Martinair Holland, N.V. v. BENIHANA, INC.
Plaintiff: Martinair Holland, N.V.
Defendant: BENIHANA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2017cv20163
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Darrin P. Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Adopting 66 Report and Recommendations on 38 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by BENIHANA, INC. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Defendant Benihana, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinair Holland, N.V. v. BENIHANA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinair Holland, N.V.
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENIHANA, INC.
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Represented By: James J Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?