Hazan et al v. NLG, LLC

Plaintiff: Selective Advisors Group, LLC and Liza Hazan
Defendant: NLG, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv23062
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 20 NOTICE by NLG, LLC re #19 Renewed MOTION to Expedite (Gabbe, Astrid)
September 21, 2018 19 Renewed MOTION to Expedite by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
September 19, 2018 18 REPLY to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion by Liza Hazan, Selective Advisors Group, LLC. (Grant, Joey)
September 11, 2018 17 NOTICE by NLG, LLC (Gabbe, Astrid)
September 11, 2018 16 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of motion to dismiss by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/11/2018. (dpa)
September 4, 2018 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #10 MOTION to Expedite by Liza Hazan, Selective Advisors Group, LLC. Attorney Joey Michael Grant added to party Liza Hazan(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike)(Grant, Joey)
August 29, 2018 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #10 MOTION to Expedite filed by NLG, LLC. Replies due by 9/5/2018. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 28, 2018 13 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Withdraw Reference by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 27, 2018 12 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #10 MOTION to Expedite by Liza Hazan, Selective Advisors Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2018 (Grant, Joey)
August 26, 2018 11 MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply with Respect to Motion to Withdraw the Reference by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 24, 2018 10 MOTION to Expedite by NLG, LLC. (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 23, 2018 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NLG, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Affidavit)(Gabbe, Astrid)
August 21, 2018 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by NLG, LLC (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 17, 2018 7 RESPONSE to #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference in Opposition by Selective Advisors Group, LLC. (Grant, Joey)
August 3, 2018 6 SUPPLEMENTAL Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record by Respondent to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by NLG, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Respondent's Designation)(dcn)
July 27, 2018 5 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
July 27, 2018 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
July 27, 2018 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Plaintiff's Objection, #3 Defendant's Reply) [**SUPPLEMENTED TO INCLUDE ECF #272 AND #274, Omitted from Original Transmittal**](dcn)
July 27, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by NLG, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Movant's Designation)(dcn)
July 27, 2018 1 MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 16-1439-AJC., filed by NLG, LLC.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazan et al v. NLG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NLG, LLC
Represented By: Astrid Evelyn Gabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Advisors Group, LLC
Represented By: David William Langley
Represented By: Joey Michael Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Hazan
Represented By: David William Langley
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Represented By: Joey Michael Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?