Shapiro v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Shapiro
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv22570
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/29/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018., All Discovery due by 1/18/2019., Expert Discovery due by 1/18/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2019., All pretrial Motions due by 4/15/2019., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/8/2019., Calendar Call set for 5/23/2019 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Jury Trial set for 5/28/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Deborah Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 28 U.S.C. s. 636(c) Form)(Kerns, Mason)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Alcivar, Natasha)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Natasha K. Alcivar added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Alcivar, Natasha)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Deborah Shapiro (Kerns, Mason)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (lbc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lbc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10768004, filed by Deborah Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Kerns, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Shapiro
Represented By: Mason Kyle Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?