Narducci v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Albert Cosmo Narducci
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv22814
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:45 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Calendar Call set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor. Discovery due by 10/2/2019. Motions due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Probst, Bryan)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (mc)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10814583, filed by Albert Cosmo Narducci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gurian, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narducci v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Cosmo Narducci
Represented By: Michelle Yariz Gurian
Represented By: Keith Steven Brais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?