Jane Doe (T.C.) v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe (T.C.)
Defendant: Canyon Ranch Institute, Celebrity Cruises, Inc. and CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv23398
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/2/2018 Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles for Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz) Modified Text on 10/12/2018 (vmz).
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (Jarnagin, Walter)
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe (T.C.). CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC, Canyon Ranch Institute, Celebrity Cruises, Inc., filed by Jane Doe (T.C.).(Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard James McAlpin on behalf of CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC, Canyon Ranch Institute, Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Richard James McAlpin added to party CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard James McAlpin added to party Canyon Ranch Institute(pty:dft), Attorney Richard James McAlpin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (McAlpin, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #13 Amended Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant Celebrity's Response/Answer now due 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/18/2018. (EGT)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 Amended Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Walter Cooper Jarnagin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Jarnagin, Walter)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC. (vmz)
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (Amended Summons) by Jane Doe (T.C.) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re DE #14 : Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Multiple Parties on Summons. (vmz)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jane Doe (T.C.) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Canyon Ranch Institute, Celebrity Cruises, Inc., CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC, filed by Jane Doe (T.C.).(Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 11, 2018 Attorney James Madison Walker terminated per Order DE# 10 . (lh)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline Garcell on behalf of Jane Doe (T.C.). Attorney Jacqueline Garcell added to party Jane Doe (T.C.)(pty:pla). (Garcell, Jacqueline)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Robert Margulies on behalf of Jane Doe (T.C.). Attorney Jason Robert Margulies added to party Jane Doe (T.C.)(pty:pla). (Margulies, Jason)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER ON THE STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the firm of WALKER & ONEILL, P.A. is permitted to withdraw as counsel for the Plaintiff, JANE DOE (T.C.) and that the firm of LIPCON, MARGULIES, ALSINA & WINKLEMAN,P.A. shall be substituted as counsel for the Plaintiff, JANE DOE (T.C.) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/10/2018. (jws)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Jane Doe (T.C.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Jane Doe (T.C.). Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Walker, James)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (asl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe (T.C.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, James)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall adhere to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures, and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures are available at the Court's website: # http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/22/2018. (jws)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Canyon Ranch Institute, Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (lh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Request for Jury Trial against Canyon Ranch Institute d/b/a Canyon Ranch Spa and/or Canyon Ranch, Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10927667, filed by Jane Doe (T.C.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Celebrity Cruises, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Canyon Ranch)(Walker, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe (T.C.) v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Ranch Institute
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Represented By: Walter Cooper Jarnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR SpaClub at Sea, LLC
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe (T.C.)
Represented By: James Madison Walker
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?