Rossi et al v. Darden et al
Plaintiff: Rossi
Defendant: Darden, Thomas Darden and IPH International B.V.
Counter Defendant: Andrea Rossi, Leonardo Corporation, Henry Johnson, Fabio Penon, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc. and United States Quantum Leap, LLC
Counter Claimant: John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC and Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: James A. Bass
Case Number: 1:2016cv21199
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Filing Letter to the Court by Fred J Zoepfl (cds)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), John T. Vaughn (Pace, Christopher)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER DISMISSING and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/6/2017. (ps1) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Jury Trial completed on 7/5/2017. Case settled. Total time in court: 48 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Bernard P. Bell, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, John Charles Lukacs, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Jury Trial held on 6/30/2017. Day 3.. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, John Charles Lukacs, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Jury Trial held on 6/29/2017. Day 2. Mistrial declared after dismissing jurors. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Bernard P. Bell, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Robert Andrew Bernstein, John Charles Lukacs, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Jury Trial begun on 6/28/2017. Total time in court: 4 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Bernard P. Bell, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Robert Andrew Bernstein, John Charles Lukacs, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER permitting electronic equipment to come into the courthouse. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/28/2017. (ps1)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SUPPLEMENT to #325 Notice (Other), Defendants' Deposition Designations (Chart and Transcripts) by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn (Pace, Christopher)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn of Joint Filing of Defendants' and Third Party Defendants' Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit Third Party Defendants' Deposition Designations) (Pace, Christopher)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Statement of: The Case by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi (Chaiken, Brian)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 24 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/22/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 43 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/20/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 33 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Clerks Notice to Filer re #317 Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Document Not Related to Case; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document in the appropriate case. (ps1)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/19/2017. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Handelson, Erika)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2017. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/13/2017. Total time in court: 5 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, John Charles Lukacs, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Charge conference set for 6/19/2017 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 6/28/2017 12:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2017 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Charles Lukacs on behalf of Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Attorney John Charles Lukacs added to party Leonardo Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney John Charles Lukacs added to party Andrea Rossi(pty:pla). (Lukacs, John)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #262 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #263 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #264 Motion in Limine; denying #283 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court; denying #285 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/24/2017. (ps1)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 PAPERLESS NOTICE Setting Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2017 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (wc)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2017 re #262 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi, #285 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #266 Order to District Court Denying Motion for Sanctions Based on Spoliation, #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., #263 MOTION in Limine filed by Henry Johnson, James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., #283 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court Order - ECF No. 266. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 25 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Rodolfo Nunez, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Christopher Martin Lomax, Fernando S. Aran, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER denying #309 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs, somewhat inexplicably, continue to overlook and violate the deadline for filing pretrial motions, which has long since passed. Further, Plaintiffs continually fail to comply with the conferral requirements of the Local Rules. Future non-compliance will result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File to Take Additional Discovery and Provide Rebuttal Expert Report by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Chaiken, Brian)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER denying #304 Motion. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #283 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court Order - ECF No. #266 filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 5/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pace, Christopher) Modified document link per attorney's request on 6/6/2017 (mc).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE in Opposition re #285 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #266 Order to District Court Denying Motion for Sanctions Based on Spoliation filed by J.M. Products, Inc.. Replies due by 5/25/2017. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE in Opposition re #285 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #266 Order to District Court Denying Motion for Sanctions Based on Spoliation filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 5/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bernstein, Robert)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Plaintiff's MOTION for Limited Clarification on Daubert Order by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Bernstein, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #197 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong; granting in part and denying in part #215 Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Experts. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/17/2017. (ps1)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER denying #203 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #214 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #242 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/17/2017. (ps1)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying #300 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chaiken, Brian)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 REPLY to Response to Motion re #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine as to Third-Party Defendants Fabiani and United States Quantum Leap, LLC filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Maugans, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER denying #295 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/10/2017. (ps1)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY to Response to Motion re #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Handelson, Erika)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REPLY to Response to Motion re #263 MOTION in Limine filed by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION to Strike #289 Supplement Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Responses due by 5/23/2017 (Handelson, Erika)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #292 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney D. Porpoise Evans and Paul Dewey Turner terminated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/9/2017. (ps1)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Paul Turner and D. Porpoise Evans. by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 5/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order Providing Instructions for Trial. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/9/2017. (ps1)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Andrew Bernstein on behalf of Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Attorney Robert Andrew Bernstein added to party Leonardo Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Andrew Bernstein added to party Andrea Rossi(pty:pla). (Bernstein, Robert)
May 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SUPPLEMENT to #280 Pretrial Stipulation by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi (Annesser, John)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Replies due by 5/12/2017. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #283 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court Order - ECF No. 266, #285 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #266 Order to District Court Denying Motion for Sanctions Based on Spoliation: Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The Court has reserved the rest of the day for this hearinig. (ps1)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER denying #284 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #266 Order to District Court Denying Motion for Sanctions Based on Spoliation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Handelson, Erika)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file Their Trial Exhibit List by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 5/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaiken, Brian)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court Order - ECF No. 266 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Chaiken, Brian)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #236 Statement,,,,, of Correction to Paragraph 34 (Handelson, Erika)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #275 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V. Responses due by 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/3/2017. (ps1)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PRETRIAL STIPULATION JOINT by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn (Handelson, Erika)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 RESPONSE in Opposition re #262 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Handelson, Erika)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #263 MOTION in Limine of Third Party Defendants J.M. Products, Johnson and Bass filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Maugans, Michael)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Annesser, John)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have an additional three (3) day enlargement of time from Tuesday, May 2, 2017 up through and including Friday, May 5, 2017 to file and serve their respective trial exhibit lists. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/2/2017. (ps1)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File and Serve Their Respective Trial Exhibit Lists by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 5/16/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing held on 03/24/17, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-60 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (smn)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing held on 03/28/17, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (smn)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Change of Address by John William Annesser, II (Annesser, John)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 CLERK'S NOTICE re 268 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing; hearing on #197 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong set in error; the only motions scheduled for this hearing are docket entries #262 , #263 , and #264 . (ps1)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #262 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine , #264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine , #197 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong , #263 MOTION in Limine: Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 4/20/2017. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Erika Stephanie Handelson, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Robert Bernstein. (Digital 15:02:08) (cg1)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER following an informal discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/20/2017. (mkr)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 4/20/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Pace, Christopher)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Defendant's MOTION in Limine by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Handelson, Erika)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION in Limine by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Annesser, John)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER on March 23, 2017, discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/18/2017. (tro)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting in part #258 Amended Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot #257 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have a two (2) week enlargement of time, from Tuesday, April 18, 2017, up through and including Tuesday, May 2, 2017, to file and serve their joint pre-trial stipulation, proposed jury instructions and verdict form. The deadline for motions in limine will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/14/2017. (wc)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE to Motion re #258 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's June 30, 2017 Scheduling Order re #23 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Judge, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,,, filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 4/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Handelson, Erika)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's June 30, 2017 Scheduling Order re #23 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Judge, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,,, by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 4/27/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's June 30, 2017 Scheduling Order re #23 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Judge, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,,, by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 4/27/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 REPLY to Response to Motion re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) as to Third-Party Defendants filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Mastrucci, Christina)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re #242 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #214 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Annesser, John)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REPLY to Response to Motion re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Handelson, Erika)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re #215 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike (Daubert) Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Expert with attached Exhibits filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Annesser, John)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts] Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibit 23 in Support of the Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23) (Mastrucci, Christina)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 4/20/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Chaiken, Brian)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 4/20/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Maugans, Michael)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 REPLY to Response to Motion re #197 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lomax, Christopher)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33) (Mastrucci, Christina)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying #240 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2017. (ps1)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Statement of: Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) re #242 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #204 Corrected SEALED MOTION Third-Party Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42)(Mastrucci, Christina)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE in Opposition re #204 Corrected SEALED MOTION Third-Party Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #242 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Mastrucci, Christina)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts], #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) filed by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Nunez, Rodolfo)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Responses due by 4/19/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #239 Motion for Leave to File Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Third-Party Defendants shall file re-file their combined motion for partial summary judgment by April 5, 2017. The summary judgment motion will be deemed filed as of March 22, 2017. This Order does not affect the deadline for filing responses to the summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/5/2017. (ps1)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #218 Order to District Court (Chaiken, Brian)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to File Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party James A. Bass(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party Henry Johnson(pty:3pd). (Nunez, Rodolfo)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts], #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) filed by Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 4/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 43, #2 Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit 45, #4 Exhibit 46, #5 Exhibit 47, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 49, #8 Exhibit 50, #9 Exhibit 51, #10 Exhibit 52, #11 Exhibit 53, #12 Exhibit 54, #13 Exhibit 55, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 57, #16 Exhibit 58, #17 Exhibit 59, #18 Exhibit 60, #19 Exhibit 61, #20 Exhibit 62, #21 Exhibit 63, #22 Exhibit 64, #23 Exhibit 65, #24 Exhibit 66, #25 Exhibit 67, #26 Exhibit 68, #27 Exhibit 69, #28 Exhibit 70, #29 Exhibit 71)(Chaiken, Brian)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re #214 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 4/11/2017. (Handelson, Erika)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Statement of: Material Facts in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #214 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55)(Handelson, Erika)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re #215 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike (Daubert) Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Expert with attached Exhibits filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Replies due by 4/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Pace, Christopher)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing Proceedings held on 3/23/2017 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-100 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(apz)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 4/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Annesser, John)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi OF HEARING on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Bad Faith Litigation Conduct); Judge Altonaga's Remand of the Deep River Venture Privileged Documents; and Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Spoliation) (Chaiken, Brian)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying #217 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/28/2017. (ps1)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/28/2017. Total time in court: 36 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT of discovery hearing held on 2-23-2017 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-29 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. (dwh)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re 220 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Notice of Filing Potential Exhibits for March 28, 2017 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Handelson, Erika)
March 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SUPPLEMENT to #217 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court On Magistrate Judge O'Sullivan's Ruling that document IH-00079768 Is A Privileged Communication by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IH Documents, #2 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, #3 Transcripts Excerpt of Darden Deposition, #4 Transcripts February 23, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #5 Transcripts March 9, 2017 Hearing Transcript)(Annesser, John)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #184 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. The matter is returned to Magistrate Judge OSullivan for clarification and further proceedings consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/24/2017. (ps1)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2017 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-55 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 561-514-3728 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 15:01:04.) Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017. (dmr)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Clerks Notice to Filer re #207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts]. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#222]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 CORRECTED PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #217 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court On Magistrate Judge O'Sullivan's Ruling that document IH-00079768 Is A Privileged Communication: Hearing set for 3/28/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Hearing on #217 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court On Magistrate Judge O'Sullivan's Ruling that document IH-00079768 Is A Privileged Communication: Hearing set for 2/28/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/24/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 11 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (cmz)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER on discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/24/2017. (mkr)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 3/23/2017. Total time in court: 2 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II. (Digital 14:34:51/15:48:54) (cg1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Statement of: Material Facts in support by Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version). See image at DE #207 (lk)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Plaintiff's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court On Magistrate Judge O'Sullivan's Ruling re DE #170 that document IH-00079768 Is A Privileged Communication (Annesser, John) Modified text/Added link on 3/24/2017 (lk).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER denying #167 Motion for Sanctions; denying #194 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2017. (ps1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike (Daubert) Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Expert with attached Exhibits by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 4/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chaiken, Brian)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 4/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41)(Chaiken, Brian)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 210 Order Denying #201 Motion to Seal (nc)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 209 Order Denying #199 Motion to Seal (nc)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 208 Order Denying #195 Motion to Seal (nc)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying #201 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (ps1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER denying #199 Motion. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (ps1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying #195 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (ps1)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment [Statement of Material Facts] by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Responses due by 4/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75)(Pace, Christopher)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Image Removed pursuant to 210 Order Denying #201 Motion to Seal (Main Document 206 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Image Removed pursuant to 210 Order Denying #201 Motion to Seal (Main Document 205 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Image Removed pursuant to 209 Order Denying #199 Motion to Seal (Main Document 204 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Responses due by 4/5/2017 (Mastrucci, Christina)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Image Removed pursuant to 210 Order Denying #201 Motion to Seal (Main Document 202 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pace, Christopher)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Image Removed pursuant to 209 Order Denying #199 Motion to Seal (Main Document 200 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to File Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Image Removed pursuant to 208 Order Denying #195 Motion to Seal (Main Document 198 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Pace, Christopher)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Image Removed pursuant to 208 Order Denying #195 Motion to Seal(Main Document 196 replaced on 3/23/2017) (nc). Modified docket text on 3/23/2017 (nc).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal (1)Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and (2) Daubert Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Experts with Attached Exhibits Pursuant to the Court's Order per Local Rule 5.4 by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chaiken, Brian)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Sanctions Based on Plaintiffs' and Third Party Defendants Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap and J.M. Products Inc.'s Spoliation of Evidence by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden(individually), IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Pace, Christopher)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/23/2017 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Lomax, Christopher)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting in part #186 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #187 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #188 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting in part and denying in part #189 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Pretrial and Daubert motions due by 3/22/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/21/2017. (ps1)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Clerks Notice to Filer re #183 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court . Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #184 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #183 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court to District Court, #183 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court: Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2017 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Statement of Material Facts by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mastrucci, Christina)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handelson, Erika)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Seal Temporarily Motions for Summary Judgment per Local Rule 5.4 by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Handelson, Erika)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's July 1, 2016 Trial Order and Motion to Exceed Page Limitations Regarding Evidentiary Issues by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 4/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/23/2017 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Maugans, Michael)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #183 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court to District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pace, Christopher)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Defendant's APPEAL of Magistrate Judge to District Court DE #170 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pace, Christopher) Modified/Added link to Order on 3/21/2017 (lk).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi OF SPECIAL SET HEARING (Chaiken, Brian)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/23/2017 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Maugans, Michael)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying #179 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/20/2017. (ps1)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants, Cherokee Investment Partners and IPH International, B.V. for Failure to Comply with Rule 30(b)(6) by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Chaiken, Brian)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 177 Paperless Order (nc)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #174 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions with Attachments per Local Rule 5.4 by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chaiken, Brian)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER on March 9, 2017 discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/16/2017. (mkr)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 175 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (817192)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 177 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (CMA)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lomax, Christopher)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing Proceedings held on 3/9/17 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-48 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(hh)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #138 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., denying the relief requested in #143 the Memorandum, filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/14/2017. (tro)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 3/14/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II and Robert Bernstein. (Digital 15:01:04) (cg1)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/14/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Lomax, Christopher)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions For Bad Faith Litigation Conduct by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Chaiken, Brian)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER setting hearing on #138 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., and setting hearing on #143 Memorandum, filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V.(Discovery Hearing set for 3/14/2017 at 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/9/2017. (tro)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 3/9/2017. (Digital 14:00:28) (cg1)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to #163 Order (nc)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying #160 Motion to Seal; striking 161 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/9/2017. (ps1)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/9/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Lomax, Christopher)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions with Attachments per Local Rule 5.4 by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chaiken, Brian)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/9/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Chaiken, Brian)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 161 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (817192)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Defendant's REPLY to #143 Memorandum, #153 Memorandum of Law on Communications with Deep River Ventures, LLC by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Handelson, Erika)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Defendant's REPLY to #151 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Relating to Attorney-Client Privileged Communications and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Lomax, Christopher)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing Proceedings held on 2/7/17 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-55 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(hh)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing Proceedings held on 2/9/17 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-50 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(hh)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 2/23/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Erika Stephanie Handelson, Christopher Martin Lomax, D. Porpoise Evans and Christopher Perre. (Digital 15:04:01/16:12:01) (cg1)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #143 Memorandum, by Andrea Rossi. (Chaiken, Brian)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER on informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/23/2017. (tro)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Protective Order by Andrea Rossi. (Chaiken, Brian)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/23/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Handelson, Erika)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER on February 21, 2017, informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/21/2017. (tro)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 2/21/2017. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, D. Porpoise Evans, Christopher Perre (Digital 10:50:40) (cg1)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER on February 9, 2017, informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/21/2017. (tro)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER on February 7, 2017, informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/21/2017. (tro)
February 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/23/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM of Law Regarding Communications With Deep River Ventures Protected by Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Doctrine by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden(individually), IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), John T. Vaughn(individually). (Maugans, Michael)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER that Third-Party Defendants, Fulvio Fabiani and United States Quantum Leap, LLC shall file answers to the Counterclaims [ECF No. 132] by February 21, 2017, or show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/16/2017. (wc)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Fulvio Fabiani response to counterclaims due 2/21/2017; United States Quantum Leap, LLC response to counterclaims due 2/21/2017. (See DE#142 .) (wc)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim Fourth Amended by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Chaiken, Brian)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying #138 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/15/2017. (ps1)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Protective Order by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Handelson, Erika)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/23/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 2/9/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour and 25 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Christopher Martin Lomax, Rodolfo Nunez, John William Annesser, II. (Digital 10:08:10) (cg1)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/9/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 2/7/2017. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Erika Stephanie Handelson, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Christopher Perre. (Digital 10:02:47/10:12:39) (cg1)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/9/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Pace, Christopher)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Fourth Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against J.M. Products, Inc., Fulvio Fabiani, Henry Johnson, James A. Bass, United States Quantum Leap, LLC, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Leonardo Corporation(a Florida corporation), Andrea Rossi(individually) by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., Thomas Darden, John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Pace, Christopher)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/7/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, as ordered by the Judge by 2/1/17. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/31/2017. (ps1)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pace, Christopher)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 2/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chaiken, Brian)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. Replies due by 2/6/2017. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Replies due by 2/6/2017. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE as to #124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims; Responses due by 1/30/2017; Replies due by noon on 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/30/2017. (ps1)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Errata 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER on discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/27/2017. (mkr)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn Notice of Filing Proposed Order on Discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pace, Christopher)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #118 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/17/2017. (wc)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #90 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count IV is DISMISSED as to Third-Party Defendants, J.M. Products, Inc.; Henry Johnson; James A. Bass; United States Quantum Leap, LLC; and Fulvio Fabiani. Count V is DISMISSED. Count III remains intact. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/17/2017. (wc)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #118 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Pretrial Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pace, Christopher)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Pretrial Deadlines by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Responses due by 1/27/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pace, Christopher)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Thomas Scott. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Scott, Thomas)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER on Informal Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/12/2017. (tro)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lomax, Christopher)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear at Mediation by Video. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/12/2017. (wc)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Video Appearance at Mediation . Attorney/Representative: Fulvio Fabiani by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2017 (Nunez, Rodolfo)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying #108 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2017. (ps1)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bernard P. Bell. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2017. (ps1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V filed by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Nunez, Rodolfo)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bernard P. Bell. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9388562 by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Attorney Erika Stephanie Handelson added to party Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erika Stephanie Handelson added to party Thomas Darden(pty:dft), Attorney Erika Stephanie Handelson added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Erika Stephanie Handelson added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erika Stephanie Handelson added to party John T. Vaughn(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/24/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Handelson, Erika)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Annesser, John)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 1/10/2017. Total time in court: 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, John William Annesser, II, Brian W. Chaiken, Erika Handelson, Christopher Perre. (Digital 10:05:32) (cg1)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of discovery hearing held on 1-5-2017 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-39 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (dwh)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defedants' Second Request for Production to Plaintiffs) (Pace, Christopher)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 1/5/2017. Total time in court: 43 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco J Leon de la Barra, Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, Rodolfo Nunez, Brian W. Chaiken, Erika Handelson. (Digital 14:00:42) (cg1)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/5/2017. (tro)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Hearings. Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (tro)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 1/5/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Third-Party Defendants J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, and James Bass' Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Request for Production, #2 Third Party Defendants, Fulvio Fabiani and United States Quantum Leap, LLC, Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Request for Production) (Pace, Christopher)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). Replies due by 1/10/2017. (Mastrucci, Christina)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #98 Renewed Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs' Answer #89 is accepted. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2016. (wc)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS INDUSTRIAL HEAT, LLC AND IPH INTERNATIONAL, B.V.S COUNTERCLAIM OUT OF TIME filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). Replies due by 1/4/2017. (Pace, Christopher)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS INDUSTRIAL HEAT, LLC AND IPH INTERNATIONAL, B.V.S COUNTERCLAIM OUT OF TIME by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT of discovery hearing held on 12-20-2016 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-43 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2017. (dwh)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying without prejudice #95 Motion for Leave to File due to the failure to provide a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS INDUSTRIAL HEAT, LLC AND IPH INTERNATIONAL, B.V.S COUNTERCLAIM OUT OF TIME by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Chaiken, Brian)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States Quantum Leap, LLC (Nunez, Rodolfo)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by J.M. Products, Inc. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 12/20/2016. Total time in court: 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christopher Rebel Jude Pace, Christopher Martin Lomax, Brian W. Chaiken, Christopher Perre. (Digital 15:01:04) (cg1)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., John T. Vaughn re #87 Notice of Hearing by Attorney Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing (Pace, Christopher)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2017 (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim by Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 10/14/16, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-60 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (smn)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 12/20/2016 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #75 Notice of Hearing by Attorney, Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Pace, Christopher)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re-setting Discovery Hearing. Hearing re-set for 12/6/2016 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan.) **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 12/6/2016. (tro)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 10/14/16, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-60 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (smn)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying as moot #69 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V filed by Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC, Fulvio Fabiani, James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/5/2016. (ps1)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to the Counterclaim. Plaintiffs have 7 days from the Court's order on Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to file their response. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/29/2016. (ps1)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, D.)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, D.)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, Defendants' Notice of Filing Third Amended Answer, Additonal Defenses, Counterclaims and Third Party Claims (Pace, Christopher)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Third Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM and Third Party Claims against James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, Leonardo Corporation, Fabio Penon, Andrea Rossi, United States Quantum Leap, LLC by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., Thomas Darden, John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Pace, Christopher)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V filed by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/16/2016. (ps1) Modified on 12/5/2016 to correct docket text (ps1).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 12/6/2016 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Request for Production to Plaintiffs) (Pace, Christopher)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER on informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/8/2016. (tro)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:3pp), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:3pp), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:3pp), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:3pp). Replies due by 11/17/2016. (Mastrucci, Christina)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COUNTERLCAIMS by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 10/27/2016. John Annesser and Ryan Chaiken/plaintiffs; Christopher Pace and Christopher Lomax/defendants. (Digital 14:51:20.) (cg1)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/27/2016 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Annesser, John)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III, IV, and V by James A. Bass, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:cc), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:cc). Replies due by 10/27/2016. (Mastrucci, Christina)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #54 Motion to Strike;Please see order for details. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/14/2016. (ps1)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2016 re #54 MOTION to Strike #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, in Part Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third Party Claims, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi ; Status Conference re service of third-party complaint held on 10/14/2016. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov (cmz)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 10/14/2016. (mkr)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lomax, Christopher)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Strike #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, in Part Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third Party Claims, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. (Annesser, John)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying #60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Combined motion to dismiss due by 10/20/2016. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/13/2016. (ps1)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts III and IV by James A. Bass, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson. Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party James A. Bass(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party Henry Johnson(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party Henry Johnson(pty:cd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party Henry Johnson(pty:3pd), Attorney Francisco J Leon de la Barra added to party Henry Johnson(pty:3pd). Responses due by 10/28/2016 (Leon de la Barra, Francisco)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Third Party MOTION TO DISMISS #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts IV and V by Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Responses due by 10/28/2016 (Nunez, Rodolfo)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Strike #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, in Part Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third Party Claims, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Thomas Darden(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci added to party John T. Vaughn(pty:dft). Replies due by 10/20/2016. (Mastrucci, Christina)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: Status Conference, re: service of Third Party Complaint reset for 10/14/2016 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference, re: service of Third Party Complaint, set for 10/7/2016 12:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Annesser, John)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #54 MOTION to Strike #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, in Part Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third Party Claims, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement: Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2016 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Strike #50 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, in Part Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third Party Claims, or in the Alternative,, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Annesser, John)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rodolfo Nunez on behalf of Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party Fulvio Fabiani(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party Fulvio Fabiani(pty:cd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party Fulvio Fabiani(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party Fulvio Fabiani(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party United States Quantum Leap, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party United States Quantum Leap, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party United States Quantum Leap, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Rodolfo Nunez added to party United States Quantum Leap, LLC(pty:cd). (Attachments: #1 Certification Waiver of Service) (Nunez, Rodolfo)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney John W. Annesser, Brian W. Chaiken, D. Porpoise Evans, and Paul D. Turner added for Plaintiff; the Silver Law Group relieved of further responsibility. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/20/2016. (ps1)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Attorney Patricia Merle Silver terminated. (ps1)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Brian W. Chaiken, Esq. for Michael J. Healy, Esq. by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Annesser, John)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Second Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Fulvio Fabiani, United States Quantum Leap, LLC, J.M. Products, Inc., Fabio Penon, Henry Johnson, James A. Bass, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., Thomas Darden, John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Pace, Christopher)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count I of the Complaint filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, IPH International B.V. (Pace, Christopher)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 8/30/16 before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-44 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(hh)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; denying as moot #39 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #39 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying as moot #41 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/16/2016. (wc)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #39 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses MOTION for More Definite Statement , #41 MOTION to Dismiss #30 Answer to Complaint,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, and Memorandum of Law by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Additional Defenses, Counterclaims and Third Party Claims by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -)(Pace, Christopher)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count I of the Complaint filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 9/19/2016. (Annesser, John)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count I of the Complaint by IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC. (Pace, Christopher)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER on informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 9/2/2016. (tro)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss #30 Answer to Complaint,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, and Memorandum of Law by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 9/19/2016 (Annesser, John)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #39 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses MOTION for More Definite Statement: Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2016 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Responses due by 9/16/2016 (Annesser, John)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 8/30/2016. John Annesser, Ryan Chaiken and Porpoise Evans for plaintiff; Christopher Pace and Christopher Lomax for defendants and Francisco Leon De La Barra for third-party defendants. (Digital 11:01:25.) (cg1)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 8/30/2016 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (Annesser, John)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fernando S. Aran on behalf of J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. Attorney Fernando S. Aran added to party J.M. Products, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Fernando S. Aran added to party Henry Johnson(pty:3pd), Attorney Fernando S. Aran added to party United States Quantum Leap, LLC(pty:3pd). (Attachments: #1 Third Party Waiver) (Aran, Fernando)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Porpoise Evans on behalf of Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Attorney D. Porpoise Evans added to party Leonardo Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney D. Porpoise Evans added to party Andrea Rossi(pty:pla). (Evans, D.)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Dewey Turner on behalf of Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Attorney Paul Dewey Turner added to party Leonardo Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Dewey Turner added to party Andrea Rossi(pty:pla). (Turner, Paul)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian W. Chaiken on behalf of Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Attorney Brian W. Chaiken added to party Leonardo Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Brian W. Chaiken added to party Andrea Rossi(pty:pla). (Chaiken, Brian)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., Henry Johnson, Fabio Penon, United States Quantum Leap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(lk)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) re #30 Answer to Complaint,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, filed by Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s)) (Pace, Christopher)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against United States Quantum Leap, LLC, Fabio Penon, Fulvio Fabiani, Henry Johnson, J.M. Products, Inc., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, IPH International B.V., Thomas Darden, John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Pace, Christopher)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Henry Johnson, Fabio Penon, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., United States Quantum Leap, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Henry Johnson, Fabio Penon, Fulvio Fabiani, J.M. Products, Inc., United States Quantum Leap, LLC by IPH International B.V., Thomas Darden, Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, John T. Vaughn, Industrial Heat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Summon(s) Fabio Penon, #27 Summon(s) Fulvio Fabiana, #28 Summon(s) Henry Johnson, #29 Summon(s) J.M. Products, #30 Summon(s) United States Quantum Leap, LLC)(Pace, Christopher)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendants have up to and including August 5, 2016 to file their answer and any counterclaims. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/28/2016. (wc)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Thomas E. Scott. Mediation Hearing set for 1/12/2017 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of the mediation is due within seven (7) days after the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/26/2016. (wc)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that by July 26, 2016, the parties shall select a mediator pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, schedule a time, date, and place for mediation, and jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2016. (wc)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counts II, V, VII, and VIII are DISMISSED without prejudice. All other counts remain intact. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/19/2016. (wc)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Jury Trial set for period of 6/26/2017 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 6/20/2017 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 8/11/2016. All discovery due by 2/27/2017. Proposed order scheduling mediation due by 7/21/2016. Mediation Deadline 3/13/2017. In Limine Motions due by 4/18/2017. All pretrial motions due by 3/21/2017. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/18/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/30/2016. (ps1)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi (Annesser, John)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn identifying Corporate Parent IH Holdings International Limited for Industrial Heat, LLC; Corporate Parent IPHBV Holdings Limited for IPH International B.V. (Lomax, Christopher)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Election to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions)(Lomax, Christopher)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC, John T. Vaughn. Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax added to party John T. Vaughn(pty:dft). (Lomax, Christopher)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (Annesser, John)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V., Industrial Heat, LLC. and John T. Vaugh. Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax added to party Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax added to party Thomas Darden(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax added to party IPH International B.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax added to party Industrial Heat, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Lomax, Christopher) Modified text on 6/3/2016 (lk).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of interested parties by 6/30/2016. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/18/2016. (ps1)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 14 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Answer Due Deadline: Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC response due 6/12/2016; Thomas Darden response due 6/12/2016; IPH International B.V. response due 6/12/2016; Industrial Heat, LLC response due 6/12/2016; John T. Vaughn response due 6/12/2016. (asl)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrea Rossi, Leonardo Corporation. Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2016, answer due 6/12/2016; Thomas Darden waiver sent on 4/13/2016, answer due 6/12/2016; IPH International B.V. waiver sent on 4/13/2016, answer due 6/12/2016; Industrial Heat, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2016, answer due 6/12/2016; John T. Vaughn waiver sent on 4/13/2016, answer due 6/12/2016. See #13 -1 for image (asl) Modified answer due date on 4/18/2016 (asl).
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi of Filing Waiver of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Waiver of Service of Summons) (Annesser, John) Modified to re-docket, see 14 on 4/18/2016 (asl).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (vp)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. Case re-categorized as PATENT case and reassigned to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings. Senior Judge James Lawrence King no longer assigned to case (vp)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John T. Vaughn. (tpl)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Thomas Darden. (tpl)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Industrial Heat, LLC. (tpl)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to IPH International B.V.. (tpl)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC. (tpl)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Leonardo Corporation, Andrea Rossi re #1 Complaint, filed by Andrea Rossi (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Darden, #2 Summon(s) Vaughn, #3 Summon(s) Industrial Heat, #4 Summon(s) IPH Int'l, #5 Summon(s) Cherokee) (Annesser, John)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Please use Form AO 440 for summons(es) to be processed. (bb)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King (bb)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8624030, filed by Andrea Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #6 Summon(s) Darden, #7 Summon(s) Vaughn, #8 Summon(s) Industrial Heat, #9 Summon(s) IPH Int'l, #10 Summon(s) Cherokee)(Annesser, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossi et al v. Darden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Darden
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Represented By: Michael Alexander Maugans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPH International B.V.
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Represented By: Michael Alexander Maugans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Andrea Rossi
Represented By: Patricia Merle Silver
Represented By: John William Annesser, II
Represented By: Brian W. Chaiken
Represented By: D. Porpoise Evans
Represented By: Paul Dewey Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Leonardo Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Merle Silver
Represented By: John William Annesser, II
Represented By: Brian W. Chaiken
Represented By: D. Porpoise Evans
Represented By: Paul Dewey Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Henry Johnson
Represented By: Francisco J Leon de la Barra
Represented By: Fernando S. Aran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fabio Penon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fulvio Fabiani
Represented By: Rodolfo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: J.M. Products, Inc.
Represented By: Francisco J Leon de la Barra
Represented By: Fernando S. Aran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: United States Quantum Leap, LLC
Represented By: Rodolfo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: John T. Vaughn
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Industrial Heat, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James A. Bass
Represented By: Francisco J Leon de la Barra
Represented By: Rodolfo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?