, Scott Cruttenden, Theodore Bukowski, Patrick V. Love, John Warren Burge, Daniel K. Back, Lawrence E. Casper, Deborah A. Love, Kristen Go, Deborah Morgan, Kevin Chrusciel, Kalpna Chauhan, Michael Cunningham, Steven Pangle, Teddy K. Veser, Christopher Paul Day, Lauryn Sanchez, Frank Hrkach, Barbara Mulroy, Andrew J Kampuries, Meliza Gurian, Michael Walker, JR., Mr. Charles E. Calhoun, Sr., James McDonough, Daniel Marino, Maxine Johnson, Robert Anthony Rich, Anthony Palmieri, Cedric Walton, Timothy Archer, Leland Nutt, Kathleen A. Erb, Russ Holland, Henry Collins, Howard Morris, Rafael A. Garcia, Mary Christine Rapoza, Larry A Strauss, Dennis Hubbard, Donna Bourne, Annie McAdam, Martha Kesler, Mary Saucedo, Lemon Auto Sales, Inc., Patti Rowe, Miguel A. Gloria, Lonee Cataldo, Tru Value Auto Malls LLC, Sherrey Cioffi, Stephen Pokiniewski, Janet McFarland, Thomas Miller, E. S., Elena E Obis, Zainab Prowell, Howard G. Frey, David M. Jorgensen, Cecilia Dowdye, Dawne Hodge, Connie Collins, Avis Scott, Adrian Antonio Pielago, Charles Fishman, Frances Osterhout, Thomas Williams, Marc Seals, Raquel Gloria, Erik Heiberg, Brooks Weisblat, David Kopelman, Rory Fite, Nancy Barnett, Kristen Parker, Milton Diaz Soto, Isabel N. Diaz Diaz, Fred David Furman, Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts, LLC, Monte Leger, Mickey Vukadinovic, Sonya A (Tipton) Leonard, Julie Shmil, Craig Dunn, Jann Holland, Michael Byrne, Cindy Tiemeyer, Jason Moehlman, Brandon Anthony Martinez, Miko Greer, Krystle Nolte, Charles Kole, Mario Cervantes, Michael Hoelscher, Peter Breschnev, Domenico Emiliani, Lyle Moore, Gerdgene Karl Veser, Kathleen Wilkinson, John McKenna, John Henry Ellis, III, Kathryn Tillisch, Devon Rideout, Dan Peoples, Diana Rennie, Jorge Pimentel, Terri Gamino, Jerzy Wieczorek, Judith Hollywood, William Dougherty, Kimberly Holmes, Constantine Kazos, Tina Tran Dang, Sara Baker, Hartman Law Firm PA, Matthew Lawrence, Fredys Cabrera, James C Arnold, Jr, Christopher W. Pedersen, Julie Mi Ok Nam, Mark Yankello, Richard Hallam, Cathryn Tanner, Ted Pepin, Eric Anthony Rosson, Charlotte Whitehead, Lee Gori, Robert A. Munroe, Evelio Ruiz, Mary Howard Ellis, Christopher D Johnston, Nancy Wade, Billy Richardson, Melinda Tingle, Karen Switkowski, Ms. Bonnie W Young, Richard E H Howells, Haydee Masini, Patricia Payeur, Yessica Martinez, Arlene Rosenstock, Luke Hooper, Noemi Vega, Linda Commiciotto, Sumatee Ramroop, Robert F. Goodwin, Donna Bader, Antonio Rosado, Roy Martin, Katherine E. Shank, David Takeda, Joseph Patton, Macy A. Flett, Amber Hodgson, Lisa Regina Perry, David Neto, Butler Auto Recycling Inc, Anna Marie Brechtell Flattmann, Jonathan W. Knight, Julie Fratrik, Kostan Lathouris, Towana Banks, Jatin Chugani, Laura Gerhart, Eyal Bar, Linsey Meade, Mona Bayless, Marisa Moore, Srinivasa Ravindran, Susana Zamora, Chelsey Lynn Kulp, Byong T. Choi, James Thompson, Melissa Teisl, Anthony D. Dark, Kimberly Horton, Jack Bowen, Sarah B. Rosenwasser, Michael McLeod, Mark Anderson, Jose Luis Gomez, Racquel Hudson, Jennifer Burch, Lesley Klein, David Ball, Robert E Lyon, Jr, Karen Serrano, Joana Corticeiro, Marc C. Raiken, Kaiulani Muna, David Gunther, Robert Schmidt, Helen Pokiniewski, Dr. Abdullah Shamshir Bin Abd Mokti, Richard H. Sayler, Marilin E. Dillman, Cira Montoya, Scott T. Strachan, Thomas R. Rickert, Judy Rumlik, Richard Daniel Arnold, Jr., Dita Memed, Miguel A Morales Ramos, Keile Allen, Richard Clow, David Bear McLaughlin, Amir Bishara, Jasmine Briant, Gina Johnson, Beverly Whiddon, Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, Marita Murphy, Robert Paul Rich, Joel Brightbill, Dianne L. Moulton, John Zion, Michael Schafle, Hector Balderas, Trey Watley, Peter Gargas, Dave Battinieri, Fernando Suarez, Mario Vega Lozano, Vincent Van Aagten, John Brugaletta, Hannah Feltner, Gerald Cox, April Feltner, Tyrus Wheat, Daniel Dwinnells, Ron Townsend, Sam Siggson, Kenneth C. Jones, John Flores, Ryan Davis, William Hogan, Jr., Jacob G. Salazar, Rafael Morales, Dolores Salazar, Branko Krmpotic, Harry D. Steck, Katherine Miller, Paul Gogoshian, David Yuan, Emerson Ganiban, Christopher Stamps, Vivek Goyal, David M. Cons, Patrick F. Calhoune, Christina Niskanen, Joshua Picker, Ronald D Molina, Higinio Llamas, Justin Maestri, Mary Hart Harris, Arthur L Bustos, Carrie Bryden, Natalie A. Jaeger, Westley Farmer, Jee Woo Lee, Alexander Pensado, Leslie Pinchuk, Richard McCleary, Amanda Thomas, Sylvester Sybilski, Roes 1-20, Adam Weber, Gary Berkovich, Deloris A Jones, Michael Sanford, Delola Nelson-Reynolds, Rezuan Shaik, Steve Parker, Todd Dwyer, Angelica M. Mata, Alfred Zappola, Lynn J Royer, Jo Anne Schmidt, Kellie Siggson, Arlene Karpel, Behrad Aynehchi, Carlee D. Laster, Michael Nevieus, Dorian Roberts, Eileen Alcantar, Michael McBride, Susan Knapp, Ricardo Dillard, Jangbir S. Sangha, Olga Suarez, Patricia Hernandez, Derek Mostero, Hoa Nguyen, Sam Jaffal, Nannette Gogoshian, April Rockstead Barker, Road Tested Parts, Inc., Abraham Hirschel, George O'Connor, Gary Lane, Said Almoradi, Richard A Bartleman, James Roy Niskanen, Valissa McNeil Dillard, Yossi Shimshi, Rafael Guerrero, Ali K. Alshatti, Sean Poffenbarger, Jeffrey Orr, Malia Moore, Randy Sid, Patrick Steven Parks, Penny Sue Parks, Pedro M. Melendrez, Danielle Hallman, Chloe Crater, Mitra Bazzal, Norma Longoria, Cynthia Foster, Nahid Ghasemi, Christopher Gorgani, Noah V Siegel, Teri M. Altenes, Sophia C. Madrigal, Imelda Ganiban, Jaime Morales, Michelle Brooks, Diana Coker, David Deking, Patrick McNamara, Does 1 - 20, Brian Bartling, Vincent Catalanotto, Christine Palmer, Michael Allegretti, Carlos D. Esparza, Vanessa Latimer, David M. Lucas, Douglas M. McKeehan, Cedric Schwab, Carlos Alcantar, Blake Lane, Donald Stains, Young's Auto Center and Salvage, LP, Alexander Estrada, Albert Rizk, Jerry A. Schmidt, Danielle Dismone, Brett Alters, Michael Salazar, Joshua Kopple, Mi Sook Lee Kim, Andy Madrigal, Jerome Mostero, Tamara E. Newsome, Larry W Coker, Alan Karpel, Derrick Fenley, Margarita Salazar, Tricia Johnson, Juan Velarde, Barbara A. Christian, Dora D Meneses, Donna Sousa, Judith Pinchuk, Rose Flores, Audrey Feltner, Gwen Jewell, Carissa Lozano, Gerald Harding, Robert Tiedt, James Brooks, Constance Gast, Ray Hobson, Judy Hooker, Thomas Youmans, Hugh M. Sigley, Rogrika Dondle, Robert Helmiling, Luis Gaviria, Thomas Anthony Dugas, Sonny DeGuzman, Lynn Groves, Jessica Freire, Taylor Ivey, Donald Ross, Jim Weney, Debbie Caulley, Roger D. Stratton, Winston Cummings, Howard Brown, Judy Ballou, Jennifer Doswell, Arniza Quinn, Akram Abi-Hanna, Bruce Henley, Kellianne Worthington, Donald J Packer, Donald Laliberty, Ted Adams, Shannon Vahalik, Sallie Thames, Carmen Capezzuto, Ron Temple, Jon Weaver, Deborah Cohorst, Hector Pineda, Michael Jacobson, Edwin L. Gurr, Bernard Krueger, Arthur Docken, Charlotte King, Steven Huddleston, Keshia Godfrey, James Harlett, Michael Crowell, Phillip Cosstick, James Rust, Lois McNaughton, Carrie Burch, Pamela Sanders, Claude R. Thrash, Joseph Nuckles, Richard Tallurico, Sharon Courter, Robert Caston, James Dansby, Charles Everett, Gene Mies, Gayle Bell, Yoko Harper, Angela Davis, Loretta Poole, Freeland Payne, Jon S. Pelzer, Michael Scotece, Bruce John Miner, Cynthia Remsen, Dianna Etheridge, Tracy Yarbrough, Donald G. Lockridge, Susann Gage, Elizabeth Rasmussen, Kerry G. Fox, Samuel Bell, Shannon N. Fazio, Michael Reifschneider, Russella Adams, Rosemary Simm, Michael Daniels, David Groft, David Churilla, Cecil Laird, Stephen Cheskiewicz, Teresa Chamberlain, John Ahrens, Tadeusz Lukawski, Justin Bartlett, Douglas Fink, Barbara A. Ballard, Connie Coney, Mary Obee, Richard Worth, Larry Perri, James H. Keen, David Pirkle, Kelly A. Patsolic, Amy Wilson, Dale Hodge, Rosita Garcia, Dennis Behnke, Mike McTeague, Cynthia Harris, Nathaniel Bullock, Donna Cook, Dorothy Hollie, Lourdes Herrera, James Gusky, Steven Sofia, Leslie Reed, Madanmohan R. Soma, Teena Merritt, Nicholas Mariolis, Michael Hale, John Speaks, Brian Stewart, Wendy Spencer, Patrick Villanueva and Allen Riley
Consolidated Defendant: Honda Engineering Co Ltd, American Honda Motor Co., Inc.,, Mazda Motor Corporation, Ford Motor Company, BMW of North America, LLC, Philpott Motors, Ltd., Honda R & D Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Drivetime Car Sales Company, LLC, Toyota R&D Co., Ltd., General Motors, LLC, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Constance Camacho, Hoehn Motors, Inc., Nissan Motor Co., Ltd, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Does 1-10, Takata Corporation, TK Holdings, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors Corporation, XYZ Corporation 1-10, Morse Operations, Inc, Subaru of America, Inc., Chrysler/Dodge Distribution, Honda Motor Co, Toyota Motor Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Takata AG, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd., Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Subaru, Unidentified Party, Honda Motor Company, LTD, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Toyota MotorCo., Inc., Ferrari North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Honda Research Institute USA Inc, Honda Engineering North America Inc, Chrysler Corporation Jeep Division, John Green, BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, General Motors Co., Honda North America, International Mall Motor Company, Takata Inc, Honda Research Institute Japan Co Ltd, Honda Motor Corporation, Honda R&D Co Ltd, Audi of America, LLC, arbtre, Toyota MFG., Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Honda Motors Inc, Fuji Heavy Industries, Toyota Motor Co., Ltd., Dr. John Doe, ABC Corporation 1-10, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., BMW AG, Drivetime Automotive Group, Inc., Highland Industries, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC, Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, American Honda Co., Inc., Takata Protection Systems, Inc., TEMA, Volkswagen of Downtown L.A., LP, Walnut Creek Ford, Inc., Ford of Santa Monica, Inc., Rancho Ford, Inc., Downtown Ford Sales, P.A. Motorcars, LLC, VW Credit Inc., Vista Ford Inc., Ted Jones Ford, Inc., Capitol Del Grande 4 Inc, Vista Ford Lincoln of Oxnard, LLC, Molle Automotive Group, LLC, Haberfelde Ford, Robert Jesus Lucero, Jack Gosch Ford, Inc., ABC Companies 1-10, South Bay Motors, LLC, Newport Lexus, Beltray Inc., South Bay Ford, Inc., Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC, Roes 21 through 40, Joe Macpherson Ford, Bluesky Diversified Inc., Ford Store Morgan Hill, Inc., Future Ford, Inc., Tuttle Click's Capistrano Ford, Inc., Robichaux Motors, LLC, Los Feliz Ford, Inc., Walker Ford Co. Inc., Lithia FMF, Inc., Sunroad Auto LLC, Sunrise Ford, Theodore Robins, Inc., Fiesta Ford, Inc., Suburban Motors Inc, Perry Ford of National City LLC, Antelope Valley Chevrolet, Inc. dba Antelope Valley Ford Lincoln, Volkswagen Credit, Inc., Warren-Anderson Ford, Don Chalmers Ford Car Care Center, LLC, Riverside Metro Auto Group, LLC, General Motors Company LLC, Julian Gomez, Central Ford Automotive, Inc., Logix Financial Services, Carmax Auto Superstores West Coast, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Mesa Imports, LLC, Pacific Ford, Inc., Advantage Ford, Inc., PAG Santa Ana AVW Inc., BWM NVT Motors, Dornoch Inc, Galpin Motors, Inc., Livingston Volkswagen, Inc., Haley A. Ritchie, Carmax Business Services, LLC, Roes 1-100, The Hertz Corporation, GPI CA-F, Inc., Don Chalmers Ford, Inc.,, Bob Wondries Motors, Palm Springs Motors, Inc., Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Wells Fargo, N.A., Johnson Ford, Mossy Ford, Inc. and NGP Motors, Inc.
Special Master: John Delionado and Ryan K Stumphauzer
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: TK Holdings Inc. and DWWIII Company, Inc.
Claimant: John Randall Futch
Consolidated 3Rd Party Plaintiff: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Cross Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 1:2015md02599
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 3929 STATUS REPORT No.12 By The Settlement Special Administrator On The Implementation Of The Outreach Programs Pursuant To The BMW, Ford, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3928 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Latoya C. Brown for / by Juan Falcon-Cosme. Responses due by 1/27/2021 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Miner, Curtis)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3927 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Latoya C. Brown for / by Heidi Lantier Mauro. Responses due by 1/27/2021 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Miner, Curtis)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3926 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3924 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Scott O'Brien. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/11/2021. (zgz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3925 SUPPLEMENT to (3916 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3916 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1708 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1708 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order,,,,, Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,,, Recycler Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Over New Defendants And In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Recyclers' First Amended Complaint And The Sinclair Complaint by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3924 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott M. OBrien. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-14172936 by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. OBrien)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3923 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit Volkswagen from Deposing Dave Battinieri and Sandra Herrell by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3922 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James H. Congdon for / by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of James H. Congdon)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3921 ORDER granting #3920 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lauren P. Scott representing Ford Motor Company (Consol Defendant) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Lauren Scott. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3920 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pro Hac Counsel by Lauren P. Scott for / by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salas, Henry)
December 22, 2020 Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase representing Subaru of America, Inc. (Consol Defendant) and Subaru of America, Inc. (Cross Claimant) terminated per DE #3919 . Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jeffrey Chase. (pes)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3919 ORDER granting (1709 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey L. Chase for / filed by Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd., Subaru of America, Inc. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3918 REPLY to #3917 Response to Order to Show Cause by Tracy Brown. (mc)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3917 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3911 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Takata Bankruptcy Court Schedule of Affected Claims)(Prieto, Peter)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3916 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. By January 8, 2021, Plaintiffs must submit a detailed account of which Plaintiffs directly filed their claims, which Defendants were added once the transferor actions had been consolidated in the MDL, and when they were added. The Plaintiffs shall brief the following issue by January 8, 2021: Can this Court exercise personal jurisdiction over Defendants that were added once the actions had been transferred into the MDL (assuming the transferor court could exercise personal jurisdiction)? Defendants should respond to Plaintiffs' brief by January 22, 2021. The Court will schedule oral argument on the motions to dismiss the Butler and Sinclair complaints on January 29, 2021 at 10 A.M. (Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno re: ( #2976 , #2984 , #2985 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1016, 1025, 1027 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/3/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3915 NOTICE of Compliance Recycler Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Unredacted Complaint by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel re (3912 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Automotive Recyclers' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Prieto, Peter)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3914 RESPONSE to (3913 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Supplemental Authority, by General Motors LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3913 Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding NHTSA's Denial of GM's Consolidated Petition for Inconsequentiality by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- NHTSA Denial of GM's Consolidated Petition for Inconsequentiality) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Prieto, Peter)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3912 NOTICE OF UPCOMING RULING. The Court is prepared to rule on the Defendants' pending motions to dismiss the Butler and Sinclair Complaints filed by the Recycler Plaintiffs. The Court assumes that the version of the Butler complaint that is filed on the docket (D.E. #2781 ) is the operative version of the complaint, despite the redacted material. Should the Plaintiffs believe the redacted material would change the Court's ruling, they are ordered to file an unredacted version of the complaint by November 30th. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3911 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re ( #3908 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Letter from class member Tracy Brown. Show Cause Response due by 12/10/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/12/2020. Associate Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3910 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Meghan Chandler Moore re #3909 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3909 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Meghan Chandler Moore (Moore, Meghan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3908 NOTICE to the Court re: Settlement by Tracy Brown (Digital Voice Recorder included) (mc)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3907 ORDER granting in part ( #3903 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1700 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadlines for the Economic Loss Track Cases. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to place the Puhalla complaint on a separate track. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/29/2020. Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3906 ORDER granting ( #3905 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Armando Gustavo Hernandez representing Chrysler Group LLC (Consol Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 24, 2020 Filing 3905 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Armando G. Hernandez for / by Chrysler Group LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Armando)
October 24, 2020 Filing 3904 NOTICE of Change of Address by Armando Gustavo Hernandez Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Hernandez, Armando)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3903 Plaintiff's MOTION to Place the Puhalla Complaint on a Separate Track and to Extend Deadlines for the Puhalla Complaint by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3902 STATUS REPORT No. 11 By The Settlement Special Administrator On The Implementation Of The Outreach Programs Pursuant To The BMW, Ford, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3901 ORDER granting ( #3899 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1697) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Krista Lenart. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/15/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3900 ORDER granting ( #3898 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney William E. McDonald, III. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/15/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21052-FAM (mc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3899 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Krista Lenart. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13683192 by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 10/27/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3898 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William McDonald. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13625438 by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Fulton, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3897 ORDER granting ( #3896 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David N. Barry. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 27, 2020 Filing 3896 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David N. Barry. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13591196 by Steve Parker. Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Steve Parker(pty:conpla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Steve Parker(pty:conpla). Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Prieto, Peter)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3895 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kimberly A. Cook for / by Nissan North America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Cook, Kimberly)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3894 ORDER granting ( #3879 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1686 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3893 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rosemary J. Bruno for / by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. Attorney Stephen Carey Villeneuve added to party BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Carey Villeneuve added to party BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/18/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Villeneuve, Stephen)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3892 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (D.E. 3891 in 15-02599) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jason L. Lichtman of the law firm of Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP. Attorney Jason L. Lichtman is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Jason L. Lichtman at: jlichtman@lchb.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/1/2020. (pes)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3891 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason L. Lichtman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13430749 by Michael McBride. Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Michael McBride(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Michael McBride(pty:conpla). Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinshall, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3890 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3889 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM; 1692 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM; 1149 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Rufus E. Thompson's and Marco E. Gonzales's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorneys Rufus E. Thompson and Marco E. Gonzales are terminated as counsel of record for Defendant General Motors, LLC and shall have no further responsibilities in this matter. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3889 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rufus E. Thompson and Marco E. Gonzales for / by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 9/4/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3888 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3887 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM) Susan K. Allen's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for FCA US LLC. Susan K. Allen is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant FCA US LLC and shall have no further responsibilities in this matter. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:18-cv-21052-FAM (mc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3887 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Susan K. Allen for / by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Fulton, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3886 ORDER ON REMOTE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL; granting ( #3881 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM) Joint Motion for Entry of Order on Remote Deposition Protocol. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3885 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3883 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM and 1689 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Erroneous Document. The Clerk is directed to strike from the docket DE #3880 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3884 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3882 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM and 1688 in case 1:14-cv24009-FAM) Douglas B. Brown's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for FCA US LLC. Douglas B. Brown of Rumberger, Kirk, & Caldwell, P.A. is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant FCA US LLC and shall have no further responsibilities in this matter; denying as moot (1687 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3883 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document (3880 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion to Continue Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Erroneous Document by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3882 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Douglas B. Brown for / by FCS US LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Brown, Douglas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3881 Joint MOTION JOINT MOTION TO FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ON REMOTE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prieto, Peter)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3880 (STRICKEN per DE 3885 ) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prieto, Peter) Modified relief on 8/17/2020 (mc). Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mc).
August 12, 2020 Filing 3879 Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Modify the Scheduling Order re (3840 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Scheduling Order, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 8/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3878 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3876 , #3877 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1683, 1684 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Larry R. Rogers, Jr. and Carolyn S. Daley of the law firm Power Rogers, LLP. Attorneys Larry R. Rogers, Jr. and Carolyn S. Daley are admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Larry R. Rogers, Jr. at lrogersjr@powerrogers.com; and Carolyn S. Daley at cdaley@powerrogers.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3877 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Larry R. Rogers, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13316161 by John S Zielinski. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Miner, Curtis)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3876 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Carolyn S. Daley. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13316106 by John S Zielinski. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Miner, Curtis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3875 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to (3863 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Response in Support of Motion,, Recycler Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Supplemental Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss Recyclers' First Amended Complaint And The Sinclair Complaint by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3874 Automotive Defendants' Response to Recycler Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to (3864 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1674 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Response/Reply (Other), by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company, LTD, Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Honda R & D Co., Ltd.. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Widom, Mitchell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3873 STATUS REPORT No. 10 By The Settlement Special Administrator On The Implementation Of The Outreach Programs Pursuant To The BMW, Ford, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3872 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3870 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1677 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM; #3871 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1678 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Zoe Brumfield-Meyers and Amarto Bhattacharyya of the law firm of Kirkland & Ellis LLP. Attorneys Zoe Brumfield-Meyers and Amarto Bhattacharyya are admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Zoe Brumfield-Meyers at zoe.brumfieldmeyers@kirkland.com; and Amarto Bhattacharyya at amarto.bhattacharyya@kirkland.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3871 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amarto Bhattacharyya. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13269220 by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3870 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Zoe Brumfield-Meyers. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13269158 by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3869 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3868 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3867 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3861 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1672 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jonathan Tshiamala. Attorney Jonathan Tshiamala is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Jonathan Tshiamala at jonathan.tshiamala@kirkland.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3866 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1662 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3850 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Renewed MOTION to Amend/Correct (2762 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against the Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3865 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3864 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to (3849 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order,, Recycler Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Recycler's First Amended Complaint And The Sinclair Complaint by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3863 RESPONSE in Support re (2976 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1016 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (941 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 2781 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law AUTOMOTIVE DEFENDANTS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS AUTOMOTIVE RECYCLER PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Seipp, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3862 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Cantero, Raoul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3861 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan Tshiamala. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # FLSDC-13197136 by General Motors LLC, General Motors, LLC. Responses due by 7/31/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3860 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for PHV attorneys Todd A. Smith and Brian LaCien re #3858 Notice of Change of Address, #3859 Notice of Change of Address. (pt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3859 NOTICE of Change of Address by Curtis Bradley Miner Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Miner, Curtis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3858 NOTICE of Change of Address by Curtis Bradley Miner Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Miner, Curtis)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3857 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3854 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, and 1666 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Christopher J. Dunne. Attorney Christopher J. Dunne is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Christopher J. Dunne at dunnec@sullcrom.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3856 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1660 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3848 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct (2759 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (2758 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaints Against The General Motors and FCA D filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3855 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3850 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1662 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Renewed MOTION to Amend/Correct (2762 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against the Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants filed by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Daimler AG, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC. Replies due by 7/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3854 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher J. Dunne. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-13162916. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC. Responses due by 7/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Dunne)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3853 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (1660 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3848 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct (2759 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (2758 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaints Against The General Motors and FCA D by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
July 3, 2020 Filing 3852 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint Against Defendant FCA US LLC by FCA US LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3851 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot ( #3440 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, and 1358 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification as to the Court's Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, and denying as moot ( #3842 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification, in view of ( #3850 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1662 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against the Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3850 Renewed MOTION to Amend/Correct (2762 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against the Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Amended Puhalla Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Redline of Proposed Amended Puhalla Complaint)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3849 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING regarding the Recycler Plaintiffs' Claims in the Butler and Sinclair Complaints. Defendants' Joint Supplemental Brief and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief must be filed no later than July 17, 2020. Briefs in Opposition by Defendants and by Plaintiffs must be filed no later than July 31, 2020. Defendants' Joint Supplemental Brief cannot exceed 25 pages; Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief cannot exceed 25 pages; and the Briefs in Opposition cannot exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/26/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (pes)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3848 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct (2759 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (2758 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaints Against The General Motors and FCA Defendants by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Amended Whitaker Complaint Against GM Defendants, #2 Exhibit B -- Proposed Amended Boyd Complaint Against FCA, #3 Exhibit C -- Redline of Proposed Amended Whitaker Complaint Against GM Defendants, #4 Exhibit D -- Redline of Proposed Amended Boyd Complaint Against FCA)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3847 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MEDIATORS: Paul C. Huck, Jr. and Jacqueline Hogan Scola added. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/19/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3846 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to (3832 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3832 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3845 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3842 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion for Hearing Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Notice Requesting Oral Argument On Plaintiffs' Motion For Clarification filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Hearing Transcript)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3844 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3842 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion for Hearing filed by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Daimler AG, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Replies due by 6/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3843 Clerks Notice to Filer re #3842 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (mc)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3842 MOTION/NOTICE Requesting Oral Argument by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel re #3440 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification (1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-025 NOTICE REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Prieto, Peter) Modified relief on 6/3/2020 (mc).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3841 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3835 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM; 1651 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM; 1146 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Attorney Amanda Farfel of Sidley Austin LLP. Attorney Amanda Farfel of Sidley Austin LLP is terminated as counsel of record for Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda Motor Co., Ltd., and shall have no further responsibilities in these matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM. (mc)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3840 SCHEDULING ORDER as to the Puhalla Amended Complaint against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC; the Whitaker Amended Complaint against General Motors LLC, General Motors Company, and General Motors Holdings LLC; and the Boyd Amended Complaint against FCA US LLC. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
June 1, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline: FCA US LLC response due 7/23/2020 per DE #3839 Order. (mc)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3839 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ( #2983 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1024 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) FCA US LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Boyd Amended Complaint. Defendant FCA US LLC must answer the remaining claims in the Boyd Amended Complaint no later than July 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
May 29, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline: General Motors Holdings LLC response due 7/20/2020; General Motors LLC response due 7/20/2020; General Motors Co. response due 7/20/2020, per DE #3838 Order. (mc)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3838 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ( #2981 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1022 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) General Motors LLC, General Motors Company, and General Motors Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Whitaker Amended Complaint. Defendants General Motors LLC, General Motors Company, and General Motors Holdings LLC must answer the remaining claims in the Whitaker Complaint no later than July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/29/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3837 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for PHV attorney Janine L. Pollack re #3836 Notice of Change of Address. (cco)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3836 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Prieto. Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Marlene S. Karu(pty:conpla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Marlene S. Karu(pty:conpla). (Prieto, Peter)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3835 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Farfel for / by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company, LTD. Responses due by 6/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Widom, Mitchell)
May 27, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC response due 7/17/2020; Audi of America, LLC response due 7/17/2020; Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. response due 7/17/2020, per DE #3834 Order. (mc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3834 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ( #2988 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1029 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Puhalla Amended Complaint. Defendants Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC must answer the remaining claims in the Puhalla Complaint no later than July 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/27/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3833 PAPERLESS ORDER terminating ( #2982 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1023 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendants Daimler AG and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCs Separate Motion to Dismiss the Puhalla Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing, pursuant to ( #3406 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1329 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Dismiss by Defendants FCA, General Motors, Mercedes, Audi, and Volkswagen. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3832 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE. Plaintiffs Class Counsel must file a response with the Court, no later than Friday, June 12, 2020, addressing the concerns raised in (D.E. #3830 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and D.E. 1646 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Letter from Class Member Doc Tomkiel (P.O. Box 11211, St. Pete, FL 33733). (Responses due by 6/12/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3831 STATUS REPORT No. 9 By the Settlement Special Administrator on the Implementation of the Outreach Programs Pursuant to the BMW, Ford, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3830 Letter from Doc Tomkiel re: Takata/Honda Distribution of Settlement Awards. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3829 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24816-FAM/WIE C.A. No. 2:19-01485 Milton Childs, et al. v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14 in 1:19-cv-24816-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3828 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:20-20387-FAM/UT C.A. No. 1:19-00149 George et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 17 in 1:20-cv-20387-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3827 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24329-FAM/TXW C.A. No. 1:19-00907 Heuss v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 22 in 1:19-cv-24329-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3826 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24447-FAM/PAE C.A. No. 2:19-04512 McDaid v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 10 in 1:19-cv-24447-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3825 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24815-FAM/OKW C.A. No. 5:19-00941 Henderson v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14 in 1:19-cv-24815-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3824 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24422-FAM/OHN C.A. No. 1:19-02234 Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 12 in 1:19-cv-24422-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3823 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24807-FAM/NYS C.A. No. 7:19-09188 Senitta Jr v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 15 in 1:19-cv-24807-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3822 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24241-FAM/NJ C.A. No. 2:19-17837 Abi-Hanna et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 22 in 1:19-cv-24241-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3821 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24799-FAM/NE C.A. No. 8:19-00446 Coffman et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 13 in 1:19-cv-24799-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3820 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-25006-FAM/MSS C.A. No. 3:19-00780 Allen et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 12 in 1:19-cv-25006-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3819 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24791-FAM/MOE C.A. No. 4:19-02751 Reed, et al. v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 16 in 1:19-cv-24791-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3818 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-25205-FAM/MIE C.A. No. 2:19-13368 Powell v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14 in 1:19-cv-25205-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3817 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24800-FAM/MD C.A. No. 1:19-02974 DuPreez et al. v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14 in 1:19-cv-24800-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3816 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24237-FAM/MA C.A. No. 1:19-11877 Crehan et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 27 in 1:19-cv-24237-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3815 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-25002-FAM/INS C.A. No. 4:19-00227 Arvin v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14 in 1:19-cv-25002-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3814 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24737-FAM/ILN C.A. No. 1:19-06686 Davis v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 19 in 1:19-cv-24737-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3813 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24327-FAM/GAN C.A. No. 1:19-04196 Harper et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 21 in 1:19-cv-24327-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3812 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24735-FAM/FLN C.A. No. 4:19-00500 Doyle et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 17 in 1:19-cv-24735-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3811 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24685-FAM/CT C.A. No. 3:19-01565 Esposito et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 16 in 1:19-cv-24685-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3810 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24326-FAM/CO C.A. No. 1:19-02686 Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 24 in 1:19-cv-24326-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3809 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24734-FAM/AZ C.A. No. 2:19-05350 Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 21 in 1:19-cv-24734-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3808 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-25056-FAM/ARE C.A. No. 4:19-00808 Green et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 10 in 1:19-cv-25056-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3807 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24980-FAM/ALS C.A. No. 1:19-00911 Bass et al v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( #3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 12 in 1:19-cv-24980-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3806 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara Perez. Attorney Barbara Perez added to party Linsey Meade(pty:conpla), Attorney Barbara Perez added to party Linsey Meade(pty:conpla), Attorney Barbara Perez added to party Joseph Przybyszewski(pty:conpla), Attorney Barbara Perez added to party Joseph Przybyszewski(pty:conpla). (Perez, Barbara)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3805 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tod N. Aronovitz. Attorney Tod N. Aronovitz added to party Linsey Meade(pty:conpla), Attorney Tod N. Aronovitz added to party Linsey Meade(pty:conpla), Attorney Tod N. Aronovitz added to party Joseph Przybyszewski(pty:conpla), Attorney Tod N. Aronovitz added to party Joseph Przybyszewski(pty:conpla). (Aronovitz, Tod)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3804 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3800 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1643 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1144 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Adam Hoipkemier, Kevin Epps, Darren Heitner and Alan Wilmont are terminated as counsel of record for Objector Angela Elder-Johnson, and shall have no further responsibilities in these matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3803 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3798 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Withdrawal of Eric Yeager as counsel of record for Defendant General Motors LLC. The Court construes the Notice of Withdrawal as a motion to withdraw as counsel, as counsel must obtain leave of Court to withdraw. See S.D. Fla. Local Rule 11.1(d)(3) (No attorney shall withdraw the attorney's appearance in any action or proceeding except by leave of Court....). Attorney Eric Yeager of the firm of Kirkland & Ellis LLP is terminated as counsel for Defendant General Motors LLC, and shall have no further responsibilities in these matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/6/2020. (mc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3802 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re (3787 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3787 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3801 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3799 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Defendant General Motors LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. The deposition of General Motors 30(b)(6) representative must occur no later than July 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/3/2020. Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3800 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Heitner Legal, PLLC and Epps, Holloway, DeLoach & Hoipkemier, LLC for / by Angela Elder-Johnson. Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj), Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj), Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj), Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj), Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj), Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party Angela Elder-Johnson(pty:obj). Responses due by 4/17/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Heitner, Darren)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3799 MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, Laurie)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3798 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric Yeager for / by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2020 (Riley, Laurie)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3797 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3796 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1641 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Attorney Christopher Miles. Attorney Christopher Miles is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record and shall have no further responsibilities in this case. The Clerk is directed to remove Christopher Miles from CM/ECF in this case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/31/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:17-cv-21219-FAM. (mc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3796 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Christopher Miles for / by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3795 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3794 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1639 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant General Motors. The deposition of General Motors' 30(b)(6) representative must occur no later than April 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc) .
March 13, 2020 Filing 3794 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant GM re (1527 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3674 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3793 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24980/ALS C.A. No. 1:19-00911 Bass et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25056/ARE C.A. No. 4:19-00808 Green et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24734/AZ C.A. No. 2:19-05350 Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24326/CO C.A. No. 1:19-02686 Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24685/CT C.A. No. 3:19-01565 Esposito et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24735/FLN C.A. No. 4:19-00500 Doyle et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24327/ GAN C.A. No. 1:19-04196 Harper et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24737/ILN C.A. No. 1:19-06686 Davis v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25002/INS C.A. No. 4:19-00227 Arvin v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24237/MA C.A. No. 1:19-11877 Crehan et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24800/MD C.A. No. 1:19-02974 DuPreez et al. v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25205/MIE C.A. No. 2:19-13368 Powell v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24791/MOE C.A. No. 4:19-02751 Reed, et al. v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25006/MSS C.A. No. 3:19-00780 Allen et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24799/NE C.A. No. 8:19-00446 Coffman et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24241/NJ C.A. No. 2:19-17837 Abi-Hanna et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24807/NYS C.A. No. 7:19-09188 Senitta Jr v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24422/OHN C.A. No. 1:19-02234 Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24815/OKW C.A. No. 5:19-00941 Henderson v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24447/PAE C.A. No. 2:19-04512 McDaid v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24329/TXW C.A. No. 1:19-00907 Heuss v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:20-20387/UT C.A. No. 1:19-00149 George et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24816/WIE C.A. No. 2:19-01485 Milton Childs, et al. v. Ford Motor Company) re: MDL 2599. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a), the parties shall furnish the Clerk of the Southern District of Florida with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3792 ORDER denying ( #3790 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1636 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings or to Refile Motions to Dismiss. All deadlines concerning each Ford Opt-Out Litigation case, for which the Court suggested remand to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (see D.E. 3761-83), are STAYED pending remand by the JPML. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3791 ORDER granting ( #3789 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1635 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Joint Motion for Final Approval Under Rule 23 of Agreements with Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement. In accordance with and for the reasons stated in the Court's Order of Indicative Ruling Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 (D.E. #3632 ), Class Counsel's agreements with the Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement, as specified in the Joint Motion for a Hearing and Ruling Under Rules 23 and 62.1 Approving Agreements with Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement (D.E. #3550 ), are APPROVED under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e)(5). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3790 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Pleadings or to Refile Motions to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3789 Joint MOTION for Final Approval Under Rule 23 of Agreements with Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement re (1634 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order,, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3788 ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES INVOLVED IN THE FORD CLASS SETTLEMENT TO FILE THE APPROPRIATE PLEADING re ( #3786 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1632 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeal's Order of Dismissal and Full Remand. The parties involved in the Ford Class Settlement must file, no later than March 17, 2020, the appropriate pleadings so that the Court may effectuate its previous Order of indicative Ruling ( #3632 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1488 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/4/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3787 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE re ( #3760 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Letter from class member Jeffrey Shepard. (Responses due by 4/3/2020) Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/4/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3786 ORDER of Dismissal of USCA, FULL REMAND. In light of the District Courts January 27, 2020 Order of Indicative Ruling Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1, this Court, on its own motion, REMANDS IN FULL this matter to the District Court as to (1174 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tiffany Rembert, (1150 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3199 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Barbara M. Owens, (1157 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Joseph Chaney, (1146 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3191 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by James Laudato, (1156 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3211 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Dolly L. Wright, (3198 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1148 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Benjamin Majchrzak, (3216 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry, (1158 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Jones, (3203 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1152 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kearney Dee Hustler, (3194 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1147 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Doug R Perkowski, (3209 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis E. Raby, (1177 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry, (3188 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Angie Elder-Johnson, (1149 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Barbara M. Owens, (3215 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tiffany Rembert, (1175 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry, (3220 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry, (3207 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Joseph Chaney, (3208 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Jones, (1159 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis E. Raby Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(hh)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3785 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot ( #3751 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1598 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Enlarge the Page Limit. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3784 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice ( #3567 , #3570 , #3582 , #3586 , #3587 , #3605 , #3606 , #3608 , #3609 , #3610 , #3612 , #3613 , #3619 , #3620 , #3679 , #3689 , #3690 , #3691 , #3692 , #3693 , #3725 , #3726 , #3743 , #3744 , #3756 , #3757 , #3758 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1427, 1430, 1442, 1446, 1447, 1465, 1466, 1468, 1469, 1470, 1472, 1473, 1477, 1478, 1530, 1538, 1539, 1540, 1541, 1542, 1574, 1575, 1592, 1593, 1603, 1604, 1605 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the "Group Action" Complaints, in view of the Orders Suggesting Remand ( #3761 , #3762 , #3763 , #3764 , #3765 , #3766 , #3767 , #3768 , #3769 , #3770 , #3771 , #3772 , #3773 , #3774 , #3775 , #3776 , #3777 , #3778 , #3779 , #3780 , #3781 , #3782 , #3783 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1607, 1608, 1609, 1610, 1611, 1612, 1613, 1614, 1615, 1616, 1617, 1618, 1619, 1620, 1621, 1622, 1623, 1624, 1625, 1626, 1627, 1628, 1629 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Only if appropriate, the parties may refile the "Group Action" Complaints and corresponding Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3783 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:20-cv-20387-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3782 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3781 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3780 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3779 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3778 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3777 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3776 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3775 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3774 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3773 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3772 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3771 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3770 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3769 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3768 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3767 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3766 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3765 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3764 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3763 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3762 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3761 ORDER granting ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24237-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3760 Letter from Jeffrey Shepard re Airbag Settlement Lawsuit (Honda). (mc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3759 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re ( #3657 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1511 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order to Show Cause, by Angelica C. Westerhoff-Hirschbih (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(mc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3758 MOTION to Dismiss (1501 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Karen Arvin v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3757 MOTION to Dismiss (1500 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Debra DuPreez v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3756 MOTION to Dismiss (3643 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1499 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Michael Senitta, Jr. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3755 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re (3657 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3754 PAPERLESS ORDER ( #3748 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the George Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Motion to Dismiss no later than March 31, 2020 re ( #3726 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1575 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. (Responses due by 3/31/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM (mc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3753 STATUS REPORT Number 8 on the Implementation of the Outreach Programs Pursuant to the BMW, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3752 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3747 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the Powell Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Motion to Dismiss no later than March 31, 2020 re ( #3725 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1574 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. (Responses due by 3/31/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM(mc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3751 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3750 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3582 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1442 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 1:19-cv-24326-FAM filed by Joseph Gallardo. Replies due by 3/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3749 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1472 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Yoko Harper, et al. v. Ford Motor Company filed by Yoko Harper. Replies due by 3/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3748 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3726 MOTION to Dismiss (3646 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James George, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by James George. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James George(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James George(pty:conpla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3747 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3725 MOTION to Dismiss (3559 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Juanita Powell, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Juanita Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3746 RESPONSE in Support re (3487 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1380 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3745 RESPONSE in Support re (3486 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1379 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3744 MOTION to Dismiss (3709 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1558 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Bobby Bass and Bessie H. Bass v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3743 MOTION to Dismiss (3706 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1555 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Vanessa Van Bradley v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3742 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3733 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1582 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Green Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. (pes)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3741 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3732 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1581 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Childs Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. (pes)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3740 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3731 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1580 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Davis Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3739 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3730 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1579 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Coffman Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than March 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. (pes)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3738 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3729 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1578 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Reed Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. (pes)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3737 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. #3728 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1577 in Case No. 14-24009) Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Doyle Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/24/2020. (pes)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3736 RESPONSE in Support re (1480 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of It's Motion for Suggestion of Remand filed by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3735 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3609 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1469 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1415 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3552 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company filed by James Crehan. Replies due by 2/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3734 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1468 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3608 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1416 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3553 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company filed by Akram Abi-Hanna. Replies due by 2/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3733 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3693 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3545 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Diane Green v. Ford Motor Company by Diane Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3732 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3689 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1538 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1455 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Milton Childs v. Ford Motor Company by Milton Childs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3731 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3690 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1458 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Deborah Davis v. Ford Motor Company by Deborah Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3730 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3691 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1540 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1457 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Paul L. Coffman v. Ford Motor Company by Paul L. Coffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3729 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3692 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1456 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Leslie Reed v. Ford Motor Company by Leslie Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3728 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3679 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1530 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1475 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3615 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint Billy Doyle, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Billy Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3727 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 01-23-2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-64 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3726 MOTION to Dismiss (3646 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James George, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3725 MOTION to Dismiss (3559 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Juanita Powell, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3724 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1480 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Akram Abi-Hanna, Milton Childs, Joseph Gallardo, Bessie H. Bass, Bobby Bass, Deborah Davis, David Churilla, Juanita Powell, Leslie Reed, Josephine Mastroberti, Billy Doyle, Debra DuPreez, Yoko Harper, James Crehan, Martin Allen, Keith Heuss, Paul L. Coffman, Karen Arvin, Barbara Henderson, Alexander Esposito, Diane Green, Michael Senitta Jr, Edward B. McDaid. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martin Allen(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martin Allen(pty:conpla). Replies due by 2/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3723 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (D.E. #3710 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1559 in Case No. 14-24009) Defendant Ford Motor Companys Unopposed Motion for Leave to Enlarge the Page Limit for Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Powell Complaint. Fords Motion to Dismiss the Powell Complaint cannot exceed 30 pages in length. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/13/2020. (pes)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3710 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Its Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3709 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Bessie H. Bass, Bobby Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3708 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1446 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3586 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (1431 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3571 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Josephine Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company Case No.: 1:19-cv-24422-FAM filed by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3707 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1447 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3587 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Edward B. McDaid v. Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3706 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Vanessa Van Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3722 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 20-20387-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:20-cv-20387-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3721 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-25205-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3720 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-25056-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3719 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-25006-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3718 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-25006-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3717 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-25002-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3716 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24980-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3715 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24816-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3714 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24815-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3713 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24807-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3712 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24800-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3711 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24799-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3705 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24791-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3704 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24737-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3703 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24735-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM (pes) (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3702 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24734-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3701 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24685-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM (pes) (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3700 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24447-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3699 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24422-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3698 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24329-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3697 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24327-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3696 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24326-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3695 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24241-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3694 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24237-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24237-FAM See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3693 MOTION to Dismiss (3545 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Diane Green v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3692 MOTION to Dismiss (1456 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Leslie Reed v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3691 MOTION to Dismiss (1457 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Paul L. Coffman v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3690 MOTION to Dismiss (1458 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Deborah Davis v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3689 MOTION to Dismiss (1455 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Milton Childs v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3688 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1447 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3587 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Edward B. McDaid v. Ford Motor Company filed by Edward B. McDaid. Replies due by 2/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3687 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1446 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3586 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (1431 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3571 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Josephine Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company Case No.: 1:19-cv-24422-FAM filed by Josephine Mastroberti. Replies due by 2/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3622 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 2/14/2020 per DE 3686 Order. (mc)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3686 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3681 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. Plaintiffs must, no later than February 14, 2020, respond to Ford's Motion for Suggestion of Remand ( #3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/14/2020).Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM, 1:19-cv-24237-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM(mc)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3685 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3680 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1531 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Enlarge the Page Limit for Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Childs and Davis First Amended Complaints. Ford's Motions to Dismiss the Childs and Davis First Amended Complaints cannot exceed 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM (mc)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3684 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3678 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1529 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaints. Ford must answer or respond, no later than March 2, 2020, to the Arvin, DuPreez, and Senitta, Jr. First Amended Complaints ( #3643 , #3644 , #3645 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1499, 1500, 1501 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM (mc)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3683 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3677 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Motion for Leave to Withdraw Pro Hac Counsel. Attorney Eric Lechtzin is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Marc S. Riaken and Michael Walker, Jr., and shall have no further responsibilities in this matter. The Clerk is directed to remove Eric Lechtzin from CM/ECF in this case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Eric Lechtzin. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/4/2020. (Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) (mc)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3682 Notice of Filing Letter by Daniel Schoultz dated January 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Daniel Schoultz) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3681 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Suggestion of Remand by Akram Abi-Hanna, Milton Childs, Joseph Gallardo, Bobby Bass, Deborah Davis, David Churilla, Juanita Powell, Leslie Reed, Josephine Mastroberti, Billy Doyle, Debra DuPreez, Yoko Harper, James Crehan, Keith Heuss, Paul L. Coffman, Karen Arvin, Barbara Henderson, Alexander Esposito, Diane Green, Michael Senitta Jr, Vanessa Van Bradley, Edward B. McDaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaro, Matthew)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3680 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Enlarge the Page Limit for Its Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3679 MOTION to Dismiss (1475 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3615 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint Billy Doyle, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3678 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to First Amended Complaints by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/14/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3677 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric Lechtzin for / by Michael Walker, JR, Marc C. Raiken. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prieto, Peter)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3676 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Utah. Case Number 1:19-cv-00149 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:20-cv-20387-FAM on 1/29/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3675 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3672 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1525 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Akash M. Toprani. Attorney Akash M. Toprani is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Akash M. Toprani at TopraniA@sullcrom.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3674 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3658 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Defendant General Motors LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Compliance with the Court's November 12, 2019 Order. General Motors must complete its document production no later than February 17, 2020. Furthermore, the deposition of General Motors's 30(b)(6) representative must occur no later than March 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3673 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3649 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1503 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Enlarge the Page Limitation for Its Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Doyle Complaint. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Doyle Complaint cannot exceed 30 pages in length. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3672 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Akash M. Toprani. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # FLSDC-12367865 by FCS US LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3671 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot ( #3648 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1502 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Abigail A. Golden. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3670 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3651 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1505 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Abigail A. Golden. Attorney Abigail A. Golden is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notice of all flings on this docket to Abigail A. Golden at agolden@mcguuirewoods.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. (mc) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (mc).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3669 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3639 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1495 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than March 10, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Churilla First Amended Complaint ( #3620 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1478 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 3/10/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3668 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3637 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1493 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than March 10, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Henderson Second Amended Complaint ( #3619 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1477 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 3/10/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3667 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3641 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1497 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than March 6, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Huess First Amended Complaint (3613 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1473 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 3/6/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3666 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3640 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1496 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than March 6, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Esposito First Amended Complaint ( #3610 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1470 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 3/6/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3665 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3642 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1498 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 27, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Harper First Amended Complaint ( #3612 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1472 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/27/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3664 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3635 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1491 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motor to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 27, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Gallardo First Amended Complaint ( #3582 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1442 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/27/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3663 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3634 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1490 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 18, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Abi-Hanna First Amended Complaint ( #3608 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1468 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/18/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3662 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3633 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1489 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 18, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Crehan First Amended Complaint ( #3609 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1469 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/18/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24237-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3661 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3638 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1494 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 11, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Van Bradley Complaint ( #3606 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1466 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) (Responses due by 2/11/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM. (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3660 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3636 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1492 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 11, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Bass Complaint ( #3605 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1465 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 2/11/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM (mc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3659 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT CERTAIN MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Defendant Ford Motor Company filed separate motions to dismiss the Arvin, DuPreez, and Senitta, Jr. complaints. Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss ( #3574 , #3576 , #3603 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1434, 1436, 1463 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3658 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to complete compliance with the court's November 12, 2019 order (ECF No. 3489) re #3489 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Riley, Laurie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3657 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiffs Class Counsel file a response with the Court no later than Friday, February 28, 2020, addressing the concerns raised in the letter from class member Angelica C. Westerhoff-Hirschbih re ( #3629 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM). (Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3656 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hernandez on behalf of Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3655 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hernandez on behalf of Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3654 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hernandez on behalf of Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3653 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hernandez on behalf of Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3652 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hernandez on behalf of Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3651 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Abigail A. Golden. (as to date on certificate of service) Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See (1502 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3650 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3630 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1487 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion for Leave to Withdraw Counsel Brian Dominguez. Brian A Dominguez is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant Ford Motor Company and shall have no further responsibilities in this matter. The Clerk is directed to remove Brian A. Dominguez from CM/ECF in this case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3649 MOTION for Leave to File to Enlarge the Page Limit for Its Memorandum of Law by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3648 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Abigail A. Golden. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # FLSDC-12353005 by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Sean Hernandez added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Hernandez added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Hernandez, Sean)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3647 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Utah, Case Number 1:19-00149 George et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3646 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3646 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-93) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3645 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Karen Arvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3644 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Debra DuPreez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3643 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Michael Senitta Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3642 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1472 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Yoko Harper, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Yoko Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3641 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3613 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1473 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3556 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1419 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Keith Heuss, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Keith Heuss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3640 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3610 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3578 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1438 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint,, Alexander Esposito v. Ford Motor Company by Mark Boehm, Brian Stewart, Derek Roth, Dave Macdonald, Theresa Macdonald, Keith Barile, Greg Franklin, Daniel Kennedy, Daniel T. DeVincent, Gina R. Mariano, Vanessa Hawkins, Jill Sandora, Leonard A. Perille, Murray Bruckel, Andrew McDonald, Angel Diaz, Steven Schenk, Haralambos Efthymiou, Alexander Esposito, Beth Valente, Joseph Ciriello, Michele Ciriello, Matthew Wheaton. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3639 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3620 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3584 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1444 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint David Churilla, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by David Churilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3638 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3606 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1466 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3539 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Vanessa Van Bradley, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Vanessa Van Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3637 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3619 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1477 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Barbara Henderson, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Barbara Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3636 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3605 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3539 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Bobby Bass and Bessie H. Bass, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Bessie H. Bass, Bobby Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3635 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3582 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1442 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 1:19-cv-24326-FAM by Joseph Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3634 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3608 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1416 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3553 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Akram Abi-Hanna, William C. Zink III, Michael Payne, George Jenzano, Andrea Block, Nelson Gaskill, Daniel Caffrey, James Worthington, Kellianne Worthington, Robert Caston, Theresa D. Ferriss, Barbara A. Ballard, Michael Parham, Anastasia Parsons, Steven Sofia, Erik Spong, Susan Hughes, George Alfonso, James Rushmore, Meghan Russo, George Williams, John Ahrens, Ross Alaimo, Patricia Lapinski, Dayna Fillman, Kathleen McCarthy, Frank Iovine, Frank Fischl, Thomas E. Frank, Lynda Taylor, Joyce Gorant, Jerome Wilkins, Lourdes Herrera, Shirley McGovern, Pabitra Paudel, Cleveland Small, Jonathan Hildum, Michael Trezza, George Robertson, Richard A. Smith, Stephen Whitehead, Edward T. Hearn, Barbara Rosario, Elizabeth Rasmussen, Oliver W. Benders, Hope Goodman, Wayne Relyea, Carl A. Beharry, Malcolm Ginsberg, Nicholas Mariolis, David Marsh, John G. Pepitone, Wayne Boyce, Gladys Kay, Vincent Sacco, Israel Eisenberg, Alexander Astrakan, Harold Carey, Dominick Ervelli Jr., Kenneth Halloran, Domenick C. Linsalato, Robert Teti, Robert Vetter, Rose M. Campanaro, Wende Campanile, Lynn Mizer, Martin Agacinski Jr., Lisa Jester, Maxine Gurin, Steven Gray, Artus Satterfield, Robert Saunders, Michael Zak, Leslie Ujj, Joseph Uncle, William T. Marsh Jr, John Martin. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3633 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3609 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (1415 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3552 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Jean Donovan, James Zepka, Kristin Bzenic, John Pasierbiak, James Snow, Sethuraman Somasundaram, Yahya Maatouk, Charles Harris, Daniel Comb, Edmund Durfee, Debra Berthiaume, James Crehan, Terry Hunt, James Nunley, Jean OBrien, Helen Sylvia, Travis Dixon, Bob Jamgochian, Jenna LaHousse, Scott Palmer, Paul Josephine, Robert Massarelli, Francis Warren, William Neary, Kristin Yencho, Edward Prunty. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3632 ORDER OF INDICATIVE RULING UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62.1. The Joint Motion for a Hearing and Indicative Ruling Approving Agreements with the Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement ( #3550 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1413 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3631 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Status Conference held on 1/23/2020. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3630 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brian A. Dominguez for / by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3629 Letter from Angelica C. Westerhoff-Hirschbih re: Takata Settlement (Airbag-BMW) (mc)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3628 ORDER DENYING CERTAIN MOTIONS. Ford's Motion to Dismiss the Doyle Complaint ( #3569 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1429 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the Plaintiffs filing a First Amended Complaint in Doyle (see #3615 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1475 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). The Unopposed Expedited Motion for Leave of Court to Appear at Hearing byTelephone filed by Counsel for Objector/Class Member Barbara Owens ( #3618 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1476 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM (mc)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3627 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3621 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1479 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must answer or respond, no later than February 17, 2020, to Plaintiffs' Complaint in Powell. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM (mc) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (mc).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3626 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3617 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 4, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the McDaid First Amended Complaint ( #3587 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1447 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Responses due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (mc).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3625 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3616 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than February 4, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Mastroberti First Amended Complaint ( #3586 in case 1:15-cv-02599-FAM, 1446 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Responses due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM (mc) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (mc).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3624 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3614 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1474 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaints. Defendant must answer or respond, no later than February 7, 2020, to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaints filed in Childs, Coffman, Davis and Reed re: ( #3595 , #3596 , #3597 , #3598 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1455, 1456, 1457, 1458 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) First Amended Complaint. (Milton Childs, Paul L. Coffman, Deborah Davis, and Leslie Reed, Answers due on 2/7/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM (mc)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3623 NOTICE REGARDING FORD OPT-OUT LITIGATION STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 23, 2020 re ( #3585 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order Setting Status Conference Regarding the Class Opt-Out Litigation against Ford Motor Company. This Notice advises that the status conference relates to these individual cases: 1:19-cv-24237-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3622 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3621 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Powell v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3620 MOTION to Dismiss (3584 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1444 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint David Churilla, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3619 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Barbara Henderson, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3618 Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION to Appear Telephonically re (3592 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3592 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1452 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1452 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order Setting Status Conference,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by Barbara M. Owens. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Silverio, Brian) Modified relief and title text on 1/22/2020 (mc).
January 21, 2020 Filing 3617 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3587 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Edward B. McDaid v. Ford Motor Company by Edward B. McDaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3616 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3586 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (1431 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3571 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Josephine Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company Case No.: 1:19-cv-24422-FAM by Josephine Mastroberti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 20, 2020 Filing 3615 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Billy Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3614 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3597 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (3595 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (3598 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint, (3596 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3613 MOTION to Dismiss (3556 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1419 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint Keith Heuss, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3612 MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Yoko Harper, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3611 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3601 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1461 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21301-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3610 MOTION to Dismiss (3578 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1438 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Amended Complaint,, Alexander Esposito v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3609 MOTION to Dismiss (1415 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3552 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3608 MOTION to Dismiss (1416 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3553 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3607 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3602 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1462 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than January 30, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Gallardo Complaint ( #3582 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1442 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 1/30/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM(mc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3606 MOTION to Dismiss (3539 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Vanessa Van Bradley, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3605 MOTION to Dismiss (3539 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Bobby Bass and Bessie H. Bass, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3604 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT CERTAIN MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Defendant Ford Motor Company filed separate motions to dismiss the Childs, Coffman, Davis and Reed complaints. Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss ( #3568 , #3573 , #3575 , #3577 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1428, 1433, 1435, 1437 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM,1:19-cv-24799-FAM, 1:19-cv24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM (mc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3603 MOTION to Dismiss (3539 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Karen Arvin, et al., v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3602 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3582 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1442 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 1:19-cv-24326-FAM by Joseph Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3601 STIPULATION to Dismiss Entire Case with Prejudice Carrisa Lozano v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3600 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3594 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1454 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than January 27, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the DuPreez Complaint ( #3574 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1434 n case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 1/27/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM (mc)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3599 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3593 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1453 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond, no later than January 27, 2020, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Senitta Complaint ( #3576 in case 1:15-02599-FAM and 1436 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). (Responses due by 1/27/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM(mc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3598 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Deborah Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3597 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Paul L. Coffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3596 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Leslie Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3595 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Milton Childs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3594 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1434 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3574 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Debra DePreez, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Debra DuPreez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3593 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1436 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3576 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Michael Senitta Jr. et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Michael Senitta Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3592 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING AGREEMENTS WITH OBJECTORS TO FORD CLASS SETTLEMENT. The Joint Motion for a Hearing and Ruling Under Rule 23 and 62.1 Approving Agreements With Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement ( #3550 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, and 1413 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) is GRANTED. The Status Conference Regarding Agreements with Objectors to Ford Class Settlement is set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss any and all matters relevant to the previously approved Ford Class Settlement (DE #3182 ). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3591 ORDER denying as moot ( #3548 , #3549 , #3557 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1411, 1412, 1420 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot ( #3572 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1432 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaints. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM (mc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3590 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3581 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1441 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( #3568 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1428 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) no later than January 20, 2020. (Responses due by 1/20/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM (mc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3589 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3580 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1440 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( #3569 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1429 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) no later than January 27, 2020. (Responses due by 1/27/2020). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM (mc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3588 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3579 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1439 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Sergei Lemberg. Attorney Sergei Lemberg is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the cases named in the motion. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Sergei Lemberg at slemberg@lemberglaw.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM. (mc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3587 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Edward B. McDaid v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3586 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (1431 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3571 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Josephine Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company Case No.: 1:19-cv-24422-FAM by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3585 ORDER Setting Status Conference Regarding Class Opt-Out Litigation Against Ford (Granting D.E. #3531 in Case No. 15-02599 and D.E. #1404 in Case No. 14-24009) Status Conference Regarding Class Opt-Out Litigation against Defendant Ford Motor Company set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/6/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (pes)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3584 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by David Churilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3583 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Barbara Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3582 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 1:19-cv-24326-FAM by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3581 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3568 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1428 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3491 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Deborah Davis, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Deborah Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3580 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1429 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3569 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3491 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Billy Doyle, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Billy Doyle. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Billy Doyle(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Billy Doyle(pty:conpla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3579 MOTION to Extend Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sergei Lemberg by Karen Arvin, Bessie H. Bass, Bobby Bass, Vanessa Van Bradley, Milton Childs, David Churilla, Paul L. Coffman, Deborah Davis, Billy Doyle, Debra DuPreez, Diane Green, Barbara Henderson, Juanita Powell, Leslie Reed, Michael Senitta Jr. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Karen Arvin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Karen Arvin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bessie H. Bass(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bessie H. Bass(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bobby Bass(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bobby Bass(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Vanessa Van Bradley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Vanessa Van Bradley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Milton Childs(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Milton Childs(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Churilla(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Churilla(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Paul L. Coffman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Paul L. Coffman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Deborah Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Deborah Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Billy Doyle(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Billy Doyle(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Debra DuPreez(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Debra DuPreez(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Diane Green(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Diane Green(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara Henderson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara Henderson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Juanita Powell (pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Juanita Powell (pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Leslie Reed(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Leslie Reed(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Senitta Jr(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Senitta Jr(pty:conpla). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3578 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Keith Barile, Mark Boehm, Murray Bruckel, Joseph Ciriello, Michele Ciriello, Daniel T. DeVincent, Angel Diaz, Haralambos Efthymiou, Alexander Esposito, Greg Franklin, Vanessa Hawkins, Daniel Kennedy, Dave Macdonald, Theresa Macdonald, Gina R. Mariano, Andrew McDonald, Leonard A. Perille, Derek Roth, Jill Sandora, Steven Schenk, Brian Stewart, Unokook I LLC, Beth Valente, Matthew Wheaton.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3577 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Milton Childs, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 1:19-cv-24816-FAM by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3576 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Michael Senitta Jr. et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3575 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Leslie Reed, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3574 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Debra DePreez, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3573 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Paul Coffman, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3572 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint Gallardo v. Ford Motor Co., Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Co., McDaid v. Ford Motor Co. by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/9/2020 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3571 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Russella Adams, David Almansor, Shelly Ames, Horace Anderson, Barbara Ann Zink Revocable Trust, Richard Arthur, Debra Auger, George Auger, James Austermiller, Susan Ballish, Barbara L. Banis, Charles D. Barker, Christy Barnes, Ken Becker, Florence D. Belton, Kevin Benson, John Bianco, Betty Bivens, Richard Bivens, Connie Blaine, Jennifer Bond Dittmer, Lynn Bonfield, Ann Borowicz, Kelsey Borowicz, Jonathan Braden, Mike Browne, Nelson Buck, Sherry Burkhard, Monica Bush, Charles Bussard, Reginald Cansler, Bartholomew Catone, Evelyn Chapman, David Chappell, Pamela Christy, Donald Clanson, Cheryl Clark, William Cole, Kevin Collins, John F. Congrove, Freda Cooper, Arthur Counts, Michael T. Cox, Derrell Craig, Juanita Crothers, Roseshall Crow, Peter Dagostino, Linda Darbyshire, Judy Davdison, Sammy Davis, Sasian Davis, Sondra M. Davis, Crystal DeArment, Yolanda Dixon, Alfred T. Donaldson, William Donovan, Brian Dunkle, James Dunn, Deborah Eatman, Michelle Elliott, Randal Euckert, Nakia Fails, Tami Faulkner Shutler, Kenneth Fay, Tim Fields, Vicki Fields, Arthur Figuero, Dianne Filey, Mark Fischer, James Fouch, Tony Franco, James Francosky, Adam Fuerst, Thomas D. Funk, Ben G. Horton, Lisa Galvan, Tracie Gard, Brian Gardner, Matthew Gardner, Audrey Garrett, Constance Gast, Elsie B. Gibson, Mark Gigli, John Gillespie, Susan Good, Shamekia Goodwin, Brian Gouhin, David Gould, Gary Grace, Gary Grant, Mahogani Graves, Robert Gray, Ryan Gray, Horace Greene, Johneka Griffin, Terri Groll, Elizabeth Grundy, Shara D. Guinn, Lesa Hale, Robert C. Hale, David Hall, Edward Halsey, Pam Hamilton, Darryl L. Hampton, Gary Hanlon, Tracey Hardy, James Hariper, George Harkess, Michael Harper, Dana Harrison, Kenneth Hartfield, Robert Hembree, Nancy Hendricks, Cornelia Hill, Ray Hobson, Dale Hodge, Tina Hollis, Jason Hollister, Charlene Hornig, Brenda S. Hursh, Robert Hutchinson, Mattie Hutchison, Catherine Inglebue-Stacy, Lee Irvin, Kimberly Jackson-Moore, William P. Jaras, Phyllip Jennings, Joel Jimenez, Loveetta Johnson, Diane Jones, Patricia Jones, Robert Jones, Linda Keith, Christopher Kelley, Micheline Kerr, Norma Kiger, Richard Kile, James Knight, Tony Kocak, Cynthia Koch, Barbara Kresser, Barbara Kroneberger, Morgan Krystek, Sarah Kushen, William Laconis, Robert Landrum, Rodney Langenderfer, Charles Laureano, Sean Lewis, Robert Lucsko, Matthew Maccombs, JC Mainor, Bonnie Majoy, Mario Mancini, Gilberto Marrero, Ashley Lauren Martin, Richard Martin, Donald Mason, Andrew Massey, Josephine Mastroberti, Henry Mayle, Jasmine McCail, Betty McCloskey, David McCoy, Walter McGhee, Articia Mcclure, Jacqueline Mcclurg, Faye Miliner, Doglas Miller, Terry Miller, Aleisa Moorman, Nancy Morehead, Carley Morgan, Michael Morse, Charles Moxley, June M. Nagel, Renee Natoli, Anita Nelson, Jason Nickoloff, Rhonda Nye, James Olding, Jackie Ollis, Anthony Padur, Kathleen Paine, Edward Pasela, Kelly A. Patsolic, Barbara A. Paul, Edgard A. Paul, Amber Paullin, James Peoples, Ronald Pilkington, Loretta Poole, Catherine Province, Richard Province, Alvin Radford, James Richter, Theodore Ricks, Sanarah Riley, Victor Rivera, Albertonia Roach, Carrie Romaniw, Anthony F. Rossi, Ryan Rotterschmidt, Holly Rowe, David Rucker, Thomas Sanders, Andrea E. Saunders, Deborah Schuler, Kellie Schultz, Nicholas Schwartz, Lawrence Schwing, Daniel Sherman, Larry Singleton, Billy Smith, Daryl Smith, James Sohr, Lucy E. Soto, Phyllis Stewart, Jack Strange, Maria Sweeney, Roger Sycz, Tracie Sylvester, Richard Tallurico, James Taylor, Paula Taylor, Joshua Tedrick, Ron Temple, Randy Thomas, Nicole D. Thompson, Robert Thrush, Ronald Timbrook, Robert Todd, Gregory Tornes, Shannon Vahalik, Lee Vilardo, Dennis Vincer, Christine M. Vitale Gregar, Stephen G. Wachter, Benjamin Walker, Lorena Walker, Leah Waller, Margaret J. Wethington, Genice Williams, Deshaun Williams Sr., Arthur Willingham, Connie Willls, Debra L. Wilson, Stacy Wilson, Tamara Wilson, Robert Wismar, Alexander Wisniewski, Roderick F. Wittich, James Woods, Gary Yun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3570 MOTION to Dismiss (3506 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Barbara Henderson, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3569 MOTION to Dismiss (3491 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Billy Doyle, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3568 MOTION to Dismiss (3491 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Deborah Davis, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3567 MOTION to Dismiss (3491 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, David Churilla, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3566 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Timothy Allison, Todd Anderson, Pauline Andrews, Cheryl Ann, Erik Arnwine, Judy Ballou, Frank Barbitta Jr., Dorothy Bartos, Michael J. Basler, Gayle Bell, Eric Belove, George Betts, David Black Sr., Allison Blackie, Celeste Boehm, Ronald Bradford, Brenda Brown, Richard Cacchione, Daniel Cenci, Stephen Cheskiewicz, Ari Chester, Robert Ciach, Ernest M. Coby, Norman Cochran, Charles Copeland, Jeffrey Cramer, Lester Cramer, Mellen Cullen, Karen Culp, Wilson Datesman, Daniella Daube, Gilbert Debor, Thomas F. Delaney, Damon Ewing, Peter G. Fazio, Shannon N. Fazio, Joseph Ferlic, Gloria M. Field, Shannon Finamore, Darci Fletcher, Jeffrey Fletcher, Jacqueline G. Fox, Kerry G. Fox, Charles Fugate, Frank E. Furman, David Gamler, Faith Giglio, Ralph Giglio, Michael Gonder, Dixie Gonzalez, Karen Graham, James Gusky, James Gustafson, Charles Hannold, Ronald Henderson, Sheri Henderson, Keith Hetsko, Randy Hogg, William Holland, Robert Holloran, Kimberly R. Housseal, Richard Hovanec, John Howell, Julie Howell, Gabriella Inzko, Frank E. Jany, Michele Jany, Kathleen Jones, Anthony Kascke, Richard Kephart Sr., David Kepple, Lori A. King, Mark Kloba, Rodney Knight, Jack Koutsouradis, Cathleen Krakau, Darlene F. Kreider, Joseph D. Kreider, Stephen Kumanchik, George Langan, Jillian Leader, Robert Leader, Mark Livingston, Lauren Lohr, Melvon Martin, Ron Maszak, Nicholas McCausland, David McCurdy, Harold McKivinson, Gerald Mcmahon, Scotty L. Meyers, Thomas Miller, Madelon Milliken, Frederick Milliken Jr., David Mustapich, Mark Nelson, Jude M. O'Donnel, Vince Orend, Waso Padezanin, Seana Powell, George D. Proctor, Allen Riley, Karen Riley, Nathan S. Rockstroh, William Rosenkrantz, Roger Roth, Nancy Ryan, Timothy Seddon, Alan Sendek, Anita Shaffer, Daniel W. Sheffler, Bryan Shetler, Cynthia Shetler, Ronald Shmigalsky, Merle Shotwell, Wayne Smith, Steven Stewart, Michael M. Stocklin, Ann Marie Summers, Glendon Summers, Gail Swanson, Patrick J. Taylor, Kimberly A. Toth Jr., Richard S. Toth Jr., Lawrence Trout, Delores M. Tylenda, Janet Vehec, Nita Veres, Tracy Vorum, Liliya V. Wagenen, Nathaniel R. Wagers, John Wagner, Richard Walton, Angela Wegemer, Mark Wegemer, Jim Weney, Elise Wrable, Joseph Wrable. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3565 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Eastern District of Michigan. Case Number 2:19-cv-13368 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-25205-FAM on 12/19/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3564 ORDER denying as moot ( #3488 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1381 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot ( #3490 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1383 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot ( #3502 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1389 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot ( #3503 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1390 in case 1:15-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot ( #3523 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1396 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3563 ORDER denying as moot ( #3551 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1414 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Joint Motion to Stay the Deadlines in the Transferor Court's October 30, 2019 Initial Scheduling Order. The Transferor District Court Court's Initial Scheduling Order (DE 6 in case 1:19-cv-24735-FAM) is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM (mc)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3562 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3558 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1421 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Ford Motor Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendant Ford Motor Company must answer or respond no later than Tuesday, January 14, 2020 to ( #3552 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1415 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint in Abi-Hanna v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 1:19-cv-24241-FAM, and to ( #3553 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1416 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint in Crehan v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 1:19-cv-24237-FAM. Furthermore, Defendant Ford Motor Company must answer or respond no later than Monday, January 20, 2020 to ( #3556 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1419 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint in Heuss v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 1:19-cv-24329-FAM, and to ( #3555 in case No. 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1418 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint in Harper v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 1:19-cv-24327-FAM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM, 1:19-cv-24237-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM.(mc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3561 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Joseph Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3560 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Michigan, Case Number 2:19-13368 Powell v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3559 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3559 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-92) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3558 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint Abi-Hanna v. Ford Motor Co.; Crehan v. Ford Motor Co.; Heuss v. Ford Motor Co., Harper v. Ford Motor Co. by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/31/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3557 MOTION to Dismiss (3483 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Alexander Esposito v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3556 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Keith Heuss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3555 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Reginal Allen, Jr., Lewis Avery Jr., William Barnard III, Angelia Barnes, Richard Baxter, Tanzania Birdsong, Lamar Blige, Dennis Bone, Patricia Bowman, Elemer Caraway, Sharon Cole, Ronald Collins, Donna Cook, Bruce Cope, Graham Cossick, Bruce Cowgill, Eric C Crawford, Sammy Davis, Tameka Davis, Jerry Dean, Martha M Dickman, Mike Driggers, Thomas Anthony Dugas, Kathy Euliano, Charles Everett, Diane Fairweather, Anika Fisher, Michael Fitzpatrick, Mary Anne Cone Fletcher, Antonina Foster, Roy Foster, Eugene Free, Jessica Freire, Keshia Godfrey, Michael Gutting, Morris Harrell, Alice Hatcher, Tony Hayes, Bruce Henley, Reginald Hicks, Stella Hise, Willis Hise, Wanda Howell, David Hughes, Carole Becker Ingram, Taylor Ivey, Homer Jernigan, Kenneth C. Johnson, Stephanie Kelley, Shashank Kundurti, Carlton Lee, Nathaniel Lee, Cynthia Leonard, Mildred Lewis, Benjamin Lichtenwalner, Linton Lively, Kris Lovell, Dannie M Marks, Bryan Martin, Rosalia Mayol, William Alan McCormick, Donald Mccoy, Gary Moore, Randy Morgan, Melanye Morris, Joseph Morrison, Renae Murphy, Cassandra Neal, Jerry Franklin Neese, Kenneth Neil, Gary Nichols, Edward Nugent, James Page Jr, Brenda Pope, Petra Radke, Kenneth Ragan, Melanie Raines, Daniel Reiter, Diane H. Robinson, Mary Romine, John Rose, Donald Ross, Paul Sacia, Evans Sanders, Linda J Scarborough, Rodger Sexton, Julie Simonsen, Cherri Sims, Katie Smith, Kevin Smith, Trvett K Stanford, Robin Starner, Bobbie Sweatt, Cindy Lee Thomas, Eutevia Thomas, Norman Allen Thompson, Justin Thornton, John W. Tillman, Carol Waite, Queenie Washington, Darrell Williams, Doris Winstead, Paul Woodcock, Delores Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3554 ORDER denying ( #3471 Motion for Sanctions in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, ( #1372 ) Motion for Sanctions in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM;. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/16/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (pes)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3553 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Akram Abi-Hanna, Martin Agacinski Jr., John Ahrens, Ross Alaimo, George Alfonso, Alexander Astrakan, Barbara A. Ballard, Carl A. Beharry, Oliver W. Benders, Andrea Block, Wayne Boyce, Daniel Caffrey, Rose M. Campanaro, Wende Campanile, Harold Carey, Robert Caston, Israel Eisenberg, Dominick Ervelli Jr., Theresa D. Ferriss, Dayna Fillman, Frank Fischl, Thomas E. Frank, Nelson Gaskill, Malcolm Ginsberg, Hope Goodman, Joyce Gorant, Steven Gray, Maxine Gurin, Kenneth Halloran, Edward T. Hearn, Lourdes Herrera, Jonathan Hildum, Susan Hughes, Frank Iovine, George Jenzano, Lisa Jester, Gladys Kay, Patricia Lapinski, Domenick C. Linsalato, Nicholas Mariolis, David Marsh, William T. Marsh Jr, John Martin, Kathleen McCarthy, Shirley McGovern, Lynn Mizer, Michael Parham, Anastasia Parsons, Pabitra Paudel, Michael Payne, John G. Pepitone, Elizabeth Rasmussen, Wayne Relyea, George Robertson, Barbara Rosario, James Rushmore, Meghan Russo, Vincent Sacco, Artus Satterfield, Robert Saunders, Cleveland Small, Richard A. Smith, Steven Sofia, Erik Spong, Lynda Taylor, Robert Teti, Michael Trezza, Leslie Ujj, Joseph Uncle, Robert Vetter, Stephen Whitehead, Jerome Wilkins, George Williams, James Worthington, Kellianne Worthington, Michael Zak, William C. Zink III.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3552 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Debra Berthiaume, Kristin Bzenic, Daniel Comb, James Crehan, Travis Dixon, Jean Donovan, Edmund Durfee, Charles Harris, Terry Hunt, Bob Jamgochian, Paul Josephine, Jenna LaHousse, Yahya Maatouk, Robert Massarelli, William Neary, James Nunley, Jean OBrien, Scott Palmer, John Pasierbiak, Edward Prunty, James Snow, Sethuraman Somasundaram, Helen Sylvia, Francis Warren, Kristin Yencho, James Zepka.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3551 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Billy Doyle, et al. v. Ford Motor Company 1:19-cv-24735-FAM by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/24/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3550 Joint MOTION for a Hearing and Ruling Under Rules 23 and 62.1 Approving Agreements with Objectors to the Ford Class Settlement by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3549 MOTION to Dismiss (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3548 MOTION to Dismiss (3472 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3547 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Arkansas. Case Number 4:19-cv-00808 with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-25056-FAM on 12/9/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3546 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Arkansas, Case Number 4:19-00808 Green et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3545 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3545 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3544 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Mississippi. Case Number 3:19-cv-00780 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-25006-FAM on 12/5/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3543 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Indiana. Case Number 4:19-cv-00227 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-25002-FAM on 12/5/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3542 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Alabama. Case Number 1:19-cv-00911 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24980-FAM on 12/4/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3541 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of Mississippi, Case Number 3:19-00780 Allen et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3539 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3540 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of Indiana, Case Number 4:19-00227 Arvin v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3539 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3539 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-90) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3538 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3533 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( #3502 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1389 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) no later than Monday, December 16, 2019. (Responses due by 12/16/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3537 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3532 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1405 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( #3523 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1396 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) no later than Thursday, December 19, 2019. (Responses due by 12/19/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc) Modified text deadline date on 12/4/2019 (mc).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3536 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (D.E. 3501 in 15-02599; D.E. 1388 in 14-24009) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Sergei Lemberg. Attorney Sergei Lemberg is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in the cases named in the motion. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notice of all filings on this docket to Sergei Lemberg at slemberg@lemberglaw.com. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/3/2019. (pes)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3535 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (D.E. 3528 in 15-02599; D.E. 1401 in 14-24009). Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (D.E. 3503 in 15-02599; D.E. 1390 in 14-24009) no later than Monday, December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/3/2019. (pes)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3534 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc (D.E. 3526, 3527 in 15-02599; D.E. 1399, 1400 in 14-24009). Plaintiffs must respond to Defendants Motions to Dismiss (D.E. 3488, 3490 in 15-02599; D.E. 1381, 1383 in 14-24009) no later than Tuesday, December 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/3/2019. (pes)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3533 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3502 MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Reginal Allen, Jr., Lewis Avery Jr., William Barnard III, Angelia Barnes, Richard Baxter, Tanzania Birdsong, Lamar Blige, Dennis Bone, Patricia Bowman, Elemer Caraway, Sharon Cole, Ronald Collins, Donna Cook, Bruce Cope, Graham Cossick, Bruce Cowgill, Eric C Crawford, Sammy Davis, Tameka Davis, Jerry Dean, Martha M Dickman, Mike Driggers, Thomas Anthony Dugas, Kathy Euliano, Charles Everett, Diane Fairweather, Anika Fisher, Michael Fitzpatrick, Mary Anne Cone Fletcher, Antonina Foster, Roy Foster, Eugene Free, Jessica Freire, Keshia Godfrey, Michael Gutting, Yoko Harper, Morris Harrell, Alice Hatcher, Tony Hayes, Bruce Henley, Reginald Hicks, Stella Hise, Willis Hise, Wanda Howell, David Hughes, Carole Becker Ingram, Taylor Ivey, Homer Jernigan, Kenneth C. Johnson, Stephanie Kelley, Shashank Kundurti, Carlton Lee, Nathaniel Lee, Cynthia Leonard, Mildred Lewis, Benjamin Lichtenwalner, Linton Lively, Kris Lovell, Dannie M Marks, Bryan Martin, Rosalia Mayol, William Alan McCormick, Donald Mccoy, Gary Moore, Randy Morgan, Melanye Morris, Joseph Morrison, Renae Murphy, Cassandra Neal, Jerry Franklin Neese, Kenneth Neil, Gary Nichols, Edward Nugent, James Page Jr, Brenda Pope, Petra Radke, Kenneth Ragan, Melanie Raines, Daniel Reiter, Diane H. Robinson, Mary Romine, John Rose, Donald Ross, Paul Sacia, Evans Sanders, Linda J Scarborough, Rodger Sexton, Julie Simonsen, Cherri Sims, Katie Smith, Kevin Smith, Trvett K Stanford, Robin Starner, Bobbie Sweatt, Cindy Lee Thomas, Eutevia Thomas, Norman Allen Thompson, Justin Thornton, John W. Tillman, Carol Waite, Queenie Washington, Darrell Williams, Doris Winstead, Paul Woodcock, Delores Wright, Delores W Wright. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Reginal Allen, Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Reginal Allen, Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lewis Avery Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lewis Avery Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Barnard III(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Barnard III(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Angelia Barnes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Angelia Barnes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Richard Baxter(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Richard Baxter(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tanzania Birdsong(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tanzania Birdsong(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lamar Blige(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lamar Blige(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dennis Bone(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dennis Bone(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Patricia Bowman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Patricia Bowman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Elemer Caraway(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Elemer Caraway(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sharon Cole(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sharon Cole(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Ronald Collins(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Ronald Collins(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Donna Cook(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Donna Cook(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Cope(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Cope(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Graham Cossick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Graham Cossick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Cowgill(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Cowgill(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Eric C Crawford(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Eric C Crawford(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sammy Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sammy Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tameka Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tameka Davis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jerry Dean(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jerry Dean(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martha M Dickman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martha M Dickman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mike Driggers(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mike Driggers(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Thomas Anthony Dugas(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Thomas Anthony Dugas(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kathy Euliano(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kathy Euliano(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Charles Everett(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Charles Everett(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Diane Fairweather(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Diane Fairweather(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Anika Fisher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Anika Fisher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Fitzpatrick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Fitzpatrick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mary Anne Cone Fletcher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mary Anne Cone Fletcher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Antonina Foster(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Antonina Foster(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Roy Foster(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Roy Foster(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Eugene Free(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Eugene Free(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jessica Freire(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jessica Freire(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Keshia Godfrey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Keshia Godfrey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Gutting(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Gutting(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Morris Harrell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Morris Harrell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alice Hatcher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alice Hatcher(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tony Hayes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Tony Hayes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Henley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bruce Henley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Reginald Hicks(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Reginald Hicks(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Stella Hise(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Stella Hise(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Willis Hise(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Willis Hise(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wanda Howell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wanda Howell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Hughes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Hughes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carole Becker Ingram(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carole Becker Ingram(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Taylor Ivey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Taylor Ivey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Homer Jernigan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Homer Jernigan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kenneth C. Johnson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kenneth C. Johnson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Stephanie Kelley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Stephanie Kelley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Shashank Kundurti(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Shashank Kundurti(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carlton Lee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carlton Lee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nathaniel Lee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nathaniel Lee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Cynthia Leonard(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Cynthia Leonard(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mildred Lewis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Mildred Lewis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Benjamin Lichtenwalner(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Benjamin Lichtenwalner(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Linton Lively(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Linton Lively(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kris Lovell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kris Lovell(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dannie M Marks(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dannie M Marks(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bryan Martin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bryan Martin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Rosalia Mayol(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Rosalia Mayol(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Alan McCormick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Alan McCormick(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Donald Mccoy(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro ad
December 2, 2019 Filing 3532 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3523 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Joseph Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3531 REPORT REGARDING Joint Status Report and Request for Status Conference by Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3530 Corrected Transcript and Notice of Correction of Hearing on Motions for Protective Orders held on 11-08-19 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-86 pages, re: (3519 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1394 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Transcript; Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3529 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3514 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and #1393 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/25/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21285-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3528 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1390 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3503 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Keith Heuss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3527 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3490 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1383 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Corrected MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Akram Abi-Hanna, Martin Agacinski Jr., John Ahrens, Ross Alaimo, George Alfonso, Alexander Astrakan, Barbara A. Ballard, Carl A. Beharry, Oliver W. Benders, Andrea Block, Wayne Boyce, Daniel Caffrey, Rose M. Campanaro, Wende Campanile, Harold Carey, Robert Caston, Israel Eisenberg, Dominick Ervelli Jr., Theresa D. Ferriss, Dayna Fillman, Frank Fischl, Thomas E. Frank, Nelson Gaskill, Malcolm Ginsberg, Hope Goodman, Joyce Gorant, Steven Gray, Maxine Gurin, Kenneth Halloran, Edward T. Hearn, Lourdes Herrera, Jonathan Hildum, Susan Hughes, Frank Iovine, George Jenzano, Lisa Jester, Gladys Kay, Patricia Lapinski, Domenick C. Linsalato, Nicholas Mariolis, David Marsh, William T. Marsh Jr, John Martin, Kathleen McCarthy, Shirley McGovern, Lynn Mizer, Michael Parham, Anastasia Parsons, Pabitra Paudel, Michael Payne, John G. Pepitone, Elizabeth Rasmussen, Wayne Relyea, George Robertson, Barbara Rosario, James Rushmore, Meghan Russo, Vincent Sacco, Artus Satterfield, Robert Saunders, Cleveland Small, Richard A. Smith, Steven Sofia, Erik Spong, Lynda Taylor, Robert Teti, Michael Trezza, Leslie Ujj, Joseph Uncle, Robert Vetter, Stephen Whitehead, Jerome Wilkins, George Williams, James Worthington, Kellianne Worthington, Michael Zak, William C. Zink III. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martin Agacinski Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Martin Agacinski Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Ahrens(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Ahrens(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Ross Alaimo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Ross Alaimo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Alfonso(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Alfonso(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alexander Astrakan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alexander Astrakan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara A. Ballard(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara A. Ballard(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carl A. Beharry(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Carl A. Beharry(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Oliver W. Benders(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Oliver W. Benders(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Andrea Block(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Andrea Block(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wayne Boyce(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wayne Boyce(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Daniel Caffrey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Daniel Caffrey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Rose M. Campanaro(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Rose M. Campanaro(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wende Campanile(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wende Campanile(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Harold Carey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Harold Carey(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Caston(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Caston(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Israel Eisenberg(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Israel Eisenberg(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dominick Ervelli Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dominick Ervelli Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Theresa D. Ferriss(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Theresa D. Ferriss(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dayna Fillman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Dayna Fillman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Frank Fischl(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Frank Fischl(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Thomas E. Frank(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Thomas E. Frank(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nelson Gaskill(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nelson Gaskill(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Malcolm Ginsberg(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Malcolm Ginsberg(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Hope Goodman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Hope Goodman(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Joyce Gorant(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Joyce Gorant(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Steven Gray(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Steven Gray(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Maxine Gurin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Maxine Gurin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kenneth Halloran(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kenneth Halloran(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward T. Hearn(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward T. Hearn(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lourdes Herrera(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lourdes Herrera(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jonathan Hildum(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jonathan Hildum(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Susan Hughes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Susan Hughes(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Frank Iovine(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Frank Iovine(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Jenzano(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Jenzano(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lisa Jester(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lisa Jester(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Gladys Kay(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Gladys Kay(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Patricia Lapinski(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Patricia Lapinski(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Domenick C. Linsalato(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Domenick C. Linsalato(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nicholas Mariolis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Nicholas Mariolis(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Marsh(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party David Marsh(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William T. Marsh Jr(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William T. Marsh Jr(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Martin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Martin(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kathleen McCarthy(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kathleen McCarthy(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Shirley McGovern(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Shirley McGovern(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lynn Mizer(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lynn Mizer(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Parham(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Parham(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Anastasia Parsons(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Anastasia Parsons(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Pabitra Paudel(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Pabitra Paudel(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Payne(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Michael Payne(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John G. Pepitone(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John G. Pepitone(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Elizabeth Rasmussen(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Elizabeth Rasmussen(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wayne Relyea(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Wayne Relyea(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Robertson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party George Robertson(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara Rosario(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Barbara Rosario(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Rushmore(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Rushmore(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Meghan Russo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Meghan Russo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Vincent Sacco(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Vincent Sacco(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Artus Satterfield(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Artus Satterfield(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Saunders(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Saunders(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Cleveland Small(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Cleveland Small(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Richard A. Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Richard A. Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Steven Sofia(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Steven Sofia(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Erik Spong(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Erik Spong(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Lynda Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro
November 26, 2019 Filing 3526 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (1381 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3488 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Amended MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Debra Berthiaume, Kristin Bzenic, Daniel Comb, James Crehan, Travis Dixon, Jean Donovan, Edmund Durfee, Charles Harris, Terry Hunt, Bob Jamgochian, Paul Josephine, Jenna LaHousse, Yahya Maatouk, Robert Massarelli, William Neary, James Nunley, Jean OBrien, Scott Palmer, John Pasierbiak, Edward Prunty, James Snow, Sethuraman Somasundaram, Helen Sylvia, Francis Warren, Kristin Yencho, James Zepka. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Debra Berthiaume(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Debra Berthiaume(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kristin Bzenic(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kristin Bzenic(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Daniel Comb(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Daniel Comb(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Travis Dixon(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Travis Dixon(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jean Donovan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jean Donovan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edmund Durfee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edmund Durfee(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Charles Harris(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Charles Harris(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Terry Hunt(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Terry Hunt(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bob Jamgochian(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Bob Jamgochian(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Paul Josephine(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Paul Josephine(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jenna LaHousse(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jenna LaHousse(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Yahya Maatouk(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Yahya Maatouk(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Massarelli(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Robert Massarelli(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Neary(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party William Neary(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Nunley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Nunley(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jean OBrien(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Jean OBrien(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Scott Palmer(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Scott Palmer(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Pasierbiak(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party John Pasierbiak(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward Prunty(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward Prunty(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Snow(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Snow(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sethuraman Somasundaram(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Sethuraman Somasundaram(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Helen Sylvia(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Helen Sylvia(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Francis Warren(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Francis Warren(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kristin Yencho(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Kristin Yencho(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Zepka(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Zepka(pty:conpla). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3525 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3513 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and #1392 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/25/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21281-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3524 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re (1384 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3496 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3523 MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Joseph Gallardo, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3522 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Wisconsin. Case Number 2:19-cv-01485 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24816-FAM on 11/21/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3521 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ( #3481 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1377, 1386 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3520 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Oklahoma. Case Number 5:19-cv-00941 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24815-FAM on 11/21/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3519 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions for Protective Orders held on 11-08-19 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-86 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3518 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 7:19-cv-09188 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24807-FAM on 11/20/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3517 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Maryland. Case Number 1:19-cv-02974 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24800-FAM on 11/20/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3516 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 8:19-cv-00446 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24799-FAM pm 11/20/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3515 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Missouri. Case Number 4:19-cv-02751 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24791-FAM on 11/20/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3514 STIPULATION to Dismiss Entire Case with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3513 STIPULATION to Dismiss Entire Case with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3512 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Case Number 2:19-01485 Milton Childs, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3511 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Western District of Oklahoma, Case Number 5:19-00941 Henderson v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3510 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of New York, Case Number 7:19-09188 Senitta Jr v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3509 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Nebraska, Case Number 8:19-00446 Coffman et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3508 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Missouri, Case Number 4:19-02751 Reed, et al. v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3507 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Maryland, Case Number 1:19-02974 DuPreez et al. v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3506 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3506 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-89) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3505 REPLY to Response to Motion re ( #3471 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1372 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION for Sanctions by Amy Wheat Rumberger. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(mc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3504 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:19-cv-06686 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24737-FAM on 11/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3503 MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3502 MOTION to Dismiss (3462 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3501 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sergei Lemberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12156083 by Akram Abi-Hanna, James Crehan, Alexander Esposito, Joseph Gallardo, Yoko Harper, Keith Heuss, Josephine Mastroberti, Edward B. McDaid. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sergei Lemberg)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Fornaro, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3500 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Fornaro on behalf of Akram Abi-Hanna, James Crehan, Alexander Esposito, Joseph Gallardo, Yoko Harper, Keith Heuss, Josephine Mastroberti, Edward B. McDaid. Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Akram Abi-Hanna(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Akram Abi-Hanna(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Crehan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party James Crehan(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alexander Esposito(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Alexander Esposito(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Joseph Gallardo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Joseph Gallardo(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Yoko Harper(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Yoko Harper(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Keith Heuss(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Keith Heuss(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Josephine Mastroberti(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Josephine Mastroberti(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward B. McDaid(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew Fornaro added to party Edward B. McDaid(pty:conpla). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Fornaro, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3499 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Florida. Case Number 4:19-cv-00500 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24735-FAM on 11/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3498 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Arizona. Case Number 2:19-cv-05350 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24734-FAM on 11/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3497 ORDER denying as moot ( #3486 , #3487 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1379, 1380 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3496 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re ( #3458 in case 1:15-md-2599-FAM, 1368 in case 1:14-24009-FAM) Letter from Daniel Schoultz. Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3495 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Connecticut. Case Number 3:19-cv-01565 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24685-FAM on 11/13/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3494 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Illinois, Case Number 1:19-06686 Davis v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3491 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3493 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Florida, Case Number 4:19-00500 Doyle et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3491 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3492 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Arizona, Case Number 2:19-05350 Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3491 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3491 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-88) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3490 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3489 ORDER denying as moot ( #3450 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1363 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) General Motors LLC's Motion for Protective Order and ( #3451 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1364 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) FCA US LLC's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (pes)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3488 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3487 MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, Akram Abi-Hanna, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/26/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3486 MOTION to Dismiss (3454 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, James Crehan, et al. v. Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/26/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3485 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 11/8/2019. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3484 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Connecticut, Case Number 3:19-01565 Esposito et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3483 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3483 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-87) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3482 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3471 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1372 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Replies due by 11/14/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3481 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its memorandum of law in support of its Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Dominguez, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3480 STATUS REPORT Preceding November 8, 2019 Hearing by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3479 STATUS REPORT No. 7 by the Settlement Special Administrator on the Implementation of the Outreach Programs Pursuant to the BMW, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3478 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:19-cv-04512 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24447-FAM on 10/29/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3477 REPLY to (3451 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order , (3452 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Response/Reply (Other), Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion for Protective Order by FCS US LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3476 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1363 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plalintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by General Motors LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3475 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Ohio. Case Number 1:19-cv-02234 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24422-FAM on 10/28/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3474 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Case Number 2:19-04512 McDaid v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3472 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3473 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Ohio, Case Number 1:19-02234 Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3472 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3472 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-86) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3471 MOTION for Sanctions against Settlement Special Administrator and Class Counsel for Failing to Respond to verified claims in breach of their fiduciary and court appointed duties regarding claims filed in MDL 2599 and 14cv24009 Takata Airbag Product Liability Settlement by Amy Wheat Rumberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(mc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3470 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1364 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3451 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order , (1363 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3450 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plalintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3469 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Western Texas. Case Number 1:19-cv-00907 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24329 on 10/21/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (pes)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3468 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Northern Georgia. Case Number 1:19-cv-04196 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24327 on 10/21/2019 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (pes)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3467 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Colorado. Case Number 1:19-cv-02686 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24326-FAM on 10/21/2019 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (pes)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3466 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in Response to Order to Show Cause by FCS US LLC Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Fulton, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3465 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Western District of Texas, Case Number 1:19-00907 Heuss v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3462 order of conditional transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3464 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Georgia, Case Number 1:19-04196 Harper et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3462 order of conditional transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3463 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Colorado, Case Number 1:19-02686 Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3462 order of conditional transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3462 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3461 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ( #3457 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1367 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion. Plaintiffs must respond to General Motors's Motion for Protective Order (D.E. #3450 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and D.E. 1363 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM), and FCA US LLC's Motion for Protective Order (D.E. #3451 in case 15-md-02599-FAM and D.E. 1364 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM), no later than Tuesday, October 22, 2019. (Responses due by 10/22/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3460 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 2:19-cv-17837 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24241-FAM on 10/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3459 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the District of Massachusetts. Case Number 1:19-cv-11877 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24237-FAM on 10/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3458 Letter to the Court re Takata Airbag Settlement by Daniel Schoultz. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3457 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3451 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order , (3450 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plalintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3456 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of New Jersey, Case Number 2:19-17837 ABI-Hanna et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3454 order of conditional transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3455 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Massachusetts, Case Number 1:19-11877 Crehan et al v. Ford Motor Company, with enclosed copy of the #3454 order of conditional transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3454 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-84) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3453 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING on ( #3450 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1363 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) General Motors LLC's Motion for Protective Order. ( #3451 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1364 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) FCA US LLC's Motion for Protective Order Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/7/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3452 Declaration of Matthew J. Porpora in Support of FCA USA LLC's Motion for Protective Order to (3451 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MOTION for Protective Order by FCS US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3451 MOTION for Protective Order by FCS US LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Sarason, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3450 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plalintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3449 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is adjudged that the Parties submit a joint status report on this matter no later than Friday, October 18, 2019. (Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 18-cv-21052-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3448 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3440 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1358 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification (1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-025 filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3447 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3443 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 23 in 1:17-cv-22788-FAM as to Joshua Picker v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al) Joint Stipulation and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:17-cv-22788-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3446 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3440 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1358 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification (1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-025 filed by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Replies due by 10/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Daker, Angela)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3445 ORDER granting ( #3001 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1034 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Bayerische Motoren Werke AG's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. All claims asserted by the Recycler Plaintiffs against Bayerische Motoren Werke AG are DISMISSED. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3444 ORDER DISCHARGING CLASS COUNSEL'S OBLIGATION UNDER PRIOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3420 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3443 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Joint Stipulation by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Greenberg, Gerald)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3442 ORDER granting #3439 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Daniel C. Norris withdrawn from case 1:15-md-02599-FAM for defendants Mazda Motor of America, Inc. and Mazda Motor Corporation. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Daniel Norris. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3441 Letter from Deborah Garcia (Takata Airbags-Honda) re #3420 Order to Show Cause (mc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3440 Plaintiff's MOTION for clarification (1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1355 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3435 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order on Motion for Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Continue,,, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 9/27/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3439 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pro Hac Counsel Daniel C. Norris by Ryan Roman for / by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roman, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3438 ORDER granting ( #3382 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1123 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1316 in 1:14-cv-24009) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. James Alexander Stepan withdrawn from case for non-party Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3437 ORDER granting #3433 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eric Yeager. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3436 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re (3420 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3435 ORDER CANCELLING SEPTEMBER 13, 2019 HEARING AND ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING CERTAIN MOTIONS: denying as moot Motion to Reschedule: #1352 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3431 in case 15-md-02599;denying Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint: #1338 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3417 in case 15-md-02599;denying Requests for Entry of Judgment: #1332 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3409 in case 15-md-02599; #1333 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3410 in case 15-md-02599; #1334 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3411 in case 15-md-02599; and granting Motion to Compel the Production of Documents: #1342 in case 14-cv-24009 and #3421 in case 15-md-02599. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (km02)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3434 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1342 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3421 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel The Production Of Documents From Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3433 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric Yeager. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11954831 by General Motors Holdings LLC. Attorney Laurie Michele Riley added to party General Motors Holdings LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/18/2019 (Riley, Laurie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3432 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1338 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Clarification filed by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3431 Unopposed MOTION to Continue September 13, 2019 Motion Hearing re (1351 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3430 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3430 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing ( #3409 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1332 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Daimler AG and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Requests for Entry of Judgment, ( #3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1338 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants: Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3429 RESPONSE to (3421 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel The Production Of Documents From Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Daker, Angela)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3428 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1338 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Clarification filed by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Replies due by 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Daker, Angela)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3427 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1338 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Clarification filed by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Replies due by 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3426 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Clerks Note: JPML notified Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-22017-FAM See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3425 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (Lucas, 18-cv-22017) by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Brochin, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3424 ORDER granting ( #3422 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1343 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion for one-week Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel. Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC must respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel no later than August 30, 2019. Re: ( #3421 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1342 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel The Production Of Documents From Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC . (Responses due by 8/30/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3423 STATUS REPORT By The Settlement Special Administrator On The Implementation Of The Outreach Programs Pursuant To The BMW, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3422 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3421 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel The Production Of Documents From Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Daker, Angela)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3421 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel The Production Of Documents From Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3420 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiffs class counsel file a response with the Court no later than September 9, 2019, addressing the concerns raised in the letter by class member Deborah Garcia re ( #3416 in case 1:15-02599-FAM) Letter. Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/7/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3419 ORDER granting ( #3418 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1339 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Daimler Defendants and Volkswagen Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File and Amended Consolidated Complaint, or in the Alternative, for Clarification. The Daimler Defendants and Volkswagen Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint no later than August 26, 2019. Re: ( #3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1338 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Responses due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/5/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3418 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to (3417 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Clarification by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3417 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint Against Volkswagen and Mercedes Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Clarification by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Redlined Proposed Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3416 Letter from Deborah Garcia re: Takata Airbags Settlement Registration (Honda) (mc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3415 REPLY to (3409 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1332 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice (Other), (1333 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3410 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other), (1334 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3411 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other) by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Daker, Angela)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3414 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to (1334 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3411 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other), (3409 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1332 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice (Other), (1333 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3410 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to the Motions of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Daimler AG for Entry of Judgment by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3413 NOTICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. of Offer to Judicial Law Clerk. Attorney Ryan Roman added to party Mazda Motor of America, Inc.(pty:crc). (Roman, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3412 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel re (1334 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3411 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other), (3409 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1332 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice (Other), (1333 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3410 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Respond in Opposition to the Motions of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Daimler AG for Entry of Judgment Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Prieto, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3411 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC of Request for Entry of Judgment (Puhalla) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Cantero, Raoul) Modified to convert document to a motion on 8/30/2019 (mc).
July 1, 2019 Filing 3410 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC of Request for Entry of Judgment (Maestri) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Cantero, Raoul) Modified to convert document to a motion on 8/30/2019 (mc).
July 1, 2019 Filing 3409 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Request for Entry of Judgment (Krmpotic) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Cantero, Raoul) Modified to convert document to a motion on 8/30/2019 (mc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 3408 RESPONSE to (3407 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 3407 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1330 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1330 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (3403 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1327 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Order to Show Cause, (1326 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3402 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Class Counsel's Response to Daniel Shoultz's Letters to the Court by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3407 NOTICE of Filing Letter by Daniel Schoultz dated June 18, 2019 re Takata Airbag Settlement. A response to the letter must be filed no later than July 18, 2019 (Responses due by 7/18/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Letter) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3406 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #2981 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #2982 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #2983 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #2988 Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM. Granting in Part and Denying in Part #1022 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part Denied #1023 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #1029 Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (ra)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3405 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Request for Designation of Remand Record (Victor Williams v. Ford Motor Co.) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Dominguez, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3404 Appeal Reinstated USCA Case Number:19-10184-HH for (1146 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3191 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by James Laudato. (hh)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3403 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/30/2019 re ( #3402 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1326 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1132 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Notice of Filing Letter by Daniel Schoultz dated May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3402 NOTICE of Filing Letter by Daniel Schoultz dated May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Letter) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3401 STATUS REPORT By The Settlement Special Administrator On The Implementation Of The Outreach Programs Pursuant To The BMW, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlement Agreements by Patrick A. Juneau Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3400 ORDER granting ( #3398 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1322 in case 1:14-24009-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Yavar Bathaee withdrawn from case for Defendants Volkswagen AG, Audi AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Audi of America, LLC. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Yavar Bathaee. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3399 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc re ( #3397 in case 1:15-md-2599-FAM, 1321 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-2599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21597-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3398 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yavar Bathaee for / by Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Greenberg, Gerald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3397 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (Pinchuk Case No. 18-21597 (S.D. Fla.))) by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Brochin, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3396 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case FLS C.A. No. 1:18-22448/FLM C.A. No. 2:18-00134 Hogan v. Gomez et al, pursuant to ( #3395 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 27 in 1:18-cv-22448-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, and ( #3393 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Joint STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a). (mc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3395 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FLS C.A. No. 1:18-22448/FLM C.A. No. 2:18-00134 Hogan v. Gomez et al) re: MDL 2599. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a), the parties shall furnish the Clerk for the Southern District of Florida with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3394 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ( #2981 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1022) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant General Motor's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part ( #2983 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1024) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant FCA's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part ( #2988 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1029) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendants Mercedes-Benz and Volkswagen's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(mc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3393 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a) by William Hogan, Jr Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Felix, Andrew)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3392 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. This appeal is DISMISSED as to appellant James Laudato. Mr. Laudato failed to timely object to the district court's preliminary order approving the class action settlement and certifying the class re (1146 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3191 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by James Laudato. USCA #19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(apz)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3391 ORDER granting ( #3386 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1127 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Joint Request for Stipulation of Remand. The Court suggests to the Panel on Multidristrict Litigation that these proceedings be remanded to the United States District for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/26/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1:18-cv-22448-FAM) See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3390 ORDER granting ( #3383 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1124 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1317 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Peter Emerson Berlowe and D. Ross Hamilton, Jr. are terminated as counsel of record for third-party TK Holdings, Inc. The Clerk is hereby directed to remove non-party TK Holdings, Inc, and Peter Emerson Berlowe and D. Ross Hamilton, Jr. from CM/ECF in these cases. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/26/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3389 CLERK'S NOTICE of Remanding Case FLS C.A. No. 1:18-23880/LAE C.A. No. 2:18-08007 Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al pursuant to ( #3320 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 25 in 1:18-cv-23880-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3388 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case FLS 1:17-24175/GAN 1:17-02367 Johnson v. Takata Corporation et al, pursuant to ( #3063 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 20 in 1:17-cv-24175-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, and ( #3385 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Joint STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a). (mc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3387 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case FLS 1:17-20820/ALN 2:16-01986 Thornton v. Takata Corporation et al, pursuant to ( #3063 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 34 in 1:17-cv-20820-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, and ( #3384 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Joint STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a).(mc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3386 STIPULATION Joint Request for Stipulation of Remand by William Hogan, Jr Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Felix, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3385 STIPULATION re (3063 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, (Joint Stipulation of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a)) by BMW of North America, LLC, Tricia Johnson Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Villeneuve, Stephen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3384 STIPULATION re (3063 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) MDL Conditional Transfer Order, (Joint Stipulation of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a)) by BMW of North America, LLC Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Villeneuve, Stephen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3383 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter E. Berlowe, Assouline & Berlowe, P.A. and D. Ross Hamilton, Jr., Tuggle Duggins P.A. for / by TK Holdings, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc., TK Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:con3df), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings Inc.(pty:crd), Attorney Andrea Leslie Bos added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov). Responses due by 4/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Bos, Andrea)
April 7, 2019 Filing 3382 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Non-Party Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems and James A. Stepan, Esq. of Dickinson Wright PLLC move to withdraw as parties and counsel and remove them from CM/ECF filing in these cases by James A. Stepan for / by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems. Responses due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Stepan, James)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3381 ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-83) re: MDL 2599. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-83" is VACATED. (FLM/C.A. No. 6:18-02216 Jeannis v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, et al) (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3380 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF GARY LANE'S CLAIMS re ( #3282 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1220 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to the above referenced parties. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21322-FAM). Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3379 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF JAMES NISKANEN'S CLAIMS re ( #3276 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1214 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to the above referenced parties. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21295-FAM). Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3378 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3309 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1245 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21321-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3377 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3308 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1244 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21268-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3376 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3307 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1243 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21320-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3375 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3306 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1242 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21318-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3374 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3305 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1241 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21316-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3373 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3304 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1240 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21315-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3372 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3303 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1239 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21313-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3371 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3202 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1238 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21312-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3370 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3301 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1237 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21310-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3369 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3300 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1236 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21304-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3368 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3299 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1235 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21303-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3367 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3298 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1234 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21300-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3366 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3297 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1233 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21299-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3365 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3296 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1232 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21293-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3364 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3295 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1231 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21288-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3363 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3294 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1230 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21286-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3362 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3291 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1229 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21311-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3361 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3290 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1228 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21277-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3360 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3289 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1227 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21282-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3359 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3288 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1226 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21309-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3358 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3287 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1225 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21307-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3357 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3286 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1224 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21305-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3356 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3285 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1223 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21317-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3355 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3284 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1222 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21319-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3354 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3283 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1221 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21314-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3353 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3279 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1217 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21283-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3352 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3278 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1216 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21272-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3351 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3277 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1215 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21290-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3350 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3275 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1213 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21298-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3349 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3274 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1212 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21287-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3348 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3273 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1211 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21269-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3347 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3272 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1210 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21280-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3346 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3271 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1209 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21261-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3345 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3270 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1208 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21258-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3344 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3269 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1207 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21291-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3343 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3268 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1206 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21273-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3342 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3267 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1205 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21267-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3341 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3266 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1204 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21259-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3340 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3265 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1203 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21274-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3339 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3264 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1202 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21266-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3338 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3263 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1201 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21294-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3337 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3262 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1200 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21263-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3336 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3261 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1199 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21275-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3335 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3260 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1198 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21284-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3334 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3259 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1197 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21279-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3333 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3258 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1196 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21262-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3332 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE re ( #3257 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM and 1195 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties and claims. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-21260-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3331 ORDER granting ( #3329 in case 1:15-md-2599-FAM, 1120 in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1265 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Peter Goodman and L Andrew Stern Riccio withdrawn from case for third-party TKJP Corporation. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:15-md-2599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3330 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Adjudged that the Parties again submit a joint status report on this matter, but no later than Monday, April 15, 2019. The Parties shall update the Court on the current status of discovery and advise the Court on whether this personal injury track case should be suggested for remand back to the Western District of Wisconsin.(Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2019). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-20664-FAM, 18-cv-21052-FAM) See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3329 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter S. Goodman and L Andrew S. Riccio for / by TKJP Corporation. Responses due by 4/10/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Riccio, L Andrew)
March 25, 2019 Attorney Leonid Feller terminated per DE 1264 Order in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Leonid Feller. (mc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3328 STATUS REPORT of Settlement Special Administrator on Implementation of the Outreach Programs Pursuant to the BMW, Honda, Mazda, Nissan, Subaru, and Toyota Settlements by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Weinshall, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3327 ORDER granting ( #3319 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1254) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, (1116) in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Unopposed Joint Motion for Order Approving Bankruptcy Protective Order Relating to Data of Bankruptcy Tataka Entities. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Schedule A OEM List) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3326 ORDER granting ( #3316 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1251) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, (1113) in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Peter Goodman for third-party TKJP Corporation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3325 ORDER granting ( #3315 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1250) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, (1112) in case 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney D. Ross Hamilton, Jr. for third-part TK Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3324 ORDER denying ( #3190 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1145) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Compel Settlement Administrator. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3323 ORDER denying as moot ( #2980 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1020), (1021) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) General Motors LLC's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3322 ORDER denying as moot without prejudice ( #2978 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1018) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Bayerische Motoren Werke AG's Motion to Dismiss Automotive Recycler Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3321 ORDER denying ( #2541 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (836) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion for Suggestion of Remand of Krmpotic Action to the Transferor Court. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3320 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FLS C.A. No. 1:18-23880/LAE C.A. No. 2:18-08007 Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al) re: MDL 2599. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a), the parties shall furnish the Clerk for the Southern District of Florida with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3319 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Order Approving Bankruptcy Protective Order Relating to Data of Bankrupt Takata Entities by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Confidentiality and Data Privacy Agreement, and Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B -- Bankruptcy Court Order, #3 Exhibit C -- Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Prieto, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3318 ORDER DENYING CERTAIN PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING CERTAIN PREVIOUSLY RULED ON MOTIONS. ADJUDGED that the following motions are DENIED AS MOOT without prejudice: #1655 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Autoliv Inc. to Designate & Produce a Fed. R. civ. P.30(b)(6) Designee(s) for Deposition; #1832 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Saal; #1871 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal; #1964 Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification or in the Alternative, Reconsideration of the Court's Order Dismissing Certain Amended and Additional Counts in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; #2357 Plaintiff Patrick F Calhourne's Motion to Reassign Case; #3156 Defendant FCA US LLC's Motion for Telephonic Appearance for Status Hearing on Cases in the Personal Injury Track. ADJUDGED that the following motions are administratively TERMINATED as previously ruled on: #2632 Plaintiff' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Class Settlement; #2822 Motion for Suggestion of Remand in McKeehan, Cases No. 17-24186; #2823 Motion for Suggestion of Remand in Simarano, Case No. 16-23427; #2824 Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration, and Request for Personal Injury Track Status Conference; #2909 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ford Class Settlement, Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Class Notice; #2922 Plaintiffs' and Ford Motor Company's Joint Motion to Server Automative-Recycler Claims and to Defer Ruling on Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; #3047 Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's Request for Hearing; #3161 Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Objection Elder-Johnson's Subpoena to Lead Counsel or in the Alternative Motion for Protective Order; #3162 Plaintiffs' Opposition and Motion to Strike Objector Wright's Notice of Supplement to Objection to the Ford Settlement. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by L Andrew Stern Riccio on behalf of TKJP Corporation Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Riccio, L Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3316 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Peter Goodman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11458214 by TKJP Corporation. Attorney L Andrew Stern Riccio added to party TKJP Corporation(pty:ip), Attorney L Andrew Stern Riccio added to party TKJP Corporation(pty:ip), Attorney L Andrew Stern Riccio added to party TKJP Corporation(pty:ip). Responses due by 3/22/2019 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Riccio, L Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3315 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for D. Ross Hamilton, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11456636 by TK Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice D. Ross Hamilton, Jr.)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Berlowe, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3314 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Emerson Berlowe on behalf of TK Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Peter Emerson Berlowe added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov), Attorney Peter Emerson Berlowe added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov), Attorney Peter Emerson Berlowe added to party TK Holdings, Inc.(pty:mov). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Berlowe, Peter)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3313 ORDER granting #3292 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Diane Rennie and Richard Lee. Sean Christopher Domnick withdrawn from case. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24365-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3312 ORDER granting ( #3281 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1219 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Counsel for Ford Motor Company. Ashley W. Winsky withdrawn from case Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Ashley Winsky. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3311 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ford Class Settlement held on 09-05-18 before Judge Federico A. Moreno, 1-59 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(gpz)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3310 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND (1:18-cv-23880-FAM Wheat v. Takata Corporation et al). The Court suggests to the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that these proceedings be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana re (23 in 1:18-cv-23880-FAM, #2694 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order Dismissing Party. Note: JPML notified. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/5/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1:18-cv-23880-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3309 STIPULATION of Dismissal in David Yuan v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3308 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Vincent Van Aagten v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3307 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Donald Stains v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3306 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Donna C. Sousa and Tamara E. Newsome v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3305 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Noah V. Siegel v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3304 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Rezuan Shaik v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3303 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Michael Sanford v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3302 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Sean Poffenbarger v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3301 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Jeffrey L. Orr v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3300 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Kenneth Jones v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3299 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Nannette Gogoshian and Pual Gogoshian v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3298 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Rose Flores and John Flores v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3297 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Derrick Fenley v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3296 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Danielle Disimone v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3295 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Ryan Davis v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3294 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Gerald Cox v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3293 STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPML Rule 10.4(a)(Peggy Joyce Kole and Charles Kole v. Takata Corp., TK Holdings, Inc. and Ford Motor Company - Case No.: 16-cv-23419) by Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Salas, Henry)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3292 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sean C. Domnick for / by Richard Lee, Diana Rennie. Responses due by 3/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Domnick, Sean)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3291 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Vanessa Latimer v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3290 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Brian Bartling v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3289 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Michelle Brooks v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3288 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Derek Mostero v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3287 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Rafael Morales v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3286 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Jaime Morales v. Ford Motor Company, et. al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3285 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Patrick Mcnamara v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3284 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Keith Marsden v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3283 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Norma Longoria v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3282 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Gary Lane v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashley W. Winsky for / by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alexander Stepan on behalf of Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems. Attorney James Alexander Stepan added to party Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems (pty:ip), Attorney James Alexander Stepan added to party Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems (pty:ip), Attorney James Alexander Stepan added to party Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC d/b/a Joyson Safety Systems (pty:ip). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (Stepan, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3279 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Rafael Guerrero v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3278 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Sylvester Sybilski v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3277 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Pedro Melendrez and Angelica Mata v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3276 STIPULATION of Dismissal in James Roy Niskanen v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3275 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Higinio Llamas v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3274 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Vivek Goyal v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3273 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Peter Gargas v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3272 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Cynthia L. Foster v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3271 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Ali K. Alshatti v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3270 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Michael Allegretti v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3269 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Adam Weber v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3268 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Ron Townsend on behalf of Townsend Family 1992 Revocable Trust v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3267 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Randy Sid v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3266 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Christopher Stamps v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3265 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Juan Velarde v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3264 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Cedric Schwab v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3263 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Michael Nevieus v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3262 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Sam Jaffal v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3261 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Patricia Hernandez v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3260 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Imedla Ganiban and Emerson Ganiban v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3259 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Westley Farmer v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3258 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Richard A. Bartleman v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3257 STIPULATION of Dismissal in Said Almoradi v. Ford Motor Company, et al. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3256 Letter addressed to Mr. Peter Prieto re: Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation from Terry Delehanty. (mc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3255 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 01-29-19 by Sam P. Cannata, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (3253 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1192 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Court Reporter Acknowledgment, (3191 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3219 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1165 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3254 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 02-06-18 by N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (1157 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3244 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form, (3252 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1191 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Court Reporter Acknowledgment, (3207 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3253 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (1146 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3219 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript: Previously filed 01-18-19. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3252 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (1157 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3244 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form, (3207 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript Previously filed: 01-18-19. USCA number 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3251 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Dolly L. Wright re (1156 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3211 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Rothstein, Paul)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3250 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction Docket Text Modified by Clerk to add Proof of Delivery and to reflect filing date on 11/26/2018 instead of 12/3/2018 re ( #3125 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1097 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Response/Reply (Other), ( #3126 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1098 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Response/Reply (Other), ( #3127 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1099 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Response/Reply (Other), ( #3128 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1100 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Response/Reply (Other). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3249 NOTICE of Filing Letter by Daniel Schoultz dated January 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3248 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jerry Jones re #3208 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Bacharach, N.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3247 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Tiffany Rembert re #3215 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Bacharach, N.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3246 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Geraldine Curry re #3216 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Bacharach, N.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3245 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Dennis E. Raby re #3209 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Bacharach, N.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3244 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Joseph Chaney re #3207 Notice of Appeal,. Fairness Hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by N. Albert Bacharach, Jr.. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Bacharach, N.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3243 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 01-28-19 by Kearney Dee Hutsler, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (3203 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1152 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (1171 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3226 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3242 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 01-31-19 by Jan L. Westfall, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (1150 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3199 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (1182 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Court Reporter Acknowledgment, (1167 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3241 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 01-31-19 by Jan L. Westfall, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (3237 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1181 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Court Reporter Acknowledgment, (1150 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3199 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3222 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3240 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 01-21-19 by Adam L. Hoipkemier, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re (3239 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1183 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Court Reporter Acknowledgment, (3188 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3202 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3239 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (3188 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3202 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript: Previously filed 01-18-19. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3238 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (1150 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3199 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (1167 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript: Previously filed 01-18-19. USCA number 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3237 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (1150 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3199 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (3222 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript: Previously filed 01-18-19. USCA number 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3236 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re (3203 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1152 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, (1171 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 3226 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript: Previously filed 01-18-19. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(gpz)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3235 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lead Counsel re #3231 Letter Notice of Filing Letter to Terrence Delehanty (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Prieto, Peter)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3234 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case FLS C.A. No. 1:18-21041/FLM C.A. No. 8:18-00479 Hallman v. Walker Ford Co. Inc. et al, pursuant to ( #2889 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 17 in 1:18-cv-21041-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER and ( #3229 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPLM Rule 10.4(a) (mc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3233 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re (1177 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry, (3220 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Geraldine Curry. Date received by USCA: 1/28/19. USCA Case Number: 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(hh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3232 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re (1174 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tiffany Rembert, (3215 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tiffany Rembert. Date received by USCA: 1/28/19. USCA Case Number: 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(hh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3231 Letter from Terrence Delehanty as to Peter Prieto re: Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation (mc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3230 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re (1158 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Jones, (3208 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Jones. Date received by USCA: 1/28/19. USCA Case Number: 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(hh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3229 STIPULATION of Designation of Remand Record Pursuant to JPLM Rule 10.4(a) (Danielle Hallman v. Ford Motor Company and Walker Ford., Inc. - Case No.: 18-21041) by Ford Motor Company Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Salas, Henry)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3228 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re (3209 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis E. Raby, (1159 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis E. Raby. Date received by USCA: 1/28/19. USCA Case Number: 19-10184-HH. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(hh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3226 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Kearney Dee Hustler re (3203 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1152 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Notice of Appeal. Email sent t