Ho v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD

Plaintiff: Jerry Ho
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23541
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
0 Judge: Marcia G Cooke
1 Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Jerry Ho. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Naughton, Clay)
October 9, 2018 11 First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. Responses due by 10/23/2018 (Florez, George)
October 4, 2018 10 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due on or before October 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/4/2018. (ecz)
October 3, 2018 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Sebastian Florez on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. Attorney George Sebastian Florez added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.(pty:dft). (Florez, George)
October 3, 2018 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kassandra Cecilia Doyle Taylor on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. Attorney Kassandra Cecilia Doyle Taylor added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.(pty:dft). (Taylor, Kassandra)
October 1, 2018 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. Attorney Richard James McAlpin added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.(pty:dft). (McAlpin, Richard)
September 27, 2018 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Jerry Ho. Jerry Ho served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service)(Naughton, Clay)
August 30, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
August 30, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. (ail)
August 30, 2018 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ail)
August 29, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
August 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Ho. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10953693, filed by Jerry Ho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Naughton, Clay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.
Represented By: Kassandra Cecilia Doyle Taylor
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Represented By: George Sebastian Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Ho
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Clay Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?