Harvey v. Figueroa et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Harvey and Jose Lothario Harvey
Defendant: M.D. Alexis Figueroa, N.P. Lurita and M.D. Denis A. Vilchez
Case Number: 1:2018cv23515
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/28/2018. (br)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 8:18-cv-02394, filed 09/27/2018. (bb)
September 27, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:18-cv-23515 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (kpe)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983; denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Adopting #4 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk is directed to close this case and take all necessary steps to ensure the prompt transfer of the action to the United State District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE TRANSFER TO CORRECT VENUE on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jose Lothario Harvey; Recommending that the case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, at which time the court there may wish to have the Plaintiff amend to state a cogent claim for relief, along with requiring the payment of the Clerks filing fee or the filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Harvey. (pes)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Alexis Figueroa, Lurita, Denis A. Vilchez. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Joseph Harvey.(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Alexis Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.P. Lurita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Denis A. Vilchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lothario Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?