Miami Kolux, LLC v. Lexington Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Miami Kolux, LLC
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv24333
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2018 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal by Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Salmon, Joshua)
December 13, 2017 12 Featured Case Order Administratively Closing Case. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/13/2017. (wc) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
December 12, 2017 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Lexington Insurance Company (Salmon, Joshua)
December 8, 2017 10 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Response to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint by 12/12/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/8/2017. (jas)
December 8, 2017 9 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Removal Status Report by Lexington Insurance Company (Salmon, Joshua)
December 8, 2017 8 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant Lexington Insurance Company shall file its response to the Complaint by December 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/8/2017. (wc)
December 6, 2017 7 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company Declaration of Joshua Salmon Regarding Plaintiff's Members' Citizenship (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's Sunbiz Profile Page) (Salmon, Joshua)
December 6, 2017 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Michael Salmon on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Salmon, Joshua)
December 1, 2017 Set Deadlines per #4 Order. Amended Complaint due by 12/6/2017. (asl)
December 1, 2017 5 Featured Case Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of interested parties by 12/13/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2017. (ps1)
December 1, 2017 4 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant, Lexington Insurance Company, shall file an amended complaint or declaration containing the names and citizenship of each of Plaintiff's members no later than December 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2017. (ps1)
December 1, 2017 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2017. (ps1)
November 30, 2017 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) Modified date on 12/4/2017 (vjk).
November 30, 2017 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10224861, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "1" Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit "2" Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit "3" Declaration in Support of Removal, #5 Exhibit "4" Request for Production, #6 Exhibit "5" Request for Admissions, #7 Exhibit "6" Notice of Appearance, #8 Exhibit "7" Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Process, #9 Exhibit "8" Notice to State Court)(Sims, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miami Kolux, LLC v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Kolux, LLC
Represented By: Vyacheslav Borshchukov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salmon
Represented By: Melissa M. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?