Ukleba v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lidia Ukleba
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23437
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Applin, Nicholas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Lidia Ukleba. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Chase, Brandon)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Upcoming Deadline to Serve Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (mc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10935861, filed by Lidia Ukleba. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Chase, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ukleba v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Ukleba
Represented By: Brandon L Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?