NLG, LLC v. Hazan

Appellant: NLG, LLC
Appellee: Liza Hazan
Case Number: 1:2018cv22564
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
0 Judge: Darrin P Gayles
1 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2018 31 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Plaintiff NLG, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Initial Brief on Appeal. NLG shall file its initial brief on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/24/2018. (hmo)
August 24, 2018 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to file initial brief on appeal re 10 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by NLG, LLC. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 13, 2018 29 NOTICE by Liza Hazan re #28 Response in Support of Motion, Corrected Exhibit "C" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grant, Joey)
August 13, 2018 28 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Memorandum of Law filed by Liza Hazan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Grant, Joey)
August 7, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 8/7/2018. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
August 7, 2018 26 NOTICE by Liza Hazan re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, Amended (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Grant, Joey)
August 7, 2018 25 NOTICE by Liza Hazan re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Grant, Joey)
August 7, 2018 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal filed by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 6, 2018 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal Secured Creditor's 6913 Valencia, LLC, Objection to Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending appeal and Memorandum of Law filed by 6913 Valencia, LLC. Attorney Michael William Simon added to party 6913 Valencia, LLC(pty:cr). Replies due by 8/13/2018. (Simon, Michael)
August 6, 2018 22 NOTICE by Liza Hazan re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Grant, Joey)
August 6, 2018 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Memorandum of Law filed by NLG, LLC. Replies due by 8/13/2018. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 6, 2018 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal filed by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 3, 2018 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal filed by Liza Hazan. Replies due by 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Grant, Joey)
August 3, 2018 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal filed by Liza Hazan. Replies due by 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Grant, Joey)
August 1, 2018 17 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #12 and #13 Appellant's motions to expedite briefing on #11 its motion to stay. Appellee shall respond to the motion to stay by August 3, 2018. Appellant may file a reply by 5:00 p.m. on August 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/1/2018. (eft)
July 27, 2018 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Expedite Relief on Motion for Stay of Confirmation Order Pending Appeal [ECF No. 11] filed by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 26, 2018 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Expedite Relief on Motion for Stay of Confirmation Order Pending Appeal [ECF No. 11] filed by Liza Hazan. Replies due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grant, Joey)
July 26, 2018 14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Expedite Relief on Motion for Stay of Confirmation Order Pending Appeal [ECF No. 11] by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 26, 2018 13 NOTICE of Striking #12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Expedite Relief on Motion for Stay of Confirmation Oder Pending Appeal ECF No. 11 filed by NLG, LLC by NLG, LLC (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 26, 2018 12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Expedite Relief on Motion for Stay of Confirmation Oder Pending Appeal ECF No. 11 by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 26, 2018 11 MOTION to Stay Confirmation Order Pending Appeal by NLG, LLC. Responses due by 8/9/2018 (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 25, 2018 10 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/24/2018. (jc)
July 25, 2018 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/30/18 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-13 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2018. (dcn)
July 25, 2018 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/8/18 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-23 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2018. (dcn)
July 25, 2018 7 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by NLG, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's List of Designated Items, #3 Appellant's Designation [Part 1- ECF #1-#542], #4 Appellant's Designation [Part 2- ECF #543 - #569], #5 Appellant's Designation [Part 3- ECF #578- #635], #6 Appellant's Designation [Part 4- ECF #636 -#642], #7 Appellant's Designation [Part 5- ECF #643 -#711], #8 Appellee's List of Designated Items, #9 Appellee's Designated Items from Case 16-10389-AJC, #10 Appellee's Designated Items from Case 16-1439-AJC [Part 1- ECF #10-77], #11 Appellee's Designated Items from Case 16-1439-AJC [Part 2- ECF #138 -239], #12 CLAIM #17)(dcn)
July 23, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Memorandum of Law by Liza Hazan. Attorney Joey Michael Grant added to party Liza Hazan(pty:inre). Responses due by 8/6/2018 (Grant, Joey)
July 10, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Maurice Aresty on behalf of Liza Hazan. Attorney Joel Maurice Aresty added to party Liza Hazan(pty:inre). (Aresty, Joel)
June 26, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
June 26, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
June 26, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by NLG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
June 26, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 16-10389, filed by NLG, LLC..(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NLG, LLC v. Hazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NLG, LLC
Represented By: Juan Ramirez, Jr.
Represented By: Astrid Evelyn Gabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liza Hazan
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Represented By: Joey Michael Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?