Marvi Builders, LLC v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Plaintiff: Marvi Builders, LLC
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv22818
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Marvi Builders, LLC. Replies due by 8/28/2018. (Colon, Yvette)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance by Marvi Builders, LLC re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Colon, Yvette)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Attorney Nestor Bustamante, III added to party The Guarantee Company of North America USA(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bustamante, Nestor)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline The Guarantee Company of North America USA served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (see image DE [6) ) (vmz) Modified on 8/2/2018 (vmz).
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Marvi Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon, Yvette)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (lh)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet, and Summon. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lh)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-10813300, payment transferred from : 18cv22807 Marvi Builders, LLC v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed by Marvi Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon, Yvette) #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s)) (lh). Modified to properly arrange documents on 7/13/2018 (lh). Modified text on 7/19/2018 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvi Builders, LLC v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvi Builders, LLC
Represented By: Yvette Lisa Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Nestor Bustamante, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?