Khomutetsky v. Celebrity Cruises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Khomutetsky
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc. and Out Island Charters
Case Number: 1:2018cv23555
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #10 Amended Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Eugene Khomutetsky. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Parrish, Philip)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Parties by Eugene Khomutetsky, CareFirst Blue Cross Blue Shield identifying Other Affiliate CareFirst Blue Cross Blue Shield for Eugene Khomutetsky (Waks, Andrew)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two week period beginning 9/3/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 8/27/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Proposed order scheduling mediation, in Word format via email, due by 11/13/18; Mediation Deadline 5/13/2019. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Noah)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Dixon Parrish on behalf of Eugene Khomutetsky. Attorney Philip Dixon Parrish added to party Eugene Khomutetsky(pty:pla). (Parrish, Philip)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties by Eugene Khomutetsky, The Rawlings Company identifying Other Affiliate The Rawlings Company for Eugene Khomutetsky (Waks, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #10 Amended Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Silverman, Noah)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #10 Amended Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Attorney Noah Daniel Silverman added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cruise/Cruisetour Ticket Contract, #2 Exhibit B Shore Excursion Ticket, #3 Exhibit C Cruise Shore Excursions)(Silverman, Noah)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Foreman on behalf of Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey Eric Foreman added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc.(pty:dft). (Foreman, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Eugene Khomutetsky. Celebrity Cruises Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Waks, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises Inc., filed by Eugene Khomutetsky.(Waks, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 9/7/2018. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew L. Waks, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (wfy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2018 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Re-Set Status Conference Hearing of 9-7-2018 re 4 Notice re Hearing by Eugene Khomutetsky. Responses due by 9/19/2018 (Waks, Andrew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc., Out Island Charters. (pes)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/7/2018 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Eugene Khomutetsky (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Waks, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises Inc., Out Island Charters. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10956709, filed by Eugene Khomutetsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waks, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khomutetsky v. Celebrity Cruises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Foreman
Represented By: Noah Daniel Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Out Island Charters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Khomutetsky
Represented By: Andrew L. Waks
Represented By: Philip Dixon Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?