Herssein v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Reuven Herssein
Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc. and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv23351
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Reuven Herssein (Udell, Maury)
September 24, 2018 Civil Case Terminated, per #24 Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Closing Case. (ps1)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth L. McKeen, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 10/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William K. Pao, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 10/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing as a result of noncompliance with LR 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys as follows: Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing as a result of noncompliance with LR 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys as follows: Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William K. Pao, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11008425 by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 10/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth L. McKeen, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11008313 by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 10/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America Corporation (Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabrielle L. Gonzalez on behalf of Bank of America Corporation. Attorney Gabrielle L. Gonzalez added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft). (Gonzalez, Gabrielle)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties by Reuven Herssein (Udell, Maury)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants, Bank of America Corporation and Visa U.S.A. shall submit a single, combined response or separate answers by September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Bank of America Corporation response due 9/24/2018; Visa U.S.A., Inc. response due 9/24/2018. (ps1)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint by Visa U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Jaime Augusto Bianchi added to party Visa U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bianchi, Jaime)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Defendants, Bank of America Corporation and Visa U.S.A. shall submit a single, combined response or separate answers by September 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Reuven Herssein. Bank of America Corporation served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Udell, Maury)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Reuven Herssein. Visa U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Udell, Maury)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Reuven Herssein.(Udell, Maury)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff, Reuven Herrsein, shall file an amended complaint clarifying the citizenship of Defendants, Bank of America Corporation and Visa USA, Inc., no later than August 24, 2018. Failure to do so will result in a dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Visa U.S.A., Inc. (pes)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, Visa U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10917504, filed by Reuven Herssein. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) bank of america summons, #2 Summon(s) visa summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Udell, Maury)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herssein v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Augusto Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Gabrielle L. Gonzalez
Represented By: William K. Pao
Represented By: Elizabeth L. McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuven Herssein
Represented By: Maury Lorne Udell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?