In Re MTS Bank
Defendant: Sky Ocean International, Inc., Alexander Pleshakov and Alexander Krinichanskiy
Case Number: 1:2017mc21545
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 72 Kara Burkut's Motion for Sanctions; granting 73 Kara Burkut's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (js02)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 39 MTS Bank's Motion for a Jurisdictional Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (js02)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 42 MTS Bank's Motion to Join an Additional Party Applicant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/27/2018. (js02)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/1/2017. (js02)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Quash; denying 11 Motion to Vacate; denying 11 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/25/2017. (js02)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re MTS Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Ocean International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Pleshakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Krinichanskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?