Smith et al v. Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith, Etienne Pierre and Willie Washington
Defendant: Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc. and First Transit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23610
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by First Transit, Inc., Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc.. Replies due by 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Reid, Benjamine)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants' response due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/10/2018. (kmh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes pursuant to DE 13. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (vjk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL) by First Transit, Inc., Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court File - Part 1 of 5, #2 State Court File - Part 2 of 5, #3 State Court File - Part 3 of 5, #4 State Court File - Part 4 of 5, #5 State Court File - Part 5 of 5)(Reid, Benjamine)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Sharon Smith, Willie Washington, Etienne Pierre. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by First Transit, Inc., Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Benjamine)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Etienne Pierre, Sharon Smith, Willie Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Quiles, Alan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Etienne Pierre, Sharon Smith, Willie Washington (Quiles, Alan)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report within 7 days following this Court's order on Plaintiffs' forthcoming Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/27/2018. (jza)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to File Joint Scheduling Report by Etienne Pierre, Sharon Smith, Willie Washington. Attorney Alan Luis Quiles added to party Etienne Pierre(pty:pla). Responses due by 10/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quiles, Alan)
September 23, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Transit, Inc. (James, Elaine)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Logan Pardell on behalf of Sharon Smith, Willie Washington. Attorney Logan Pardell added to party Sharon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Logan Pardell added to party Willie Washington(pty:pla). (Pardell, Logan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Luis Quiles on behalf of Sharon Smith, Willie Washington. Attorney Alan Luis Quiles added to party Sharon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Alan Luis Quiles added to party Willie Washington(pty:pla). (Quiles, Alan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended (By Interlineation) Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10965935, filed by Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc., First Transit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reid, Benjamine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuttle Services M.I.A., Inc.
Represented By: Benjamine Reid
Represented By: Elaine Johnson James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamine Reid
Represented By: Elaine Johnson James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Michael Anthony Pancier
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Represented By: Logan Pardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne Pierre
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Michael Anthony Pancier
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Washington
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Michael Anthony Pancier
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Represented By: Logan Pardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?