Adderley v. Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David L Adderley and David Lawrence Adderley
Defendant: James W Gilley, Roy Hunt, Jr. and Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23362
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS #18 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by James W Gilley, Roy Hunt, Jr., Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2018 (Robin, Raymond)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 25, 2018 Reset Deadlines James W Gilley answer due 10/9/2018; Roy Hunt, Jr. answer due 10/9/2018; Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. answer due 10/9/2018 Per DE#193. (cqs)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #17 the parties' joint motion for clarification. The Defendants are required to file only a response to the #18 Plaintiff's amended complaint, and must do so on or before October 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/25/2018. (vgn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David L Adderley.(Zelmer, Diane)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for clarification 14 Order,,,, as to Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by James W Gilley, Roy Hunt, Jr., Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.. Attorney Raymond Leonard Robin added to party James W Gilley(pty:dft), Attorney Raymond Leonard Robin added to party Roy Hunt, Jr.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robin, Raymond)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, return of service affidavit of Summons & Complaint upon Roy Hunt, Jr., filed by David L Adderley. (Zelmer, Diane)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, acceptance of service of Summons and Complaint on James Gilley by his Counsel, filed by David L Adderley. (Zelmer, Diane)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court strikes #12 the parties' stipulation regarding the deadline for the Defendants to file a response in this action. Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12 and 15 set forth the deadlines to serve a responsive pleading, and the parties may not amend these deadlines without leave from the Court. If the parties agree upon the relief sought, they may file a joint motion expressing their position for the Court's consideration on or before September 21, 2018. Moreover, the parties' stipulation indicates that all of the Defendants' seek clarification as to their deadline to file their response, but there is no evidence in the record that Defendants Roy Hunt, Jr. and James W. Gilley have been served and no attorney has appeared on their behalf. If Defendants Hunt and Gilley have been served, then the Plaintiff must file proof of service as to these defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(l) on or before September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/17/2018. (vgn)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 , #11 counsel's motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Timothy W. Ridley and M. Gregory Simpson are given permission to appear and participate in this matter as counsel on behalf of Defendant Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/17/2018. (vgn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, by Plaintiff, by Defendants, Roy Hunt, Jr., James W. Gilley, by Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. (Robin, Raymond)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Gregory Simpson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10995661 by Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Robin, Raymond)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Timothy W. Ridley. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10995618 by Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.. Attorney Raymond Leonard Robin added to party Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Robin, Raymond)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #8 the Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file his amended complaint. The Plaintiff must file his amended complaint in compliance with this Court's #4 order on or before September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/12/2018. (vgn)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, by David L Adderley. Responses due by 9/21/2018 (Zelmer, Diane)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered & Incorrect Defendant entered ; ERROR - The incorrect service date and incorrect defedant was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 6 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by David L Adderley. Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. See DE #5 for image. (kpe)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by David L Adderley. David L Adderley served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Zelmer, Diane)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Amended Complaint, ( Amended Complaint due by 9/14/2018.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James W Gilley, Roy Hunt, Jr., Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. (pes)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David L Adderley. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10919073, filed by David L Adderley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summon(s) 3ABN, #12 Summon(s) Hunt, Jr., #13 Summon(s) Gilley)(Zelmer, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adderley v. Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Adderley
Represented By: Glen Matthew Lindsay
Represented By: Diane J. Zelmer
Represented By: Ross D Kulberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Adderley
Represented By: Glen Matthew Lindsay
Represented By: Diane J. Zelmer
Represented By: Ross D Kulberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Gilley
Represented By: Raymond Leonard Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Hunt, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond Leonard Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Angels Broadcasting Network, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Leonard Robin
Represented By: M. Gregory Simpson
Represented By: Timothy Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?