U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC and Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Antoine Acosta
Case Number: 1:2018cv23573
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RESETTING PLANNING & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2018 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Replies due by 11/1/2018. (Martinez, Ana)
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #20 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 21 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (See DE# [20-1} for image). (jas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Antoine Acosta of Filing Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Return of Service) (Smith, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc.. (jas)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Antoine Acosta (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Smith, Kevin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Antoine Acosta re #16 Order to Show Cause of Filing Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Smith, Kevin)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RESETTING PLANNING & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference re-set for 11/2/2018 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order : Proposed Joint Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit : Joint Plan for Discovery of ESI)(Martinez, Ana)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim by Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 10/25/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perez, Diane)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC of No Opposition by Plaintiff Re: Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 9) (Perez, Diane)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perez, Diane)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diane Patricia Perez on behalf of Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC. Attorney Diane Patricia Perez added to party Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Perez, Diane)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Martinez, Ana)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene as of Right of Right as Party Plaintiff by Antoine Acosta. Attorney Kevin David Smith added to party Antoine Acosta(pty:intvp). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervenor Complaint)(Smith, Kevin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Martinez, Ana)
September 6, 2018 Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. As per D.E. #4 . (ra)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCH EDULING CONFERENCE, Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
September 6, 2018 Setting -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/12/2018 as per D.E. #4 . (ra)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc., Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC. (jas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Martinez, Ana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Kristen M. Foslid
Represented By: Ana Consuelo Martinez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Diversified Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Diane Patricia Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Diversified Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Antoine Acosta
Represented By: Kevin David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?